Alert Signal Intellectual Property, LLC v. Apple Inc.
Plaintiff: Alert Signal Intellectual Property, LLC
Defendant: Apple, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2018cv05407
Filed: September 4, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Edward M Chen
Referring Judge: Joseph C Spero
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 26, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 26, 2018 Filing 51 Answer to Amended Complaint #10 Amended Complaint, Apple's First Amended Answer, Defenses and Counterclaims to Alert's Amended Complaint (Per Court Order dated Oct. 25, 2018 (Dkt. #50)), COUNTERCLAIM against Alert Signal Intellectual Property, LLC byApple, Inc.. (Jensen, Travis) (Filed on 10/26/2018)
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER re #49 Stipulation Allowing Defendant Apple, Inc. to File Amended Answer and Counterclaims filed by Apple, Inc.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/25/2018. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2018)
October 23, 2018 Filing 49 STIPULATION Allowing Defendant Apple, Inc. to File Amended Answer and Counterclaims filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Jensen, Travis) (Filed on 10/23/2018)
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER granting #47 Stipulation filed by Alert Signal Intellectual Property, LLC. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/3/2018. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2018)
October 2, 2018 Filing 47 STIPULATION re #33 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim to Extend Time to Respond to Defendant's Counterclaims filed by Alert Signal Intellectual Property, LLC. (Ni, Hao) (Filed on 10/2/2018)
September 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #44 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Claudia Wilson Frost. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2018)
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 45 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER IN REASSIGNED CASE: Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/31/2019 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 1/24/2019. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/24/2018. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2018)
September 24, 2018 Filing 44 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12704215.) filed by Apple, Inc.. (Frost, Claudia) (Filed on 9/24/2018)
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Edward M. Chen for all further proceedings. Judge Susan Illston no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Executive Committee on 9/24/18. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2018)
September 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 9/20/18. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2018)
September 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting #37 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12691864.) filed by Apple, Inc.. (Miller, Tyler) (Filed on 9/19/2018). (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2018)
September 19, 2018 Filing 40 CLERK'S NOTICE Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/7/2018 02:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 01, 17th Floor. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Standing Order, #3 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording) (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2018)
September 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting #31 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12687537.) filed by Alert Signal Intellectual Property, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Ni, Hao). (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2018)
September 19, 2018 Filing 38 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Travis Marc Jensen re Withdrawal of Melissa Richards Smith (Jensen, Travis) (Filed on 9/19/2018)
September 19, 2018 Filing 37 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12691864.) filed by Apple, Inc.. (Miller, Tyler) (Filed on 9/19/2018)
September 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Susan Illston for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Executive Committee on 9/19/18. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2018)
September 18, 2018 Filing 35 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Alert Signal Intellectual Property, LLC.. (LeFan, Kris) (Filed on 9/18/2018)
September 18, 2018 Filing 34 Certificate of Interested Entities by Apple, Inc. (Jensen, Travis) (Filed on 9/18/2018)
September 18, 2018 Filing 33 ANSWER to Amended Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Alert Signal Intellectual Property, LLC byApple, Inc.. (Jensen, Travis) (Filed on 9/18/2018)
September 18, 2018 Filing 32 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2018)
September 18, 2018 Filing 31 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12687537.) filed by Alert Signal Intellectual Property, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Ni, Hao) (Filed on 9/18/2018)
September 18, 2018 Filing 30 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Apple, Inc... (Jensen, Travis) (Filed on 9/18/2018)
September 17, 2018 Filing 29 Certificate of Interested Entities by Alert Signal Intellectual Property, LLC (LeFan, Kris) (Filed on 9/17/2018)
September 17, 2018 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Kris S. LeFan (LeFan, Kris) (Filed on 9/17/2018)
September 4, 2018 Filing 27 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/30/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/7/2018 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2018)
September 4, 2018 Filing 26 Case transferred in from District of Texas Eastern; Case Number 2:18-cv-00177. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
August 10, 2018 ***FILED IN ERROR. PER CLERK Document # 24, Order - Scheduling Conference. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ch, )
August 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #23 Joint MOTION to Change Venue to the Northern District of California. ORDERED that this case is transferred to the United States District Court for the Northern District of California. It is further ORDERED that all deadlines in this case are stayed pending transfer. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 8/9/2018. (ch, )
August 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ***FILED IN ERROR***ORDER - Scheduling Conference set for 9/11/2018 01:30 PM before District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 8/9/2018. (ch, ) Modified on 8/10/2018 (ch, ).
