Animal Legal Defense Fund et al v. Christiansen et al
Plaintiff: Carla Bowers, Animal Legal Defense Fund and American Wild Horse Campaign
Defendant: Vicki Christiansen, Randy Moore, Amanda McAdams and George "Sonny" Perdue
Amicus Curiae: Modoc County Farm Bureau, Wilson Ranches, Public Lands Council, Green Valley Corporation, Modoc County, Devils' Garden Preservation Group, California Farm Bureau and California Cattlemen's Association
Case Number: 3:2018cv06410
Filed: October 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: James Donato
Referring Judge: Kandis A Westmore
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:551
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2019 Filing 71 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley: Telephone Conference held on 9/18/2019.(Not Reported)(Time 00:10) Attorney for Defendants: Davene Williams. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/18/2019) Modified on 9/19/2019 (ahm, COURT STAFF).
September 16, 2019 Filing 70 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley: Telephone Conference held on 9/16/2019. (Not Reported)(Time 00:15)Attorney for Intervenors: Navi Dhillon. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/16/2019)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER. In light of the referral to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley for settlement proceedings, all pending motions are terminated without prejudice to renewal, as appropriate. Signed by Judge James Donato on 9/13/2019. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2019)
September 11, 2019 Filing 69 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley: Telephone Conference held on 9/11/2019. (Not Reported)(Time 00:20) Attorneys for Defendants: Davene Williams; Rickey Turner Jr. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/11/2019)
September 10, 2019 Filing 68 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley: Telephone Conference held on 9/10/2019. (Not Reported)(Time 00:25)Attorneys for Plaintiffs: William Eubanks, Bruce Wagman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/10/2019)
August 28, 2019 Filing 66 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley: Settlement Conference held on 8/28/2019. (Not Reported)(Time 1:00)Attorneys for Defendants: Davene Williams; Rickey Turner Jr. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/28/2019)
August 28, 2019 Filing 65 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley: Telephone Settlement Conference held on 8/28/2019. (Not Reported)(Time 1:00)Attorney for Intervenors: Navi Dhillon. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/28/2019)
August 23, 2019 Filing 64 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley: Telephone settlement conference held on August 23, 2019. Settlement discussions are continuing. The Court will hold individual telephone conferences with the parties next week. (Not Reported)(Time 1:15)Attorneys for Plaintiffs: William Eubanks, Bruce Wagman.Attorneys for Defendants: Davene Williams; Rickey Turner Jr. Attorneys for Intervenors: Navi Dhillon. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/23/2019) Modified on 8/23/2019 (ahm, COURT STAFF).
August 19, 2019 Filing 63 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley: Telephone Conference held on 8/19/2019. Further call scheduled for 8/23/19 at 7:30 a.m. Mr. Dhillon circulated the conference call in number. (Not Reported)(Time 00:20) Attorneys for Plaintiffs: William Eubanks, Bruce Wagman.Attorney for Defendants: Davene Williams. Attorneys for Intervenors: Navi Dhillon, Chris Carr, Caroline Lombalt. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/19/2019) Modified on 8/23/2019 (ahm, COURT STAFF).
