Rosenblum v. U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee for CSFB Mortgage Backed Pass-through Certificates, Series 2004-7 et al
Plaintiff: Frank Rosenblum
Defendant: U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee for CSFB Mortgage Backed Pass-through Certificates, Series 2004-7, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. and U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee, Successor in Interest to Wachovia Bank, N.A., for MALT 2004-1
Case Number: 3:2018cv06725
Filed: November 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Joseph C Spero
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Lis Pendens by James H. Seymour (Seymour, James) (Filed on 12/13/2018)
December 12, 2018 Filing 9 Proposed Summons. (Seymour, James) (Filed on 12/12/2018)
December 11, 2018 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT To Cancel Instruments and Quiet Title to Real Property against All Defendants. Filed byFrank Rosenblum. (Seymour, James) (Filed on 12/11/2018)
December 3, 2018 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Frank Rosenblum.. (Seymour, James) (Filed on 12/3/2018)
November 26, 2018 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (Party/parties were also notified via telephone or email.) Consent/Declination due by 12/10/2018. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2018)
November 6, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee for CSFB Mortgage Backed Pass-through Certificates, Series 2004-7, U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee, Successor in Interest to Wachovia Bank, N.A., for MALT 2004-1. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2018)
November 6, 2018 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 2/1/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/8/2019 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2018)
November 6, 2018 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 11/20/2018. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2018)
November 5, 2018 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Seymour, James) (Filed on 11/5/2018)
November 5, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT to Cancel Instrument and Quiet Title to Real Property against JPMorgan Bank Chase Bank, N.A., U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee for CSFB Mortgage Backed Pass-through Certificates, Series 2004-7, U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee, Successor in Interest to Wachovia Bank, N.A., for MALT 2004-1 (Filing fee $ 400.00, receipt number 0971-12823961.). Filed by Frank Rosenblum. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Seymour, James) (Filed on 11/5/2018) Modified on 11/6/2018 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rosenblum v. U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee for CSFB Mortgage Backed Pass-through Certificates, Series 2004-7 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee for CSFB Mortgage Backed Pass-through Certificates, Series 2004-7
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee, Successor in Interest to Wachovia Bank, N.A., for MALT 2004-1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Rosenblum
Represented By: James H. Seymour
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?