Pure Data Systems, LLC v. Electronic Arts Inc.

Plaintiff: Pure Data Systems, LLC
Defendant: Electronic Arts Inc.
Case Number: 3:2018cv05343
Filed: August 30, 2018
Court: California Northern District Court
0 Judge: Donna M Ryu
1 Judge: Joseph C Spero
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order 74 Order, signed 10/11/18 as modified, by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting #73 Stipulation To Continue Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 11/13/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/30/2018 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor.(klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2018)
October 10, 2018 73 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Case Management Conference (filed Jointly) filed by Electronic Arts Inc.. (Marriott, Michelle) (Filed on 10/10/2018)
October 5, 2018 72 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Pure Data Systems, LLC. (Skeels, David) (Filed on 10/5/2018)
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order 71 Order, signed as modified on 10/3/18, by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting (68) Motion to Appear by Telephone for Michelle Marriott on 10/12/18 at 2:00 PM in case 3:18-cv-00852-JCS.Associated Cases: 3:18-cv-00852-JCS, 3:18-cv-05343-JCS(klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2018)
September 26, 2018 Opinion or Order 70 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 10/5/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/12/2018 at 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 9/26/18. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2018)
September 25, 2018 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to the case. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2018)
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order 69 ORDER RELATING CASE. Related to 18-cv-0852 JCS. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 9/24/18. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2018)
September 24, 2018 68 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Pure Data Systems, LLC.. (Skeels, David) (Filed on 9/24/2018)
September 20, 2018 67 SECOND CLERK'S NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 10/4/2018. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2018)
September 18, 2018 66 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Electronic Arts Inc... (Marriott, Michelle) (Filed on 9/18/2018)
September 5, 2018 65 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff and Defendant shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 9/19/2018. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2018)
August 31, 2018 63 CLERK'S NOTICE regarding case transferred in from Central District of California. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2018)
August 30, 2018 64 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/28/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/5/2018 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2018)
August 30, 2018 62 Case transferred in from District of California Central; Case Number 2:18-cv-01097. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. Modified on 8/31/2018 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
August 28, 2018 Opinion or Order 61 ORDER RE JOINT STIPULATION TO TRANSFER THE CASE TO THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA by Judge John A. Kronstadt, re Stipulation to Transfer Case #60 . After considering the Stipulation, and in the interest of justice, the Stipulation is GRANTED. This action is transferred to the District Court for the Northern District of California-San Francisco division, (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (bp)
August 24, 2018 60 Joint STIPULATION to Transfer Case to Northern District of California filed by defendant Electronic Arts Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order to Transfer Case to NDCA)(Smith, Stephen)
August 2, 2018 Opinion or Order 59 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER ADVANCING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO TRANSFER TO THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA (DKT. #58 ) by Judge John A. Kronstadt: The Court, on its own motion, advances the Motion from October 29, 2018 to October 15, 2018 at 8:30 a.m. Any opposition shall be filed by August 27, 2018, with the reply to be filed no later than September 17, 2018. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ake) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
August 1, 2018 58 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Transfer Case to Northern District of California filed by Defendant Electronic Arts Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 10/29/2018 at 08:30 AM before Judge John A. Kronstadt. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Memorandum in Support of Motion to Transfer, #2 Declaration Declaration of Betsy Contro, #3 Declaration Declaration of Mark Lang in Support of Motion for Transfer, #4 Exhibit Ex 1 to Lang Dec'l, #5 Exhibit Ex 2 to Lang Dec'l, #6 Exhibit Ex 3 to Lang Dec'l, #7 Exhibit Ex 4 to Lang Dec'l, #8 Exhibit Ex 5 to Lang Dec'l, #9 Exhibit Ex 6 to Lang Dec'l, #10 Exhibit Ex 7 to Lang Dec'l, #11 Exhibit Ex 8 to Lang Dec'l, #12 Exhibit Ex 9 to Lang Dec'l, #13 Exhibit Ex 10 to Lang Dec'l, #14 Exhibit Ex 11 to Lang Dec'l, #15 Exhibit Ex 12 to Lang Dec'l, #16 Exhibit Ex 13 to Lang Dec'l, #17 Exhibit Ex 14 to Lang Dec'l, #18 Exhibit Ex 15 to Lang Dec'l, #19 Exhibit Ex 16 to Lang Dec'l, #20 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Lang, Mark)
July 25, 2018 Opinion or Order 57 ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge John A. Kronstadt: granting #55 Non-Resident Attorney Enrique Sanchez Jr APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Pure Data Systems, LLC, designating Stephen M Lobbin as local counsel. (jp)
July 19, 2018 56 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by defendant Electronic Arts Inc..(Smith, Stephen)
July 17, 2018 55 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Enrique Sanchez Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Pure Data Systems, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-22105004) filed by plaintiff Pure Data Systems, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Lobbin, Stephen)
July 16, 2018 Opinion or Order 54 ORDER by Judge John A. Kronstadt: granting #49 Non-Resident Attorney Mark C. Lang APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant, Electronic Arts Inc., designating Smith, Stephen S. as local counsel. (yl)
July 16, 2018 Opinion or Order 53 ORDER by Judge John A. Kronstadt: granting #48 Non-Resident Attorney Michelle L. Marriot APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant, Electronic Arts Inc., designating Stephen S. Smith as local counsel. (yl)
July 16, 2018 Opinion or Order 52 ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge John A. Kronstadt: granting #47 Non-Resident Attorney Eric A. Buresh APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Electronic Arts Inc., designating Smith, Stephen S. as local counsel. (yl)
