Roberts, Jr. v. Telltale Games, Inc.

Plaintiff: Vernie Roberts, Jr.
Defendant: Telltale Games, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2018cv05850
Filed: September 24, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Joseph C Spero
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 05:704
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER GRANTING re #14 Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed by Vernie Roberts, Jr. Attorney Douglas Evans Dexter terminated.. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 10/22/18. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2018)
October 18, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Steven M. Tindall (Tindall, Steven) (Filed on 10/18/2018)
October 9, 2018 Filing 13 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Vernie Roberts, Jr... (Olsen, Mary) (Filed on 10/9/2018)
October 4, 2018 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Vernie Roberts, Jr. re 4 Case Assigned by Intake,,, #8 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint, (Dexter, Douglas) (Filed on 10/4/2018)
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER, signed 10/1/18, by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting #6 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for M. Vance McCrary. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2018)
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Order, signed 10/1/18, by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting #5 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Mary E. Olsen.(klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2018)
September 28, 2018 Filing 9 AMENDED Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case may fall within the Pilot Program for Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See #General Order 71. Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Case Management Statement due by 12/28/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/4/2019 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2018)
September 28, 2018 #Electronic filing error. Re: #7 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines. Incorrect CMC hearing date, please disregard. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2018)
September 28, 2018 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Telltale Games, Inc.. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2018)
September 28, 2018 Filing 7 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case may fall within the Pilot Program for Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See #General Order 71. Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Case Management Statement due by 12/14/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/28/2018 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2018)
September 28, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice; Proposed Order (Filing fee $ 310.00, receipt number 0971-12720794.) filed by Vernie Roberts, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (McCrary, M.) (Filed on 9/28/2018) Modified on 9/28/2018 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
September 28, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice with Proposed Order (Filing fee $ 310.00, receipt number 0971-12720769.) filed by Vernie Roberts, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Olsen, Mary) (Filed on 9/28/2018) Modified on 9/28/2018 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
September 24, 2018 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 10/9/2018. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2018)
September 24, 2018 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by Vernie Roberts, Jr. (Dexter, Douglas) (Filed on 9/24/2018)
September 24, 2018 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Dexter, Douglas) (Filed on 9/24/2018)
September 24, 2018 Filing 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT [Violation of Worker Adjustment and Restraining Notification Act, 29 USC Sections 2101-2109 and California Labor Code Sections 1400 ET SEQ.]; Demand for Jury Trial against Telltale Games, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400.00, receipt number 0971-12704801.). Filed by Vernie Roberts, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Dexter, Douglas) (Filed on 9/24/2018) Modified on 9/28/2018 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roberts, Jr. v. Telltale Games, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vernie Roberts, Jr.
Represented By: Douglas Evans Dexter
Represented By: Steven M. Tindall
Represented By: Mary E. Olsen
Represented By: M. Vance McCrary
Represented By: Stuart J. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Telltale Games, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?