Eastman v. Apple Inc.
Plaintiff: Darren Eastman
Defendant: Apple Inc.
Case Number: 3:2018cv05929
Filed: September 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Donna M Ryu
Referring Judge: Jon S Tigar
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER GRANTING IN PART MOTION TO DISMISS AND REMANDING STATE-LAW CLAIMS by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting in part #11 Motion to Dismiss; granting #19 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; terminating as moot #25 Motion to Compel. Amended Pleadings due by 12/14/2018. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2018)
November 13, 2018 Filing 26 CLERK'S NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing as to #25 MOTION to Compel Interrogatories. This motion has been noticed for hearing on a date closed to further settings. The Motion Hearing set for 12/28/2018 is continued to 1/3/2019 at 2:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 9, 19th Floor before Judge Jon S. Tigar. The briefing schedule is unchanged. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2018)
November 9, 2018 Filing 25 MOTION to Compel Interrogatories filed by Darren Eastman. Motion Hearing set for 12/27/2018 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 09, 19th Floor before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 11/23/2018. Replies due by 11/30/2018. (Eastman, Darren) (Filed on 11/9/2018)
November 1, 2018 Filing 24 NOTICE filed by Apple Inc. re Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance for Jesse J. Koehler (Eberhart, David) (Filed on 11/1/2018)
October 30, 2018 Filing 23 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Proof of Service - Opposition to Demurrer and Memo of Points & Authorities served on Jesse Koehler, Esq. on 10/22/18, filed by Darren Eastman. (Eastman, Darren) (Filed on 10/30/2018)
October 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER VACATING HEARING re #11 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint filed by Apple Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on October 30, 2018. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2018)
October 25, 2018 Filing 21 REPLY (re #11 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint ) filed byApple Inc.. (Eberhart, David) (Filed on 10/25/2018)
October 24, 2018 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple Inc. re #19 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Eberhart, David) (Filed on 10/24/2018)
October 24, 2018 Filing 19 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David R. Eberhart, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Eastman Memorandum of Points and Authorities Supporting Opposition to Demurrer at Dkt. 18, #4 UnRedacted Eastman Memorandum of Points and Authorities Supporting Opposition to Demurrer at Dkt. 18)(Eberhart, David) (Filed on 10/24/2018)
October 22, 2018 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM of Points & Authorities Supporting re #17 Opposition/Response to Demurrer re #11 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint filed byDarren Eastman. (Related document(s) #17 ) (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2018)
October 22, 2018 Filing 17 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE to Demurrer (re #11 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint) filed by Darren Eastman. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2018)
October 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting #15 Motion for Permission for Electronic Case Filing. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2018)
October 15, 2018 Filing 15 MOTION for Permission for Electronic Case Filing filed by Darren Eastman.(Attachments: #(1) [Proposed] Order, #(2) Envelope) (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2018)
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STIPULATION AND ORDER re #13 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Joint Stipulation Regarding Continuance of January 2, 2019 Initial Case Management Conference filed by Apple Inc. Case Management Statement due by 12/28/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/9/2019 at 2:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 9, 19th Floor. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on October 9, 2018. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2018)
October 4, 2018 Filing 13 Joint Stipulation Regarding Continuance of January 2, 2019 Initial Case Management Conference and [Proposed] Order filed by Apple Inc.. (Eberhart, David) (Filed on 10/4/2018)
October 4, 2018 Filing 12 Declaration of Alexander B. Parker in Support of #11 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint filed byApple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(Related document(s) #11 ) (Parker, Alexander) (Filed on 10/4/2018)
October 4, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint filed by Apple Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 11/8/2018 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 09, 19th Floor before Judge Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 10/18/2018. Replies due by 10/25/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Eberhart, David) (Filed on 10/4/2018)
October 2, 2018 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 12/20/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/2/2019 at 2:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 9, 19th Floor. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service, #2 Standing Order, #3 Standing Order for All Judges of the Northern District) (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2018)
October 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Jon S. Tigar for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Executive Committee on 10/2/2018. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2018)
October 1, 2018 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2018)
October 1, 2018 Set/Reset Hearing re #6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/2/2019 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2018)
September 28, 2018 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Apple Inc... (Eberhart, David) (Filed on 9/28/2018)
September 27, 2018 Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 12/26/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/2/2018 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2018)
September 27, 2018 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple Inc. re #2 Certificate of Interested Entities, #3 Certificate of Interested Entities, #1 Notice of Removal, 4 Case Assigned by Intake,,, (Eberhart, David) (Filed on 9/27/2018)
September 27, 2018 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 10/11/2018. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2018)
September 27, 2018 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by Apple Inc. (Eberhart, David) (Filed on 9/27/2018)
September 27, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Apple Inc. (Eberhart, David) (Filed on 9/27/2018)
September 27, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court For The State Of California, Santa Clara County. Their case number is 18CV333181. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-12715678). Filed byApple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - First Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit 3 - Remainder Of State Court File, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Eberhart, David) (Filed on 9/27/2018)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eastman v. Apple Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darren Eastman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple Inc.
Represented By: David R. Eberhart
Represented By: Alexander B Parker
Represented By: Jesse Jon Koehler
Represented By: Alexander Bok-Sing Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?