August 9, 2019 Filing 62 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley: Settlement conference held on August 9, 2019. Further telephone discussions scheduled for August 19, 2019 at 9:00 a.m. PST and August 23 2019 at 7:30 a.m. PST. Attorney Dhillon will circulate a conference call-in number. (Not Reported)(Time 5:30)Attorneys for Plaintiffs: William Eubanks; Bruce Wagman.Attorney for Defendants: Rickey Turner Jr.Attorney for Intervenors: Navi Dhillon.(This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/9/2019)
July 30, 2019 Filing 61 NOTICE of Change of Address by Davene Dashawn Walker (Walker, Davene) (Filed on 7/30/2019)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 60 NOTICE AND ORDER REGARDING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 7/29/2019. Settlement Conference set for 8/9/2019 at 8:30 a.m. in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2019)
June 26, 2019 Filing 59 NOTICE by American Wild Horse Campaign, Animal Legal Defense Fund, Carla Bowers NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF KATHERINE A. MEYER ON BEHALF OF PLAINTIFFS (Eubanks, William) (Filed on 6/26/2019)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER. At the parties' joint request, the case is referred to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley for settlement proceedings. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2019)
June 10, 2019 Filing 57 STATUS REPORT Regarding Settlement Discussions by Vicki Christiansen, Amanda McAdams, Randy Moore, George "Sonny" Perdue. (Walker, Davene) (Filed on 6/10/2019)
May 10, 2019 Filing 55 Transcript of Proceedings held on 5/9/19, before Judge James Donato. Court Reporter Vicki Eastvold, telephone number 218-355-8781. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 5/31/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/10/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/8/2019. (veS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2019)
May 9, 2019 Filing 56 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James Donato: Motion Hearing held on 5/9/2019. Joint status report due 6/10/2019. (jdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/9/2019)
May 8, 2019 Filing 54 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexandra Julia Monson (Monson, Alexandra) (Filed on 5/8/2019)
May 6, 2019 Filing 53 NOTICE by American Wild Horse Campaign, Animal Legal Defense Fund, Carla Bowers of Recent Development (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Eubanks, William) (Filed on 5/6/2019)
April 15, 2019 Filing 52 RESPONSE re #51 Objection by Proposed Intervenors to Plaintiffs' Notices of Supplemental Authority by American Wild Horse Campaign, Animal Legal Defense Fund, Carla Bowers. (Eubanks, William) (Filed on 4/15/2019)
April 12, 2019 Filing 51 OBJECTIONS to re #49 Notice (Other), #50 Notice (Other), IMPROPER FILINGS by The Coalition for the Responsible Management of the Modoc National Forest. (Carr, Christopher) (Filed on 4/12/2019)
April 4, 2019 Filing 50 NOTICE by American Wild Horse Campaign, Animal Legal Defense Fund, Carla Bowers re #21 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , #38 Reply to Opposition/Response NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY (Eubanks, William) (Filed on 4/4/2019)
March 20, 2019 Filing 49 NOTICE by American Wild Horse Campaign, Animal Legal Defense Fund, Carla Bowers re #21 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , #38 Reply to Opposition/Response NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITIES (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - March 15, 2019 E&E Article)(Eubanks, William) (Filed on 3/20/2019)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER by Judge James Donato granting #35 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Caroline Lobdell. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2019)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER. The Court confirms May 9, 2019, for the preliminary injunction hearing. Signed by Judge James Donato on 2/8/2019. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2019)
February 6, 2019 Filing 46 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Reset Preliminary Injunction Hearing filed by Vicki Christiansen, Amanda McAdams, Randy Moore, George "Sonny" Perdue. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Walker, Davene) (Filed on 2/6/2019)
January 29, 2019 Filing 45 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 44 Order on Stipulation, to Reset Preliminary Injunction Hearing and Other Deadlines filed by Vicki Christiansen, Amanda McAdams, Randy Moore, George "Sonny" Perdue. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Walker, Davene) (Filed on 1/29/2019)
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 44 Order re #42 Stipulation entered by Judge James Donato. The stay entered in Case No. 18-6531 at Dkt. No. 37 is entered here in all respects and on the same condition re no horse sales without limitations. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
