Klock et al v. Monsanto Company
Plaintiff: Alisa Sharp, Thomas Gordon, Stephen Wayshak, Gerald Wybranski, Bobby Goad, Robert Kun, Marie Rynearson, Sue Harvell, Rose Powell, Christie Douglass, Troy Mihalinac, Earlynn Sheehan, Allan Rickards, Rhenita Clay, Robert Sterling, Jean Klock, Anita Bouck, Dave Hummi, Linda Harvill, Cathleen Wilk, Steve Elliot, Kerry Jones, Ronnie Ard, Melvin Harvell, William Porta, James Cross, Ronald Klock, Gail Coilton, Carl Piazza, Carl Denham, Bill Gewalt, Alfred Kilbourne, Robert Spada, Nelson Britten, Richard Dirksen, Jeffrey Breeden, Richard Merna, Mark Radominkski, Normal Des Lauriers, Sally Geise, Russel Tollefson, Israel Vega, Deseri Roper, James Bingham, Barbara Corcoran, Bruce Butterfield, Tim Sagarsee, Rodney Damon, Paula Peck, Edward Perry, William Turner, Jr., Chris Remley, Troy Fields, Sandi Ard, Thomas Vanfossen, Murtell Sligh, Frances Deans, Patricia Clark, Priscilla Johnson, Henry Clark, Edwin Hansen, Ernest Snyder, Danielle Fontenot-O'Toole, Barbara Nichter, Richard Dallin, Gary Geise, John Gorney, Lois Smith, Nancy Mucha, Sherman Trout, Alexander Roman, Jr and Robin Neal
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Case Number: 3:2018cv07370
Filed: December 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Vince Chhabria
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 69 by Judge Vince Chhabria granting Motion to Remand in Klock v. Monsanto, Dkt. No. 2368 in MDL No. 16-md-2741. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on February 1, 2019. (vclc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2019)
January 16, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE by Monsanto Company re: Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand and Memorandum of Law in Support of Monsanto's Opposition (Lasker, Eric) (Filed on 1/16/2019)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER re: Motion to Remand in Klock v. Monsanto Co., Dkt. No. 2368 in MDL No. 16-md-2741. Monsanto is directed to file a response by January 16, 2019. The matter will then be submitted unless the Court asks for further briefing. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on December 21, 2018. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (vclc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2018)
December 10, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Tate James Kunkle for Plaintiffs (Kunkle, Tate) (Filed on 12/10/2018)
December 6, 2018 Filing 9 Case transferred in from District of Missouri Eastern; Case Number 4:18-cv-01966. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER OF MDL TRANSFER to: Northern District of California. Case transferred via CM/ECF extraction. (DJO)
December 6, 2018 Filing 7 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-112) regarding multidistrict litigation No. 2741 IN RE: ROUNDUP PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION signed by Jeffery N. Lthi, Clerk of the Panel. (DJO)
November 27, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Monsanto Company Sent To: State Court - Executed (Hansell, Erik)
November 26, 2018 Filing 5 SUPPLEMENTAL - State Court docket sheet. (BAK)
November 26, 2018 Case Opening Notification: All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge John A. Ross. (BAK)
November 26, 2018 Filing 4 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court, St. Louis County, Missouri, filed by Priscilla Johnson, Dave Hummi, Thomas Vanfossen, Christie Douglass, Anita Bouck, Bill Gewalt, Gary Geise, Carl Denham, Rodney Damon, Carl Piazza, Murtell Sligh, Jean Klock, Bobby Goad, Ernest Snyder, Sherman Trout, Richard Dirksen, Bruce Butterfield, Linda Harvill, Alfred Kilbourne, Rhenita Clay, Patricia Clark, Chris Remley, Sandi Ard, Stephen Wayshak, John Gorney, Deseri Roper, Nancy Mucha, Israel Vega, Robert Spada, Barbara Nichter, Gail Coilton, Richard Dallin, Tim Sagarsee, Russel Tollefson, Lois Smith, Cathleen Wilk, William Porta, Normal Des Lauriers, William Turner, Jr., Earlynn Sheehan, Gerald Wybranski, Ronnie Ard, Frances Deans, Ronald Klock, Edwin Hansen, Danielle Fontenot-O'Toole, Thomas Gordon, Robin Neal, James Cross, Robert Sterling, Allan Rickards, Alexander Roman, Jr, Alisa Sharp, Sue Harvell, Steve Elliot, Paula Peck, Rose Powell, Troy Fields, Barbara Corcoran, James Bingham, Henry Clark, Robert Kun, Nelson Britten, Marie Rynearson, Mark Radominkski, Jeffrey Breeden, Troy Mihalinac, Melvin Harvell, Kerry Jones, Richard Merna, Edward Perry, Sally Geise.(BAK)
November 23, 2018 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint by Monsanto Company.(Hansell, Erik)
November 21, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Monsanto Company Sent To: Plaintiff (Hansell, Erik)
November 21, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Twenty-First Judicial Circuit St.Louis County, case number 18SL-CC04398, with receipt number 0865-6889265, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Monsanto Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Original Filing Form)(Hansell, Erik)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Klock et al v. Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alisa Sharp
Represented By: Wilson D. Sikes
Represented By: Tate James Kunkle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Gordon
Represented By: Wilson D. Sikes
Represented By: Tate James Kunkle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Wayshak
Represented By: Wilson D. Sikes
Represented By: Tate James Kunkle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerald Wybranski
Represented By: Wilson D. Sikes
Represented By: Tate James Kunkle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bobby Goad
Represented By: Wilson D. Sikes
Represented By: Tate James Kunkle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Kun
Represented By: Wilson D. Sikes
Represented By: Tate James Kunkle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marie Rynearson
Represented By: Wilson D. Sikes
Represented By: Tate James Kunkle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sue Harvell
Represented By: Wilson D. Sikes
