The Board of Trustees for the Laborers Health and Welfare Trust Fund for Northern California et al v. Michael Heavey Construction, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Laborers Pension Trust Fund for Northern California, Laborers Training and Retraining Trust Fund for Northern California, The Board of Trustees for the Laborers Health and Welfare Trust Fund for Northern California and Laborers Vacation-Holiday Trust Fund for Northern California
Defendant: MICHAEL BART HEAVEY, NOREEN BRIDGET BOYLE and Michael Heavey Construction, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2018cv06119
Filed: October 4, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 28, 2018 Filing 20 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Noreen Bridget Boyle, Michael Bart Heavey, Michael Heavey Construction, Inc... (Kuhner, Chris) (Filed on 11/28/2018)
November 28, 2018 Filing 19 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 12/12/2018. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2018)
November 28, 2018 Filing 18 ANSWER to Complaint for Breach of Contract, Damages, Audit and Enforcement of Personal Guaranty byNoreen Bridget Boyle, Michael Bart Heavey, Michael Heavey Construction, Inc.. (Kuhner, Chris) (Filed on 11/28/2018)
November 9, 2018 Filing 17 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Laborers Pension Trust Fund for Northern California, Laborers Training and Retraining Trust Fund for Northern California, Laborers Vacation-Holiday Trust Fund for Northern California, The Board of Trustees for the Laborers Health and Welfare Trust Fund for Northern California.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Mainguy, Tracy) (Filed on 11/9/2018)
November 8, 2018 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by The Board of Trustees for the Laborers Health and Welfare Trust Fund for Northern California, Laborers Training and Retraining Trust Fund for Northern California, Laborers Pension Trust Fund for Northern California, Laborers Vacation-Holiday Trust Fund for Northern California. Noreen Bridget Boyle served on 11/7/2018, answer due 11/28/2018. (Mainguy, Tracy) (Filed on 11/8/2018)
November 8, 2018 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by The Board of Trustees for the Laborers Health and Welfare Trust Fund for Northern California, Laborers Training and Retraining Trust Fund for Northern California, Laborers Pension Trust Fund for Northern California, Laborers Vacation-Holiday Trust Fund for Northern California. Michael Heavey Construction, Inc. served on 11/7/2018, answer due 11/28/2018. (Mainguy, Tracy) (Filed on 11/8/2018)
November 8, 2018 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by The Board of Trustees for the Laborers Health and Welfare Trust Fund for Northern California, Laborers Training and Retraining Trust Fund for Northern California, Laborers Pension Trust Fund for Northern California, Laborers Vacation-Holiday Trust Fund for Northern California. Michael Bart Heavey served on 11/7/2018, answer due 11/28/2018. (Mainguy, Tracy) (Filed on 11/8/2018)
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley denying #7 Ex Parte Application for Right to Attach Order and Writ of Attachment, or Alternatively, a Temporary Protective Order. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2018)
October 26, 2018 Filing 12 Proposed Order re #7 Ex Parte Application for Right to Attach Order and Writ of Attachment, or Alternatively, a Temporary Protective Order, #8 Brief,, [Proposed] Right to Attach Order and Order for Issuance of Writ of Attachment by Laborers Pension Trust Fund for Northern California, Laborers Training and Retraining Trust Fund for Northern California, Laborers Vacation-Holiday Trust Fund for Northern California, The Board of Trustees for the Laborers Health and Welfare Trust Fund for Northern California. (Mainguy, Tracy) (Filed on 10/26/2018)
October 26, 2018 Filing 11 Declaration of Craig Haberlein in Support of #7 Ex Parte Application for Right to Attach Order and Writ of Attachment, or Alternatively, a Temporary Protective Order, #8 Brief,, Declaration of Craig Haberlein in Support of Ex Parte Application for Right to Attach Order and Writ of Attachment, or Alternatively a Temporary Protective Order filed byLaborers Pension Trust Fund for Northern California, Laborers Training and Retraining Trust Fund for Northern California, Laborers Vacation-Holiday Trust Fund for Northern California, The Board of Trustees for the Laborers Health and Welfare Trust Fund for Northern California. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #7 , #8 ) (Mainguy, Tracy) (Filed on 10/26/2018)
October 26, 2018 Filing 10 Declaration of Michelle Lauziere in Support of #7 Ex Parte Application for Right to Attach Order and Writ of Attachment, or Alternatively, a Temporary Protective Order, #8 Brief,, Declaration of Michelle Lauziere in Support of Ex Parte Application for Right to Attach Order and Writ of Attachment, or Alternatively a Temporary Protective Order filed byLaborers Pension Trust Fund for Northern California, Laborers Training and Retraining Trust Fund for Northern California, Laborers Vacation-Holiday Trust Fund for Northern California, The Board of Trustees for the Laborers Health and Welfare Trust Fund for Northern California. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Related document(s) #7 , #8 ) (Mainguy, Tracy) (Filed on 10/26/2018)
