Inter-Local Pension Fund GCC/IBT v. Tesla, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Inter-Local Pension Fund GCC/IBT
Defendant: Goldman Sachs & Co. LLC, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Inc., Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc., Barclays Capital, Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co, LLC, Citigroup Global Markets, Inc., RBC Capital Markets, LLC, Elon Musk, Tesla, Inc., Morgan Stanley & Company, LLC and Goldman Sachs & Company, LLC
Case Number: 3:2018cv07325
Filed: December 4, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Charles R Breyer
Referring Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #32 Motion to Dismiss Notice Of Motion And Motion To Dismiss Amended Complaint; Memorandum Of Point And Authorities In Support Thereof. Opposition due by 9/24/2019. Replies due by 11/5/2019. Motion Hearing set for 12/13/2019 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 06, 17th Floor before Judge Charles R. Breyer. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2019)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 41 STIPULATION AND ORDER ADJUSTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE by Judge Charles R. Breyer: Granting #40 Stipulation. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2019)
August 22, 2019 Filing 40 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Adjusting Briefing Schedule filed by Inter-Local Pension Fund GCC/IBT. (Oddo, Stephen) (Filed on 8/22/2019)
August 7, 2019 Filing 39 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Bank of America Corporation, Other Affiliate NB Holdings Corporation, Other Affiliate Berkshire Hathaway Inc. for Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Inc.. Amended Rule 7.1 Disclosures of Defendant Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated (Laguardia, Daniel) (Filed on 8/7/2019)
August 7, 2019 Filing 38 Certificate of Interested Entities by Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Bank of America Corporation, Other Affiliate NB Holdings Corporation, Other Affiliate Berkshire Hathaway Inc. for Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Inc.. Amended Civil Local rule 3-15 Certification of Defendant Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated (Laguardia, Daniel) (Filed on 8/7/2019)
July 2, 2019 Filing 37 Joinder re #32 MOTION to Dismiss Notice Of Motion And Motion To Dismiss Amended Complaint; Memorandum Of Point And Authorities In Support Thereof by Barclays Capital, Inc., Citigroup Global Markets, Inc., Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc., Goldman Sachs & Company, LLC, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Inc., Morgan Stanley & Company, LLC, RBC Capital Markets, LLC. (Laguardia, Daniel) (Filed on 7/2/2019)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE, Daniel C. Lewis by Judge Charles R. Breyer: Granting #31 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2019)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE, Adam S. Hakki by Judge Charles R. Breyer: Granting #30 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2019)
July 2, 2019 Filing 34 Declaration of Jennifer C. Bretan in Support of #32 MOTION to Dismiss Notice Of Motion And Motion To Dismiss Amended Complaint; Memorandum Of Point And Authorities In Support Thereof and Exhibits A-E filed byElon Musk, Tesla, Inc.. (Related document(s) #32 ) (Bretan, Jennifer) (Filed on 7/2/2019)
July 2, 2019 Filing 33 Request for Judicial Notice re #32 MOTION to Dismiss Notice Of Motion And Motion To Dismiss Amended Complaint; Memorandum Of Point And Authorities In Support Thereof - Request For Judicial Notice And Incorporation By Reference In Support Of Motion To Dismiss Amended Complaint filed byElon Musk, Tesla, Inc.. (Related document(s) #32 ) (Bretan, Jennifer) (Filed on 7/2/2019)
July 2, 2019 Filing 32 MOTION to Dismiss Notice Of Motion And Motion To Dismiss Amended Complaint; Memorandum Of Point And Authorities In Support Thereof filed by Elon Musk, Tesla, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 11/8/2019 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 06, 17th Floor before Judge Charles R. Breyer. Responses due by 9/2/2019. Replies due by 10/14/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kristy, Dean) (Filed on 7/2/2019)
July 1, 2019 Filing 31 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13483038.) filed by Barclays Capital, Inc., Citigroup Global Markets, Inc., Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc., Goldman Sachs & Company, LLC, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Inc., Morgan Stanley & Company, LLC, RBC Capital Markets, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Lewis, Daniel) (Filed on 7/1/2019)
July 1, 2019 Filing 30 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 26IH5I0E.) Filing fee previously paid on 07/01/2019 filed by Barclays Capital, Inc., Citigroup Global Markets, Inc., Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc., Goldman Sachs & Company, LLC, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Inc., Morgan Stanley & Company, LLC, RBC Capital Markets, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Hakki, Adam) (Filed on 7/1/2019)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 STIPULATION AND ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer: Granting #28 Stipulation. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2019)
June 17, 2019 Filing 28 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #27 Order on Stipulation Stipulation And [Proposed] Order Adjusting Schedule For Responding To Amended Complaint filed by Elon Musk, Tesla, Inc.. (Bretan, Jennifer) (Filed on 6/17/2019)
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 STIPULATION AND ORDER SETTING SCHEDULE FOR RESPONDING TO AMENDED COMPLAINT AND EXTENDING PAGE LIMITS by Judge Charles R. Breyer: Granting #26 Stipulation. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2019)
April 25, 2019 Filing 26 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Setting Schedule For Responding To Amended Complaint And Extending Page Limits filed by Elon Musk, Tesla, Inc.. (Bretan, Jennifer) (Filed on 4/25/2019)
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO PROVIDE UPDATE ON SCHEDULE FOR RESPONDING TO AMENDED COMPLAINT by Judge Charles R. Breyer: Granting #24 Stipulation. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2019)
April 3, 2019 Filing 24 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #22 Order on Stipulation Stipulation And [Proposed] Order Extending Time To Provide Update On Schedule For Responding To Amended Complaint filed by Elon Musk, Tesla, Inc.. (Bretan, Jennifer) (Filed on 4/3/2019)
March 4, 2019 Motion hearing vacated. Motion Hearing set for March 15, 2019 in C17-5828 has been rescheduled to March 22, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2019)
March 1, 2019 Filing 23 CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING MOTION TO DISMISS (Case Number 17-cv-5828 CRB, ECF No. 49) HEARING on March 8, 2019 before the Honorable Charles R. Breyer. Motion Hearing reset for 3/15/2019 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 06, 17th Floor before Judge Charles R. Breyer. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2019) Modified on 3/1/2019 (lsS, COURT STAFF).
