Johnson v. Live Oak Properties, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Scott Johnson
Defendant: P & E Supplies Inc. and Live Oak Properties, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2018cv06798
Filed: November 9, 2018
Court: California Northern District Court
0 Judge: Charles R Breyer
1 Judge: Nathanael M Cousins
Nature of Suit: American with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
December 17, 2018 15 Certificate of Interested Entities by Live Oak Properties, Inc. (Morin, Richard) (Filed on 12/17/2018)
December 17, 2018 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand; by Live Oak Properties, Inc. (Morin, Richard) (Filed on 12/17/2018) Modified on 12/18/2018 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
December 17, 2018 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard J Morin (Morin, Richard) (Filed on 12/17/2018)
December 4, 2018 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Scott Johnson. P & E Supplies Inc. served on 11/28/2018, answer due 12/19/2018. (Carson, Chris) (Filed on 12/4/2018)
November 15, 2018 11 Featured Case ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: A Joint Case Management Statement due by 3/22/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/29/2019 at 8:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 06, 17th Floor. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 11/15/2018. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2018)
November 14, 2018 10 Case REASSIGNED to Judge Charles R. Breyer. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins Judge no longer assigned to the case. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording) (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2018)
November 14, 2018 9 This case will be randomly reassigned to a District Judge outside the San Jose Division pursuant to the Caseload Rebalancing Pilot Program approved by the Court effective March 1, 2018. For information, visit our web page at #http://cand.uscourts.gov/news/225. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2018)
November 14, 2018 8 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2018)
November 14, 2018 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Scott Johnson.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Carson, Chris) (Filed on 11/14/2018)
November 9, 2018 6 Summons Issued as to Live Oak Properties, Inc., P & E Supplies Inc.. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2018)
November 9, 2018 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order for Cases Asserting Denial of Right of Access under Americans with Disabilities Act. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2018)
November 9, 2018 4 Case assigned to Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 11/23/2018. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2018)
November 9, 2018 3 Proposed Summons. (Carson, Chris) (Filed on 11/9/2018)
November 9, 2018 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Scott Johnson re #1 Complaint, (Carson, Chris) (Filed on 11/9/2018)
November 9, 2018 1 COMPLAINT For Damages And Injunctive Relief For Violations Of: Americans With Disabilities Act; Unruh Civil Rights Act against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-12835087.). Filed byScott Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Carson, Chris) (Filed on 11/9/2018)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Live Oak Properties, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P & E Supplies Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Live Oak Properties, Inc.
Represented By: Richard J Morin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Johnson
Represented By: Dennis Jay Price, II
Represented By: Chris Carson
Represented By: Amanda Lockhart Seabock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?