Valperga v. Bank of America, N.A.

Plaintiff: Kristen Valperga
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Case Number: 3:2018cv06724
Filed: November 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Banks and Banking
Cause of Action: 28:1330
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2019 Filing 11 STIPULATION Regarding Briefing Schedule filed by Kristen Valperga. (Zavareei, Hassan) (Filed on 1/3/2019)
January 3, 2019 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Kristen Valperga. Service waived by Bank of America, N.A. waiver sent on 12/14/2018, answer due 2/12/2019. (Zavareei, Hassan) (Filed on 1/3/2019)
November 7, 2018 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE RE REASSIGNED CASE: You are notified that the Court has scheduled an Initial Case Management Conference before Judge Richard Seeborg upon reassignment. For a copy of Judge Seeborg's Standing Order and other information, please refer to the Court's website at www.cand.uscourts.gov. Parties or counsel may appear personally at 10:00 a.m. or file a request to appear by telephone at 11:00 am. If any party files such a request to appear by telephone, the Case Management Conference shall be moved to 11:00 am to be held telephonically. All parties shall appear telephonically and must contact Court Conference at 866/582-6878 at least one week prior to the Conference.Case Management Statement due by 1/31/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/7/2019 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 03, 17th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2018)
November 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER, Case reassigned to Judge Richard Seeborg. Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Executive Committee on 11/7/18. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2018)
November 7, 2018 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Bank of America, N.A. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2018)
November 6, 2018 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now reassign this case to a District Judge because a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2018)
November 6, 2018 Filing 5 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Kristen Valperga.. (Zavareei, Hassan) (Filed on 11/6/2018)
November 6, 2018 Filing 4 Proposed Summons. (Zavareei, Hassan) (Filed on 11/6/2018)
November 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 1/29/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/5/2019 10:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 11/05/18. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2018)
November 5, 2018 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 11/19/2018. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2018)
November 5, 2018 Filing 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT FOR : 1. Breach of Contract and Breach of the Covenant of Good Faith and Fair Dealing; 2. Violation of California's Unfair Competition Law, Cal.Civ.Code 17200 et seq., and 3. unjust Enrichment; JURY TRIAL DEMANDED; (NO PROCESS); against Bank of America, N.A. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-12823724.). Filed by Kristen Valperga. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Zavareei, Hassan) (Filed on 11/5/2018) Modified on 11/6/2018 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Valperga v. Bank of America, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristen Valperga
Represented By: Hassan Ali Zavareei
Represented By: Annick Marie Persinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?