January 17, 2019 Filing 43 NOTICE by American Wild Horse Campaign, Animal Legal Defense Fund, Carla Bowers re #21 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , #38 Reply to Opposition/Response OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY (Attachments: #1 Supplemental Authority -- AWHC v. Zinke (D. Wyo.))(Eubanks, William) (Filed on 1/17/2019)
January 16, 2019 Filing 42 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Stay the Case in Light of Appropriations Lapse filed by Vicki Christiansen, Amanda McAdams, Randy Moore, George "Sonny" Perdue. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Walker, Davene) (Filed on 1/16/2019)
January 15, 2019 Filing 41 Joint ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Vacate Initial Case Management Order re #6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines Via Stipulation of the Parties filed by American Wild Horse Campaign, Animal Legal Defense Fund, Carla Bowers. Responses due by 1/22/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Eubanks, William) (Filed on 1/15/2019)
January 14, 2019 Filing 40 ADR Clerks Notice re: Non-Compliance with Court Order. The parties have failed to file an ADR Certification as required by the Initial Case Management Scheduling Order. Counsel shall comply promptly with the requirements of ADR L.R. 3-5(b) and shall file the ADR Certification. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2019)
January 10, 2019 Filing 39 REPLY (re #34 MOTION to Intervene ) MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO INTERVENE filed byThe Coalition for the Responsible Management of the Modoc National Forest. (Carr, Christopher) (Filed on 1/10/2019)
January 8, 2019 Filing 38 REPLY (re #21 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction ) filed byAmerican Wild Horse Campaign, Animal Legal Defense Fund, Carla Bowers. (Eubanks, William) (Filed on 1/8/2019)
January 3, 2019 Filing 37 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #34 MOTION to Intervene ) filed byAmerican Wild Horse Campaign, Animal Legal Defense Fund, Carla Bowers. (Eubanks, William) (Filed on 1/3/2019)
December 20, 2018 Filing 36 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #21 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction ) filed byThe Coalition for the Responsible Management of the Modoc National Forest. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Chris Carr in Support of Coalition's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #2 Declaration of Bill Wilson in Support of Coalition's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #3 Declaration of Sean Curtis in Support of Coalition's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #4 Declaration of Mike Byrne in Support of Coalition's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #5 Declaration of Jess Dancer in Support of Coalition's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #6 Proposed Order Denying Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction)(Carr, Christopher) (Filed on 12/20/2018)
December 20, 2018 Filing 35 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Caroline Lobdell ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12947312.) filed by The Coalition for the Responsible Management of the Modoc National Forest. (Carr, Christopher) (Filed on 12/20/2018)
December 20, 2018 Filing 34 MOTION to Intervene filed by The Coalition for the Responsible Management of the Modoc National Forest. Motion Hearing set for 1/31/2019 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 1/3/2019. Replies due by 1/10/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Chris Carr in Support of Coalition's Motion to Intervene, #2 Declaration of Bill Wilson in Support of Coalition's Motion to Intervene, #3 Declaration Sean Curtis in Support of Coalition's Motion to Intervene, #4 Declaration of Mike Byrne in Support of Coalition's Motion to Intervene, #5 Declaration of Jess Dancer in Support of Coalition's Motion to Intervene, #6 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Intervene)(Carr, Christopher) (Filed on 12/20/2018)
December 20, 2018 Filing 33 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #21 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction ) filed byVicki Christiansen, Amanda McAdams, Randy Moore, George "Sonny" Perdue. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1 - McAdams Declaration, #2 Exhibit Ex. 2 - Frolli Declaration)(Walker, Davene) (Filed on 12/20/2018)
December 18, 2018 Set/Reset Hearing: Preliminary Injunction Hearing set for January 31, 2019, at 10:00 am. (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2018)
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER. The Court confirms January 31, 2019, at 10:00 am for the hearing on the injunction motion. Signed by Judge James Donato on 12/18/2018. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2018)
December 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 32 Order re #30 . The dates available for a hearing are January 24 or 31, 2019. The parties are directed to pick one and promptly advise the Court. Signed by Judge James Donato on 12/16/2018. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2018)