August 6, 2018 Filing 23 Joint MOTION to Change Venue to the Northern District of California by Alert Signal Intellectual Property, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ni, Hao)
August 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #21 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #16 SEALED PATENT MOTION Motion to Dismiss for Improper Venue Responses due by 8/6/2018. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 8/1/2018. (ch, )
July 30, 2018 Filing 21 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #18 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION to Transfer Venue Under 28 U.S.C. 1404(a), #16 SEALED PATENT MOTION Motion to Dismiss for Improper Venue by Alert Signal Intellectual Property, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(McCool, Krystal)
July 18, 2018 Filing 20 REDACTION to #18 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION to Transfer Venue Under 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Frost, Claudia)
July 18, 2018 Filing 19 REDACTION to #16 SEALED PATENT MOTION Motion to Dismiss for Improper Venue by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Frost, Claudia)
July 16, 2018 Filing 18 Opposed SEALED PATENT MOTION to Transfer Venue Under 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Jensen, Travis)
July 16, 2018 Filing 17 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Apple's Motion to Transfer Venue Under 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jensen, Travis)
July 16, 2018 Filing 16 SEALED PATENT MOTION Motion to Dismiss for Improper Venue by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Jensen, Travis)
July 16, 2018 Filing 15 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Apple's Motion to Dismiss for Improper Venue by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jensen, Travis)
July 16, 2018 Filing 14 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Apple Inc. (Jensen, Travis)
July 16, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Tyler Scott Miller on behalf of Apple Inc. (Miller, Tyler)
July 16, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Travis Jensen on behalf of Apple Inc. (Jensen, Travis)
July 16, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Claudia Wilson Frost on behalf of Apple Inc. (Frost, Claudia)
July 2, 2018 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Apple Inc., filed by Alert Signal Intellectual Property, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit A-1, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit B-1, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit C-1, #7 Exhibit D, #8 Exhibit D-1)(Ni, Hao)
May 15, 2018 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Alert Signal Intellectual Property, LLC. Apple Inc. served on 5/2/2018, answer due 7/9/2018. (McCool, Krystal)
May 8, 2018 Defendant's Unopposed SECOND Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Apple Inc. to 7/9/2018. 15 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
May 8, 2018 Filing 8 Defendant Apple Inc.'s Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Apple Inc. (Smith, Melissa)
May 8, 2018 Defendant's Unopposed FIRST Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Apple Inc. to 6/22/2018. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( ch, )
May 8, 2018 Filing 7 Defendant Apple Inc.'s Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint Apple Inc.( Smith, Melissa)
May 1, 2018 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Alert Signal Intellectual Property, LLC (McCool, Krystal)
May 1, 2018 In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ch, )
May 1, 2018 Case assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (ch, )
May 1, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Issued as to Apple Inc.. (ch, )
April 30, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Stevenson Moore, V on behalf of Alert Signal Intellectual Property, LLC (Moore, Stevenson)
April 30, 2018 Filing 3 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (McCool, Krystal)
April 30, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Krystal La'Shae McCool on behalf of Alert Signal Intellectual Property, LLC (McCool, Krystal)
April 30, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Apple Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-6759397.), filed by Alert Signal Intellectual Property, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit A-1, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit B-1, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit C-1, #7 Exhibit D, #8 Exhibit D-1, #9 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ni, Hao)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alert Signal Intellectual Property, LLC v. Apple Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple, Inc.
Represented By: Tyler Scott Miller
Represented By: Melissa Richards Smith
Represented By: Claudia Wilson Frost
Represented By: Travis Jensen
Represented By: Tyler Scott Miller,
Represented By: Travis Marc Jensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alert Signal Intellectual Property, LLC
Represented By: Stevenson Moore, V
Represented By: Krystal La'Shae McCool
Represented By: Hao Ni
Represented By: Kris S. LeFan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?