Adkins v. Facebook, Inc.
Plaintiff: CARLA ECHAVARRIA, DERRICK WALKER, William Bass, Jr., Jasper Schmidt, Jill Herr, Denise Brown-Wells and Stephen Adkins
Defendant: Facebook, Inc.
Interested Party: Scott Schinder
Consolidated Plaintiff: Kathi McGuire, Dominique Martin, Licea Luis, Rebecca A King, Hassan Elkassem, Robert E Newborn, Joseph Melendez, Connor Wiik, Angeles Meneses, Rubin K Johnson, Caryn Bendetowies and Luis Licea
Case Number: 3:2018cv05982
Filed: September 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Referring Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
2 Judge: Sallie Kim
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 30, 2020 Filing 302 Declaration of Gavin A. Corn in Support of #296 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Exhibit 6 to Supplemental Brief ISO Motion for Preliminary Approval filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Related document(s) #296 ) (Blunschi, Melanie) (Filed on 3/30/2020)
March 26, 2020 Filing 301 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Facebook, Inc. re #299 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of the Second Declaration of Christopher Bream (Blunschi, Melanie) (Filed on 3/26/2020) Modified on 3/31/2020 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
March 26, 2020 Filing 300 Declaration of Christopher Bream in Support of #297 Supplemental Brief,, - [Redacted] filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Related document(s) #297 ) (Blunschi, Melanie) (Filed on 3/26/2020) Modified on 3/31/2020 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
March 26, 2020 Filing 299 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of the Second Declaration of Christopher Bream filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Gavin A. Corn, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version of Second Declaration of Christopher Bream, #4 Unredacted Version of Second Declaration of Christopher Bream)(Blunschi, Melanie) (Filed on 3/26/2020) Modified on 3/30/2020 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
March 26, 2020 Filing 298 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Stephen Adkins re #296 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Exhibit 6 to Supplemental Brief ISO Motion for Preliminary Approval (Friedman, Andrew) (Filed on 3/26/2020)
March 26, 2020 Filing 297 Supplemental Brief re #281 MOTION for Settlement and Preliminary Approval filed byStephen Adkins. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Class Counsel ISO Supplemental Brief, #2 Exhibit 1 - Excerpts from March 5, 2020 Hearing Transcript, #3 Exhibit 2 - Settlement Agreement Redline, #4 Exhibit 3 - Proposed Order on Preliminary Approval Redline, #5 Exhibit 4 - Long Form Notice of Settlement Redline, #6 Exhibit 5 - Proposed Order on Final Approval Redline, #7 Exhibit 6 - Amended Settlement Agreement [REDACTED])(Related document(s) #281 ) (Friedman, Andrew) (Filed on 3/26/2020)
March 26, 2020 Filing 296 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Exhibit 6 to Supplemental Brief ISO Motion for Preliminary Approval filed by Stephen Adkins. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit 6 [REDACTED], #4 Exhibit 6 [UNDER SEAL])(Friedman, Andrew) (Filed on 3/26/2020)
March 19, 2020 Filing 295 Transcript of Proceedings held on March 5, 2020, before Judge William H. Alsup. Court Reporter, Marla F. Knox, RPR, CRR, telephone number (602) 391-6990. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #293 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/17/2020. (Related documents(s) #293 ) (mfkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2020)
March 9, 2020 Filing 294 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 3/5/2020 before Judge William Alsup by Scott Schinder, for Court Reporter Marla Knox. (Weaver, Lesley) (Filed on 3/9/2020)
March 6, 2020 Filing 293 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 03/05/2020 before Judge William Alsup by Stephen Adkins, for Court Reporter Marla Knox. (Yanchunis, John) (Filed on 3/6/2020)
March 5, 2020 Filing 292 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 03/05/2020 before Judge William Alsup by Facebook, Inc., for Court Reporter Marla Knox. (Blunschi, Melanie) (Filed on 3/5/2020)
March 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 291 SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER RE MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS SETTLEMENT. By Judge Alsup. (whalc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2020)
March 5, 2020 Filing 290 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 03/05/2020 before Judge William Alsup by Stephen Adkins, William Bass, Jr., Denise Brown-Wells, Carla Echavarria, Jill Herr, Jasper Schmidt, Derrick Walker, for Court Reporter Marla Knox. (De Bartolomeo, A.J.) (Filed on 3/5/2020)
March 5, 2020 Filing 289 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William Alsup: Motion Hearing re #281 MOTION for Settlement and Preliminary Approval held on 3/5/2020. Matter taken under submission. Court to issue written order. (Total Time in Court: 31 minutes.) Court Reporter: Marla Knox. Plaintiff Attorney: A.J. de Bartolomeo, John Yanchunis, Ariana Tadler, Andrew Friedman. Defendant Attorney: Elizabeth Deeley, Melanie Blunschi, Andrew Clubok, Serrin Turner. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/5/2020)
February 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 288 ORDER GRANTING #287 MOTION TO CONTINUE. By Judge Alsup. Motion for Preliminary Approval Hearing set for 3/5/2020 08:00 AM. (whalc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2020)
February 11, 2020 Filing 287 MOTION to Continue (Unopposed Motion to Continue Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement) filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Melanie M. Blunschi, #2 Proposed Order)(Blunschi, Melanie) (Filed on 2/11/2020)
February 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 286 ORDER ON #282 STIPULATION TO STAY FURTHER PROCEEDINGS PENDING SETTLEMENT APPROVAL AND SETTING HEARING ON MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT. By Judge Alsup. Motion for Preliminary Approval Hearing set for 2/20/2020 08:00 AM. (whalc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2020)
February 10, 2020 Filing 285 Declaration of Gavin A. Corn in Support of #280 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal , #281 MOTION for Settlement and Preliminary Approval filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Plaintiffs Exhibit A-1 [Redacted])(Related document(s) #280 , #281 ) (Blunschi, Melanie) (Filed on 2/10/2020)
February 7, 2020 Filing 284 AMENDED CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Stephen Adkins re #283 Certificate of Service (Friedman, Andrew) (Filed on 2/7/2020)
February 7, 2020 Filing 283 Erroneous Entry - Please Refer to Document #284 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Stephen Adkins re #280 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Friedman, Andrew) (Filed on 2/7/2020) Modified on 2/12/2020 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
February 7, 2020 Filing 282 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER (Stipulated Request and [Proposed] Order to Stay Pending Settlement Approval) filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Melanie M. Blunschi)(Blunschi, Melanie) (Filed on 2/7/2020)
February 7, 2020 Filing 281 MOTION for Settlement and Preliminary Approval filed by Stephen Adkins. Motion Hearing set for 3/19/2020 08:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor before Judge William Alsup. Responses due by 2/21/2020. Replies due by 2/28/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Settlement Agreement, #2 Exhibit A1 FILED UNDER SEAL, #3 Exhibit A-2 Proposed Order Granting Preliminary Approval, #4 Exhibit A3 Weisbrot Declaration, #5 Exhibit A4a Long Form Notice, #6 Exhibit A4b Short Form Notice, #7 Exhibit A5 Proposed Order for Final Approval, #8 Exhibit B Joint Declaration of Class Counsel ISO Mot for Preliminary Approval, #9 Exhibit C Firm Resumes, #10 Proposed Order)(Friedman, Andrew) (Filed on 2/7/2020)
February 7, 2020 Filing 280 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Stephen Adkins, William Bass, Jr., Caryn Bendetowies, Denise Brown-Wells, Carla Echavarria, Hassan Elkassem, Jill Herr, Rubin K Johnson, Rebecca A King, Luis Licea, Dominique Martin, Kathi McGuire, Joseph Melendez, Angeles Meneses, Robert E Newborn, Scott Schinder, Jasper Schmidt, Derrick Walker, Connor Wiik. (Attachments: #1 Declaration ISO Admin Mot to Seal Ex. A -1 to Mot for Prelim Approval, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit A-1)(Friedman, Andrew) (Filed on 2/7/2020)
February 5, 2020 Filing 279 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero: Telephone Conference held on 2/5/2020.FTR Time: Not Reported. Attorney for Plaintiff: John Yanchunis, Ariana Tadler, AJ de Bartolomeo Attorney for Defendant: Melanie Blunchi, Serrin Turner (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/5/2020)
January 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 278 ORDER GRANTING IN PART #276 JOINT MOTION TO CONTINUE NOTICE PLAN AND EXPERT-RELATED DEADLINES. By Judge Alsup. (whalc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2020)
January 17, 2020 Filing 276 Joint ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Continue Notice Plan and Expert-Related Deadlines re #271 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief filed by Stephen Adkins. Responses due by 1/21/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John Yanchunis in Support, #2 Proposed Order Continuing Deadlines)(Yanchunis, John) (Filed on 1/17/2020)
January 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 275 ORDER GRANTING #274 STIPULATED REQUEST TO TAKE DEPOSITIONS. By Judge Alsup. (whalc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2020)
January 9, 2020 Filing 274 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER (Stipulated Request and [Proposed] Order Regarding Depositions to be Taken After Non-Expert Discovery Cutoff) filed by Facebook, Inc. and Stephen Adkins. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Melanie M. Blunschi)(Blunschi, Melanie) (Filed on 1/9/2020) Modified on 1/10/2020 (amgS, COURT STAFF).
January 8, 2020 Filing 273 Notice and Order Setting Further Settlement Conference before Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Further Settlement Conference set for 2/5/2020 09:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 1/8/2020. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2020)
January 8, 2020 Filing 272 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero: Settlement Conference held on 1/8/2020. Further Settlement Conference set for 2/5/2020 at 9:00 AM. FTR Time: Not Reported. Attorney for Plaintiff: John Yanchunis, Ryan McGee, Douglas McNamara, AJ de Bartolomeo, Devyn R. Glass Attorney for Defendant: Joseph Hansen, Annaka Abramson, Susan E. Engel, Serrin Turner, Andrew Clubok (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/8/2020)
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 271 ORDER GRANTING #270 JOINT MOTION TO MODIFY CERTIFIED CLASS AND CLASS NOTICE. By Judge Alsup. (whalc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2020)
December 19, 2019 Filing 270 Joint MOTION to Modify Certified Class and Class Notice filed by Facebook, Inc.. Responses due by 1/2/2020. Replies due by 1/9/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jennifer Foster, #2 Proposed Order)(Clubok, Andrew) (Filed on 12/19/2019) Modified on 12/19/2019 (amgS, COURT STAFF).
December 12, 2019 Filing 269 Statement [Update Pursuant to Order Granting in Part and Denying in Part Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, Dkt. #187 ] by Facebook, Inc.. (Blunschi, Melanie) (Filed on 12/12/2019)
December 12, 2019 Filing 268 MOTION to Certify Class Refiled Pursuant to 11/26/19 Order, Dkt. #259 filed by Stephen Adkins, William Bass, Jr., Caryn Bendetowies, Denise Brown-Wells, Carla Echavarria, Hassan Elkassem, Jill Herr, Rubin K Johnson, Rebecca A King, Luis Licea, Dominique Martin, Kathi McGuire, Joseph Melendez, Angeles Meneses, Robert E Newborn, Scott Schinder, Jasper Schmidt, Derrick Walker, Connor Wiik. Responses due by 12/26/2019. Replies due by 1/2/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 15, #15 Exhibit 16, #16 Exhibit 17, #17 Exhibit 18, #18 Exhibit 19, #19 Exhibit 20, #20 Exhibit 21, #21 Exhibit 22, #22 Exhibit 23, #23 Exhibit 25, #24 Exhibit 26, #25 Exhibit 27)(Friedman, Andrew) (Filed on 12/12/2019)
December 12, 2019 Filing 267 RESPONSE re #213 MOTION to Strike Doc. #259 by Stephen Adkins, William Bass, Jr., Caryn Bendetowies, Denise Brown-Wells, Carla Echavarria, Hassan Elkassem, Jill Herr, Rubin K Johnson, Rebecca A King, Luis Licea, Dominique Martin, Kathi McGuire, Joseph Melendez, Angeles Meneses, Robert E Newborn, Scott Schinder, Jasper Schmidt, Derrick Walker, Connor Wiik. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 32, #2 Exhibit 34, #3 Exhibit 37, #4 Exhibit 38, #5 Exhibit 39, #6 Exhibit 40, #7 Exhibit 43, #8 Exhibit 44)(Friedman, Andrew) (Filed on 12/12/2019) Modified on 12/12/2019 (amgS, COURT STAFF).
December 12, 2019 Filing 266 RESPONSE re #214 MOTION to Strike [Doc. # 259] by Stephen Adkins, William Bass, Jr., Caryn Bendetowies, Denise Brown-Wells, Carla Echavarria, Hassan Elkassem, Jill Herr, Rubin K Johnson, Rebecca A King, Luis Licea, Dominique Martin, Kathi McGuire, Joseph Melendez, Angeles Meneses, Robert E Newborn, Scott Schinder, Jasper Schmidt, Derrick Walker, Connor Wiik. (Friedman, Andrew) (Filed on 12/12/2019) Modified on 12/12/2019 (amgS, COURT STAFF).
December 12, 2019 Filing 265 AMENDED REPLY re #215 Opposition/Response to Motion [Doc. # 259] by Stephen Adkins, William Bass, Jr., Caryn Bendetowies, Denise Brown-Wells, Carla Echavarria, Hassan Elkassem, Jill Herr, Rubin K Johnson, Rebecca A King, Luis Licea, Dominique Martin, Kathi McGuire, Joseph Melendez, Angeles Meneses, Robert E Newborn, Scott Schinder, Jasper Schmidt, Derrick Walker, Connor Wiik. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 41, #2 Exhibit 45)(Friedman, Andrew) (Filed on 12/12/2019) Modified on 12/12/2019 (amgS, COURT STAFF).
December 12, 2019 Filing 264 REPLY Defendant Facebook, Inc.'s Reply in Support of Motion to Exclude the Declaration and Opinions of Plaintiff's Expert James Van Dyke - Refiled Pursuant to 11/26/19 Order, Dkt. #259 by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Melanie M. Blunschi, #2 Exhibit 21 to Blunschi Decl.)(Clubok, Andrew) (Filed on 12/12/2019) Modified on 12/12/2019 (amgS, COURT STAFF).
