Eden Environmental Citizen's Group LLC v. Pleasanton Garbage Service et al

Plaintiff: Eden Environmental Citizen's Group LLC
Defendant: Eric Lauritsen, Pleasanton Garbage Service and Robert J Molinaro
Case Number: 3:2018cv07169
Filed: November 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Referring Judge: Kandis A Westmore
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 33:1365
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 30, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2018 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Eden Environmental Citizen's Group LLC. Service waived by All Defendants. (Herb, Hans) (Filed on 11/30/2018)
November 29, 2018 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE SCHEDULING CMC ON REASSIGNMENT: Case Management Statement due by 2/28/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/7/2019 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2018)
November 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge William Alsup for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Judge Executive Committee on 11/29/2018. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2018)
November 29, 2018 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2018)
November 28, 2018 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Eden Environmental Citizen's Group LLC.. (Herb, Hans) (Filed on 11/28/2018)
November 28, 2018 Filing 7 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 2/19/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/26/2019 01:30 PM. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2018)
November 28, 2018 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Eric Lauritsen, Robert J Molinaro, Pleasanton Garbage Service. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2018)
November 27, 2018 Filing 5 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 12/11/2018. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/27/2018)
November 27, 2018 Filing 4 Proposed Summons. (Herb, Hans) (Filed on 11/27/2018)
November 27, 2018 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. (Herb, Hans) (Filed on 11/27/2018)
November 27, 2018 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Herb, Hans) (Filed on 11/27/2018)
November 27, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Injunctive and Declaratory Relief, Civil Penalties and Remediation against All Defendants with jury demand ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-12877147.). Filed by Eden Environmental Citizen's Group LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A-Notice of Intent to Sue, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Herb, Hans) (Filed on 11/27/2018) Modified on 11/28/2018 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eden Environmental Citizen's Group LLC v. Pleasanton Garbage Service et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Lauritsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pleasanton Garbage Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert J Molinaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eden Environmental Citizen's Group LLC
Represented By: Hans William Herb
Represented By: Craig Alfred Brandt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?