Piscovich et al v. Miller

Plaintiff: Jill Piscovich and Martin Piscovich
Defendant: Daniel G. Miller
Case Number: 3:2018cv05507
Filed: September 7, 2018
Court: California Northern District Court
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2018 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jill Piscovich, Martin Piscovich re #1 Complaint, Summons, etc. on Daniel G. Miller (Green, Horace) (Filed on 10/23/2018)
October 9, 2018 9 CLERK'S NOTICE SCHEDULING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE UPON REASSIGNMENT - Joint Case Management Statement due by 12/13/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/20/2018 at 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/whaorders.. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2018)
October 4, 2018 Opinion or Order 8 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge William Alsup for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Executive Committee on 10/4/18. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2018)
October 3, 2018 7 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2018)
October 3, 2018 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Jill Piscovich, Martin Piscovich.. (Green, Horace) (Filed on 10/3/2018)
September 11, 2018 5 Summons Issued as to Defendant Daniel G. Miller. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2018)
September 11, 2018 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Joint Case Management Statement due by 12/3/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/10/2018 at 1:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom A, 15th Floor. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2018)
September 10, 2018 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/24/2018. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2018)
September 7, 2018 2 Proposed Summons. (Green, Horace) (Filed on 9/7/2018)
September 7, 2018 1 COMPLAINT for Breach of Fiduciary Duty, Concealment, Misrepresentation, and Accounting against Daniel G. Miller, (Filing Fee: $400.00, receipt number 0971-12661571). Filed by Martin Piscovich, Jill Piscovich. (Attachments: #(1) Civil Cover Sheet)(Green, Horace) (Filed on 9/7/2018) Modified on 9/11/2018 (tnS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Piscovich et al v. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jill Piscovich
Represented By: Horace W. Green
Represented By: Roger Joseph Brothers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martin Piscovich
Represented By: Horace W. Green
Represented By: Roger Joseph Brothers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel G. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?