December 12, 2019 Filing 263 AMENDED CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT [Doc. # 259] against Facebook, Inc.. Filed by Robert E Newborn, Connor Wiik, Jasper Schmidt, Kathi McGuire, Jill Herr, Carla Echavarria, Stephen Adkins, Rubin K Johnson, Hassan Elkassem, Derrick Walker, Caryn Bendetowies, Joseph Melendez, Denise Brown-Wells, Rebecca A King, Scott Schinder, William Bass, Jr., Angeles Meneses, Dominique Martin, Luis Licea. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Friedman, Andrew) (Filed on 12/12/2019) Modified on 12/12/2019 (amgS, COURT STAFF).
December 12, 2019 Filing 262 RESPONSE Defendant Facebook, Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification - Refiled Pursuant to 11/26/19 Order, Dkt. #259 by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 6 to Blunschi Decl., #2 Exhibit 7 to Blunschi Decl., #3 Exhibit 8 to Blunschi Decl., #4 Exhibit 9 to Blunschi Decl., #5 Exhibit 10 to Blunschi Decl., #6 Exhibit 11 to Blunschi Decl., #7 Exhibit 12 to Blunschi Decl., #8 Exhibit 13 to Blunschi Decl., #9 Declaration of Austin Berglas, #10 Expert Report of Catherine Tucker, Ph.D.)(Clubok, Andrew) (Filed on 12/12/2019)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 261 REDACTED VERSION OF ORDER ON MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION AND MOTIONS TO STRIKE. By Judge Alsup. (whalc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2019)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 260 ORDER ON #198 MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION AND ON #213 #214 MOTIONS TO STRIKE. By Judge Alsup. Filed under seal for seven days. (whalc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2019)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 259 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART #192 #197 #220 #234 #239 #246 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTIONS TO FILE UNDER SEAL. By Judge Alsup. (whalc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2019) Modified on 11/26/2019 (whalc3, COURT STAFF).
November 21, 2019 Filing 258 CLERK'S NOTICE RESCHEDULING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Settlement Conference, previously set for 12/11/19 at 9:30 AM, has been re-set for 1/8/2020 at 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor before Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2019)
November 14, 2019 Filing 257 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 11/06/2019 before Judge William Alsup by Scott Schinder, for Court Reporter Marla Knox. (Weaver, Lesley) (Filed on 11/14/2019)
November 8, 2019 Filing 256 Transcript of Proceedings held on November 6, 2019, before Judge William H. Alsup. Court Reporter, Marla F. Knox, RPR, CRR, telephone number (602) 391-6990. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #254 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/6/2020. (Related documents(s) #254 ) (mfk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2019)
November 7, 2019 Filing 255 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 11/06/2019 before Judge William Alsup by Stephen Adkins, William Bass, Jr., Denise Brown-Wells, Carla Echavarria, Jill Herr, Jasper Schmidt, Derrick Walker, for Court Reporter Marla Knox. (Tadler, Ariana) (Filed on 11/7/2019)
November 6, 2019 Filing 254 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 11/06/2019 before Judge William Alsup by Facebook, Inc., for Court Reporter Marla Knox. (Blunschi, Melanie) (Filed on 11/6/2019)
November 6, 2019 Filing 253 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William Alsup: Motion Hearing re #198 MOTION to Certify Class, #213 MOTION to Strike, #214 MOTION to Strike held on 11/6/2019. Matter taken under submission. Court to issue written order. (Total Time in Court: 2 hours 7 minutes.) Court Reporter: Marla Knox. Plaintiff Attorney: John Yanchunis, Ryan McGee, Ariana Tadler, Douglas McNamara, Andrew Friedman. Defendant Attorney: Andrew Clubok, Susan Engel, Elizabeth Deeley, Rebecca McMahon, Melanie Blunschi, Joseph Hansen. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/6/2019)
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 252 THIRD ORDER RE VOLUNTARY DISMISSALS. By Judge Alsup. (whalc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2019)
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 251 ORDER GRANTING #238 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO REMOVE PREVIOUSLY FILED PLAINTIFFS REPLY MEMORANDUM ISO MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION AND EXHIBIT 41. By Judge Alsup. (whalc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2019)
October 28, 2019 Filing 250 Declaration of Jeremy Robinson in Support of #246 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Defendant Facebook, Inc.'s Reply in Support of Its Motion to Exclude the Declaration and Opinions of Plaintiff's Expert James Van Dyke and Supporting Documents filed byStephen Adkins. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 21 [Redacted], #2 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) #246 ) (Friedman, Andrew) (Filed on 10/28/2019)
October 23, 2019 Filing 249 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Facebook, Inc. re #246 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Defendant Facebook, Inc.'s Reply in Support of Its Motion to Exclude the Declaration and Opinions of Plaintiff's Expert James Van Dyke and Supporting Documents (Blunschi, Melanie) (Filed on 10/23/2019)
October 23, 2019 Filing 248 Declaration of Melanie M. Blunschi in Support of #247 Defendant Facebook, Inc.'s Reply in Support of Motion to Exclude the Declaration and Opinions of Plaintiff's Expert James Van Dyke filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 18, #2 Exhibit 19, #3 Exhibit 20, #4 Exhibit 21 [Sealed], #5 Exhibit 22, #6 Exhibit 23, #7 Exhibit 24 [Sealed], #8 Exhibit 25 [Sealed])(Blunschi, Melanie) (Filed on 10/23/2019)
October 23, 2019 Filing 247 REPLY (re #213 MOTION to Strike (Defendant Facebook, Inc.'s Motion to Exclude the Declaration and Opinions of Plaintiff's Expert James Van Dyke) ) [Redacted] filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Clubok, Andrew) (Filed on 10/23/2019)
October 23, 2019 Filing 246 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Defendant Facebook, Inc.'s Reply in Support of Its Motion to Exclude the Declaration and Opinions of Plaintiff's Expert James Van Dyke and Supporting Documents filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Melanie M. Blunschi in Support of Administrative Motion to Seal, #2 Proposed Order, #3 [Redacted] Facebook's Reply iso Motion to Exclude James Van Dyke, #4 [Unredacted] Facebook's Reply iso Motion to Exclude James Van Dyke, #5 [Redacted] Declaration of Melanie M. Blunschi iso Reply iso Motion to Exclude James Van Dyke, #6 [Unredacted] Declaration of Melanie M. Blunschi iso Reply iso Motion to Exclude James Van Dyke, #7 [Unredacted] Exhibit 21, #8 [Unredacted] Exhibit 24, #9 [Unredacted] Exhibit 25)(Blunschi, Melanie) (Filed on 10/23/2019)
October 21, 2019 Filing 245 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven Richard Weinmann (Weinmann, Steven) (Filed on 10/21/2019)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 244 ORDER GRANTING #243 STIPULATED REQUEST TO ENLARGE TIME FOR FACEBOOK, INC. TO FILE ITS REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO EXCLUDE JAMES VAN DYKE. By Judge Alsup. (whalc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2019)
October 17, 2019 Filing 243 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Enlarging Time for Facebook, Inc. to File its Reply in Support of Motion to Exclude James Van Dyke filed by Facebook, Inc. and Stephen Adkins. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Melanie Blunschi)(Blunschi, Melanie) (Filed on 10/17/2019) Modified on 10/18/2019 (amgS, COURT STAFF).
October 17, 2019 Filing 242 REPLY (re #214 MOTION to Strike (Defendant Facebook, Inc.'s Motion to Exclude the Declaration and Opinions of Plaintiff's Expert Ian Ratner) ) filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Clubok, Andrew) (Filed on 10/17/2019)
October 16, 2019 Filing 241 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley: Telephonic Discovery Hearing held on 10/16/2019. The parties will file a stipulation and order re: discovery. (FTR Time: 2:06-2:31.)Attorney for Plaintiff: Douglas McNamara.Attorneys for Defendant: Melanie Blunschi; Andrew Clubok; Serrin Turner. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/16/2019)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 240 ORDER GRANTING #228 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO REMOVE THE PREVIOUSLY FILED REDACTED VERSION OF THE DECLARATION OF AUSTIN BERGLAS. By Judge Alsup. (whalc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2019)
October 15, 2019 Filing 239 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Stephen Adkins, William Bass, Jr., Caryn Bendetowies, Denise Brown-Wells, Carla Echavarria, Hassan Elkassem, Jill Herr, Rubin K Johnson, Rebecca A King, Luis Licea, Dominique Martin, Kathi McGuire, Joseph Melendez, Angeles Meneses, Robert E Newborn, Scott Schinder, Jasper Schmidt, Derrick Walker, Connor Wiik. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jeremy Robinson, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted version of Plaintiffs Amended Reply Memorandum In Support of Plaintiffs Motion for Class Certification, #4 Unredacted version of Plaintiffs Amended Reply Memorandum In Support of Plaintiffs Motion for Class Certification, #5 Declaration of Douglas J. McNamera, #6 Exhibit 41, #7 Exhibit 45)(Friedman, Andrew) (Filed on 10/15/2019)
October 15, 2019 Filing 238 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Remove the Previously Filed Reply Memorandum In Support of Plaintiffs Motion for Class Certification and Exhibit 41 to the supporting Declaration of Douglas J. McNamara (ECF Nos. 231, 234-3, 234-17) filed on October 10, 2019 from the Courts ECF system and the public record for this action. re 231 Reply to Opposition/Response,,, filed by Stephen Adkins, William Bass, Jr., Caryn Bendetowies, Denise Brown-Wells, Carla Echavarria, Hassan Elkassem, Jill Herr, Rubin K Johnson, Rebecca A King, Luis Licea, Dominique Martin, Kathi McGuire, Joseph Melendez, Angeles Meneses, Robert E Newborn, Scott Schinder, Jasper Schmidt, Derrick Walker, Connor Wiik. Responses due by 10/21/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Douglas J. McNamara, #2 Proposed Order)(Friedman, Andrew) (Filed on 10/15/2019)
October 15, 2019 Filing 237 Declaration of Melanie M. Blunschi in Support of #234 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Plaintiff's Reply in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification and Accompanying Exhibits filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Plaintiff's Reply Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification [Redacted], #3 Exhibit 32 [Redacted], #4 Exhibit 38 [Redacted], #5 Exhibit 40 [Redacted])(Related document(s) #234 ) (Blunschi, Melanie) (Filed on 10/15/2019)
October 15, 2019 Filing 236 CLERK'S NOTICE SCHEDULING TELEPHONIC DISCOVERY HEARING. Please take notice that a telephonic discovery hearing is set for October 16, 2019 at 2:00 p.m. before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Counsel shall contact Court Call at 1-888-882-6878 to make the arrangements to appear by telephone. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ahmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2019)
October 10, 2019 Filing 235 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Stephen Adkins, William Bass, Jr., Caryn Bendetowies, Denise Brown-Wells, Carla Echavarria, Hassan Elkassem, Jill Herr, Rubin K Johnson, Rebecca A King, Luis Licea, Dominique Martin, Kathi McGuire, Joseph Melendez, Angeles Meneses, Robert E Newborn, Scott Schinder, Jasper Schmidt, Derrick Walker, Connor Wiik re #234 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Robinson, Jeremy) (Filed on 10/10/2019)
October 10, 2019 Filing 234 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Stephen Adkins, William Bass, Jr., Caryn Bendetowies, Denise Brown-Wells, Carla Echavarria, Hassan Elkassem, Jill Herr, Rubin K Johnson, Rebecca A King, Luis Licea, Dominique Martin, Kathi McGuire, Joseph Melendez, Angeles Meneses, Robert E Newborn, Scott Schinder, Jasper Schmidt, Derrick Walker, Connor Wiik. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jeremy Robinson re: Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Plaintiffs Reply ISO Motion for Class Certification, Oppositions to Facebooks Motions to Exclude Plaintiffs Experts Jim Van Dyke and Ian Ratner, and Accompanying Exhibits, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted version of Plaintiffs Reply Memorandum In Support of Plaintiffs Motion for Class Certification ***(removed from public docket per #251 Order)***, #4 Unredacted version of Plaintiffs Reply Memorandum In Support of Plaintiffs Motion for Class Certification, #5 Redacted version of Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion to Exclude James Van Dyke, #6 Unredacted version of Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion to Exclude James Van Dyke, #7 Redacted version of Plaintiffs Opposition to Motion to Exclude the Declaration and Opinions of Plaintiffs Expert Ian Ratner, #8 Unredacted version of Plaintiffs Opposition to Motion to Exclude the Declaration and Opinions of Plaintiffs Expert Ian Ratner, #9 Exhibit 32 Redacted, #10 Exhibit 32 Unredacted, #11 Exhibit 34 Under Seal, #12 Exhibit 37 Redacted, #13 Exhibit 37 Unredacted, #14 Exhibit 38 Under Seal, #15 Exhibit 39 Under Seal, #16 Exhibit 40 Under Seal, #17 Exhibit 41 Under Seal ***(removed from public docket per #251 Order)***, #18 Exhibit 43 Under Seal, #19 Exhibit 44 Under Seal)(Friedman, Andrew) (Filed on 10/10/2019) (Attachment 3 replaced on 10/30/2019) (wsnS, COURT STAFF). (Attachment 17 replaced on 10/30/2019) (wsnS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 11/4/2019 (tlhS, COURT STAFF).
October 10, 2019 Filing 233 REPLY (re #213 MOTION to Strike (Defendant Facebook, Inc.'s Motion to Exclude the Declaration and Opinions of Plaintiff's Expert James Van Dyke) ) filed by Stephen Adkins, William Bass, Jr., Caryn Bendetowies, Denise Brown-Wells, Carla Echavarria, Hassan Elkassem, Jill Herr, Rubin K Johnson, Rebecca A King, Luis Licea, Dominique Martin, Kathi McGuire, Joseph Melendez, Angeles Meneses, Robert E Newborn, Scott Schinder, Jasper Schmidt, Derrick Walker, Connor Wiik. (Friedman, Andrew) (Filed on 10/10/2019) Modified on 10/10/2019 (amgS, COURT STAFF).
October 10, 2019 Filing 232 REPLY (re #214 MOTION to Strike (Defendant Facebook, Inc.'s Motion to Exclude the Declaration and Opinions of Plaintiff's Expert Ian Ratner) ) filed by Stephen Adkins, William Bass, Jr., Caryn Bendetowies, Denise Brown-Wells, Carla Echavarria, Hassan Elkassem, Jill Herr, Rubin K Johnson, Rebecca A King, Luis Licea, Dominique Martin, Kathi McGuire, Joseph Melendez, Angeles Meneses, Robert E Newborn, Scott Schinder, Jasper Schmidt, Derrick Walker, Connor Wiik. (Friedman, Andrew) (Filed on 10/10/2019) Modified on 10/10/2019 (amgS, COURT STAFF).
