Social Technologies LLC v. Apple Inc.
Plaintiff: Social Technologies, LLC and Social Technologies LLC
Defendant: Apple, Inc. and Apple Inc.
Case Number: 3:2018cv05945
Filed: September 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Vince Chhabria
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:44
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2018 Filing 44 ANSWER TO COUNTERCLAIM bySocial Technologies LLC. (Dee, Peter) (Filed on 11/13/2018)
November 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 43 Order by Judge Vince Chhabria denying #4 Motion for Preliminary Injunction.(knmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2018)
November 1, 2018 Filing 42 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Vince Chhabria: Motion Hearing held on 11/1/2018 re #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Social Technologies LLC. The Court heard oral argument from counsel and took the matter under submission. A written ruling will be issued. FTR Time: 10:42- 11:10. Plaintiff Attorney: Nicholas Ranallo and Peter Dee. Defendant Attorney: Dale Cendali, Diana Torres, and Mary Mazzello. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (knm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/1/2018)
October 26, 2018 Filing 41 REPLY (re #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction ) filed bySocial Technologies LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Dee Reply Decl., #2 Exhibit Ex A Apple's analytics, #3 Exhibit Ex B Fortune article, #4 Exhibit Ex C Statista messaging app users stats)(Dee, Peter) (Filed on 10/26/2018)
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER by Judge Vince Chhabria granting #39 Administrative Motion to file an oversized reply brief. (vclc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2018)
October 23, 2018 Filing 39 Consent ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION File Oversized Reply Brief re #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Social Technologies LLC. Responses due by 10/29/2018. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Peter Dee, #2 Exhibit Ex 1, Apple consent, #3 Proposed Order)(Dee, Peter) (Filed on 10/23/2018)
October 22, 2018 Filing 38 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Social Technologies LLC byApple Inc.. (Cendali, Dale) (Filed on 10/22/2018)
October 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 37 Order by Judge Vince Chhabria granting #30 Motion for Pro Hac Vice - McKeown.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2018)
October 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 36 Order by Judge Vince Chhabria granting #29 Motion for Pro Hac Vice - Mazzello.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2018)
October 19, 2018 Filing 35 DECLARATION of Diana M. Torres in Opposition to #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed byApple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Related document(s) #4 ) (Cendali, Dale) (Filed on 10/19/2018)
October 19, 2018 Filing 34 DECLARATION of Michael Jaynes in Opposition to #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed byApple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Related document(s) #4 ) (Cendali, Dale) (Filed on 10/19/2018)
October 19, 2018 Filing 33 DECLARATION of Kurt Knight in Opposition to #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed byApple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Related document(s) #4 ) (Cendali, Dale) (Filed on 10/19/2018)
October 19, 2018 Filing 32 DECLARATION of Thomas R. La Perle in Opposition to #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed byApple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24)(Related document(s) #4 ) (Cendali, Dale) (Filed on 10/19/2018)
October 19, 2018 Filing 31 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction ) filed byApple Inc.. (Cendali, Dale) (Filed on 10/19/2018)
October 19, 2018 Filing 30 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12779479.) filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(McKeown, Megan) (Filed on 10/19/2018)
October 19, 2018 Filing 29 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12779459.) filed by Apple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Mazzello, Mary) (Filed on 10/19/2018)
October 11, 2018 Filing 28 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, Administrative Motion to Shorten Time, Motion for Preliminary Injunction and all supporting papers filed therewith served on Apple Inc. on 10/1/18, filed by Social Technologies LLC., CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Social Technologies LLC (Dee, Peter) (Filed on 10/11/2018)
October 9, 2018 Reset Deadlines as to #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . Responses due by 10/19/2018. Replies due by 10/26/2018. Motion Hearing set for 11/1/2018 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 04, 17th Floor before Judge Vince Chhabria. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2018)
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Order by Judge Vince Chhabria denying #9 Administrative Motion to Shorten Time, and Setting Deadlines.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2018)
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Order by Judge Vince Chhabria granting #22 Motion for Pro Hac Vice - Dee.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2018)
October 9, 2018 Filing 25 REASSIGNED CASE - NOTICE OF NEW HEARING DATE: You are notified that the Court has scheduled an Initial Case Management Conference before Judge Vince Chhabria upon reassignment. For a copy of Judge Chhabria's Standing Order and other information, please refer to the Court's website at www.cand.uscourts.gov. All pending motions will be taken off-calendar and must be re-noticed by the moving party for a new hearing according to Judge Chhabria's available dates, which are listed on his webpage under the section "Scheduling Notes." The new hearing date must be at least five weeks from the date the motion was filed and at least three weeks from the date the re-notice is filed. The due date for any opposition or reply papers not yet filed shall be calculated in accordance with Civil Local Rule 7-3. Case Management Statement due by 1/2/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/8/2019 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 04, 17th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2018)
