United States of America v. Hughes
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Timberly E. Hughes
Case Number: 3:2018cv05931
Filed: September 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth D Laporte
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2018 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by United States of America. Service waived by Timberly E. Hughes waiver sent on 10/11/2018, answer due 12/10/2018. (Senra, Nithya) (Filed on 11/20/2018)
October 11, 2018 Filing 5 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by United States of America.. (Senra, Nithya) (Filed on 10/11/2018)
September 28, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Timberly E. Hughes. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2018)
September 27, 2018 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 10/11/2018. (cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2018)
September 27, 2018 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Senra, Nithya) (Filed on 9/27/2018)
September 27, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Timberly E. Hughes. Filed by United States of America. (Fee Waived) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Senra, Nithya) (Filed on 9/27/2018) Modified on 9/28/2018 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timberly E. Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Nithya Senra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?