October 8, 2019 Filing 230 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Melanie Marilyn Blunschi (Blunschi, Melanie) (Filed on 10/8/2019)
October 7, 2019 Filing 229 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Henry J. Kelston (Kelston, Henry) (Filed on 10/7/2019)
October 7, 2019 Filing 228 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Remove the Previously Filed Redacted Version of the Declaration of Austin Berglas filed by Facebook, Inc.. Responses due by 10/11/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Melanie M. Blunschi, #2 Proposed Order)(Blunschi, Melanie) (Filed on 10/7/2019)
October 7, 2019 Filing 227 Declaration of Austin Berglas in Support of #215 Facebook's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification [Amended Redactions] - Correction of Docket 218 filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Blunschi, Melanie) (Filed on 10/7/2019)
October 4, 2019 Filing 226 DECLARATION of Karen H. Riebel in Opposition to #220 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Defendant Facebook, Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification and Supporting Documents filed byStephen Adkins. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Related document(s) #220 ) (Friedman, Andrew) (Filed on 10/4/2019)
October 3, 2019 Filing 225 AMENDED CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING MOTION(S) HEARING TO NOVEMBER 6, 2019 AT 8:00 AM - ALL BRIEFING ON ORIGINAL SCHEDULE.As to #214 MOTION to Strike (Defendant Facebook, Inc.'s Motion to Exclude the Declaration and Opinions of Plaintiff's Expert Ian Ratner), #213 MOTION to Strike (Defendant Facebook, Inc.'s Motion to Exclude the Declaration and Opinions of Plaintiff's Expert James Van Dyke), #198 MOTION to Certify Class . Motion(s) Hearing reset to 11/6/2019 at 08:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor before Judge William Alsup. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.), (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2019)
October 3, 2019 Filing 224 CLERK'S NOTICE. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.), CLERK'S NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.), Set/Reset Deadlines as to #213 MOTION to Strike (Defendant Facebook, Inc.'s Motion to Exclude the Declaration and Opinions of Plaintiff's Expert James Van Dyke), #198 MOTION to Certify Class , #214 MOTION to Strike (Defendant Facebook, Inc.'s Motion to Exclude the Declaration and Opinions of Plaintiff's Expert Ian Ratner). Motion Hearing continued to 11/7/2019 08:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor before Judge William Alsup. (Related documents(s) #213 , #198 , #214 )(lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2019)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 223 ORDER GRANTING #222 STIPULATED REQUEST TO ENLARGE TIME TO FILE SUPPORTING DECLARATION. Signed by Judge William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2019)
September 30, 2019 Filing 222 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Request and [proposed] Order Enlarging Time for Plaintiff to File Declaration in Support of Sealing Pursuant to Local Rule 79-5(E)(1) filed by Stephen Adkins. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Karina G. Puttieva in Support)(Friedman, Andrew) (Filed on 9/30/2019)
September 26, 2019 Filing 221 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Facebook, Inc. re #220 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Defendant Facebook, Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification and Supporting Documents (Blunschi, Melanie) (Filed on 9/26/2019)
September 26, 2019 Filing 220 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Defendant Facebook, Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification and Supporting Documents filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Melanie M. Blunschi, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Unredacted Facebook's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification, #4 Redacted Facebook's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification, #5 Unredacted Exh. 6 to Blunschi Decl., #6 Redacted Exh. 6 to Blunschi Decl., #7 Unredacted Exh. 7 to Blunschi Decl., #8 Unredacted Exh. 8 to Blunschi Decl., #9 Unredacted Exh. 9 to Blunschi Decl., #10 Unredacted Exh. 10 to Blunschi Decl., #11 Unredacted Exh. 11 to Blunschi Decl., #12 Unredacted Exh. 12 to Blunschi Decl., #13 Unredacted Exh. 13 to Blunschi Decl., #14 Unredacted Declaration of Austin Berglas, *** #15 Redacted Declaration of Austin Berglas DOCUMENT LOCKED AT FILER'S REQUEST. DOCUMENT TO BE REFILED LATER. *** (removed from public docket per #240 Order), #16 Unredacted Exh. B to Berglas Decl., #17 Unredacted Exh. C to Berglas Decl., #18 Unredacted Expert Report of Catherine Tucker, Ph.D.)(Blunschi, Melanie) (Filed on 9/26/2019) Modified on 10/4/2019 (ewn, COURT STAFF). (Attachment 15 replaced on 10/16/2019) (wsnS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 11/4/2019 (tlhS, COURT STAFF).
September 26, 2019 Filing 219 Statement (Expert Report of Catherine Tucker, Ph.D. in Support of #215 Facebook, Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification) [Sealed] by Facebook, Inc.. (Blunschi, Melanie) (Filed on 9/26/2019)
September 26, 2019 Filing 217 Declaration of Melanie M. Blunschi in Support of #213 MOTION to Strike (Defendant Facebook, Inc.'s Motion to Exclude the Declaration and Opinions of Plaintiff's Expert James Van Dyke), #215 Opposition/Response to Motion, #214 MOTION to Strike (Defendant Facebook, Inc.'s Motion to Exclude the Declaration and Opinions of Plaintiff's Expert Ian Ratner) filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 4, #2 Exhibit 5, #3 Exhibit 6 [Redacted], #4 Exhibit 7 [Sealed], #5 Exhibit 8 [Sealed], #6 Exhibit 9 [Sealed], #7 Exhibit 10 [Sealed], #8 Exhibit 11 [Sealed], #9 Exhibit 12 [Sealed], #10 Exhibit 13 [Sealed], #11 Exhibit 14, #12 Exhibit 15, #13 Exhibit 16, #14 Exhibit 17)(Related document(s) #213 , #215 , #214 ) (Blunschi, Melanie) (Filed on 9/26/2019)
September 26, 2019 Filing 216 Declaration of Michael P. Duffey in Support of #215 Facebook's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Blunschi, Melanie) (Filed on 9/26/2019)
September 26, 2019 Filing 215 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #198 MOTION to Certify Class ) [Redacted] filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Clubok, Andrew) (Filed on 9/26/2019)
September 26, 2019 Filing 214 MOTION to Strike (Defendant Facebook, Inc.'s Motion to Exclude the Declaration and Opinions of Plaintiff's Expert Ian Ratner) filed by Facebook, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 10/31/2019 08:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor before Judge William Alsup. Responses due by 10/10/2019. Replies due by 10/17/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Clubok, Andrew) (Filed on 9/26/2019)
September 26, 2019 Filing 213 MOTION to Strike (Defendant Facebook, Inc.'s Motion to Exclude the Declaration and Opinions of Plaintiff's Expert James Van Dyke) filed by Facebook, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 10/31/2019 08:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor before Judge William Alsup. Responses due by 10/10/2019. Replies due by 10/17/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Clubok, Andrew) (Filed on 9/26/2019)
September 12, 2019 Filing 212 Transcript of Proceedings held on 09/09/2019, before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Court Reporter/Transcriber Peggy Schuerger/Ad Hoc Reporting, telephone number (619) 228-3774/adhocreporting@aol.com. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #206 Transcript Order ) Redaction Request due 10/3/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/15/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/11/2019. (Related documents(s) #206 ) (pls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2019)
September 11, 2019 Filing 211 EXHIBITS re #132 Declaration in Support,,, Exhibits to Declaration of Melanie M. Blunschi in Support of Facebook's Supplemental Brief in Support of its Motion to Dismiss the Consolidated Class Action Complaint - Refiled Pursuant to 8/13/19 Order, Dkt. 187 filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit H, #2 Exhibit I, #3 Exhibit J, #4 Exhibit K, #5 Exhibit L, #6 Exhibit M, #7 Exhibit N, #8 Exhibit O, #9 Exhibit P, #10 Exhibit Q, #11 Exhibit R, #12 Exhibit S, #13 Exhibit T, #14 Exhibit U, #15 Exhibit V, #16 Exhibit W, #17 Exhibit X, #18 Exhibit Y, #19 Exhibit Z, #20 Exhibit BB, #21 Exhibit CC, #22 Exhibit DD, #23 Exhibit EE, #24 Exhibit FF, #25 Exhibit GG)(Related document(s) #132 ) (Blunschi, Melanie) (Filed on 9/11/2019)
September 11, 2019 Filing 210 Supplemental Brief in Support of its #96 Motion to Dismiss the Consolidated Class Action Complaint - Refiled Pursuant to 8/13/19 Order, Dkt. #187 filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Clubok, Andrew) (Filed on 9/11/2019) Modified on 9/12/2019 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
September 11, 2019 Filing 209 EXHIBITS re #197 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal and Declaration of Ian Chen filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Motion for Class Certification [Dkt. 198 Redacted], #3 Exhibit 2 [Redacted - Corrected Slip Sheet Only], #4 Exhibit 3 [Redacted], #5 Exhibit 4 [Redacted], #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6 [Redacted], #8 Exhibit 7 [Redacted], #9 Exhibit 8 [Redacted], #10 Exhibit 9 [Redacted], #11 Exhibit 10 [Redacted], #12 Exhibit 11 [Redacted], #13 Exhibit 12 [Redacted], #14 Exhibit 15, #15 Exhibit 17 [Redacted], #16 Exhibit 18 [Redacted], #17 Exhibit 19 [Redacted], #18 Exhibit 21 [Redacted - Corrected Slip Sheet Only], #19 Exhibit 22 [Redacted], #20 Exhibit 23 [Redacted], #21 Exhibit 25, #22 Exhibit 26 [Corrected Slip Sheet Only], #23 Exhibit 27)(Related document(s) #197 ) (Blunschi, Melanie) (Filed on 9/11/2019)
September 10, 2019 Filing 208 EXHIBITS re #197 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal and Declaration of Ian Chen filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Motion for Class Certification [Dkt. 198 Redacted], #3 Exhibit 2 to Mary Franz Declaration [Redacted], #4 Exhibit 3 to Mary Franz Declaration [Redacted], #5 Exhibit 4 to Mary Franz Declaration [Redacted], #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6 to Mary Franz Declaration [Redacted], #8 Exhibit 7 to Mary Franz Declaration [Redacted], #9 Exhibit 8 to Mary Franz Declaration [Redacted], #10 Exhibit 9 to Mary Franz Declaration [Redacted], #11 Exhibit 10 to Mary Franz Declaration [Redacted], #12 Exhibit 11 to Mary Franz Declaration [Redacted], #13 Exhibit 12 to Mary Franz Declaration [Redacted], #14 Exhibit 15, #15 Exhibit 17 to Mary Franz Declaration [Redacted], #16 Exhibit 18 to Mary Franz Declaration [Redacted], #17 Exhibit 19 to Mary Franz Declaration [Redacted], #18 Exhibit 21 to Mary Franz Declaration [Redacted], #19 Exhibit 22 to Mary Franz Declaration [Redacted], #20 Exhibit 23 to Mary Franz Declaration [Redacted], #21 Exhibit 25, #22 Exhibit 26, #23 Exhibit 27)(Related document(s) #197 ) (Blunschi, Melanie) (Filed on 9/10/2019)
September 10, 2019 Filing 207 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 09/09/2019 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley by Stephen Adkins, for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Riebel, Karen) (Filed on 9/10/2019)
September 9, 2019 Filing 206 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 09/09/2019 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley by Facebook, Inc., for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Blunschi, Melanie) (Filed on 9/9/2019)
September 9, 2019 Filing 205 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley: Telephone Discovery Hearing held on 9/9/2019.(FTR Time: 11:11-11:23.)Attorney for Plaintiffs: Karen Riebel.Attorneys for Defendant: Melanie Blunschi; Francis J. Acott. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/9/2019) Modified on 9/9/2019 (ahm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 9/9/2019: Matter transcribed by Peggy Schuerger (AdHoc Reporting). (rjdS, COURT STAFF).
September 2, 2019 Filing 204 NOTICE of Change of Address by A.J. De Bartolomeo (De Bartolomeo, A.J.) (Filed on 9/2/2019)
August 30, 2019 Filing 203 ANSWER to Amended Complaint #193 by Facebook, Inc.. (Blunschi, Melanie) (Filed on 8/30/2019) Modified on 9/3/2019 (amgS, COURT STAFF).
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 202 ORDER GRANTING #201 STIPULATION TO ENLARGE TIME FOR FACEBOOK, INC. TO FILE DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF SEALING by Judge William Alsup. (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2019)
August 30, 2019 Filing 201 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Enlarging Time for Facebook, Inc. to File Declaration in Support of Sealing Pursuant to Local Rule 79-5(e)(1) filed by Facebook, Inc. and Stephen Adkins. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Melanie Blunschi)(Blunschi, Melanie) (Filed on 8/30/2019) Modified on 8/30/2019 (amgS, COURT STAFF).
