MVC Enterprises, Inc. v. American Integrated Services, Inc., et al.
Plaintiff: MVC Enterprises, Inc.
Defendant: Environmental Chemical Corporation and American Integrated Services, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2018cv07145
Filed: November 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2019 Filing 11 Certificate of Interested Entities by American Integrated Services, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Environmental Chemical Corproration, Corporate Parent MCV ENTERPRISES INC, Corporate Parent American Integrated Services for American Integrated Services, Inc.. [AIS' Certificate] (McCarthy, Colin) (Filed on 1/14/2019)
January 14, 2019 Filing 10 Certificate of Interested Entities by American Integrated Services, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent MVC Enterprises, Inc., Corporate Parent American Integrated Services, Inc., Corporate Parent Environmental Chemical Corproration for American Integrated Services, Inc.. [ECC's Certificate] (McCarthy, Colin) (Filed on 1/14/2019)
January 14, 2019 Filing 9 Certificate of Interested Entities by American Integrated Services, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Environmental Chemical Corporation, Corporate Parent Environmental Chemical Corproration, Corporate Parent MVC Enterprise, Inc. for American Integrated Services, Inc.. (McCarthy, Colin) (Filed on 1/14/2019)
January 11, 2019 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 1/25/2019. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2019)
January 11, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER OF ECC ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND , First COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by Environmental Chemical Corporation, American Integrated Services, Inc. (Attachments: #1 ANSWER BY AIS, #2 COUNTER-CLAIM)(McCarthy, Colin) (Filed on 1/11/2019) Modified on 1/14/2019 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
December 10, 2018 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by MVC Enterprises, Inc... (Lynch, Robert) (Filed on 12/10/2018)
November 27, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to American Integrated Services, Inc., Environmental Chemical Corporation. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/27/2018)
November 27, 2018 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 2/21/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/28/2019 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/27/2018)
November 26, 2018 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 12/10/2018. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2018)
November 26, 2018 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Lynch, Robert) (Filed on 11/26/2018)
November 26, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against American Integrated Services, Inc., Environmental Chemical Corporation ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-12872299.). Filed byMVC Enterprises, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lynch, Robert) (Filed on 11/26/2018)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MVC Enterprises, Inc. v. American Integrated Services, Inc., et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MVC Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By: Robert James Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Environmental Chemical Corporation
Represented By: Colin Kendall McCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Integrated Services, Inc.
Represented By: Colin Kendall McCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?