Moore v. United States of America

Plaintiff: Kory L. Moore
Defendant: United States District Court of Northern California and United States of America
Case Number: 3:2018cv07055
Filed: November 16, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Sallie Kim
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 2, 2019 Filing 8 Acknowledgment of Receipt from United States Marshals Service of summons and complaint. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/2/2019)
December 27, 2018 service packet delivered to the United States Marshals Service Post Box in the Clerk's Office mailroom. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/27/2018)
December 27, 2018 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Defendant United States of America. (Attachments: #(1) USM Form 285) (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/27/2018)
December 7, 2018 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge filed by Kory L. Moore. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2018)
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER CONSTRUING MOTION AS AMENDED COMPLAINT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim on 11/30/2018. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2018)
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Sallie kim granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2018)
November 16, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss Forfeiture Proceeding filed by Kory L. Moore. Responses due by 11/30/2018. Replies due by 12/7/2018. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2018) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/26/2018: #1 Exhibit) (tnS, COURT STAFF).
November 16, 2018 Filing 2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Kory L. Moore. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2018)
November 16, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (no process) against United States District Court of Northern California, (Filing Fee: Ifpp entered on 11/16/2018). Filed by Kory L. Moore. Consent/Declination due by 11/30/2018. (Attachments: #(1) Civil Cover Sheet, #(2) Envelope) (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2018) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/26/2018: #3 Exhibits) (tnS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moore v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States District Court of Northern California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kory L. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?