August 29, 2019 Filing 200 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Stephen Adkins, William Bass, Jr., Caryn Bendetowies, Denise Brown-Wells, Carla Echavarria, Hassan Elkassem, Jill Herr, Rubin K Johnson, Rebecca A King, Luis Licea, Dominique Martin, Kathi McGuire, Joseph Melendez, Angeles Meneses, Robert E Newborn, Scott Schinder, Jasper Schmidt, Derrick Walker, Connor Wiik re #198 MOTION to Certify Class , #197 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Robinson, Jeremy) (Filed on 8/29/2019)
August 29, 2019 Filing 199 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 8/8/2019 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (rjdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2019)
August 29, 2019 Filing 198 MOTION to Certify Class filed by Stephen Adkins, William Bass, Jr., Caryn Bendetowies, Denise Brown-Wells, Carla Echavarria, Hassan Elkassem, Jill Herr, Rubin K Johnson, Rebecca A King, Luis Licea, Dominique Martin, Kathi McGuire, Joseph Melendez, Angeles Meneses, Robert E Newborn, Scott Schinder, Jasper Schmidt, Derrick Walker, Connor Wiik. Motion Hearing set for 10/31/2019 08:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor before Judge William Alsup. Responses due by 9/12/2019. Replies due by 9/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of P&A-REDACTED, #2 Declaration Declaration of Doug McNamara, #3 Exhibit 1 (FILED UNDER SEAL), #4 Exhibit 2 (FILED UNDER SEAL), #5 Exhibit 2 Attachment, #6 Exhibit 3 (FILED UNDER SEAL), #7 Exhibit 4 (FILED UNDER SEAL), #8 Exhibit 5 (FILED UNDER SEAL), #9 Exhibit 6 (FILED UNDER SEAL), #10 Exhibit 7 (FILED UNDER SEAL), #11 Exhibit 8 (FILED UNDER SEAL), #12 Exhibit 9 (FILED UNDER SEAL), #13 Exhibit 10 Excerpts from Deposition of Neal Poole-REDACTED, #14 Exhibit 11 (FILED UNDER SEAL), #15 Exhibit 12 Excerpts from Deposition of Kyle Minshall-REDACTED, #16 Exhibit 13 (FILED UNDER SEAL), #17 Exhibit 14 Sept. 5, 2018 tweet, #18 Exhibit 15 (FILED UNDER SEAL), #19 Exhibit 16 (FILED UNDER SEAL), #20 Exhibit 17 Excerpts from Deposition of Chris Bream 30(b)(6)-REDACTED, #21 Exhibit 18 (FILED UNDER SEAL), #22 Exhibit 19 (FILED UNDER SEAL), #23 Exhibit 20 (FILED UNDER SEAL), #24 Exhibit 21 (FILED UNDER SEAL), #25 Exhibit 22 (FILED UNDER SEAL), #26 Exhibit 23 (FILED UNDER SEAL), #27 Exhibit 24 MTD hrg transcript 5.2.19, #28 Exhibit 25 (FILED UNDER SEAL), #29 Exhibit 26 (FILED UNDER SEAL), #30 Exhibit 27 (FILED UNDER SEAL), #31 Exhibit 28 010919 Tutorial and CMC Transcript, #32 Exhibit 29. Excerpts from Deposition of Stephen Adkins, #33 Proposed Order)(Friedman, Andrew) (Filed on 8/29/2019)
August 29, 2019 Filing 197 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Stephen Adkins, William Bass, Jr., Caryn Bendetowies, Denise Brown-Wells, Carla Echavarria, Hassan Elkassem, Jill Herr, Rubin K Johnson, Rebecca A King, Luis Licea, Dominique Martin, Kathi McGuire, Joseph Melendez, Angeles Meneses, Robert E Newborn, Scott Schinder, Jasper Schmidt, Derrick Walker, Connor Wiik. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order, #3 (REDACTED) Memorandum of P&A, #4 (UNREDACTED) Memorandum of P&A, #5 Exhibit 1. FB-SCHMIDT-000054545, #6 Exhibit 2. Declaration of Mary Frantz, #7 Exhibit 3. FB-SCHMIDT-000000487, #8 Exhibit 4. FB-SCHMIDT-000053846, #9 Exhibit 5. FB-SCHMIDT-000052617, #10 Exhibit 6. FB-SCHMIDT-000054527, #11 Exhibit 7. FB-SCHMIDT-000053863, #12 Exhibit 8. Excerpts from Deposition of Alex Stamos, #13 Exhibit 9. FB-SCHMIDT-000054518, #14 Exhibit 10. Excerpts from Deposition of Neal Poole-REDACTED, #15 Exhibit 10. Excerpts from Deposition of Neal Poole-Green, #16 Exhibit 11. FB-SCHMIDT-000054260, #17 Exhibit 12. Excerpts from Deposition of Kyle Minshall-REDACTED, #18 Exhibit 12. Excerpts from Deposition of Kyle Minshall-Green, #19 Exhibit 13. FB-SCHMIDT-000064914, #20 Exhibit 15. FB-SCHMIDT-000052079, #21 Exhibit 16. FB-SCHMIDT-000000102, #22 Exhibit 17. Excerpts from Deposition of Chris Bream 30(b)(6)-REDACTED, #23 Exhibit 17. Excerpts from Deposition of Chris Bream 30(b)(6)-Green, #24 Exhibit 18. FB-SCHMIDT-000053844, #25 Exhibit 19. FB-SCHMIDT-000055983, #26 Exhibit 20. FB-SCHMIDT-000052491, #27 Exhibit 21. FB-SCHMIDT-000049965, #28 Exhibit 22. FB-SCHMIDT-000055511, #29 Exhibit 23. FB-SCHMIDT-000000198, #30 Exhibit 25. Excerpts from Deposition of Brad Hill, #31 Exhibit 26. Facebook Data Breach - Declaration of Ian Ratner (August 29 2019), #32 Exhibit 27. FB DB - Van Dyke Decl 20190828)(Friedman, Andrew) (Filed on 8/29/2019)
August 21, 2019 Filing 196 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Luis Licea (Yanchunis, John) (Filed on 8/21/2019)
August 20, 2019 Filing 195 Declaration of Gavin A. Corn in Support of #192 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Plaintiff's Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Related document(s) #192 ) (Blunschi, Melanie) (Filed on 8/20/2019)
August 16, 2019 Filing 194 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Stephen Adkins, William Bass, Jr., Caryn Bendetowies, Denise Brown-Wells, Carla Echavarria, Hassan Elkassem, Jill Herr, Rubin K Johnson, Rebecca A King, Luis Licea, Dominique Martin, Kathi McGuire, Joseph Melendez, Angeles Meneses, Robert E Newborn, Scott Schinder, Jasper Schmidt, Derrick Walker, Connor Wiik re #192 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Robinson, Jeremy) (Filed on 8/16/2019)
August 16, 2019 Filing 193 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Facebook, Inc.. Filed byRobert E Newborn, Connor Wiik, Jasper Schmidt, Kathi McGuire, Jill Herr, Carla Echavarria, Stephen Adkins, Rubin K Johnson, Hassan Elkassem, Derrick Walker, Caryn Bendetowies, Joseph Melendez, Denise Brown-Wells, Rebecca A King, Scott Schinder, William Bass, Jr., Angeles Meneses, Dominique Martin, Luis Licea. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Friedman, Andrew) (Filed on 8/16/2019)
August 16, 2019 Filing 192 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Stephen Adkins, William Bass, Jr., Caryn Bendetowies, Denise Brown-Wells, Carla Echavarria, Hassan Elkassem, Jill Herr, Rubin K Johnson, Rebecca A King, Luis Licea, Dominique Martin, Kathi McGuire, Joseph Melendez, Angeles Meneses, Robert E Newborn, Scott Schinder, Jasper Schmidt, Derrick Walker, Connor Wiik. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order, #3 First Amended Consolidated Complaint REDACTED, #4 First Amended Consolidated Complaint, #5 Exhibit A - Redacted, #6 Exhibit A)(Friedman, Andrew) (Filed on 8/16/2019)
August 15, 2019 Filing 191 NOTICE by Facebook, Inc. of Withdrawal of Exhibit Conditionally Submitted Under Seal (Blunschi, Melanie) (Filed on 8/15/2019)
August 15, 2019 Filing 190 Declaration of Melanie M. Blunschi in Support of #189 Response ( Non Motion ) Amended filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3 [Withdrawn], #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(Related document(s) #189 ) (Blunschi, Melanie) (Filed on 8/15/2019)
August 15, 2019 Filing 189 RESPONSE re #184 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,,, Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File First Amended Consolidated Complaint by Facebook, Inc.. (Clubok, Andrew) (Filed on 8/15/2019)
August 15, 2019 Filing 188 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Stephen Adkins, William Bass, Jr., Caryn Bendetowies, Denise Brown-Wells, Carla Echavarria, Hassan Elkassem, Jill Herr, Rubin K Johnson, Rebecca A King, Luis Licea, Dominique Martin, Kathi McGuire, Joseph Melendez, Angeles Meneses, Robert E Newborn, Scott Schinder, Jasper Schmidt, Derrick Walker, Connor Wiik. Amendment to #187 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,,,,, Amended Documents filed pursuant to Order Granting Motion to Seal - ECF 187. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Friedman, Andrew) (Filed on 8/15/2019)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 187 ORDER ON #111 #121 #130 #144 SEALING MOTIONS. TEMPORARILY GRANTING FACEBOOK'S #164 REQUEST TO SEAL. By Judge Alsup. The parties must file revised versions of their documents consistent with this order on the public docket by 9/12/19 at noon. Facebook must file a status report as to sealed information consistent with #111 and #164 by 12/12/19 at noon. All prior deadlines remain. (whalc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2019)
August 11, 2019 Filing 186 Transcript of Proceedings held on 08/08/2019, before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Court Reporter/Transcriber Peggy Schuerger/Ad Hoc Reporting, telephone number (619) 228-3774/adhocreporting@aol.com. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #182 Transcript Order ) Redaction Request due 9/3/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/11/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/12/2019. (Related documents(s) #182 ) (pls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2019)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 185 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART #160 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AN AMENDED CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT AND VACATING HEARING. By Judge Alsup. (whalc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2019)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 184 ORDER DENYING #159 #172 #179 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTIONS TO FILE UNDER SEAL. By Judge Alsup. The parties shall file revised versions of their documents consistent with this order on the public docket by August 15 at noon. (whalc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2019)
August 9, 2019 Filing 183 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 08/08/2019 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley by Stephen Adkins, William Bass, Jr., Carla Echavarria, Jill Herr, Jasper Schmidt, Derrick Walker, for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Yanchunis, John) (Filed on 8/9/2019)
August 8, 2019 Filing 182 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 8/8/2019 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley by Facebook, Inc., for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Reicher, Alexander) (Filed on 8/8/2019)
August 8, 2019 Filing 181 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Stephen Adkins, William Bass, Jr., Caryn Bendetowies, Denise Brown-Wells, Carla Echavarria, Hassan Elkassem, Jill Herr, Rubin K Johnson, Rebecca A King, Luis Licea, Dominique Martin, Kathi McGuire, Joseph Melendez, Angeles Meneses, Robert E Newborn, Scott Schinder, Jasper Schmidt, Derrick Walker, Connor Wiik re #180 Reply to Opposition/Response,, (Robinson, Jeremy) (Filed on 8/8/2019)
August 8, 2019 Filing 180 REPLY (re #160 MOTION to Amend/Correct Consolidated Complaint ) First Amended Consolidated Complaint filed byStephen Adkins, William Bass, Jr., Caryn Bendetowies, Denise Brown-Wells, Carla Echavarria, Hassan Elkassem, Jill Herr, Rubin K Johnson, Rebecca A King, Luis Licea, Dominique Martin, Kathi McGuire, Joseph Melendez, Angeles Meneses, Robert E Newborn, Scott Schinder, Jasper Schmidt, Derrick Walker, Connor Wiik. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit A)(Friedman, Andrew) (Filed on 8/8/2019)
August 8, 2019 Filing 179 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Stephen Adkins, William Bass, Jr., Caryn Bendetowies, Denise Brown-Wells, Carla Echavarria, Hassan Elkassem, Jill Herr, Rubin K Johnson, Rebecca A King, Luis Licea, Dominique Martin, Kathi McGuire, Joseph Melendez, Angeles Meneses, Robert E Newborn, Scott Schinder, Jasper Schmidt, Derrick Walker, Connor Wiik. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Reply ISO Motion to Amend Complaint FINAL, #4 Unredacted Reply ISO Motion to Amend Complaint FINAL, #5 Exhibits A to Declaration, #6 Unredcted Ex A to McNamara Decl ISO Reply re Mot to Amend Complaint - to be filed entirely under seal)(Friedman, Andrew) (Filed on 8/8/2019)
August 8, 2019 Filing 178 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley: Discovery Hearing held on 8/8/2019. The issues in the joint discovery brief (Dkt. No. #170 ) were resolved. (FTR Time: 9:00-9:58.)Attorney for Plaintiffs: Henry Kelston.Attorneys for Defendant: Serrin Turner; Alexander Reicher; Sheridan Caldwell; Ian Chen. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/8/2019) Modified on 8/8/2019: Matter transcribed by Peggy Schuerger (AdHoc Reporting). (rjdS, COURT STAFF).
August 7, 2019 Filing 177 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexander E. Reicher (Reicher, Alexander) (Filed on 8/7/2019)
August 1, 2019 Filing 176 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Facebook, Inc. re #172 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Defendant Facebook, Inc.s Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion for Leave to File First Amended Consolidated Complaint and Certain Exhibits (Clubok, Andrew) (Filed on 8/1/2019)
August 1, 2019 Filing 175 Request for Judicial Notice re #173 Opposition/Response to Motion, #174 Declaration in Support, filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) #173 , #174 ) (Clubok, Andrew) (Filed on 8/1/2019) Modified on 8/2/2019 (amgS, COURT STAFF).
August 1, 2019 Filing 174 Declaration of Melanie M. Blunschi in Support of #173 Opposition/Response to Motion filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2 [Redacted], #3 Exhibit 3 [Sealed], #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(Related document(s) #173 ) (Blunschi, Melanie) (Filed on 8/1/2019) Modified on 8/2/2019 (amgS, COURT STAFF).
August 1, 2019 Filing 173 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #160 MOTION to Amend/Correct Consolidated Complaint ) [Redacted] filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Clubok, Andrew) (Filed on 8/1/2019) Modified on 8/2/2019 (amgS, COURT STAFF).
August 1, 2019 Filing 172 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Defendant Facebook, Inc.s Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion for Leave to File First Amended Consolidated Complaint and Certain Exhibits filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Melanie M. Blunschi, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version of Opposition to Motion for Leave to Amend, #4 Unredacted Version of Opposition to Motion for Leave to Amend, #5 Redacted Version of Exhibit 2, #6 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 2, #7 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 3)(Blunschi, Melanie) (Filed on 8/1/2019)
July 30, 2019 Filing 171 CLERK'S NOTICE SCHEDULING DISCOVERY HEARING. Discovery Hearing re: #170 is set for 8/8/2019 at 9:00 a.m. in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2019)
July 29, 2019 Filing 170 Discovery Letter Brief filed by Stephen Adkins. (Kelston, Henry) (Filed on 7/29/2019)
July 24, 2019 Filing 169 NOTICE of Appearance by Karina Grace Puttieva for plaintiffs (Puttieva, Karina) (Filed on 7/24/2019)
July 23, 2019 Set/Reset Hearing re #168 Order on Stipulation: Motion to Certify Class Hearing set for 10/31/2019 08:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor before Judge William Alsup. (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2019)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 168 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART #163 MOTION FOR EXTENSION AND GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART #166 STIPULATION. By Judge Alsup. The schedule on the motion for leave to amend remains the same. The deadline to move for class certification is continued to 8/29/2019 at noon. The opposition brief is due 9/26/2019 at noon. The reply brief is due 10/10/2019 at noon. The hearing on the motion for class certification is set for 10/31/2019 at 8:00 A.M. (whalc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2019)
July 23, 2019 Filing 166 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Hearing on Motion to Leave to September 12, 2019 filed by Facebook, Inc. and Stephen Adkins. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Melanie Blunschi)(Blunschi, Melanie) (Filed on 7/23/2019) Modified on 7/24/2019 (amgS, COURT STAFF).