July 10, 2018 51 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 7/2/18, 8:30 AM re Transcript #50 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (Joko, Alexander) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
July 10, 2018 50 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 7/2/18, 8:30 AM. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: Alex Joko, phone number aj_csr@yahoo.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 7/31/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/10/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/9/2018. (Joko, Alexander)
July 9, 2018 49 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Mark C. Lang to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Electronic Arts Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $325 Previously Paid on 6/30/2018, Receipt No. 26AM2F77) filed by defendant Electronic Arts Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Smith, Stephen)
July 9, 2018 48 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Michelle L. Marriott to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Electronic Arts Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $325 Previously Paid on 6/30/2018, Receipt No. 26AM2E0I) filed by defendant Electronic Arts Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Smith, Stephen)
July 9, 2018 47 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Eric A. Buresh to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Electronic Arts Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $325 Previously Paid on 6/30/2018, Receipt No. 26AM2D5S) filed by defendant Electronic Arts Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Smith, Stephen)
July 6, 2018 Opinion or Order 46 ORDER TO STRIKE ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS by Judge John A. Kronstadt: the following document(s) be STRICKEN for failure to comply with the Local Rules, General Order and/or the Courts Case Management Order: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Mark C. Lang to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Electronic Arts Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-22020098) #39 , APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Eric A. Buresh to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Electronic Arts Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-22020096) #37 , APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Michelle L. Marriott to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Electronic Arts Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-22020097) #38 , for the following reasons: The Applications are DENIED without prejudice to them being refiled by July 16, 2018. Counsel shall re-file the Applications so that they each have an original signature(s) pursuant to the Local Rule. A proposed order shall be attached to each application. See G-64 Order. If the amended applications are not filed by July 16, 2018, the Clerk shall return the fees to counsel.; (bp)
July 6, 2018 45 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Defendant Electronic Arts Inc. for Court Reporter. Court will contact Penny Dicks at penny.dicks@eriseip.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Schmidt, Chris)
July 3, 2018 Opinion or Order 44 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS (DKT. 20) by Judge John A. Kronstadt: The Motion is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. The Motion is DENIED as to patent eligibility under 35 U.S.C. 101, without prejudice to the renewal of these challenges based on a factual record. The Motion is GRANTED, without prejudice, as to the claim for indirect patent infringement. Any amended complaint shall be filed no later than July 17, 2018. (bp)
July 2, 2018 43 DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS (DKT. 20) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held before Judge John A. Kronstadt. The motion hearing is held. The Court states its tentative views that it is inclined to grant in part and deny in part Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (the "Motion"). Counsel address the Court. The Court takes the Motion UNDER SUBMISSION and a ruling will be issued. The scheduling conference is held. The Court confers with counsel regarding the status of the case. The Court has reviewed the parties' June 26, 2018 Report and sets the following deadlines: Last day to amend or add parties 4/27/2018. Discovery cut-off 4/8/2019. Last day to file motions 5/6/2019. Last day to participates in a settlement conference is 1/31/2019. Post-Mediation Status Conference set for 2/11/2019 01:30 PM. Markman hearing 11/19/2018 at 10:00 a.m. (SEE CIVIL MINUTES FOR FURTHER SPECIFICS) Court Reporter: Alex Joko. (bp)
July 2, 2018 42 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Eric A. Buresh to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Electronic Arts Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-22020096) #37 , APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Michelle L. Marriott to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Electronic Arts Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-22020097) #38 , APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Mark C. Lang to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Electronic Arts Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-22020098) #39 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(b) Proposed order not attached. Local Rule 5-4.3.4 Application not hand-signed. (lom)
July 2, 2018 Opinion or Order 41 ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 3 by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Case ordered to a private mediator based upon a stipulation of the parties or by the court order. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than January 31, 2019. Status Conference set for February 11, 2019 at 1:30 pm before Judge John A. Kronstadt. (ake)
July 2, 2018 Opinion or Order 40 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER CONTINUING POST MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE AND SETTING DATE FOR UPDATED JOINT REPORT ON SETTLEMENT (DKT. #14 ) by Judge John A. Kronstadt: The Court has reviewed the parties' Joint Report. Dkt. 14. The Court continues the Post Mediation Status Conference from July 9, 2018 to December 10, 2018 at 1:30 p.m. Counsel shall file an updated joint report no later than December 3, 2018, regarding the status of the parties' settlement efforts and whether a further mediation session with Hon. Robert T. Altman (Ret.) would be productive and, if so, when. The Court will determine whether the December 10 hearing is necessary upon review of the joint report. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ake) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
June 30, 2018 39 [STRICKEN PURSUANT TO DOCKET ENTRY #46] APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Mark C. Lang to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Electronic Arts Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-22020098) filed by defendant Electronic Arts Inc.. (Smith, Stephen) Modified on 7/9/2018 (bp).
