Gevorkyan v. Bitmain Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Gor Gevorkyan
Defendant: Bitmain Technologies Ltd. and Bitmain Inc.
Case Number: 3:2018cv07004
Filed: November 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: James Donato
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 16, 2019 Filing 17 Case reassigned to Judge James Donato. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Virginia k DeMarchi no longer assigned to case. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording) (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2019)
January 16, 2019 Filing 16 This case will be randomly reassigned to a District Judge outside the San Jose Division pursuant to the Caseload Rebalancing Pilot Program approved by the Court effective March 1, 2018. For information, visit our web page at #http://cand.uscourts.gov/news/225. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2019)
January 16, 2019 Filing 15 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (pmcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2019)
January 16, 2019 Filing 14 Certificate of Interested Entities by Bitmain Inc. identifying Corporate Parent BitMain Technologies Holding Company for Bitmain Inc.. (Pao, William) (Filed on 1/16/2019)
January 16, 2019 Filing 13 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Bitmain Inc... (Pao, William) (Filed on 1/16/2019)
January 16, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by William Ka Hing Pao on behalf of Defendant Bitmain, Inc. (Pao, William) (Filed on 1/16/2019)
January 16, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Xin-Yi Zhou on behalf of Defendant Bitmain, Inc. (Zhou, Xin-Yi) (Filed on 1/16/2019)
January 16, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Carlos Manuel Lazatin on behalf of Defendant Bitmain, Inc. (Lazatin, Carlos) (Filed on 1/16/2019)
January 4, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Gor Gevorkyan. Service waived by Bitmain Inc. waiver sent on 12/19/2018, answer due 2/19/2019. (Rose, Adam) (Filed on 1/4/2019)
December 3, 2018 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Bitmain Inc., Bitmain Technologies Ltd.. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2018)
November 30, 2018 Filing 7 Proposed Summons. (Rose, Adam) (Filed on 11/30/2018)
November 30, 2018 #Electronic filing error. Incomplete PDF attached. [err201] You must include the name(s) of the defendant(s) and their addresses on the summons form. Please complete the p roposed summons form and re-file in its entirety. Re: #5 Proposed Summons filed by Gor Gevorkyan (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2018)
November 30, 2018 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Gor Gevorkyan.. (Rose, Adam) (Filed on 11/30/2018)
November 29, 2018 Filing 5 ***INCOMPLETE PDF SUBMITTED*** Proposed Summons. (Rose, Adam) (Filed on 11/29/2018) Modified on 12/3/2018 (dhmS, COURT STAFF).
November 20, 2018 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 2/12/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/19/2019 01:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 2, 5th Floor. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2018)
November 19, 2018 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 12/3/2018. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2018)
November 19, 2018 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet by Gor Gevorkyan . (Karapetyan, Karo) (Filed on 11/19/2018)
November 19, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bitmain Inc., Bitmain Technologies Ltd. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-12860244.). Filed byGor Gevorkyan. (Karapetyan, Karo) (Filed on 11/19/2018)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gevorkyan v. Bitmain Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bitmain Technologies Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bitmain Inc.
Represented By: William Ka Hing Pao
Represented By: Xin-Yi Zhou
Represented By: Carlos Manuel Lazatin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gor Gevorkyan
Represented By: Karo Gary Karapetyan
Represented By: Adam Morris Rose
Represented By: Robert Lorne Starr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?