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 165 ORDER RE CAPTION. By Judge Alsup. (whalc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2019)
July 22, 2019 Filing 164 Declaration of Gavin A. Corn in Support of #159 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Related document(s) #159 ) (Blunschi, Melanie) (Filed on 7/22/2019)
July 22, 2019 Filing 163 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #160 MOTION to Amend/Correct Consolidated Complaint filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Andrew B. Clubok, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Proposed Order)(Clubok, Andrew) (Filed on 7/22/2019)
July 19, 2019 Filing 162 CLERK'S NOTICE ADVANCING MOTION HEARING: Motion Hearing re #160 MOTION to Amend/Correct Consolidated Complaint previously set for 8/29/2019 08:00 AM is rescheduled to 8/22/2019 08:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor before Judge William Alsup. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2019)
July 18, 2019 Filing 161 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Stephen Adkins, William Bass, Jr., Caryn Bendetowies, Denise Brown-Wells, Carla Echavarria, Hassan Elkassem, Jill Herr, Rubin K Johnson, Rebecca A King, Luis Licea, Dominique Martin, Kathi McGuire, Joseph Melendez, Angeles Meneses, Robert E Newborn, Scott Schinder, Jasper Schmidt, Derrick Walker, Connor Wiik re #160 MOTION to Amend/Correct Consolidated Complaint (Robinson, Jeremy) (Filed on 7/18/2019)
July 18, 2019 Filing 160 MOTION to Amend/Correct Consolidated Complaint filed by Stephen Adkins, William Bass, Jr., Caryn Bendetowies, Denise Brown-Wells, Carla Echavarria, Hassan Elkassem, Jill Herr, Rubin K Johnson, Rebecca A King, Luis Licea, Dominique Martin, Kathi McGuire, Joseph Melendez, Angeles Meneses, Robert E Newborn, Scott Schinder, Jasper Schmidt, Derrick Walker, Connor Wiik. Motion Hearing set for 8/29/2019 08:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor before Judge William Alsup. Responses due by 8/1/2019. Replies due by 8/8/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Douglas McNamara, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Proposed Order)(Friedman, Andrew) (Filed on 7/18/2019)
July 18, 2019 Filing 159 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Stephen Adkins, William Bass, Jr., Caryn Bendetowies, Denise Brown-Wells, Carla Echavarria, Hassan Elkassem, Jill Herr, Rubin K Johnson, Rebecca A King, Luis Licea, Dominique Martin, Kathi McGuire, Joseph Melendez, Angeles Meneses, Robert E Newborn, Scott Schinder, Jasper Schmidt, Derrick Walker, Connor Wiik. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jeremy Robinson, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Motion to Amend Complaint - Redacted, #4 Motion to Amend Complaint Unredacted, #5 Exhibit A- First Amended Consolidated Complaint Redacted, #6 Exhibit A- First Amended Consolidated Complaint Unredacted, #7 Exhibit B - Redacted, #8 Exhibit B - Unredacted)(Friedman, Andrew) (Filed on 7/18/2019)
July 4, 2019 Filing 158 Transcript of Proceedings held on July 1, 2019, before Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Court Reporter/Transcriber Joan Marie Columbini, CSR, RPR, telephone number (510) 367-3043, joan.columbini.csr@gmail.com. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #156 Transcript Order, #157 Transcript Order ) Redaction Request due 7/25/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/5/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/2/2019. (Related documents(s) #156 , #157 ) (Columbini, Joan) (Filed on 7/4/2019)
July 2, 2019 Filing 157 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 7/1/2019 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley by Facebook, Inc., for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Blunschi, Melanie) (Filed on 7/2/2019)
July 2, 2019 Filing 156 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 07/01/2019 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley by Stephen Adkins, William Bass, Jr., for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Baxter-Kauf, Kate) (Filed on 7/2/2019)
July 1, 2019 Filing 155 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley: Discovery Hearing held on 7/1/2019. The issues contained in the #151 Joint Discovery Letter Brief are resolved. (FTR Time: 2:05-2:18.)Attorneys for Plaintiffs: Kate Baxter-Kauf; AJ DeBartolomeo.Attorneys for Defendant: Melanie Blunschi; Sheridan Caldwell. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/1/2019) Modified on 7/2/2019: Matter transcribed by Joan Columbini. (rjdS, COURT STAFF).
June 26, 2019 Filing 154 CLERK'S NOTICE SCHEDULING DISCOVERY HEARING. Discovery Hearing re: #151 is set for 7/1/2019 at 2:00 p.m. in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2019)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART #96 MOTION TO DISMISS. By Judge Alsup. (whalc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2019)
June 21, 2019 Filing 152 NOTICE by Stephen Adkins, William Bass, Jr. re #135 Reply to Opposition/Response,, #108 Opposition/Response to Motion,,, #122 Supplemental Brief, #96 MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated Class Action Complaint Supplemental Notice in Support of their Opposition to Defendants Motion to Dismiss and Supplemental Briefings (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Yanchunis, John) (Filed on 6/21/2019)
June 20, 2019 Filing 151 Joint Discovery Letter Brief filed by Facebook, Inc. and Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Melanie M. Blunschi, #2 Exhibit A to the Declaration of Melanie M. Blunschi, #3 Exhibit B to the Declaration of Melanie M. Blunschi)(Blunschi, Melanie) (Filed on 6/20/2019) Modified on 6/20/2019 (amgS, COURT STAFF).
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 150 SECOND ORDER RE VOLUNTARY DISMISSALS. By Judge Alsup. (whalc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2019)
June 18, 2019 Filing 149 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Ariana J. Tadler (Tadler, Ariana) (Filed on 6/18/2019)
June 14, 2019 ***Internal setting of deadlines/hearings due to case being incorrectly terminated*** Set Deadlines/Hearings: Settlement Conference set for 12/11/2019 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Discovery due by 1/9/2020. Dispositive Motion due by 3/5/2020. Expert Witness List due by 1/9/2020. Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/6/2020 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor. Jury Selection set for 5/18/2020 07:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor before Judge William Alsup. Jury Trial set for 5/18/2020, 5/19/2020, 5/20/2020 07:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor before Judge William Alsup. (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2019)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting #147 Stipulation Regarding Production of Data Analysis Documents. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2019)
June 13, 2019 Filing 147 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Production of Data Analysis Documents filed by Facebook, Inc. and plaintiffs. (Blunschi, Melanie) (Filed on 6/13/2019) Modified on 6/13/2019 (amgS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 6/13/2019 (tlhS, COURT STAFF).
June 12, 2019 Filing 146 NOTICE by Carla Echavarria of Withdrawal of Counsel for Plaintiffs (Handmaker, Sally) (Filed on 6/12/2019)
June 5, 2019 Filing 145 REPLY (re #130 Amended Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendant Facebook, Inc.'s Supplemental Brief in Support of Its Motion to Dismiss the Consolidated Class Action Complaint and Certain Exhibits to the Declaration of Melanie M. Blunschi ) Plaintiffs' Response to Facebook's Supplemental Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss filed byWilliam Bass, Jr., Caryn Bendetowies, Denise Brown-Wells, Carla Echavarria, Hassan Elkassem, Jill Herr, Rubin K Johnson, Rebecca A King, Licea Luis, Dominique Martin, Kathi McGuire, Joseph Melendez, Angeles Meneses, Robert E Newborn, Scott Schinder, Jasper Schmidt, Derrick Walker, Connor Wiik. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jeremy Robinson, #2 Exhibit One, Redacted, #3 Exhibit Two, Redacted, #4 Exhibit Three, #5 Exhibit Four, #6 Exhibit Five, Redacted, #7 Exhibit Six, Redacted)(Friedman, Andrew) (Filed on 6/5/2019)
June 5, 2019 Filing 144 Amended Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Plaintiff's Response to Facebook's Supplemental Brief in Support of its Motion to Dismiss filed by William Bass, Jr., Caryn Bendetowies, Denise Brown-Wells, Carla Echavarria, Hassan Elkassem, Jill Herr, Rubin K Johnson, Rebecca A King, Licea Luis, Dominique Martin, Kathi McGuire, Joseph Melendez, Angeles Meneses, Robert E Newborn, Scott Schinder, Jasper Schmidt, Derrick Walker, Connor Wiik. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Jeremy Robinson, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Unredacted - Plaintiffs' Response to Supplemental Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #4 Redacted - Plaintiffs' Response to Supplemental Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #5 Exhibit One- Unredacted, #6 Exhibit One - Redacted, #7 Exhibit Two - Unredacted, #8 Exhibit Two - Redacted, #9 Exhibit Five - Unredacted, #10 Exhibit Five - Redacted, #11 Exhibit Six - Unredacted, #12 Exhibit Six - Redacted)(Friedman, Andrew) (Filed on 6/5/2019)
May 31, 2019 Filing 143 EXHIBITS re #136 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal and Declaration of John A. Yanchunis filed by William Bass, Jr., Caryn Bendetowies, Denise Brown-Wells, Carla Echavarria, Hassan Elkassem, Jill Herr, Rubin K Johnson, Rebecca A King, Licea Luis, Dominique Martin, Kathi McGuire, Joseph Melendez, Angeles Meneses, Robert E Newborn, Jasper Schmidt, Derrick Walker, Connor Wiik. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex 1 - D-Brief - Redacted, #2 Exhibit Ex 2 - Blunschi - Redacted, #3 Exhibit Ex 3 - Brown-Wells - Redacted, #4 Exhibit Ex 4 - Adkins - Redacted, #5 Exhibit Ex 5 - Bass - Redacted, #6 Exhibit Ex 1 - D-Brief - Unredacted, #7 Exhibit Ex 2 - Blunschi - Unredacted, #8 Exhibit Ex 3 - Brown-Wells - Unredacted, #9 Exhibit Ex 4 - Adkins - Unredacted, #10 Exhibit Ex 5 - Bass - Unredacted)(Related document(s) #136 ) (Yanchunis, John) (Filed on 5/31/2019) Modified on 6/3/2019 (amgS, COURT STAFF).
May 30, 2019 Filing 142 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Jill Herr (Yanchunis, John) (Filed on 5/30/2019)
May 30, 2019 Filing 141 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Denise Brown-Wells (Yanchunis, John) (Filed on 5/30/2019)
May 30, 2019 Filing 140 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Jasper Schmidt (Yanchunis, John) (Filed on 5/30/2019)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER GRANTING #138 STIPULATED PROTOCOL REGARDING COMMUNICATIONS WITH PUTATIVE CLASS MEMBERS. By Judge Alsup. (whalc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2019)
May 24, 2019 Filing 138 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Communications with Putative Class Members filed by Facebook, Inc., Jasper Schmidt and William Bass, Jr. (Blunschi, Melanie) (Filed on 5/24/2019) Modified on 5/24/2019 (amgS, COURT STAFF).
May 20, 2019 Filing 137 EXHIBITS re #136 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by William Bass, Jr., Caryn Bendetowies, Carla Echavarria, Hassan Elkassem, Rubin K Johnson, Rebecca A King, Licea Luis, Dominique Martin, Kathi McGuire, Joseph Melendez, Angeles Meneses, Robert E Newborn, Scott Schinder, Jasper Schmidt, Derrick Walker, Connor Wiik. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Corrected Unredacted version to Declaration, #2 Exhibit 2 Corrected Unredacted version to Declaration)(Related document(s) #136 ) (Friedman, Andrew) (Filed on 5/20/2019) Modified on 5/20/2019 (amgS, COURT STAFF).
May 20, 2019 Filing 136 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by William Bass, Jr., Caryn Bendetowies, Carla Echavarria, Hassan Elkassem, Rubin K Johnson, Rebecca A King, Licea Luis, Dominique Martin, Kathi McGuire, Joseph Melendez, Angeles Meneses, Robert E Newborn, Scott Schinder, Jasper Schmidt, Derrick Walker, Connor Wiik. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jeremy Robinson, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 1 Redacted, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 2 Redacted, #6 Proposed Order)(Friedman, Andrew) (Filed on 5/20/2019)
May 20, 2019 Filing 135 Response (re #96 MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated Class Action Complaint ) filed by William Bass, Jr., Caryn Bendetowies, Carla Echavarria, Hassan Elkassem, Rubin K Johnson, Rebecca A King, Licea Luis, Dominique Martin, Kathi McGuire, Joseph Melendez, Angeles Meneses, Robert E Newborn, Scott Schinder, Jasper Schmidt, Derrick Walker, Connor Wiik. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jeremy Robinson, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6)(Friedman, Andrew) (Filed on 5/20/2019) Modified on 5/20/2019 (amgS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 5/20/2019 (amgS, COURT STAFF).
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER GRANTING #128 STIPULATED REQUEST TO ENLARGE TIME FOR PLAINTIFFS TO FILE DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF SEALING. By Judge Alsup. (whalc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2019)
May 17, 2019 Filing 133 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Facebook, Inc. re #130 Amended Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendant Facebook, Inc.'s Supplemental Brief in Support of Its Motion to Dismiss the Consolidated Class Action Complaint and Certain Exhibits to the Declaration of Melanie M. Blunschi (Blunschi, Melanie) (Filed on 5/17/2019)
May 17, 2019 Filing 132 Declaration of Melanie M. Blunschi in Support of #131 Supplemental Brief filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit F [Sealed], #2 Exhibit G [Sealed], #3 Exhibit H [Sealed], #4 Exhibit I [Sealed], #5 Exhibit J [Sealed], #6 Exhibit K [Sealed], #7 Exhibit L [Sealed], #8 Exhibit M [Sealed], #9 Exhibit N [Sealed], #10 Exhibit O [Sealed], #11 Exhibit P [Sealed], #12 Exhibit Q [Sealed], #13 Exhibit R [Sealed], #14 Exhibit S [Sealed], #15 Exhibit T [Sealed], #16 Exhibit U [Sealed], #17 Exhibit V [Sealed], #18 Exhibit W [Sealed], #19 Exhibit X [Sealed], #20 Exhibit Y [Sealed], #21 Exhibit Z [Sealed], #22 Exhibit AA, #23 Exhibit BB [Sealed], #24 Exhibit CC [Sealed], #25 Exhibit DD [Sealed], #26 Exhibit EE [Sealed], #27 Exhibit FF [Sealed], #28 Exhibit GG [Sealed])(Related document(s) #131 ) (Blunschi, Melanie) (Filed on 5/17/2019) Modified on 5/20/2019 (amgS, COURT STAFF).
