Yu et al v. Apple Inc.
Plaintiff: Yanbin Yu and Zhongxuan Zhang
Defendant: Apple Inc.
Case Number: 3:2018cv06181
Filed: October 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: James Donato
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:145
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER by Judge James Donato granting #16 Motion to Relate Case. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2018)
November 28, 2018 Filing 16 MOTION to Relate Case filed by Yanbin Yu, Zhongxuan Zhang. (Johnson, Daniel) (Filed on 11/28/2018)
November 14, 2018 Filing 15 STIPULATION Extending Time for Apple to Respond to Complaint filed by Apple Inc.. (Keefe, Heidi) (Filed on 11/14/2018)
November 2, 2018 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Yanbin Yu, Zhongxuan Zhang (Johnson, Daniel) (Filed on 11/2/2018)
October 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/10/2019 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 1/3/2019.. Signed by Judge James Donato on 10/15/18. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2018)
October 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge James Donato for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Executive Committee on 10/12/18. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2018)
October 12, 2018 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2018)
October 10, 2018 Filing 10 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Yanbin Yu, Zhongxuan Zhang.. (Litts, Robert) (Filed on 10/10/2018)
October 10, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert George Litts (Litts, Robert) (Filed on 10/10/2018)
October 10, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Mario Moore (Moore, Mario) (Filed on 10/10/2018)
October 10, 2018 Filing 7 REPORT on the filing of an action regarding Patent Infringement. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/10/2018)
October 10, 2018 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Apple Inc.. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/10/2018)
October 10, 2018 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 1/4/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/11/2019 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/10/2018)
October 10, 2018 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 10/24/2018. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/10/2018)
October 9, 2018 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by Yanbin Yu, Zhongxuan Zhang (Johnson, Daniel) (Filed on 10/9/2018)
October 9, 2018 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Johnson, Daniel) (Filed on 10/9/2018)
October 9, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement with jury demand against Apple Inc. ($400.00, Receipt No. 0971-12747352) Filed by Yanbin Yu, Zhongxuan Zhang. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (U.S. Patent No. 6,611,289), #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Johnson, Daniel) (Filed on 10/9/2018) Modified on 10/10/2018 (jmlS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 10/10/2018 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yu et al v. Apple Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yanbin Yu
Represented By: Daniel Johnson, Jr.
Represented By: Robert George Litts
Represented By: Mario Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zhongxuan Zhang
Represented By: Daniel Johnson, Jr.
Represented By: Robert George Litts
Represented By: Mario Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple Inc.
Represented By: Heidi Lyn Keefe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?