June 30, 2018 38 [STRICKEN PURSUANT TO DOCKET ENTRY #46] APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Michelle L. Marriott to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Electronic Arts Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-22020097) filed by defendant Electronic Arts Inc.. (Smith, Stephen) Modified on 7/9/2018 (bp).
June 30, 2018 37 [STRICKEN PURSUANT TO DOCKET ENTRY #46] APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Eric A. Buresh to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Electronic Arts Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-22020096) filed by defendant Electronic Arts Inc.. (Attorney Stephen S Smith added to party Electronic Arts Inc.(pty:dft)) (Smith, Stephen) Modified on 7/9/2018 (bp).
June 26, 2018 36 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 5 days, filed by Plaintiff Pure Data Systems, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Schedule of Pretrial and Trial Dates for Patent Cases)(Skeels, David)
June 25, 2018 Opinion or Order 35 ORDER RE STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEADLINE TO SUBMIT JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT by Judge John A. Kronstadt. The date by which the parties must submit a Joint Case Management Conference is extended to June 26, 2018. #34 (pso)
June 22, 2018 34 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Joint Case Management Statement filed by Plaintiff Pure Data Systems, LLC.(Skeels, David)
June 21, 2018 33 REPLY in Support NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #20 filed by Defendant Electronic Arts Inc.. (Schmidt, Chris)
June 14, 2018 Opinion or Order 32 ORDER RE STIPULATION TO EXTEND BRIEFING SCHEDULE by Judge John A. Kronstadt: Court GRANTS the Stipulation #31 . The date for the DefendantElectronic Arts Inc.s Reply in Support of its Motion to Dismiss is extended to June 21, 2018. (et)
June 12, 2018 31 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Reply as to Response in Opposition to Motion #30 filed by Defendant Electronic Arts Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Schmidt, Chris)
June 11, 2018 30 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #20 filed by Plaintiff Pure Data Systems, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Skeels, David)
June 4, 2018 Opinion or Order 29 ORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPROVAL OF SUBSTITUTION OR WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY #28 by Judge John A. Kronstadt: The Court hereby orders that the request of: PURE DATA SYSTEMS, LLC, Plaintiff to substitute Stephen M. Lobbin as attorney of record instead of Ryan E. Hatch. (bp)
May 29, 2018 28 REQUEST TO WITHDRAW ATTORNEY Ryan E. Hatch as counsel of record filed by Plaintiff Pure Data Systems, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Hatch, Ryan)
May 25, 2018 Opinion or Order 27 ORDER by Judge John A. Kronstadt: Granting #24 Non-Resident Attorney David A. Skeels APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff, Pure Data Systems LLC, designating Stephen M Lobbin as local counsel. (shb)
May 25, 2018 Opinion or Order 26 ORDER TO STRIKE ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS by Judge John A. Kronstadt: the following document(s) be STRICKEN for failure to comply with the Local Rules, General Order and/or the Courts Case Management Order: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION of Ryan E. Hatch to Withdraw as Attorney Unopposed Motion to Withdraw as Counsel #25 , for the following reasons: Hearing information is missing, incorrect, or not timely. The motion is not opposed. Accordingly, Plaintiff shall re-file the motion using the appropriate request for approval of substitution of attorney. See the Court's Form G-001.; (bp)
May 24, 2018 25 [STRICKEN PURSUANT TO DOCKET ENTRY #26] NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION of Ryan E. Hatch to Withdraw as Attorney Unopposed Motion to Withdraw as Counsel filed by Plaintiff Pure Data Systems, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Hatch, Ryan) Modified on 5/25/2018 (bp).
