Mitsui O.S.K. Lines, Ltd. v. Kesco Container Line, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Mitsui O.S.K. Lines, Ltd.
Defendant: Washington International Insurance Company, Roanoke Insurance Group, Inc., American Alternative Insurance Corporation and Kesco Container Line, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2018cv06780
Filed: November 8, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth D Laporte
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 28:1352
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2018 Filing 20 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Mitsui O.S.K. Lines, Ltd... (Chang, Melody) (Filed on 11/20/2018)
November 13, 2018 Filing 19 Civil Cover Sheet by Mitsui O.S.K. Lines, Ltd. . (Chang, Melody) (Filed on 11/13/2018)
November 12, 2018 Filing 18 Erroneous Entry--Please Ignore Proposed Summons. (Chang, Melody) (Filed on 11/12/2018) Modified on 11/13/2018 (msrS, COURT STAFF).
November 12, 2018 Filing 17 Erroneous Entry--Please Ignore Proposed Summons. (Chang, Melody) (Filed on 11/12/2018) Modified on 11/13/2018 (msrS, COURT STAFF).
November 12, 2018 Filing 16 Erroneous Entry--Please Ignore Proposed Summons. (Chang, Melody) (Filed on 11/12/2018) Modified on 11/13/2018 (msrS, COURT STAFF).
November 12, 2018 Filing 15 Erroneous Entry--Please Ignore Proposed Summons. (Chang, Melody) (Filed on 11/12/2018) Modified on 11/13/2018 (msrS, COURT STAFF).
November 12, 2018 Filing 14 Erroneous Entry--Please Ignore COMPLAINT against American Alternative Insurance Corporation, Kesco Container Line, Inc., Roanoke Insurance Group, Inc., Washington International Insurance Company. Filed byMitsui O.S.K. Lines, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Chang, Melody) (Filed on 11/12/2018) Modified on 11/13/2018 (msrS, COURT STAFF).
November 9, 2018 Filing 13 Summons Issued as to Roanoke Insurance Group, Inc. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2018)
November 9, 2018 Filing 12 Summons Issued as to American Alternative Insurance Corporation. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2018)
November 9, 2018 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to Washington International Insurance Company. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2018)
November 9, 2018 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Kesco Container Line, Inc. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2018)
November 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 2/5/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/12/2019 10:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 11/8/18. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2018)
November 8, 2018 #Electronic filing error. This filing will not be processed by the clerks office.Please re-file in its entirety. Re: #6 Civil Cover Sheet filed by Mitsui O.S.K. Lines, Ltd. M ust Select Nature of Suit by placing an X next to the appropriate description (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2018)
November 8, 2018 Filing 8 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 11/23/2018. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2018)
November 8, 2018 Filing 7 Certificate of Interested Entities by Mitsui O.S.K. Lines, Ltd. identifying Corporate Parent MOL (America) Inc. for Mitsui O.S.K. Lines, Ltd.. (Chang, Melody) (Filed on 11/8/2018)
November 8, 2018 Filing 6 ERRONEOUSLY E-FILED: PLEASE SEE ERROR MESSAGE DATED 11/08/18 Civil Cover Sheet by Mitsui O.S.K. Lines, Ltd. . (Chang, Melody) (Filed on 11/8/2018) Modified on 11/9/2018 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
November 8, 2018 Filing 5 Proposed Summons. (Chang, Melody) (Filed on 11/8/2018)
November 8, 2018 Filing 4 Proposed Summons. (Chang, Melody) (Filed on 11/8/2018)
November 8, 2018 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. (Chang, Melody) (Filed on 11/8/2018)
November 8, 2018 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Chang, Melody) (Filed on 11/8/2018)
November 8, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Recovery on Bond against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-12832476.). Filed byMitsui O.S.K. Lines, Ltd.. (Chang, Melody) (Filed on 11/8/2018)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mitsui O.S.K. Lines, Ltd. v. Kesco Container Line, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Washington International Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roanoke Insurance Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Alternative Insurance Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kesco Container Line, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mitsui O.S.K. Lines, Ltd.
Represented By: Melody Catherine Chang
Represented By: Erich Paul Wise
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?