Hernandez v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Plaintiff: Alicia Hernandez
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 3:2018cv07354
Filed: December 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2019 Filing 37 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. Motion Hearing set for 4/25/2019 08:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor before Judge William Alsup. Responses due by 2/14/2019. Replies due by 2/21/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Groves, Amanda) (Filed on 1/31/2019)
January 22, 2019 Filing 36 REPLY (re #25 MOTION to Transfer Case ) filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Groves, Amanda) (Filed on 1/22/2019) Modified on 1/23/2019 (amgS, COURT STAFF).
January 22, 2019 Filing 35 CLERK'S NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing: Motion Hearing re #25 MOTION to Transfer Case set for 2/21/2019 08:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor before Judge William Alsup. Previously set briefing schedule remains in effect. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2019)
January 14, 2019 Filing 34 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #25 MOTION to Transfer Case ) filed byAlicia Hernandez. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael L. Schrag, #2 Exhibit 1 to Schrag Declaration, #3 Exhibit 2 to Schrag Declaration, #4 Exhibit 3 to Schrag Declaration, #5 Exhibit 4 to Schrag Declaration, #6 Exhibit 5 to Schrag Declaration, #7 Exhibit 6 to Schrag Declaration, #8 Exhibit 7 to Schrag Declaration, #9 Exhibit 8 to Schrag Declaration, #10 Exhibit 9 to Schrag Declaration, #11 Exhibit 10 to Schrag Declaration, #12 Exhibit 11 to Schrag Declaration, #13 Exhibit 12 to Schrag Declaration, #14 Exhibit 13 to Schrag Declaration, #15 Exhibit 14 to Schrag Declaration, #16 Exhibit 15 to Schrag Declaration, #17 Exhibit 16 to Schrag Declaration, #18 Exhibit 17 to Schrag Declaration)(Schrag, Michael) (Filed on 1/14/2019)
January 14, 2019 Filing 33 Transcript of Proceedings held on 1-3-2019, before Judge William H. Alsup. Court Reporter Ana Dub, telephone number 415-290-1651; ana_dub@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #27 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/15/2019. (Related documents(s) #27 ) (amdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2019)
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER by Judge William Alsup granting #30 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Stacie C. Knight. (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2019)
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER by Judge William Alsup granting #29 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Kobi Kennedy Brinson. (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2019)
January 9, 2019 Filing 30 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Application of Stacie C. Knight ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12987713.) Filing fee previously paid on 01/09/2018 filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Groves, Amanda) (Filed on 1/9/2019)
January 9, 2019 Filing 29 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Application of Kobi Kennedy Brinson ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12987600.) filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Groves, Amanda) (Filed on 1/9/2019)
January 4, 2019 Filing 27 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 01/03/2019 before Judge William Alsup by Alicia Hernandez, for Court Reporter Ana Dub. (Schrag, Michael) (Filed on 1/4/2019)
January 4, 2019 Filing 26 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on January 3, 2019 before Judge William Alsup by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., for Court Reporter Ana Dub. (Groves, Amanda) (Filed on 1/4/2019)
January 3, 2019 Filing 28 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William Alsup: Show Cause Hearing - Non Evidentiary held on 1/3/2019. Defendant shall send out letter to putative class members advising of new developments in this matter. Parties are to meet and confer over acknowledgement and wavier of counsel form and regarding letter content. (Total Time in Court: 32 minutes.)Court Reporter: Ana Dub. Plaintiff Attorney: Richard Paul, Michael Schrag, Joshua Bloomfield. Defendant Attorney: Amanda Groves. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/3/2019)
December 31, 2018 Filing 25 MOTION to Transfer Case filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. Motion Hearing set for 2/7/2019 08:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor before Judge William Alsup. Responses due by 1/14/2019. Replies due by 1/22/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Carmen Bell, #2 Proposed Order)(Groves, Amanda) (Filed on 12/31/2018)
December 31, 2018 Filing 24 Response to Order to Show Cause #15 Order to Show Cause byWells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Carmen Bell in Support of Response to Order to Show Cause, #2 Ex. 1, #3 Ex. 2)(Groves, Amanda) (Filed on 12/31/2018)
December 27, 2018 Filing 23 STIPULATION of Extension of Time to Respond re #1 Complaint, Stipulation of Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. and Alicia Hernandez. (Groves, Amanda) (Filed on 12/27/2018) Modified on 12/28/2018 (amgS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 12/28/2018 (amgS, COURT STAFF).