May 21, 2018 24 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney David A. Skeels to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Pure Data Systems, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-21785658) filed by Plaintiff Pure Data Systems, LLC. (Attachments: # (1 ) Proposed Order) (Lobbin, Stephen)
May 14, 2018 23 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Stephen M Lobbin on behalf of Plaintiff Pure Data Systems, LLC (Attorney Stephen M Lobbin added to party Pure Data Systems, LLC(pty:pla))(Lobbin, Stephen)
May 11, 2018 Opinion or Order 22 ORDER SETTING RULE 16(b)/26(f) by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Scheduling Conference set for 7/2/2018 at 08:30 AM. Joint Report due on 6/22/2018. Refer to the Court's order for details. (pso)
May 9, 2018 21 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Electronic Arts Inc. (Schmidt, Chris)
May 9, 2018 20 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by defendant Electronic Arts Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 7/2/2018 at 08:30 AM before Judge John A. Kronstadt. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum In Support of Motion to Dismiss) (Schmidt, Chris)
May 8, 2018 19 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) #16 , Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) #17 by Clerk. The Notices are stricken. Plaintiff shall file the appropriate application that seeks the admission of a non-resident attorney to appear in a case. See Court's General Form G-64. (lom)
May 7, 2018 18 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123), #16 , Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123), #17 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Application for Pro Hac Vice. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
May 4, 2018 17 STRICKEN, see docket entry no. 19 - Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Ryan E Hatch counsel for Plaintiff Pure Data Systems, LLC. Adding Enrique Sanchez, Jr. as counsel of record for Pure Data Systems, LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Pure Data Systems, LLC. (Hatch, Ryan) Modified on 5/8/2018 (lom).
May 4, 2018 16 STRICKEN, see docket entry no. 19 - Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Ryan E Hatch counsel for Plaintiff Pure Data Systems, LLC. Adding David A. Skeels as counsel of record for Pure Data Systems, LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Pure Data Systems, LLC. (Hatch, Ryan) Modified on 5/8/2018 (lom).
April 5, 2018 Opinion or Order 15 ORDER RE STIPULATION TO EXTEND THE TIME WITHIN WHICH DEFENDANT ELECTRONIC ARTS INC. MAY RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT (L.R. 7-1) #14 by Judge John A. Kronstadt. The Court GRANTS the Stipulation and orders that Defendant Electronic Arts Inc.'s deadline to file its Answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended to May 9, 2018. (lom)
April 3, 2018 14 Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Electronic Arts Inc. answer now due 5/9/2018, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Electronic Arts Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Schmidt, Chris)
April 3, 2018 13 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Chris R Schmidt on behalf of Defendant Electronic Arts Inc. (Attorney Chris R Schmidt added to party Electronic Arts Inc.(pty:dft))(Schmidt, Chris)
February 27, 2018 12 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Pure Data Systems, LLC, upon Defendant Electronic Arts Inc. served on 2/15/2018, answer due 4/9/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Cogency Global Inc. c/o Mary Mclntyre - Authorized Agent for Service of Process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by method of service not specified.Original Summons NOT returned. (Hatch, Ryan)
February 26, 2018 11 Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Electronic Arts Inc. answer now due 4/9/2018, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Pure Data Systems, LLC.(Hatch, Ryan)
February 22, 2018 10 STANDING ORDER FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOHN A. KRONSTADT. (SEE ORDER FOR SPECIFICS) (bp)
February 9, 2018 9 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Electronic Arts Inc. (et)
February 9, 2018 8 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
February 9, 2018 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John A. Kronstadt and Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (et)
February 8, 2018 6 DEMAND for Jury Trial filed by Plaintiff Pure Data Systems, LLC.. (Hatch, Ryan)
February 8, 2018 5 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Pure Data Systems, LLC. (Hatch, Ryan)
February 8, 2018 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff Pure Data Systems, LLC identifying Monument Patent Holdings, LLC as Corporate Parent. (Hatch, Ryan)
February 8, 2018 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Pure Data Systems, LLC. (Hatch, Ryan)
February 8, 2018 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Pure Data Systems, LLC. (Hatch, Ryan)
February 8, 2018 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-21233432 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Pure Data Systems, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Attorney Ryan E Hatch added to party Pure Data Systems, LLC(pty:pla))(Hatch, Ryan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pure Data Systems, LLC v. Electronic Arts Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pure Data Systems, LLC
Represented By: Enrique Sanchez, Jr.
Represented By: Ryan Ephraim Hatch
Represented By: Stephen M Lobbin
Represented By: David Arthur Skeels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Electronic Arts Inc.
Represented By: Chris R Schmidt
Represented By: Michelle L Marriott
Represented By: Stephen Shannon Smith
Represented By: Eric A. Buresh
Represented By: Mark C Lang
Represented By: Michelle Lyons Marriott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?