Huang v. Nephos Inc.
Plaintiff: Xiaohua Huang
Defendant: Nephos Inc.
Case Number: 3:2018cv06654
Filed: November 1, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Referring Judge: Susan van Keulen
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge William Alsup for all further proceedings. Judge Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen no longer assigned to the case. (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/27/2018: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording) (cv, COURT STAFF). Modified text on 12/27/2018 (cv, COURT STAFF).
December 26, 2018 Filing 17 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned.

December 18, 2018 Filing 16 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Xiaohua Huang.. (Huang, Xiaohua) (Filed on 12/18/2018)
December 18, 2018 Filing 15 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 1/2/2019. (djmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2018)
December 17, 2018 Filing 14 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Nephos Inc... (Stroy, Brandon) (Filed on 12/17/2018)
December 7, 2018 Filing 13 Response byXiaohua Huang. (Huang, Xiaohua) (Filed on 12/7/2018)
December 4, 2018 #Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101]Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re: #11 Answer to Removal Complaint, Answer to Third Part y Complaint, Response, Affidavit in Opposition filed by Xiaohua Huang (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2018)
December 4, 2018 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs/Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 12/18/2018. (djmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2018)
December 4, 2018 Filing 11 OBJECTION to #9 Disclosure Statement by Xiaohua Huang. (Huang, Xiaohua) (Filed on 12/4/2018) Modified on 12/4/2018 (cv, COURT STAFF).
December 4, 2018 Filing 10 ANSWER TO COUNTERCLAIM #8 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim byXiaohua Huang. (Huang, Xiaohua) (Filed on 12/4/2018)
November 21, 2018 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Nephos Inc. identifying Corporate Parent MediaTek, Inc., Corporate Parent Gaintech Co. Ltd., Corporate Parent MediaTek Investment Singapore Pte. Ltd. for Nephos Inc.. (Stroy, Brandon) (Filed on 11/21/2018)
November 21, 2018 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Xiaohua Huang byNephos Inc.. (Stroy, Brandon) (Filed on 11/21/2018)
November 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING #2 MOTION FOR PERMISSION FOR ELECTRONIC CASE FILING. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen on 11/5/2018. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2018)
November 2, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Xiaohua Huang. Nephos Inc. served on 11/2/2018, answer due 11/23/2018. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2018)
November 1, 2018 Filing 5 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding Patent (cc: form mailed to register). (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2018)
November 1, 2018 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 1/29/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/5/2019 09:30 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 6, 4th Floor. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2018)
November 1, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Nephos Inc.. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2018)
November 1, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Permission for Electronic Case Filing filed by Xiaohua Huang. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2018)
November 1, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Nephos Inc. (Filing fee $ 400.). Filed byXiaohua Huang. Consent/Declination due by 11/15/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2018) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/1/2018: #3 receipt) (cv, COURT STAFF). Modified on 11/1/2018 (cv, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Huang v. Nephos Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Xiaohua Huang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nephos Inc.
Represented By: Brandon H. Stroy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?