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO AMENDED COMPLAINT AND CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND ASSOCIATED DEADLINES by Judge Charles R. Breyer: Granting #21 Stipulation. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2019)
February 4, 2019 Filing 21 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #20 Amended Complaint, #12 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines, Set/Reset Hearings Stipulation And [Proposed] Order Extending Time To Respond To Amended Complaint And Continuing Case Management Conference And Associated Deadlines filed by Elon Musk, Tesla, Inc.. (Bretan, Jennifer) (Filed on 2/4/2019)
January 22, 2019 Filing 20 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filed byInter-Local Pension Fund GCC/IBT. (Oddo, Stephen) (Filed on 1/22/2019)
January 22, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Change of Address by Stephen J. Oddo (Oddo, Stephen) (Filed on 1/22/2019)
December 14, 2018 Filing 18 Case reassigned to Judge Charles R. Breyer. Judge Richard Seeborg no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2018)
December 14, 2018 Set/Reset Hearing: Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/1/2019 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 06, 17th Floor. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2018)
December 14, 2018 Filing 17 CLERK'S NOTICE: Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/1/2019 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 06, 17th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2018)
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER RELATING CASE. The following cases are related: C17-5828 CRB and C18-7325 RS. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 12/14/2018. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2018)
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting #13 Stipulation setting briefing schedule for motion to remand and extending time for defendants to respond to complaint. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2018)
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER OF REFERRAL FOR RELATED CASE DETERMINATION. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 12/12/18. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2018)
December 10, 2018 Filing 13 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #1 Notice of Removal, Stipulation And [Proposed] Order Setting Briefing Schedule For Motion To Remand And Extending Time For Defendants To Respond To Complaint filed by Elon Musk, Tesla, Inc.. (Bretan, Jennifer) (Filed on 12/10/2018)
December 7, 2018 Filing 12 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras Case Management Statement due by 2/28/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/7/2019 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 03, 17th Floor. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording) (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2018)
December 5, 2018 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Barclays Capital, Inc., Citigroup Global Markets, Inc., Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc., Goldman Sachs & Co. LLC, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co, LLC, RBC Capital Markets, LLC re #10 Certificate of Interested Entities,,,,, #9 Certificate of Interested Entities,,,,, (Laguardia, Daniel) (Filed on 12/5/2018)
December 5, 2018 Filing 10 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Barclays Capital, Inc., Citigroup Global Markets, Inc., Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc., Goldman Sachs & Co. LLC, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co, LLC, RBC Capital Markets, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Bank of America Corporation, Other Affiliate NB Holdings Corporation for Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Inc.; Corporate Parent Barclays Bank PLC, Other Affiliate Barclays PLC, Other Affiliate Barclays Group US Inc. for Barclays Capital, Inc.; Corporate Parent The Goldman Sachs Group, Inc. for Goldman Sachs & Co. LLC; Corporate Parent Royal Bank of Canada for RBC Capital Markets, LLC; Corporate Parent Citigroup Inc., Other Affiliate Citigroup Financial Products Inc., Other Affiliate CitiGroup Global Markets Holdings Inc. for Citigroup Global Markets, Inc.; Corporate Parent Deutsche Bank A.G., Other Affiliate DB U.S. Financial Markets Holding Corporation, Other Affiliate DB USA Corporation for Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc.; Corporate Parent Morgan Stanley, Other Affiliate Mitsubishi UFJ Financial Group, Inc., Other Affiliate Morgan Stanley Capital Management, LLC, Other Affiliate Morgan Stanley Domestic Holdings, Inc. for Morgan Stanley & Co, LLC. (Laguardia, Daniel) (Filed on 12/5/2018)