December 27, 2018 Filing 22 Certificate of Interested Entities by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. identifying Corporate Parent Wells Fargo & Company for Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Groves, Amanda) (Filed on 12/27/2018)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER GRANTING APLLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE by Judge William Alsup granting #19 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for attorney Ashlea G. Schwarz.(tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2018)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE by Judge William Alsup granting #18 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for attorney Richard M. Paul III.(tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2018)
December 20, 2018 Filing 19 Amended MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Ashlea G. Schwarz ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12912298.) Filing fee previously paid on 12/10/2018 filed by Alicia Hernandez. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Paul, Richard) (Filed on 12/20/2018)
December 20, 2018 Filing 18 Amended MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Richard M. Paul III ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12912266.) Filing fee previously paid on 12/10/2018 filed by Alicia Hernandez. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Paul, Richard) (Filed on 12/20/2018)
December 19, 2018 Filing 17 CORRECTION OF DOCKET #14 - 2 Exhibit 1 to Schrag Declaration by Alicia Hernandez. (Schrag, Michael) (Filed on 12/19/2018) Modified on 12/19/2018 (amgS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 12/19/2018 (amgS, COURT STAFF).
December 18, 2018 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Alicia Hernandez re #15 Order to Show Cause, #14 Status Report,, (Schrag, Michael) (Filed on 12/18/2018)
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER FOR WELLS FARGO TO SHOW CAUSE. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 1/3/2019 10:00 AM. Show Cause Response due by 12/31/2018. Signed by Judge Alsup on 12/18/2018. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2018)
December 17, 2018 Filing 14 STATUS REPORT RE DEFENDANT'S MEDIATION PROGRAM FOR PUTATIVE CLASS MEMBERS, AND REQUEST FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Alicia Hernandez. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael L. Schrag, #2*** EXHIBIT FILED IN ERROR WITH CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION. DOCUMENT LOCKED. DOCUMENT TO BE REFILED LATER. *** Exhibit 1 to Schrag Declaration, #3 Exhibit 2 to Schrag Declaration, #4 Proposed Order, #5 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Schrag, Michael) (Filed on 12/17/2018) Modified on 12/18/2018 (fff, COURT STAFF).
December 12, 2018 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Alicia Hernandez re #1 Complaint, (Schrag, Michael) (Filed on 12/12/2018)
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE AND ORDER RE PUTATIVE CLASS ACTIONS AND FACTORS TO BE EVALUATED FOR ANY PROPOSED CLASS SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge Alsup on 12/12/2018. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2018)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER DENYING PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION by Judge William Alsup denying #9 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for attorney Ashlea G. Schwarz.(tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2018)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER DENYING PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION by Judge William Alsup denying #8 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for attorney Richard M. Paul III.(tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2018)
December 10, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Ashlea G. Schwarz ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12912298.) filed by Alicia Hernandez. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Schwarz, Ashlea) (Filed on 12/10/2018)
December 10, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Richard M. Paul III ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12912266.) filed by Alicia Hernandez. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Paul, Richard) (Filed on 12/10/2018)
December 6, 2018 Filing 7 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 2/28/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/7/2019 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor. (amgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2018)
December 6, 2018 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (amgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2018)
December 5, 2018 Filing 5 Case assigned to Judge William Alsup. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2018)
December 5, 2018 Filing 4 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Alicia Hernandez.. (Schrag, Michael) (Filed on 12/5/2018)
December 5, 2018 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by Alicia Hernandez (Schrag, Michael) (Filed on 12/5/2018)
December 5, 2018 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Schrag, Michael) (Filed on 12/5/2018)
December 5, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT - Class Action Complaint and Jury Demand against Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-12903914.). Filed byAlicia Hernandez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Schrag, Michael) (Filed on 12/5/2018)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hernandez v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Amanda L. Groves
Represented By: Kobi Kennedy Brinson
Represented By: Stacie Corbett Knight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alicia Hernandez
Represented By: Michael Lawrence Schrag
Represented By: Richard M. Paul, III
Represented By: Ashlea Gayle Schwarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?