May 17, 2019 Filing 131 Supplemental Brief re #96 MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated Class Action Complaint [Sealed in Its Entirety] filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Related document(s) #96 ) (Clubok, Andrew) (Filed on 5/17/2019)
May 17, 2019 Filing 130 Amended Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendant Facebook, Inc.'s Supplemental Brief in Support of Its Motion to Dismiss the Consolidated Class Action Complaint and Certain Exhibits to the Declaration of Melanie M. Blunschi filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Melanie M. Blunschi in Support of Administrative Motion to Seal, #2 Proposed Order, #3 [Unredacted] Facebook's Supplemental Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss Consolidated Complaint, #4 [Unredacted] Exhibit F to Blunschi Decl. iso Supplemental Brief iso Mot. to Dismiss Cons. Complaint, #5 [Unredacted] Exhibit G to Blunschi Decl. iso Supplemental Brief iso Mot. to Dismiss Cons. Complaint, #6 [Unredacted] Exhibit H to Blunschi Decl. iso Supplemental Brief iso Mot. to Dismiss Cons. Complaint, #7 [Unredacted] Exhibit I to Blunschi Decl. iso Supplemental Brief iso Mot. to Dismiss Cons. Complaint, #8 [Unredacted] Exhibit J to Blunschi Decl. iso Supplemental Brief iso Mot. to Dismiss Cons. Complaint, #9 [Unredacted] Exhibit K to Blunschi Decl. iso Supplemental Brief iso Mot. to Dismiss Cons. Complaint, #10 [Unredacted] Exhibit L to Blunschi Decl. iso Supplemental Brief iso Mot. to Dismiss Cons. Complaint, #11 [Unredacted] Exhibit M to Blunschi Decl. iso Supplemental Brief iso Mot. to Dismiss Cons. Complaint, #12 [Unredacted] Exhibit N to Blunschi Decl. iso Supplemental Brief iso Mot. to Dismiss Cons. Complaint, #13 [Unredacted] Exhibit O to Blunschi Decl. iso Supplemental Brief iso Mot. to Dismiss Cons. Complaint, #14 [Unredacted] Exhibit P to Blunschi Decl. iso Supplemental Brief iso Mot. to Dismiss Cons. Complaint, #15 [Unredacted] Exhibit Q to Blunschi Decl. iso Supplemental Brief iso Mot. to Dismiss Cons. Complaint, #16 [Unredacted] Exhibit R to Blunschi Decl. iso Supplemental Brief iso Mot. to Dismiss Cons. Complaint, #17 [Unredacted] Exhibit S to Blunschi Decl. iso Supplemental Brief iso Mot. to Dismiss Cons. Complaint, #18 [Unredacted] Exhibit T to Blunschi Decl. iso Supplemental Brief iso Mot. to Dismiss Cons. Complaint, #19 [Unredacted] Exhibit U to Blunschi Decl. iso Supplemental Brief iso Mot. to Dismiss Cons. Complaint, #20 [Unredacted] Exhibit V to Blunschi Decl. iso Supplemental Brief iso Mot. to Dismiss Cons. Complaint, #21 [Unredacted] Exhibit W to Blunschi Decl. iso Supplemental Brief iso Mot. to Dismiss Cons. Complaint, #22 [Unredacted] Exhibit X to Blunschi Decl. iso Supplemental Brief iso Mot. to Dismiss Cons. Complaint, #23 [Unredacted] Exhibit Y to Blunschi Decl. iso Supplemental Brief iso Mot. to Dismiss Cons. Complaint, #24 [Unredacted] Exhibit Z to Blunschi Decl. iso Supplemental Brief iso Mot. to Dismiss Cons. Complaint, #25 [Unredacted] Exhibit BB to Blunschi Decl. iso Supplemental Brief iso Mot. to Dismiss Cons. Complaint, #26 [Unredacted] Exhibit CC to Blunschi Decl. iso Supplemental Brief iso Mot. to Dismiss Cons. Complaint, #27 [Unredacted] Exhibit DD to Blunschi Decl. iso Supplemental Brief iso Mot. to Dismiss Cons. Complaint, #28 [Unredacted] Exhibit EE to Blunschi Decl. iso Supplemental Brief iso Mot. to Dismiss Cons. Complaint, #29 [Unredacted] Exhibit FF to Blunschi Decl. iso Supplemental Brief iso Mot. to Dismiss Cons. Complaint, #30 [Unredacted] Exhibit GG to Blunschi Decl. iso Supplemental Brief iso Mot. to Dismiss Cons. Complaint)(Blunschi, Melanie) (Filed on 5/17/2019)
May 17, 2019 Filing 129 Declaration of Andrew N. Friedman in Support of #128 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed byJasper Schmidt. (Related document(s) #128 ) (Friedman, Andrew) (Filed on 5/17/2019)
May 17, 2019 Filing 128 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Jasper Schmidt and Facebook, Inc. (Friedman, Andrew) (Filed on 5/17/2019) Modified on 5/20/2019 (amgS, COURT STAFF).
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting #125 Stipulation Regarding E-Discovery. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2019)
May 17, 2019 Filing 126 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark A. Ozzello (Ozzello, Mark) (Filed on 5/17/2019)
May 16, 2019 Filing 125 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding E-Discovery filed by Facebook, Inc. and Interim Class. (Blunschi, Melanie) (Filed on 5/16/2019) Modified on 5/16/2019 (amgS, COURT STAFF).
May 13, 2019 Filing 124 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Facebook, Inc. re #121 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (1) Portions of Defendant Facebook, Inc.'s Supplemental Brief in Support of Its Motion to Dismiss the Consolidated Class Action Complaint and (2) Certain Exhibits to the Declaration of Melanie M. Blunsc (Blunschi, Melanie) (Filed on 5/13/2019)
May 13, 2019 Filing 123 Declaration of Melanie M. Blunschi in Support of #122 Supplemental Brief filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit F, #2 Exhibit G, #3 Exhibit H [Sealed], #4 Exhibit I [Sealed], #5 Exhibit J, #6 Exhibit K [Sealed], #7 Exhibit L, #8 Exhibit M, #9 Exhibit N, #10 Exhibit O, #11 Exhibit P [Sealed], #12 Exhibit Q [Sealed], #13 Exhibit R, #14 Exhibit S, #15 Exhibit T, #16 Exhibit U, #17 Exhibit V, #18 Exhibit W [Sealed], #19 Exhibit X, #20 Exhibit Y, #21 Exhibit Z, #22 Exhibit AA, #23 Exhibit BB, #24 Exhibit CC, #25 Exhibit DD, #26 Exhibit EE, #27 Exhibit FF, #28 Exhibit GG)(Related document(s) #122 ) (Blunschi, Melanie) (Filed on 5/13/2019)
May 13, 2019 Filing 122 Supplemental Brief re #96 MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated Class Action Complaint [Redacted] filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Related document(s) #96 ) (Clubok, Andrew) (Filed on 5/13/2019)
May 13, 2019 Filing 121 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (1) Portions of Defendant Facebook, Inc.'s Supplemental Brief in Support of Its Motion to Dismiss the Consolidated Class Action Complaint and (2) Certain Exhibits to the Declaration of Melanie M. Blunschi filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Melanie M. Blunschi in Support of Administrative Motion to Seal, #2 Proposed Order, #3 [Redacted] Facebook's Supplemental Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss Consolidated Complaint, #4 [Unredacted] Facebook's Supplemental Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss Consolidated Complaint, #5 [Unredacted] Exhibit H to Blunschi Decl. iso Supplemental Brief iso Mot. to Dismiss Cons. Complaint, #6 [Unredacted] Exhibit I to Blunschi Decl. iso Supplemental Brief iso Mot. to Dismiss Cons. Complaint, #7 [Unredacted] Exhibit K to Blunschi Decl. iso Supplemental Brief iso Mot. to Dismiss Cons. Complaint, #8 [Unredacted] Exhibit P to Blunschi Decl. iso Supplemental Brief iso Mot. to Dismiss Cons. Complaint, #9 [Unredacted] Exhibit Q to Blunschi Decl. iso Supplemental Brief iso Mot. to Dismiss Cons. Complaint, #10 [Unredacted] Exhibit W to Blunschi Decl. iso Supplemental Brief iso Mot. to Dismiss Cons. Complaint)(Blunschi, Melanie) (Filed on 5/13/2019)
May 8, 2019 Filing 120 Transcript of Proceedings held on May 2, 2019, before Judge William H. Alsup. Court Reporter, Marla F. Knox, RPR, CRR, telephone number (602)391-6990. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/6/2019. (mfk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2019)
May 7, 2019 Filing 119 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 05/02/2019 before Judge William Alsup by Caryn Bendetowies, for Court Reporter Marla Knox. (Yanchunis, John) (Filed on 5/7/2019)
May 3, 2019 Filing 118 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 05/02/2019 before Judge William Alsup by Scott Schinder, for Court Reporter Marla Knox. (Weaver, Lesley) (Filed on 5/3/2019)
May 3, 2019 Filing 117 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 5/2/2019 before Judge William Alsup by Facebook, Inc., for Court Reporter Marla Knox. (Deeley, Elizabeth) (Filed on 5/3/2019)
May 2, 2019 Filing 116 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William Alsup: Motion Hearing re #96 MOTION to Dismiss Consolidated Class Action Complaint held on 5/2/2019. Defendant's deposition of plaintiffs are to be conducted by 5/10/2019 and supplemental brief due by 5/13/2019. Plaintiffs' response due by 5/20/2019 at Noon. (Total Time in Court: 1 hour 28 minutes.) Court Reporter: Marla Knox. Plaintiff Attorney: Andrew Friedman, Douglas McNamara, John Yanchunis, Ariana Tadler. Defendant Attorney: Susan Engel, Elizabeth Deeley, Andrew Clubok. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/2/2019)
April 18, 2019 Filing 115 RESPONSE (Opposition to [108-8] Plaintiffs Request for Incorporation by Reference) by Facebook, Inc.. (Clubok, Andrew) (Filed on 4/18/2019)
April 18, 2019 Filing 114 Declaration of Melanie M. Blunschi in Support of #113 Facebook, Inc.'s Reply in Support of Its Motion to Dismiss the Consolidated Class Action Complaint filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit C, #2 Exhibit D, #3 Exhibit E)(Blunschi, Melanie) (Filed on 4/18/2019)
April 18, 2019 Filing 113 REPLY (re #96 MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated Class Action Complaint ) filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Clubok, Andrew) (Filed on 4/18/2019) Modified on 4/19/2019 (amgS, COURT STAFF).
April 11, 2019 Filing 112 Declaration of Gavin A. Corn in Support of #111 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Opposition Brief and Amended Exhibit E to the McNamara Declaration filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Related document(s) #111 ) (Clubok, Andrew) (Filed on 4/11/2019)
April 10, 2019 Filing 111 Amended/Corrected Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by William Bass, Jr., Caryn Bendetowies, Carla Echavarria, Hassan Elkassem, Rubin K Johnson, Rebecca A King, Licea Luis, Dominique Martin, Kathi McGuire, Joseph Melendez, Angeles Meneses, Robert E Newborn, Scott Schinder, Jasper Schmidt, Derrick Walker, Connor Wiik. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order, #3 UNREDACTED Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss the Consolidated Class Action Complaint, #4 REDACTED Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss the Consolidated Class Action Complaint, #5 Amended Exhibit E - UNREDACTED CONFIDENTIAL VERSION, #6 Amended Exhibit E - REDACTED PUBLIC VERSION)(Friedman, Andrew) (Filed on 4/10/2019) Modified on 4/10/2019 (amgS, COURT STAFF).
April 8, 2019 Filing 110 Declaration of Gavin A. Corn in Support of #107 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Opposition Brief and Exhibit E to the McNamara Declaration filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Related document(s) #107 ) (Clubok, Andrew) (Filed on 4/8/2019)
April 5, 2019 Filing 109 AMENDED REDACTED EXHIBIT E re #107 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal , #108 Opposition/Response to Motion, Amended Exhibit E filed by William Bass, Jr., Jasper Schmidt. (Related document(s) #107 , #108 ) (Friedman, Andrew) (Filed on 4/5/2019) Modified on 4/5/2019 (amgS, COURT STAFF).
April 4, 2019 Filing 108 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #96 MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated Class Action Complaint ) filed byWilliam Bass, Jr., Caryn Bendetowies, Carla Echavarria, Hassan Elkassem, Rubin K Johnson, Rebecca A King, Licea Luis, Dominique Martin, Kathi McGuire, Joseph Melendez, Angeles Meneses, Robert E Newborn, Scott Schinder, Jasper Schmidt, Derrick Walker, Connor Wiik. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Douglas McNamara ISO Plaintiffs Opposition to MTD, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6***FILED IN ERROR. SEE #109 FOR CORRECTED EXHIBIT E*** Exhibit E (Redacted), #7 Exhibit F, #8 Plaintiffs Request for Incorporation by Reference ISO Opposition to MTD, #9 Proposed Order Granting Incorporation by Reference)(Friedman, Andrew) (Filed on 4/4/2019) Modified on 4/5/2019 (amgS, COURT STAFF).
April 4, 2019 Filing 107 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by William Bass, Jr., Caryn Bendetowies, Carla Echavarria, Hassan Elkassem, Rubin K Johnson, Rebecca A King, Licea Luis, Dominique Martin, Kathi McGuire, Joseph Melendez, Angeles Meneses, Robert E Newborn, Scott Schinder, Jasper Schmidt, Derrick Walker, Connor Wiik. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order, #3 REDACTED Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss the Consolidated Class Action Complaint, #4 UNREDACTED Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss the Consolidated Class Action Complaint, #5 ***FILED IN ERROR. SEE #109 FOR CORRECTED EXHIBIT E*** REDACTED Exhibit E - Bream Transcript, #6 UNREDACTED Exhibit E - Bream Transcript)(Friedman, Andrew) (Filed on 4/4/2019) Modified on 4/5/2019 (amgS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 4/5/2019 (amgS, COURT STAFF).
