G & G Closed Circuit Events, LLC v. Bozin et al

Plaintiff: G & G Closed Circuit Events, LLC
Defendant: Mark Daniel Bozin, KRM, LLC and Kevin Cassidy Sprenger
Case Number: 3:2018cv05533
Filed: September 10, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: James Donato
Referring Judge: Joseph C Spero
Nature of Suit: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 47:605
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/13/2018 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 12/6/2018.. Signed by Judge James Donato on 9/27/18. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2018)
September 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge James Donato for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Executive Committee on 9/26/18. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2018)
September 25, 2018 Filing 13 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2018)
September 24, 2018 Filing 12 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by G & G Closed Circuit Events, LLC.. (Riley, Thomas) (Filed on 9/24/2018)
September 13, 2018 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to Mark Daniel Bozin. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2018)
September 13, 2018 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to KRM, LLC. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2018)
September 13, 2018 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Kevin Cassidy Sprenger. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2018)
September 13, 2018 Filing 8 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 12/7/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/14/2018 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2018)
September 10, 2018 Filing 7 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/24/2018. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2018)
September 10, 2018 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filed byG & G Closed Circuit Events, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Amended)(Riley, Thomas) (Filed on 9/10/2018)
September 10, 2018 Filing 5 Proposed Summons. (Riley, Thomas) (Filed on 9/10/2018)
September 10, 2018 Filing 4 Proposed Summons. (Riley, Thomas) (Filed on 9/10/2018)
September 10, 2018 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. (Riley, Thomas) (Filed on 9/10/2018)
September 10, 2018 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by G & G Closed Circuit Events, LLC (Riley, Thomas) (Filed on 9/10/2018)
September 10, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400.00, receipt number 0971-12664066.). Filed by G & G Closed Circuit Events, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Riley, Thomas) (Filed on 9/10/2018) Modified on 9/13/2018 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: G & G Closed Circuit Events, LLC v. Bozin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Daniel Bozin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KRM, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Cassidy Sprenger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: G & G Closed Circuit Events, LLC
Represented By: Thomas Peter Riley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?