Johnson v. Executive Hotel Vintage Court, LLC

Plaintiff: Scott Johnson
Defendant: Executive Hotel Vintage Court, LLC
Case Number: 3:2018cv06248
Filed: October 12, 2018
Court: California Northern District Court
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Nature of Suit: American with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 10, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
December 10, 2018 11 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Executive Hotel Vintage Court, LLC.. (Karlin, Michael) (Filed on 12/10/2018)
November 20, 2018 10 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendant shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 12/4/2018. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2018)
November 20, 2018 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Farrell Jay Goodman (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Goodman, Farrell) (Filed on 11/20/2018)
November 20, 2018 8 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Initial Complaint By Not More Than 30 Days filed by Executive Hotel Vintage Court, LLC. (Karlin, Michael) (Filed on 11/20/2018)
October 17, 2018 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Scott Johnson.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Carson, Chris) (Filed on 10/17/2018)
October 15, 2018 6 Summons Issued as to Executive Hotel Vintage Court, LLC. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2018)
October 15, 2018 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order for Cases Asserting Denial of Right of Access under Americans with Disabilities Act. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2018)
October 12, 2018 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 10/26/2018. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2018)
October 12, 2018 3 Proposed Summons. (Carson, Chris) (Filed on 10/12/2018)
October 12, 2018 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Scott Johnson re #1 Complaint, (Carson, Chris) (Filed on 10/12/2018)
October 12, 2018 1 COMPLAINT For Damages And Injunctive Relief For Violations Of: Americans With Disabilities Act; Unruh Civil Rights Act against Executive Hotel Vintage Court, LLC (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-12756493). Filed by Scott Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Carson, Chris) (Filed on 10/12/2018) Modified on 10/15/2018 (slhS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Executive Hotel Vintage Court, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Executive Hotel Vintage Court, LLC
Represented By: Michael J Karlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Johnson
Represented By: Chris Carson
Represented By: Farrell Jay Goodman
Represented By: Dennis Jay Price, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?