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER GRANTING #104 STIPULATED CLAWBACK AGREEMENT. By Judge Alsup. (whalc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2019)
March 29, 2019 Filing 105 ERRATA re #97 Declaration in Support (Notice of Errata Regarding the Declaration of Christopher Bream in Support of Motion to Dismiss the Consolidated Class Action Complaint) by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Clubok, Andrew) (Filed on 3/29/2019)
March 28, 2019 Filing 104 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER STIPULATED [PROPOSED] FEDERAL RULES OF EVIDENCE 502(d) ORDER AND CLAWBACK AGREEMENT filed by William Bass, Jr., Caryn Bendetowies, Carla Echavarria, Hassan Elkassem, Rubin K Johnson, Rebecca A King, Licea Luis, Dominique Martin, Kathi McGuire, Joseph Melendez, Angeles Meneses, Robert E Newborn, Jasper Schmidt, Derrick Walker, Connor Wiik and Facebook, Inc. (Kelston, Henry) (Filed on 3/28/2019) Modified on 3/28/2019 (amgS, COURT STAFF).
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER APPROVING #102 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER SUBJECT TO STATED CONDITIONS. By Judge Alsup. (whalc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2019)
March 25, 2019 Filing 102 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER (Stipulated and [Proposed] Protective Order) filed by Facebook, Inc. and The Class. (Blunschi, Melanie) (Filed on 3/25/2019) Modified on 3/25/2019 (amgS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 3/25/2019 (amgS, COURT STAFF).
March 19, 2019 Filing 101 Notice of Settlement Conference and Order Setting Settlement Conference before Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Settlement Conference set for 12/11/2019 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 3/19/19. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2019)
March 18, 2019 Filing 100 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero: Telephone Conference held on 3/18/2019. Settlement Conference set for 12/11/2019 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor.FTR Time: Not Reported. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/18/2019)
March 14, 2019 Filing 99 Request for Judicial Notice (Request for Incorporation by Reference in Support of #96 Motion to Dismiss the Consolidated Class Action Complaint) filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Clubok, Andrew) (Filed on 3/14/2019)
March 14, 2019 Filing 98 Declaration of Melanie M. Blunschi in Support of #96 MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated Class Action Complaint filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) #96 ) (Blunschi, Melanie) (Filed on 3/14/2019)
March 14, 2019 Filing 97 Declaration of Christopher Bream in Support of #96 MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated Class Action Complaint filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Related document(s) #96 ) (Clubok, Andrew) (Filed on 3/14/2019)
March 14, 2019 Filing 96 MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated Class Action Complaint filed by Facebook, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 5/2/2019 08:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor before Judge William Alsup. Responses due by 4/4/2019. Replies due by 4/18/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Clubok, Andrew) (Filed on 3/14/2019)
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER RE VOLUNTARY DISMISSALS. By Judge Alsup. (whalc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2019)
March 7, 2019 Filing 94 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal without prejudice by Connor Wiik (Yanchunis, John) (Filed on 3/7/2019)
March 7, 2019 Filing 93 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal without prejudice by Angeles Meneses (Yanchunis, John) (Filed on 3/7/2019)
March 7, 2019 Filing 92 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal without prejudice by Joseph Melendez (Yanchunis, John) (Filed on 3/7/2019)
March 7, 2019 Filing 91 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal without prejudice by Kathi McGuire (Yanchunis, John) (Filed on 3/7/2019)
March 7, 2019 Filing 90 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal without prejudice by Rubin K Johnson, Rebecca A King, Dominique Martin, Robert E Newborn (Yanchunis, John) (Filed on 3/7/2019)
March 7, 2019 Filing 89 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal without prejudice by Hassan Elkassem (Yanchunis, John) (Filed on 3/7/2019)
March 7, 2019 Filing 88 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal without prejudice by Carla Echavarria, Derrick Walker (Yanchunis, John) (Filed on 3/7/2019)
March 7, 2019 Filing 87 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal without prejudice by Caryn Bendetowies (Yanchunis, John) (Filed on 3/7/2019)
March 7, 2019 Filing 86 CLERK'S NOTICE. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) Telephone Conference, previously set for 3/5/19 at 2:00 PM, has been re- set for 3/18/2019 at 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Chambers before Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2019)
March 4, 2019 Filing 85 CLERK'S NOTICE. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) Telephone Conference set for 3/5/2019 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Chambers before Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Conference call information has been emailed to counsel.(klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2019)
February 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER APPROVING IN PART #82 STIPULATION TO EXTEND BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND PAGE LIMITS. By Judge Alsup. (whalc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2019)
February 22, 2019 Filing 83 Declaration of Melanie M. Blunschi in Support of #82 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Requesting Change to the Briefing Schedule and Extension of Page Limits filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Related document(s) #82 ) (Blunschi, Melanie) (Filed on 2/22/2019)
February 22, 2019 Filing 82 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Requesting Change to the Briefing Schedule and Extension of Page Limits filed by Facebook, Inc. and Echavarria. (Deeley, Elizabeth) (Filed on 2/22/2019) Modified on 2/22/2019 (amgS, COURT STAFF).
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER denying #80 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Gary S. Graifman by Judge William Alsup. (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2019)
February 20, 2019 Filing 80 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice on behalf Gary S. Graifman ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13107066.) filed by Carla Echavarria. (Graifman, Gary) (Filed on 2/20/2019)
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER GRANTING #72 MOTION TO APPOINT CO-INTERIM COUNSEL. By Judge Alsup. (whalc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2019)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER GRANTING #77 STIPULATION TO CONSOLIDATE 3:18-cv-05982-WHA AND 3:19-cv-00117-WHA. By Judge Alsup. (whalc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2019)
February 11, 2019 Filing 77 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Consolidate Related Cases filed by Facebook, Inc., Carla Exhavarria, Scott Schinder and Derrick Walker. (Blunschi, Melanie) (Filed on 2/11/2019) Modified on 2/12/2019 (amgS, COURT STAFF).
February 7, 2019 Filing 76 AMENDED COMPLAINT Consolidated Class Action Complaint against Facebook, Inc.. Filed by Carla Echavarria, Derrick Walker. (Friedman, Andrew) (Filed on 2/7/2019) Modified on 2/8/2019 (amgS, COURT STAFF).
January 31, 2019 Filing 75 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 1/9/2019 before Judge William Alsup for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (rjdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2019)
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER RELATING CASES. By Judge Alsup. (whalc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2019)
January 17, 2019 Filing 73 Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases re 3:19-cv-00117-LB. Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on 01/17/2019. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2019)
January 15, 2019 Filing 72 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Carla Echavarria, Derrick Walker. (Attachments: #1 Declaration John A. Yanchunis Declaration in Support, #2 Exhibit Morgan & Morgan Firm Bio, #3 Exhibit Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll Firm Bio, #4 Exhibit Milberg Tadler Phillips Grossman Firm Bio, #5 Exhibit Proposed Committee Assignments, #6 Exhibit Proposed Time and Expense Reporting Protocol)(Yanchunis, John) (Filed on 1/15/2019)
January 12, 2019 Filing 71 Transcript of Proceedings held on 01/09/2019, before Judge William H. Alsup. Court Reporter/Transcriber Leo T. Mankiewicz, CSR, RMR, CRR, telephone number (415) 722-7045; email: leomank@gmail.com. FTR 8:00 a.m. - 9:28 a.m. and 9:46 a.m. - 10:51 a.m. = 153 minutes. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re (63 in 3:18-cv-05982-WHA) Transcript Order, (62 in 3:18-cv-05982-WHA) Transcript Order ) Redaction Request due 2/4/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/12/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/12/2019. (Mankiewicz, Leo) (Filed on 1/12/2019)
January 11, 2019 Filing 70 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 1/9/2019 before Judge William Alsup for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (rjdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2019)
January 10, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley for Discovery (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2019)
January 10, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero for Settlement (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2019)
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 67 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/6/2020 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor. Jury/Bench Trial set for 5/18/2020 07:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor before Judge William Alsup. Consolidated complaint due by 2/7/2019. Rule 12 motion due by 3/7/2019. Motion for class certification due by 1/9/2020. Discovery due by 1/9/2020. Expert Witness List due by 1/9/2020. Motions due by 3/5/2020. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 1/10/2019. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2019)
January 10, 2019 Filing 66 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 1/9/2019 before Judge William Alsup for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (rjdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2019)
January 9, 2019 Filing 69 AMENDED Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William Alsup: Initial Case Management Conference held on 1/9/2019. Plaintiffs are directed to file a motion for appointment of interim counsel as soon as possible. CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley for Discovery. CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero for Settlement Conference. Jury Selection set for 5/18/2020 07:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor before Judge William Alsup. Jury Trial set for 5/18/2020, 5/19/2020, 5/20/2020 07:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor before Judge William Alsup. (FTR Time: 10:32-10:51.) Plaintiff Attorney: Andrew Friedman, Doug McNamara, Sally Handmaker Guido, John Yanchunis, Ryan McGee, Daniel Robinson, A.J. de Bartolomeo, Ariana Tadler, Karen Riebel, Jonathan Shub, Melissa Emert, Ivy Ngo, Joshua Watson, Gayle Blatt.Defendant Attorney: Elizabeth Deeley, Andrew Bertolli, Andrew Clubok, Serrin Turner.(This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2019)
January 9, 2019 Filing 68 *** FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE DOCKET # 69 . *** Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William Alsup: Initial Case Management Conference held on 1/9/2019. Plaintiffs are directed to file a motion for appointment of interim counsel as soon as possible. CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley for Settlement Conference. Jury Selection set for 5/18/2020 07:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor before Judge William Alsup. Jury Trial set for 5/18/2020, 5/19/2020, 5/20/2020 07:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor before Judge William Alsup. (FTR Time: 10:32-10:51.)Plaintiff Attorney: Andrew Friedman, Doug McNamara, Sally Handmaker Guido, John Yanchunis, Ryan McGee, Daniel Robinson, A.J. de Bartolomeo, Ariana Tadler, Karen Riebel, Jonathan Shub, Melissa Emert, Ivy Ngo, Joshua Watson, Gayle Blatt. Defendant Attorney: Elizabeth Deeley, Andrew Bertolli, Andrew Clubok, Serrin Turner. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/9/2019) Modified on 1/10/2019 (tlhS, COURT STAFF).
January 9, 2019 Filing 65 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William Alsup: Tutorial Hearing held on 1/9/2019. (FTR Time: 8:00-9:28; 9:46-10:32.) Plaintiff Attorney: Andrew Friedman, Doug McNamara, Sally Handmaker Guido, John Yanchunis, Ryan McGee, Daniel Robinson, A.J. de Bartolomeo, Ariana Tadler, Karen Riebel, Jonathan Shub, Melissa Emert, Ivy Ngo, Joshua Watson, Gayle Blatt. Defendant Attorney: Elizabeth Deeley, Andrew Bertolli, Andrew Clubok, Serrin Turner. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/9/2019) Modified on 1/10/2019: Matter transcribed by Leo Mankiewicz. (rjdS, COURT STAFF).
January 9, 2019 Filing 64 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 1/9/2019 before Judge William Alsup by Facebook, Inc., for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Deeley, Elizabeth) (Filed on 1/9/2019)
January 9, 2019 Filing 63 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 1/9/2019 before Judge William Alsup by Scott Schinder, for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Weaver, Lesley) (Filed on 1/9/2019)
January 9, 2019 Filing 62 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 01/09/2019 before Judge William Alsup by Carla Echavarria, Derrick Walker, for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Yanchunis, John) (Filed on 1/9/2019)
January 2, 2019 Filing 61 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (Joint & Consolidated for all Related Cases) filed by Carla Echavarria, Derrick Walker and Facebook, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Table of Related Cases, Causes of Action, and Service/Waiver)(Yanchunis, John) (Filed on 1/2/2019) Modified on 1/3/2019 (amgS, COURT STAFF).
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE by Judge William Alsup granting #56 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for attorney Jean S. Martin.(tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2018)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION OF ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE by Judge William Alsup granting #55 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for attorney Susan E. Engel.(tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2018)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE by Judge William Alsup granting #54 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for attorney Serrin A. Turner.(tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2018)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE by Judge William Alsup granting #53 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for attorney Andrew B. Clubok.(tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2018)
December 20, 2018 Filing 56 Amended MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Jean S. Martin ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12846540.) Filing fee previously paid on 11/14/18 filed by Carla Echavarria, Derrick Walker. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Martin, Jean) (Filed on 12/20/2018) Modified on 12/21/2018 (amgS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 12/21/2018 (amgS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 12/21/2018 (amgS, COURT STAFF).
December 19, 2018 Filing 55 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Susan Engel ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12943309.) filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Engel, Susan) (Filed on 12/19/2018)
December 19, 2018 Filing 54 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Serrin Turner ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12943307.) filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Turner, Serrin) (Filed on 12/19/2018)
December 19, 2018 Filing 53 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Andrew Clubok ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12943287.) filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Clubok, Andrew) (Filed on 12/19/2018)
December 19, 2018 Filing 52 NOTICE of Appearance by Melanie Marilyn Blunschi on behalf of Facebook, Inc. (Blunschi, Melanie) (Filed on 12/19/2018)
December 19, 2018 Filing 51 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael H. Rubin on behalf of Facebook, Inc. (Rubin, Michael) (Filed on 12/19/2018)
December 19, 2018 Filing 50 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Deeley, Elizabeth) (Filed on 12/19/2018)
December 19, 2018 Filing 49 Certificate of Interested Entities by Facebook, Inc. (Deeley, Elizabeth) (Filed on 12/19/2018)
December 19, 2018 Filing 48 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Facebook, Inc. (Deeley, Elizabeth) (Filed on 12/19/2018)
December 19, 2018 Filing 47 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth L. Deeley on behalf of Facebook, Inc. (Deeley, Elizabeth) (Filed on 12/19/2018)
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER DENYING PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION by Judge William Alsup denying #33 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for attorney Jean S. Martin.(tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2018)
December 10, 2018 Filing 45 Clerk's Notice CONSENTING TO Video Recording re: (16 in 3:18-cv-06246-WHA, 9 in 3:18-cv-06953-WHA, 16 in 3:18-cv-06657-WHA, 24 in 3:18-cv-06583-WHA, 20 in 3:18-cv-06022-WHA, 15 in 3:18-cv-06511-WHA, 22 in 3:18-cv-06172-WHA, 13 in 3:18-cv-06887-WHA, 18 in 3:18-cv-06263-WHA, 43 in 3:18-cv-05982-WHA) Clerk's Notice of Video Recording Request. (tmiS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2018)
November 29, 2018 Filing 44 STIPULATION TO TOLL DEADLINES TO RESPOND TO THE CLASS PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINTS AND TO EXTEND THE TIME TO RESPOND TO A FORTHCOMING CONSOLIDATED AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Carla Echavarria, Derrick Walker. (Yanchunis, John) (Filed on 11/29/2018) Modified on 11/30/2018 (ddkS, COURT STAFF).