December 5, 2018 Filing 9 Certificate of Interested Entities by Barclays Capital, Inc., Citigroup Global Markets, Inc., Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc., Goldman Sachs & Co. LLC, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co, LLC, RBC Capital Markets, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Bank of America Corporation, Other Affiliate NB Holdings Corporation for Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Inc.; Corporate Parent Barclays Bank PLC, Other Affiliate Barclays PLC, Other Affiliate Barclays Group US Inc. for Barclays Capital, Inc.; Corporate Parent The Goldman Sachs Group, Inc. for Goldman Sachs & Co. LLC; Corporate Parent Royal Bank of Canada for RBC Capital Markets, LLC; Corporate Parent Citigroup Inc., Other Affiliate Citigroup Financial Products Inc., Other Affiliate CitiGroup Global Markets Holdings Inc. for Citigroup Global Markets, Inc.; Corporate Parent Deutsche Bank A.G., Other Affiliate DB U.S. Financial Markets Holding Corporation, Other Affiliate DB USA Corporation for Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc.; Corporate Parent Morgan Stanley, Other Affiliate Mitsubishi UFJ Financial Group, Inc., Other Affiliate Morgan Stanley Capital Management, LLC, Other Affiliate Morgan Stanley Domestic Holdings, Inc. for Morgan Stanley & Co, LLC. (Laguardia, Daniel) (Filed on 12/5/2018)
December 4, 2018 Filing 8 Case assigned to Judge Richard Seeborg. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2018)
December 4, 2018 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Barclays Capital, Inc., Citigroup Global Markets, Inc., Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc., Goldman Sachs & Co. LLC, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co, LLC, RBC Capital Markets, LLC re #5 Notice (Other), #6 Notice of Appearance (Laguardia, Daniel) (Filed on 12/4/2018)
December 4, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Hector Rees Laguardia (Laguardia, Daniel) (Filed on 12/4/2018)
December 4, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Consent to Removal by Barclays Capital, Inc., Citigroup Global Markets, Inc., Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc., Goldman Sachs & Co. LLC, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Inc., Morgan Stanley & Co, LLC, RBC Capital Markets, LLC (Laguardia, Daniel) (Filed on 12/4/2018) Modified on 12/7/2018 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
December 4, 2018 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Elon Musk, Tesla, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, #3 Certificate of Interested Entities, #2 Notice of Appearance (Bretan, Jennifer) (Filed on 12/4/2018) Modified on 12/7/2018 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
December 4, 2018 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by Elon Musk, Tesla, Inc. (Bretan, Jennifer) (Filed on 12/4/2018)
December 4, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Corinne Bretan (Bretan, Jennifer) (Filed on 12/4/2018) Modified on 12/7/2018 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).
December 4, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of California, Santa Clara County. Their case number is 18CV337109. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number 0971-12897923). Filed by Tesla, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Kristy, Dean) (Filed on 12/4/2018) Modified on 12/7/2018 (gbaS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Inter-Local Pension Fund GCC/IBT v. Tesla, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goldman Sachs & Co. LLC
Represented By: Daniel Hector Rees Laguardia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Inc.
Represented By: Daniel Hector Rees Laguardia
Represented By: Adam S. Hakki
Represented By: Daniel Lewis
Represented By: Daniel Craig Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel Hector Rees Laguardia
Represented By: Adam S. Hakki
Represented By: Daniel Lewis
Represented By: Daniel Craig Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barclays Capital, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel Hector Rees Laguardia
Represented By: Adam S. Hakki
Represented By: Daniel Lewis
Represented By: Daniel Craig Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morgan Stanley & Co, LLC
Represented By: Daniel Hector Rees Laguardia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citigroup Global Markets, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel Hector Rees Laguardia
Represented By: Adam S. Hakki
Represented By: Daniel Lewis
Represented By: Daniel Craig Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RBC Capital Markets, LLC
Represented By: Daniel Hector Rees Laguardia
Represented By: Adam S. Hakki
Represented By: Daniel Lewis
Represented By: Daniel Craig Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elon Musk
Represented By: Jennifer Corinne Bretan
Represented By: Dean S. Kristy
Represented By: Alexis I. Caloza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tesla, Inc.
Represented By: Dean S. Kristy
Represented By: Jennifer Corinne Bretan
Represented By: Alexis I. Caloza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morgan Stanley & Company, LLC
Represented By: Daniel Hector Rees Laguardia
Represented By: Adam S. Hakki
Represented By: Daniel Lewis
Represented By: Daniel Craig Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goldman Sachs & Company, LLC
Represented By: Daniel Hector Rees Laguardia
Represented By: Adam S. Hakki
Represented By: Daniel Lewis
Represented By: Daniel Craig Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Inter-Local Pension Fund GCC/IBT
Represented By: Brian J. Robbins
Represented By: Stephen J. Oddo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?