Bokaie et al v. Green Earth Coffee LLC et al
Plaintiff: Stefan Bokaie, Carol Bokaie, Brenda Ward, Patrick Ward, Gurjiwan Uppal, Surinder Uppal, Marie Uppal, Sandeep Bhandari and Neera Bhandari
Defendant: Exchange Bank, Green Earth Coffee LLC, Carlos Zambrano and Flying Rooster, LLC
Case Number: 3:2018cv05244
Filed: August 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jon S Tigar
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1962
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 27, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 19, 2018 Filing 20 NOTICE of Errata and Correction to #17 NOTICE OF MOTION & MOTION to Dismiss First, Second and Third causes of action and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Defendant Cultivators' Motion to Dismiss filed by Green Earth Coffee LLC. Motion Hearing set for 11/29/2018 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 09, 19th Floor before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 10/29/2018. Replies due by 11/5/2018. (Stratton, Kenneth) (Filed on 10/19/2018) Modified on 10/22/2018 (tnS, COURT STAFF).
October 19, 2018 Filing 19 Notice of Errata and Correction filed by Flying Rooster, LLC. (Terreri, Herbert) (Filed on 10/19/2018)
October 15, 2018 Filing 18 NOTICE AND MOTION to MOTION to Dismiss First, Second and Third Causes of Action and Memorandum of Points & Authorities in Support of Defendant Cultivators' Motion to Dismiss filed by Flying Rooster, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 11/29/2018 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 09, 19th Floor before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 10/29/2018. Replies due by 11/5/2018. (Terreri, Herbert) (Filed on 10/15/2018)
October 15, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE OF MOTION & MOTION to Dismiss First, Second and Third causes of action and MEMORANDUM of Points & Authorities in Support of Defendant Cultivators' MOTION to Dismiss filed by Green Earth Coffee LLC. Motion Hearing set for 11/29/2018 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 09, 19th Floor before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 10/29/2018. Replies due by 11/5/2018. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Kenneth Stratton, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Stratton, Kenneth) (Filed on 10/15/2018)
October 10, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth Blair Stratton Joe Rogoway, & David Socher (Stratton, Kenneth) (Filed on 10/10/2018)
October 9, 2018 Filing 15 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 11/19/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/28/2018 at 2:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 9, 19th Floor. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Standing Order for All Judges of the Northern District) (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2018)
October 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Jon S. Tigar for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Executive Committee on 10/4/18. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2018)
October 3, 2018 Filing 13 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2018)
October 3, 2018 Filing 12 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Flying Rooster, LLC.. (Terreri, Herbert) (Filed on 10/3/2018)
September 25, 2018 Filing 11 STIPULATION Regarding Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint filed by Neera Bhandari, Sandeep Bhandari, Carol Bokaie, Stefan Bokaie, Gurjiwan Uppal, Marie Uppal, Surinder Uppal, Brenda Ward, Patrick Ward. (Block, Roman) (Filed on 9/25/2018)
September 18, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice as to defendant Exchange Bank by Neera Bhandari, Sandeep Bhandari, Carol Bokaie, Stefan Bokaie, Gurjiwan Uppal, Marie Uppal, Surinder Uppal, Brenda Ward, Patrick Ward (Block, Roman) (Filed on 9/18/2018)
September 13, 2018 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Patrick Ward, Surinder Uppal, Brenda Ward, Sandeep Bhandari, Carol Bokaie, Neera Bhandari, Stefan Bokaie, Marie Uppal, Gurjiwan Uppal. Green Earth Coffee LLC served on 9/4/2018, answer due 9/25/2018. (Block, Roman) (Filed on 9/13/2018) Modified on 9/14/2018 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
September 13, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Patrick Ward, Surinder Uppal, Brenda Ward, Sandeep Bhandari, Carol Bokaie, Neera Bhandari, Stefan Bokaie, Marie Uppal, Gurjiwan Uppal. Carlos Zambrano served on 9/4/2018, answer due 9/25/2018. (Block, Roman) (Filed on 9/13/2018) Modified on 9/14/2018 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
September 10, 2018 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Neera Bhandari, Sandeep Bhandari, Carol Bokaie, Stefan Bokaie, Gurjiwan Uppal, Marie Uppal, Surinder Uppal, Brenda Ward, Patrick Ward.. (Block, Roman) (Filed on 9/10/2018)
September 3, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Patrick Ward, Surinder Uppal, Brenda Ward, Sandeep Bhandari, Carol Bokaie, Neera Bhandari, Stefan Bokaie, Marie Uppal, Gurjiwan Uppal. Exchange Bank served on 8/29/2018, answer due 9/19/2018. (Block, Roman) (Filed on 9/3/2018) Modified on 9/5/2018 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
August 28, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Exchange Bank, Flying Rooster, LLC, Green Earth Coffee LLC, Carlos Zambrano. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2018)
August 28, 2018 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/22/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/29/2018 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2018)
August 27, 2018 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/10/2018. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2018)
August 27, 2018 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Block, Roman) (Filed on 8/27/2018)
August 27, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Green Earth Coffee LLC, Carlos Zambrano, Flying Rooster, LLC, Exchange Bank (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-12630382). Filed by Stefan Bokaie. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Block, Roman) (Filed on 8/27/2018) Modified on 8/28/2018 (slhS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bokaie et al v. Green Earth Coffee LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stefan Bokaie
Represented By: Roman Block
Represented By: Kevin Peter Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol Bokaie
Represented By: Roman Block
Represented By: Kevin Peter Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Ward
Represented By: Roman Block
Represented By: Kevin Peter Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Ward
Represented By: Roman Block
Represented By: Kevin Peter Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gurjiwan Uppal
Represented By: Roman Block
Represented By: Kevin Peter Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Surinder Uppal
Represented By: Roman Block
Represented By: Kevin Peter Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marie Uppal
Represented By: Roman Block
Represented By: Kevin Peter Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandeep Bhandari
Represented By: Roman Block
Represented By: Kevin Peter Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Neera Bhandari
Represented By: Roman Block
Represented By: Kevin Peter Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Exchange Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Green Earth Coffee LLC
Represented By: Joseph Alexander Rogoway
Represented By: David Robert Socher
Represented By: Kenneth Blair Stratton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carlos Zambrano
Represented By: Joseph Alexander Rogoway
Represented By: David Robert Socher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flying Rooster, LLC
Represented By: Herbert Luca Terreri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?