November 26, 2018 Filing 43 Clerk's Notice of Video Recording Request. Video Camera Hearing set for 1/9/2019 08:00 AM. Objections to Video Recording due 12/3/2018. (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2018)
November 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER RELATING CASES. Signed by Judge Alsup on 11/21/2018. (whalc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2018)
November 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER RELATING CASES. Signed by Judge Alsup on 11/21/2018. (whalc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2018)
November 20, 2018 Filing 40 Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases re 18-cv-06953-LB. Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on 11/20/2018. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2018)
November 19, 2018 Filing 39 Sua Sponte Judicial Referral for Purposes of Determining Relationship of Cases 18-cv-6887-DMR and 18-cv-5982-WHA. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 11/19/2018. (dmrlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2018)
November 16, 2018 Filing 38 FURTHER NOTICE RE TUTORIAL. By Judge Alsup. (whalc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2018)
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER GRANTING #35 MOTION RELATING CASES. By Judge Alsup. (whalc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2018)
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER RELATING CASES. Signed by Judge Alsup on 11/16/2018. (whalc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2018)
November 15, 2018 Filing 35 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related filed by Carla Echavarria, Derrick Walker. (Attachments: #(1) [Proposed] Order)(Yanchunis, John) (Filed on 11/15/2018)
November 15, 2018 Filing 34 REFERRAL for Purpose of Determining Relationship by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2018)
November 14, 2018 Filing 33 MOTION for Leave to Appear in Pro Hac Vice, (Filing Fee: $310.00, receipt number 0971-12846540) filed by Carla Echavarria. (Attachments: #(1) Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate of Good Standing)(Martin, Jean) (Filed on 11/14/2018)
November 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER GRANTING #31 MOTION TO RELATE CASES. By Judge Alsup. (whalc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2018)
November 7, 2018 Filing 31 MOTION to Relate Case filed by Carla Echavarria, Derrick Walker. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Handmaker, Sally) (Filed on 11/7/2018)
November 5, 2018 Filing 30 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Carla Echavarria. Service waived by Facebook, Inc. waiver sent on 10/8/2018, answer due 12/7/2018. (Yanchunis, John) (Filed on 11/5/2018)
November 2, 2018 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Tutorial Hearing set for 1/9/2019 08:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 1/2/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/9/2019 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor. (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2018)
November 2, 2018 Filing 29 NOTICE RE TUTORIAL. By Judge William Alsup. (whalc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2018)
November 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER RELATING CASES. Signed by Judge William Alsup on November 2, 2018. (whalc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2018)
October 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 SUA SPONTE REFERRAL ORDER FOR DETERMINING RELATIONSHIP OF CASES. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 10/29/18. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2018)
October 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 NOTICE AND ORDER RE PUTATIVE CLASS ACTIONS AND FACTORS TO BE EVALUATED FOR ANY PROPOSED CLASS SETTLEMENT by Judge William Alsup. (whalc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2018)
October 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER GRANTING #24 MOTION TO RELATE CASES. By Judge William Alsup. (whalc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2018)
October 19, 2018 Filing 24 Consent MOTION to Relate Case filed by Carla Echavarria, Derrick Walker. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Signature Page (Declarations/Stipulations), #3 Proposed Order)(Yanchunis, John) (Filed on 10/19/2018)
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER GRANTING #22 MOTION TO RELATE CASES. By Judge William Alsup. (whalc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2018)
October 15, 2018 Filing 22 Consent MOTION to Relate Case filed by Carla Echavarria, Derrick Walker. (Attachments: #1 Signature Page (Declarations/Stipulations), #2 Proposed Order)(Yanchunis, John) (Filed on 10/15/2018)
October 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER GRANTING #11 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO RELATE CASES. By Judge William Alsup. (whalc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2018)
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE by Judge William Alsup granting #16 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for attorney Marcio W. Valladares.(tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2018)
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE by Judge William Alsup granting #15 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for attorney Ryan McGee.(tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2018)
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE by Judge William Alsup granting #14 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for attorney John A. Yanchunis.(tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2018)
October 9, 2018 Filing 17 CLERK'S NOTICE SCHEDULING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE UPON REASSIGNMENT - Joint Case Management Statement due by 1/3/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/10/2019 at 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/whaorders.. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2018)
October 5, 2018 Filing 16 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Marcio W. Valladares) ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12740951.) filed by Carla Echavarria, Derrick Walker. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Watson, Joshua) (Filed on 10/5/2018)
October 5, 2018 Filing 15 Amended MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Ryan McGee) ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 26CM76VO; 0971-12737.) Filing fee previously paid on 10/4/2018 filed by Carla Echavarria, Derrick Walker. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Watson, Joshua) (Filed on 10/5/2018)
October 5, 2018 Filing 14 Amended MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (John A. Yanchunis) ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 26CM7744; 0971-12737.) Filing fee previously paid on 10/4/2018 filed by Carla Echavarria, Derrick Walker. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Watson, Joshua) (Filed on 10/5/2018)
October 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER DENYING PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION by Judge William Alsup denying #10 Motion for Admission of Attorney Ryan McGee Pro Hac Vice.(tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2018) Modified on 10/5/2018 (tlS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 10/5/2018 (tlS, COURT STAFF).
October 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER DENYING PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION by Judge William Alsup denying #9 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for attorney John A. Yanchunis.(tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2018)
October 4, 2018 Filing 11 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION To Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related (Bass v Facebook) filed by Carla Echavarria, Derrick Walker. Responses due by 10/9/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exh A - Bass Docket and Complaint)(Watson, Joshua) (Filed on 10/4/2018) Modified on 10/5/2018 (tlS, COURT STAFF).
October 4, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by Ryan McGee ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12737838.) filed by Carla Echavarria, Derrick Walker. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Watson, Joshua) (Filed on 10/4/2018) Modified on 10/5/2018 (tlS, COURT STAFF).
October 4, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by John A. Yanchunis ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12737815.) filed by Carla Echavarria, Derrick Walker. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Watson, Joshua) (Filed on 10/4/2018)
October 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge William Alsup for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Executive Committee on 10/2/18. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2018)
October 2, 2018 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2018)
October 1, 2018 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Defendant Facebook, Inc.. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2018)
October 1, 2018 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Joint Case Management Statement due by 12/24/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/31/2018 at 1:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom A, 15th Floor. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2018)
October 1, 2018 Filing 4 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge filed by CARLA ECHAVARRIA & DERRICK WALKER. (Watson, Joshua) (Filed on 10/1/2018)
September 28, 2018 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 10/12/2018. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2018)
September 28, 2018 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Watson, Joshua) (Filed on 9/28/2018)
September 28, 2018 Filing 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT for (1) UCL - Unlawful Business Practice; (2) UCL - Unfair Business Practice; (3) Deceit by Concealment; (4) Negligence; (5) California's Customer Records Act; Jury Trial Demanded against Facebook, Inc., (Filing Fee: $400.00, receipt number 0971-12721516). Filed by CARLA ECHAVARRIA & DERRICK WALKER. (Attachments: #(1) Civil Cover Sheet)(Watson, Joshua) (Filed on 9/28/2018) Modified on 10/1/2018 (tnS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adkins v. Facebook, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Facebook, Inc.
Represented By: Elizabeth L. Deeley
Represented By: Susan E. Engel
Represented By: Michael H. Rubin
Represented By: Serrin A Turner
Represented By: Melanie Marilyn Blunschi
Represented By: Andrew Brian Clubok
Represented By: Alexander E. Reicher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CARLA ECHAVARRIA
Represented By: Joshua Haakon Watson
Represented By: Ryan McGee
Represented By: John A. Yanchunis
Represented By: Clayeo C. Arnold
Represented By: Marcio William Valladares
Represented By: Sally Mae Handmaker
Represented By: Jean Sutton Martin
Represented By: Jean S. Martin
Represented By: Andrew N. Friedman
Represented By: Gary S. Graifman
Represented By: Henry J. Kelston
Represented By: Ariana J. Tadler
Represented By: Jeremy Keith Robinson
Represented By: A.J. De Bartolomeo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DERRICK WALKER
Represented By: Joshua Haakon Watson
Represented By: Ryan McGee
Represented By: John A. Yanchunis
Represented By: Clayeo C. Arnold
Represented By: Marcio William Valladares
Represented By: Sally Mae Handmaker
Represented By: Jean S. Martin
Represented By: Jean Sutton Martin
Represented By: Andrew N. Friedman
Represented By: Henry J. Kelston
Represented By: Ariana J. Tadler
Represented By: Jeremy Keith Robinson
Represented By: A.J. De Bartolomeo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Bass, Jr.
Represented By: Tarek H. Zohdy
Represented By: Ariana J. Tadler
Represented By: John A. Yanchunis
Represented By: Kate M. Baxter-Kauf
Represented By: Andrew N. Friedman
Represented By: Jeremy Keith Robinson
Represented By: Steven Richard Weinmann
Represented By: A.J. De Bartolomeo
Represented By: Steven R. Weinmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jasper Schmidt
Represented By: Gayle Meryl Blatt
Represented By: Ariana J. Tadler
Represented By: Andrew N. Friedman
Represented By: Jeremy Keith Robinson
Represented By: John A. Yanchunis
Represented By: A.J. De Bartolomeo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jill Herr
Represented By: John A. Yanchunis
Represented By: Melissa R. Emert
Represented By: Patrice L. Bishop
Represented By: Ariana J. Tadler
Represented By: Andrew N. Friedman
Represented By: Jeremy Keith Robinson
Represented By: A.J. De Bartolomeo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denise Brown-Wells
Represented By: John A. Yanchunis
Represented By: Ariana J. Tadler
Represented By: Andrew N. Friedman
Represented By: Jeremy Keith Robinson
Represented By: A.J. De Bartolomeo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Adkins
Represented By: Ariana J. Tadler
Represented By: Andrew N. Friedman
Represented By: John A. Yanchunis
Represented By: Kate M. Baxter-Kauf
Represented By: Henry J. Kelston
Represented By: Jeremy Keith Robinson
Represented By: Karina Grace Puttieva
Represented By: Karen Hanson Riebel
Represented By: A.J. De Bartolomeo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Scott Schinder
Represented By: Lesley Elizabeth Weaver
Represented By: Andrew N. Friedman
Represented By: Jeremy Keith Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Kathi McGuire
Represented By: David E. Azar
Represented By: Henry J. Kelston
Represented By: Ariana J. Tadler
Represented By: A.J. De Bartolomeo
Represented By: John A. Yanchunis
Represented By: Andrew N. Friedman
Represented By: Jeremy Keith Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Dominique Martin
Represented By: Ivy T. Ngo
Represented By: John A. Yanchunis
Represented By: Henry J. Kelston
Represented By: Andrew N. Friedman
Represented By: Ariana J. Tadler
Represented By: Jeremy Keith Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Licea Luis
Represented By: Keith David Griffin
Represented By: Ebby Shahrokh Bakhtiar
Represented By: Thomas V. Girardi
Represented By: Henry J. Kelston
Represented By: Andrew N. Friedman
Represented By: John A. Yanchunis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Rebecca A King
Represented By: Ivy T. Ngo
Represented By: John A. Yanchunis
Represented By: Henry J. Kelston
Represented By: Andrew N. Friedman
Represented By: Ariana J. Tadler
Represented By: Jeremy Keith Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Hassan Elkassem
Represented By: Jonathan Shub
Represented By: Kevin Laukaitis
Represented By: John A. Yanchunis
Represented By: Henry J. Kelston
Represented By: Andrew N. Friedman
Represented By: Ariana J. Tadler
Represented By: Jeremy Keith Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Robert E Newborn
Represented By: Ivy T. Ngo
Represented By: John A. Yanchunis
Represented By: Henry J. Kelston
Represented By: Andrew N. Friedman
Represented By: Ariana J. Tadler
Represented By: Jeremy Keith Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Joseph Melendez
Represented By: Wesley Kaikaina Polischuk
Represented By: Daniel Stewart Robinson
Represented By: Daniel S Robinson
Represented By: John A. Yanchunis
Represented By: Henry J. Kelston
Represented By: Andrew N. Friedman
Represented By: Ariana J. Tadler
Represented By: Jeremy Keith Robinson
Represented By: Daniel S. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Connor Wiik
Represented By: Marc Lawrence Godino
Represented By: John A. Yanchunis
Represented By: Henry J. Kelston
Represented By: Andrew N. Friedman
Represented By: Ariana J. Tadler
Represented By: Jeremy Keith Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Angeles Meneses
Represented By: Arielle S. Wagner
Represented By: Kate M. Baxter-Kauf
Represented By: Douglas James McNamara
Represented By: Andrew N. Friedman
Represented By: Karen Hanson Riebel
Represented By: Sally Mae Handmaker
Represented By: Charles Philip Reichmann
Represented By: John A. Yanchunis
Represented By: Henry J. Kelston
Represented By: Ariana J. Tadler
Represented By: Jeremy Keith Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Rubin K Johnson
Represented By: Ivy T. Ngo
Represented By: John A. Yanchunis
Represented By: Henry J. Kelston
Represented By: Andrew N. Friedman
Represented By: Ariana J. Tadler
Represented By: Jeremy Keith Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Caryn Bendetowies
Represented By: Melissa R. Emert
Represented By: Patrice L. Bishop
Represented By: John A. Yanchunis
Represented By: Henry J. Kelston
Represented By: Andrew N. Friedman
Represented By: Ariana J. Tadler
Represented By: Jeremy Keith Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Luis Licea
Represented By: Keith David Griffin
Represented By: Ebby Shahrokh Bakhtiar
Represented By: Thomas V. Girardi
Represented By: Ariana J. Tadler
Represented By: Andrew N. Friedman
Represented By: Jeremy Keith Robinson
Represented By: John A. Yanchunis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?