December 11, 2018 Filing 30 MOTION To Reschedule the January 24, 2019 oral argument (UNOPPOSED) filed by Amanda McAdams, Randy Moore, George "Sonny" Perdue. Responses due by 12/26/2018. Replies due by 1/2/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Turner, Rickey) (Filed on 12/11/2018)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER re Dkt. No. 23 . The Court appreciates the parties' scheduling cooperation. The dates and page limits are approved. The hearing is set for January 24, 2019, at 10:00 a.m. Signed by Judge James Donato on 12/6/2018. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2018)
December 6, 2018 Filing 28 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for Revised Briefing Schedule filed by Vicki Christiansen, Amanda McAdams, Randy Moore, George "Sonny" Perdue. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Walker, Davene) (Filed on 12/6/2018)
December 4, 2018 Filing 27 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James Donato: Telephonic Scheduling Hearing held on 12/4/2018. (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/4/2018)
December 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER by Judge James Donato granting #7 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Katherine A. Meyer. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2018)
December 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER by Judge James Donato granting #5 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to William Eubanks, II. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2018)
November 30, 2018 Filing 24 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by American Wild Horse Campaign, Animal Legal Defense Fund, Carla Bowers of Complaint and Summons on all Defendants, the U.S. Attorney General, and the U.S. Attorney for the Northern District of California (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Confirmation Receipts)(Eubanks, William) (Filed on 11/30/2018)
November 30, 2018 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Telephone Conference set for 12/4/2018 11:00 AM before Judge James Donato. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2018)
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER. The Court sets a telephonic hearing with the parties in Animal Legal Defense Fund v. Christiansen, 18-6410, and Front Range Equine Rescue v. Christiansen, 18-6531, for December 4, 2018, at 11:00 AM PST. The parties should be prepared to discuss the proposed schedule in Dkt. No. 19 in 18-6410 and Dkt. No. 17 in 18-6531. The parties are directed to contact CourtCall at 866-582-6878 by no later than 24 hours in advance of the call to schedule their appearances. Signed by Judge James Donato on 11/30/2018. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2018)
November 27, 2018 Filing 22 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER RE AUTHORIZATION TO FILE AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF filed by Modoc County, Modoc County Farm Bureau, Wilson Ranches, Green Valley Corporation, Devils' Garden Preservation Group, California Farm Bureau, California Cattlemen's Association, Public Lands Council. (Carr, Christopher) (Filed on 11/27/2018)
November 26, 2018 Filing 21 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by American Wild Horse Campaign, Animal Legal Defense Fund, Carla Bowers. Motion Hearing set for 1/3/2019 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 12/10/2018. Replies due by 12/17/2018. (Attachments: #1 List of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O, #17 Exhibit P, #18 Exhibit Q, #19 Exhibit R, #20 Exhibit S, #21 Proposed Order)(Eubanks, William) (Filed on 11/26/2018)
November 16, 2018 Filing 20 NOTICE by Vicki Christiansen, Amanda McAdams, Randy Moore, George "Sonny" Perdue of Lodging Preliminary Administrative Record (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Certification)(Walker, Davene) (Filed on 11/16/2018)
November 16, 2018 Filing 19 Joint ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Preliminary Injunction Briefing Schedule and Enlargement of Page Limits , Stipulated by all Parties, filed by Vicki Christiansen, Amanda McAdams, Randy Moore, George "Sonny" Perdue. Responses due by 11/20/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Walker, Davene) (Filed on 11/16/2018)
November 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER by Judge James Donato granting #13 Motion to Relate Case; terminating #13 Administrative Motion to relate cases. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2018)
November 2, 2018 Filing 17 Statement of Non-Opposition re #13 MOTION to Relate Case ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Consider Relating This Case and Front Range Equine Rescue v. Christiansen, No. 3:18-cv-06531-JCS filed byVicki Christiansen, Amanda McAdams, Randy Moore, George "Sonny" Perdue. (Related document(s) #13 ) (Walker, Davene) (Filed on 11/2/2018)
November 2, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Davene Dashawn Walker (Walker, Davene) (Filed on 11/2/2018)
November 2, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Rickey Doyle Turner, Jr (Turner, Rickey) (Filed on 11/2/2018)
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/31/2019 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 1/24/2019.Signed by Judge James Donato on 11/1/18. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2018)
