Adobe Systems Incorporated v. Digi Spot, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Adobe Systems Incorporated
Defendant: Jabbar Mohammed, Digi Spot, LLC, Digi Spot, LLC a Texas Limited Liability Company doing business as Digi Shop doing business as Deal-Smart and Jabbar Mohammed an Individual doing business as Digitronics
Case Number: 3:2018cv05444
Filed: September 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Referring Judge: Kandis A Westmore
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Extending Second Request to Extend Deadline to Answer #18 . Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 10/31/18. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2018)
October 30, 2018 Filing 18 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, Enlarging Time for Defendants Digi Spot, LLC and Jabbar Mohammed to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint [Civil L.R. 6-1(a)] filed by Adobe Systems Incorporated. (Chaney, Marcus) (Filed on 10/30/2018)
October 5, 2018 Filing 17 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, Enlarging Time for Defendants Digi Spot, LLC and Jabbar Mohammed to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint [Civil L.R. 6-1(a)] filed by Adobe Systems Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Chaney, Marcus) (Filed on 10/5/2018)
September 17, 2018 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Adobe Systems Incorporated. Jabbar Mohammed served on 9/15/2018, answer due 10/9/2018. (Chaney, Marcus) (Filed on 9/17/2018)
September 17, 2018 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Adobe Systems Incorporated. Digi Spot, LLC served on 9/15/2018, answer due 10/9/2018. (Chaney, Marcus) (Filed on 9/17/2018)
September 12, 2018 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Adobe Systems Incorporated re #13 Clerk's Notice, Judge Illston's Standing Order, Standing Order For All Judges Of The N.D.C.A. and Notice Of Eligibility For Video Recording (Chaney, Marcus) (Filed on 9/12/2018)
September 12, 2018 Filing 13 CLERK'S NOTICE Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/7/2018 02:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 01, 17th Floor. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Standing Order, #3 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording) (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2018)
September 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Susan Illston for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Executive Committee on 9/11/2018. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2018)
September 11, 2018 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2018)
September 10, 2018 Filing 10 DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Adobe Systems Incorporated. (Chaney, Marcus) (Filed on 9/10/2018) Modified on 9/11/2018 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
September 6, 2018 Filing 9 REPORT on the filing of an action regarding Trademark (cc: form mailed to register). (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2018)
September 6, 2018 Filing 8 REPORT on the filing of an action regarding Copyright (cc: form mailed to register). (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2018)
September 6, 2018 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Digi Spot, LLC, Jabbar Mohammed. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2018)
September 6, 2018 Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/27/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/4/2018 01:30 PM. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2018)
September 5, 2018 Filing 5 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/19/2018. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2018)
September 5, 2018 Filing 4 Proposed Summons. (Chaney, Marcus) (Filed on 9/5/2018)
September 5, 2018 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Adobe Systems Incorporated pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 (Chaney, Marcus) (Filed on 9/5/2018)
September 5, 2018 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Adobe Systems Incorporated pursuant to Civil L.R. 3-15 (Chaney, Marcus) (Filed on 9/5/2018)
September 5, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Damages(with jury demand) against Digi Spot, LLC, Jabbar Mohammed (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-12651903). Filed by Adobe Systems Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Chaney, Marcus) (Filed on 9/5/2018) Modified on 9/6/2018 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adobe Systems Incorporated v. Digi Spot, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jabbar Mohammed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Digi Spot, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Digi Spot, LLC a Texas Limited Liability Company doing business as Digi Shop doing business as Deal-Smart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jabbar Mohammed an Individual doing business as Digitronics
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adobe Systems Incorporated
Represented By: Marcus Freeman Chaney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?