October 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Vince Chhabria for all further proceedings pursuant to Order of Recusal. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. District Judge Beth Labson Freeman no longer assigned to the case. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2018)
October 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 10/5/2018. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2018)
October 5, 2018 Filing 22 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12741305.) filed by Social Technologies LLC. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Certificate of Good Standing)(Dee, Peter) (Filed on 10/5/2018)
October 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Beth Labson Freeman for all further proceedings. Judge Charles R. Breyer no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Executive Committee on 10/4/18. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2018)
October 4, 2018 Filing 20 Certificate of Interested Entities by Social Technologies LLC identifying Other Affiliate FlexDev, LLC, Other Affiliate Robert Long II, Other Affiliate Samuel Bonet, LLP for Social Technologies LLC. (Ranallo, Nicholas) (Filed on 10/4/2018) Modified on 10/4/2018 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 10/3/2018. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2018)
October 2, 2018 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Lauren J. Schweitzer (Schweitzer, Lauren) (Filed on 10/2/2018)
October 2, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Dale Cendali (Cendali, Dale) (Filed on 10/2/2018)
October 2, 2018 Filing 16 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #9 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Shorten Time re #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction ) filed byApple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Thomas La Perle, #2 Exhibit A - 87-397135 USPTO Record, #3 Exhibit B - 87-397135 Trademark Assignments, #4 Exhibit C - 6/13/2018 Cease and Desist Letter, #5 Exhibit D - 6/14/2018 Apple Response Letter, #6 Exhibit E - 6/22/2018 Follow-Up Letter, #7 Exhibit F - Petition for Cancellation, #8 Declaration Diana Torres, #9 Exhibit 1 - 10/2/2018 E-mail re Consent to Page Increase, #10 Proposed Order)(Torres, Diana) (Filed on 10/2/2018)
October 2, 2018 Filing 15 Certificate of Interested Entities by Apple Inc. (Torres, Diana) (Filed on 10/2/2018)
October 2, 2018 Filing 14 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Apple Inc. (Torres, Diana) (Filed on 10/2/2018)
October 2, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Diana Marie Torres (Torres, Diana) (Filed on 10/2/2018)
October 2, 2018 Filing 12 REPORT on the filing of an action regarding Trademark Infringement (cc: form mailed to register). (Attachments: #1 Complaint)(mclS, COURT STAFF)
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Charles R. Breyer for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Executive Committee on 10/1/18. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2018)
October 1, 2018 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2018)
September 28, 2018 Filing 9 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Shorten Time re #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Social Technologies LLC. Responses due by 10/2/2018. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Dee Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Ranallo, Nicholas) (Filed on 9/28/2018)
September 28, 2018 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Social Technologies LLC.. (Ranallo, Nicholas) (Filed on 9/28/2018)
September 28, 2018 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Defendant Apple Inc.. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2018)
September 28, 2018 Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Joint Case Management Statement due by 12/24/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/31/2018 at 1:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom A, 15th Floor. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2018)
September 28, 2018 Filing 5 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 10/12/2018. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2018)
September 28, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE OF MOTION & MOTION for Preliminary Injunction; Memorandum of Law in Support filed by Social Technologies LLC. Responses due by 10/12/2018. Replies due by 10/19/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Declaration Bonet Declaration, #17 Declaration Dee Declaration, #18 Proposed Order)(Ranallo, Nicholas) (Filed on 9/28/2018)
September 27, 2018 Filing 3 REPORT on the filing of an action regarding Trademarks Infringement (cc: form mailed to register). (Ranallo, Nicholas) (Filed on 9/27/2018)
September 27, 2018 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Ranallo, Nicholas) (Filed on 9/27/2018)
September 27, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for (1) Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act), (2) Trademark Infringement (Common Law), (3) Unfair Competition (Cal.Bus. & Prof. Code Section 17200), (4) Declaratory Judgment of Validity, (5) Declaratory Judgment of Non-Infringement; Demand for Jury Trial against Apple Inc., (Filing Fee: $400.00, receipt number 0971-12717941). Filed by Social Technologies LLC. (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit A, #(2) Civil Cover Sheet)(Ranallo, Nicholas) (Filed on 9/27/2018) Modified on 9/28/2018 (tnS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Social Technologies LLC v. Apple Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple Inc.
Represented By: Lauren J. Schweitzer
Represented By: Dale Cendali
Represented By: Diana Marie Torres
Represented By: Megan Leigh McKeown
Represented By: Mary C. Mazzello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Social Technologies, LLC
Represented By: Nicholas Ranallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Social Technologies LLC
Represented By: Nicholas Ranallo
Represented By: Peter Caro Dee,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?