Copus et al v. Hartford Casualty Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Virgil Copus and Adele Copus
Defendant: Hartford Casualty Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2018cv06915
Filed: November 15, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: James Donato
Referring Judge: Robert M Illman
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER. The motions to dismiss and for judgment on the pleadings, Dkt. Nos. 11, 15, will be heard on the same day as the case management conference, on February 21, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. Signed by Judge James Donato on 12/31/2018. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/31/2018)
December 11, 2018 Filing 16 REPLY (re #11 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 12(b)(6) ) and Opposition to Plaintiffs' Cross-Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings filed byHartford Casualty Insurance Company. (Downs, Andrew) (Filed on 12/11/2018)
November 30, 2018 Filing 15 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #11 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 12(b)(6) ) filed byAdele Copus, Virgil Copus. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(O'Connor, Timothy) (Filed on 11/30/2018)
November 21, 2018 Filing 14 CLERK'S NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.), Set/Reset Deadlines as to #11 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 12(b)(6). Motion Hearing set for 1/3/2019 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2018)
November 21, 2018 Filing 13 CLERK'S NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.), Set/Reset Deadlines as to #11 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 12(b)(6). Motion Hearing set for 1/10/2019 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2018)
November 20, 2018 Filing 12 Request for Judicial Notice re #11 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 12(b)(6) filed byHartford Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) #11 ) (Downs, Andrew) (Filed on 11/20/2018)
November 20, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 12(b)(6) filed by Hartford Casualty Insurance Company. Motion Hearing set for 12/27/2018 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 12/4/2018. Replies due by 12/11/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Downs, Andrew) (Filed on 11/20/2018)
November 19, 2018 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Hartford Casualty Insurance Company OF JUDGE DONATO'S STANDING ORDERS (Downs, Andrew) (Filed on 11/19/2018)
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/21/2019 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 2/14/2019. Signed by Judge James Donato on 11/19/18. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2018)
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER, Case reassigned to Judge James Donato. Magistrate Judge Robert M. Illman no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Executive Committee on 11/16/18. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2018)
November 16, 2018 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (glmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2018)
November 15, 2018 Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 2/12/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/19/2019 02:00 PM in McKinleyville. (msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2018)
November 15, 2018 Filing 5 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Hartford Casualty Insurance Company.. (Downs, Andrew) (Filed on 11/15/2018)
November 15, 2018 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Hartford Casualty Insurance Company re #1 Notice of Removal, #2 Certificate of Interested Entities (Downs, Andrew) (Filed on 11/15/2018)
November 15, 2018 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Robert M. Illman. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 11/29/2018. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2018)
November 15, 2018 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Hartford Casualty Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc. for Hartford Casualty Insurance Company. (Downs, Andrew) (Filed on 11/15/2018)
November 15, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Lake County Superior Court. Their case number is CV488855. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-12848458). Filed byHartford Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (State Court Complaint), #2 Exhibit B (State Court Summons), #3 Exhibit C (Other State Court Papers), #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Downs, Andrew) (Filed on 11/15/2018)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Copus et al v. Hartford Casualty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Andrew B. Downs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Virgil Copus
Represented By: Timothy John O'Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adele Copus
Represented By: Timothy John O'Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?