Sream, Inc. et al v. Cigar Palace, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Sream, Inc. and RooR International, BV
Defendant: DOES 1 though 10, inclusive and Cigar Palace, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2018cv05687
Filed: September 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth D Laporte
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1051
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting Stipulation to Extend Time for Defendants to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte: granting #14 Stipulation. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2018)
October 23, 2018 #Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101]Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re: #16 Claim Construction Statement filed by Cigar Pal ace, Inc. Correct Event is Consent Declination to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction not Claims Construction Statement. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2018)
October 22, 2018 Filing 16 CONSENT OR DECLINATION TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE JURISDICTION; filed by Cigar Palace, Inc. (Atalla, Nabil) (Filed on 10/22/2018) Modified on 10/23/2018 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
October 22, 2018 Filing 15 CLERK'S NOTICE TO PLAINTIFFS AND DEFENDANT Re: Consent or Declination. Plaintiffs and Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 11/5/2018. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2018)
October 22, 2018 Filing 14 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Cigar Palace, Inc.. (Atalla, Nabil) (Filed on 10/22/2018)
October 22, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Nabil Ramsey Atalla (Atalla, Nabil) (Filed on 10/22/2018)
October 9, 2018 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sream, Inc., RooR International, BV. Cigar Palace, Inc. served on 10/1/2018, answer due 10/22/2018. (Vakil, Imran) (Filed on 10/9/2018)
September 27, 2018 Filing 11 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by RooR International, BV, Sream, Inc... (Vakil, Imran) (Filed on 9/27/2018)
September 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting Request to Appear Telephonically at Motion for Scheduling Conference signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte: granting #9 Request. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2018)
September 26, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION & [PROPOSED] ORDER to Appear by Telephone filed by RooR International, BV, Sream, Inc. (Vakil, Imran) (Filed on 9/26/2018) Modified on 9/27/2018 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
September 19, 2018 Filing 8 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding: TRADEMARK INFRINGEMENT (cc: form mailed to register). (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2018)
September 19, 2018 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Cigar Palace, Inc. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2018)
September 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 12/11/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/18/2018 10:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 9/18/18. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2018)
September 18, 2018 Filing 5 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 10/2/2018. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2018)
September 17, 2018 Filing 4 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by RooR International, BV, Sream, Inc. (Vakil, Imran) (Filed on 9/17/2018)
September 17, 2018 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by RooR International, BV, Sream, Inc. (Vakil, Imran) (Filed on 9/17/2018)
September 17, 2018 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Vakil, Imran) (Filed on 9/17/2018)
September 17, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR: (1) FEDERAL TRADEMARK INFRINGEMENT [15 U.S.C. 1114]; (2) COUNTERFEITING [15 U.S.C. 1117]; (3) FALSE DESIGNATION OF ORIGIN [15 U.S.C. 1125 (a)]; (4) UNFAIR COMPETITION [CA..BUS.& PROF.CODE 17200]; (5) COMMON LAW UNFAIR COMPETITION; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL; against Cigar Palace, Inc., DOES 1 though 10, inclusive ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-12686053.). Filed bySream, Inc., RooR International, BV. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Vakil, Imran) (Filed on 9/17/2018) Modified on 9/19/2018 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sream, Inc. et al v. Cigar Palace, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 though 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cigar Palace, Inc.
Represented By: Nabil Ramsey Atalla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sream, Inc.
Represented By: Imran Vakil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RooR International, BV
Represented By: Imran Vakil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?