Gonzales v. Gonzales

Plaintiff: Shelley Gonzales
Defendant: Roger Gonzales
Case Number: 3:2018cv06902
Filed: November 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 21, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2018 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Shelley Gonzales.. (Carvajal, Johanna) (Filed on 11/21/2018)
November 15, 2018 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Roger Gonzales. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2018)
November 15, 2018 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 2/7/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/14/2019 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2018)
November 15, 2018 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 11/29/2018. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2018)
November 14, 2018 Filing 3 Civil Cover Sheet by Shelley Gonzales . (Carvajal, Johanna) (Filed on 11/14/2018)
November 14, 2018 #Electronic filing error. No Civil cover sheet filed. Please refer to Civil Local Rules 3-2(a) re civil cover sheet requirement. This filing will not be processed by the clerks of fice until the civil cover sheet is filed. Re: #1 Complaint filed by Shelley Gonzales (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2018)
November 14, 2018 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Carvajal, Johanna) (Filed on 11/14/2018)
November 14, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF against Roger Gonzales (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-12846543). Filed by Shelley Gonzales. (Carvajal, Johanna) (Filed on 11/14/2018) Modified on 11/15/2018 (slhS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gonzales v. Gonzales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roger Gonzales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shelley Gonzales
Represented By: Johanna Carvajal
Represented By: David Kraft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?