Banks v. Polk
Plaintiff: Teresa Banks
Defendant: Melissa Polk
Case Number: 3:2018cv05283
Filed: August 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jon S Tigar
Referring Judge: Kandis A Westmore
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: False Claims Act
Cause of Action: 31:3729
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER ADOPTING MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION AND DISMISSING CASE FOR LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION by Judge Jon S. Tigar; denying #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (Attachments: #(1) Certificate/Proof of Service) (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2018)
September 11, 2018 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statements due by 1/7/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/16/2019 at 2:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 9, 19th Floor. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service, #2 Standing Order, #3 Standing Order for All Judges of the Northern District) (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2018)
September 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Jon S. Tigar for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Executive Committee on 9/10/2018. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2018)
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore Reassigning Case to a District Judge and Report and Recommendation to Deny #2 Plaintiff's In Forma Pauperis Application. (kawlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2018) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/7/2018: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (sisS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 9/10/2018 (sisS, COURT STAFF).
August 29, 2018 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #4 Clerk's Notice. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2018)
August 28, 2018 Filing 5 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Teresa Banks. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2018)
August 28, 2018 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE Regarding Resources Available to Pro Se Litigants. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2018)
August 28, 2018 Filing 3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/20/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/27/2018 01:30 PM. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order)(cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2018)
August 28, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Teresa Banks. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2018) Modified on 9/10/2018 (sisS, COURT STAFF).
August 28, 2018 Filing 1 CLAIM against Melissa Polk. Filed by Teresa Banks. Consent/Declination due by 9/11/2018. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2018) Modified on 8/29/2018 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Banks v. Polk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teresa Banks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melissa Polk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?