Shamima v. Wells Fargo Bank, NA

Plaintiff: Aktar Shamima
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, NA
Case Number: 3:2018cv05540
Filed: September 10, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Nature of Suit: Banks and Banking
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Aktar Shamima (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2018)
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCREENING ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 10/16/2018. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2018)
October 2, 2018 Filing 6 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Wells Fargo Bank, NA. Filed by Aktar Shamima. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2018)
September 21, 2018 Filing 5 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Aktar Shamima.. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2018)
September 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2018)
September 10, 2018 Filing 3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 12/6/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/13/2018 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order)(jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2018)
September 10, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Aktar Shamima. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2018)
September 10, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Wells Fargo Bank, NA. Filed by Aktar Shamima. Consent/Declination due by 9/24/2018. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2018)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shamima v. Wells Fargo Bank, NA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, NA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aktar Shamima
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?