October 26, 2018 Filing 9 Declaration of Tracy L. Mainguy in Support of #7 Ex Parte Application for Right to Attach Order and Writ of Attachment, or Alternatively, a Temporary Protective Order, #8 Brief,, Declaration of Tracy L. Mainguy in Support of Ex Parte Application for Right to Attach Order and Writ of Attachment, or Alternatively a Temporary Protective Order filed byLaborers Pension Trust Fund for Northern California, Laborers Training and Retraining Trust Fund for Northern California, Laborers Vacation-Holiday Trust Fund for Northern California, The Board of Trustees for the Laborers Health and Welfare Trust Fund for Northern California. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) #7 , #8 ) (Mainguy, Tracy) (Filed on 10/26/2018)
October 26, 2018 Filing 8 Brief re #7 Ex Parte Application for Right to Attach Order and Writ of Attachment, or Alternatively, a Temporary Protective Order Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Application for Right to Attach Order and Writ of Attachment, or Alternatively, Temporary Proctective Order filed byLaborers Pension Trust Fund for Northern California, Laborers Training and Retraining Trust Fund for Northern California, Laborers Vacation-Holiday Trust Fund for Northern California, The Board of Trustees for the Laborers Health and Welfare Trust Fund for Northern California. (Related document(s) #7 ) (Mainguy, Tracy) (Filed on 10/26/2018)
October 26, 2018 Filing 7 Ex Parte Application for Right to Attach Order and Writ of Attachment, or Alternatively, a Temporary Protective Order filed by Laborers Pension Trust Fund for Northern California, Laborers Training and Retraining Trust Fund for Northern California, Laborers Vacation-Holiday Trust Fund for Northern California, The Board of Trustees for the Laborers Health and Welfare Trust Fund for Northern California. (Mainguy, Tracy) (Filed on 10/26/2018)
October 25, 2018 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 11/8/2018. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2018)
October 11, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Noreen Bridget Boyle, Michael Bart Heavey, Michael Heavey Construction, Inc.. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2018)
October 11, 2018 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 12/27/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/3/2019 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2018)
October 5, 2018 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 10/19/2018. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2018)
October 5, 2018 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Mainguy, Tracy) (Filed on 10/5/2018)
October 5, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for breach of contract, damages, audit and enforcement of personal guarantee against Noreen Bridget Boyle, Michael Bart Heavey, Michael Heavey Construction, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-12739989). Filed by The Board of Trustees for the Laborers Health and Welfare Trust Fund for Northern California, Laborers Training and Retraining Trust Fund for Northern California, Laborers Pension Trust Fund for Northern California, Laborers Vacation-Holiday Trust Fund for Northern California. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mainguy, Tracy) (Filed on 10/5/2018) Modified on 10/11/2018 (slhS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Board of Trustees for the Laborers Health and Welfare Trust Fund for Northern California et al v. Michael Heavey Construction, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL BART HEAVEY
Represented By: Chris David Kuhner, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NOREEN BRIDGET BOYLE
Represented By: Chris David Kuhner, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Heavey Construction, Inc.
Represented By: Chris David Kuhner, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laborers Pension Trust Fund for Northern California
Represented By: Barry E. Hinkle
Represented By: Tracy Lynn Mainguy
Represented By: Concepcion E. Lozano-Batista
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laborers Training and Retraining Trust Fund for Northern California
Represented By: Barry E. Hinkle
Represented By: Tracy Lynn Mainguy
Represented By: Concepcion E. Lozano-Batista
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Board of Trustees for the Laborers Health and Welfare Trust Fund for Northern California
Represented By: Barry E. Hinkle
Represented By: Tracy Lynn Mainguy
Represented By: Concepcion E. Lozano-Batista
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laborers Vacation-Holiday Trust Fund for Northern California
Represented By: Barry E. Hinkle
Represented By: Tracy Lynn Mainguy
Represented By: Concepcion E. Lozano-Batista
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?