October 29, 2018 Filing 13 MOTION to Relate Case , ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Consider Relating This Case and Front Range Equine Rescue v. Christiansen, No. 3:18-cv-06531-JCS filed by American Wild Horse Campaign, Animal Legal Defense Fund, Carla Bowers. Responses due by 11/2/2018. (Eubanks, William) (Filed on 10/29/2018)
October 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge James Donato for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Executive Committee on 10/24/2018. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2018)
October 23, 2018 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2018)
October 23, 2018 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Vicki Christiansen, Amanda McAdams, Randy Moore, George "Sonny" Perdue, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2018)
October 22, 2018 Filing 9 DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by American Wild Horse Campaign, Animal Legal Defense Fund, Carla Bowers. (Berry, Christopher) (Filed on 10/22/2018) Modified on 10/23/2018 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
October 22, 2018 Filing 8 Proposed Summons. (Berry, Christopher) (Filed on 10/22/2018)
October 22, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice on Behalf of Plaintiffs ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12780710.) filed by American Wild Horse Campaign, Animal Legal Defense Fund, Carla Bowers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Meyer, Katherine) (Filed on 10/22/2018)
October 22, 2018 Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 1/15/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/22/2019 01:30 PM. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2018)
October 22, 2018 #Electronic filing error. Only ONE summons will be issued. Please list all defendants on ONE summons and re-file in its entirety Re: #2 Proposed Summons filed by Carla Bowers, American Wild Horse Campaign, Animal Legal Defense Fund (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2018)
October 22, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for William S. Eubanks II ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12780348.) filed by American Wild Horse Campaign, Animal Legal Defense Fund, Carla Bowers. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing (CO Bar))(Eubanks, William) (Filed on 10/22/2018)
October 19, 2018 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 11/2/2018. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2018)
October 19, 2018 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by American Wild Horse Campaign, Animal Legal Defense Fund, Carla Bowers (Berry, Christopher) (Filed on 10/19/2018)
October 19, 2018 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Berry, Christopher) (Filed on 10/19/2018)
October 19, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-12778752.). Filed byAnimal Legal Defense Fund, Carla Bowers, American Wild Horse Campaign. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Berry, Christopher) (Filed on 10/19/2018)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Animal Legal Defense Fund et al v. Christiansen et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vicki Christiansen
Represented By: Davene Dashawn Walker
Represented By: Rickey Doyle Turner, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy Moore
Represented By: Davene Dashawn Walker
Represented By: Rickey Doyle Turner, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amanda McAdams
Represented By: Davene Dashawn Walker
Represented By: Rickey Doyle Turner, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George "Sonny" Perdue
Represented By: Davene Dashawn Walker
Represented By: Rickey Doyle Turner, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carla Bowers
Represented By: Christopher Andrew Berry
Represented By: William Stewart Eubanks, II
Represented By: Katherine A. Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Animal Legal Defense Fund
Represented By: Christopher Andrew Berry
Represented By: William Stewart Eubanks, II
Represented By: Katherine A. Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Wild Horse Campaign
Represented By: Christopher Andrew Berry
Represented By: William Stewart Eubanks, II
Represented By: Katherine A. Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Modoc County Farm Bureau
Represented By: Christopher J. Carr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Wilson Ranches
Represented By: Christopher J. Carr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Public Lands Council
Represented By: Christopher J. Carr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Green Valley Corporation
Represented By: Christopher J. Carr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Modoc County
Represented By: Christopher J. Carr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Devils' Garden Preservation Group
Represented By: Christopher J. Carr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: California Farm Bureau
Represented By: Christopher J. Carr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: California Cattlemen's Association
Represented By: Christopher J. Carr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?