Represented By: Tate James Kunkle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rose Powell
Represented By: Wilson D. Sikes
Represented By: Tate James Kunkle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christie Douglass
Represented By: Wilson D. Sikes
Represented By: Tate James Kunkle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Troy Mihalinac
Represented By: Wilson D. Sikes
Represented By: Tate James Kunkle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Earlynn Sheehan
Represented By: Wilson D. Sikes
Represented By: Tate James Kunkle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allan Rickards
Represented By: Wilson D. Sikes
Represented By: Tate James Kunkle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rhenita Clay
Represented By: Wilson D. Sikes
Represented By: Tate James Kunkle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Sterling
Represented By: Wilson D. Sikes
Represented By: Tate James Kunkle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jean Klock
Represented By: Wilson D. Sikes
Represented By: Tate James Kunkle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anita Bouck
Represented By: Wilson D. Sikes
Represented By: Tate James Kunkle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dave Hummi
Represented By: Wilson D. Sikes
Represented By: Tate James Kunkle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Harvill
Represented By: Wilson D. Sikes
Represented By: Tate James Kunkle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cathleen Wilk
Represented By: Wilson D. Sikes
Represented By: Tate James Kunkle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve Elliot
Represented By: Wilson D. Sikes
Represented By: Tate James Kunkle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kerry Jones
Represented By: Wilson D. Sikes
Represented By: Tate James Kunkle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronnie Ard
Represented By: Wilson D. Sikes
Represented By: Tate James Kunkle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melvin Harvell
Represented By: Wilson D. Sikes
Represented By: Tate James Kunkle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Porta
Represented By: Wilson D. Sikes
Represented By: Tate James Kunkle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Cross
Represented By: Wilson D. Sikes
Represented By: Tate James Kunkle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Klock
Represented By: Wilson D. Sikes
Represented By: Tate James Kunkle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gail Coilton
Represented By: Wilson D. Sikes
Represented By: Tate James Kunkle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carl Piazza
Represented By: Wilson D. Sikes
Represented By: Tate James Kunkle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carl Denham
Represented By: Wilson D. Sikes
Represented By: Tate James Kunkle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bill Gewalt
Represented By: Wilson D. Sikes
Represented By: Tate James Kunkle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alfred Kilbourne
Represented By: Wilson D. Sikes
Represented By: Tate James Kunkle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Spada
Represented By: Wilson D. Sikes
Represented By: Tate James Kunkle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nelson Britten
Represented By: Wilson D. Sikes
Represented By: Tate James Kunkle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Dirksen
Represented By: Wilson D. Sikes
Represented By: Tate James Kunkle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Breeden
Represented By: Wilson D. Sikes
Represented By: Tate James Kunkle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Merna
Represented By: Wilson D. Sikes
Represented By: Tate James Kunkle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Radominkski
Represented By: Wilson D. Sikes
Represented By: Tate James Kunkle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Normal Des Lauriers
Represented By: Wilson D. Sikes
Represented By: Tate James Kunkle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sally Geise
Represented By: Wilson D. Sikes
Represented By: Tate James Kunkle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Russel Tollefson
Represented By: Wilson D. Sikes
Represented By: Tate James Kunkle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Israel Vega
Represented By: Wilson D. Sikes
Represented By: Tate James Kunkle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deseri Roper
Represented By: Wilson D. Sikes
Represented By: Tate James Kunkle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Bingham
Represented By: Wilson D. Sikes
Represented By: Tate James Kunkle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Corcoran
Represented By: Wilson D. Sikes
Represented By: Tate James Kunkle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bruce Butterfield
Represented By: Wilson D. Sikes
Represented By: Tate James Kunkle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tim Sagarsee
Represented By: Wilson D. Sikes
Represented By: Tate James Kunkle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rodney Damon
Represented By: Wilson D. Sikes
Represented By: Tate James Kunkle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paula Peck
Represented By: Wilson D. Sikes
Represented By: Tate James Kunkle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Perry
Represented By: Wilson D. Sikes
Represented By: Tate James Kunkle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Turner, Jr.
Represented By: Wilson D. Sikes
Represented By: Tate James Kunkle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chris Remley
Represented By: Wilson D. Sikes
Represented By: Tate James Kunkle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Troy Fields
Represented By: Wilson D. Sikes
Represented By: Tate James Kunkle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandi Ard
Represented By: Wilson D. Sikes
Represented By: Tate James Kunkle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Vanfossen
Represented By: Wilson D. Sikes
Represented By: Tate James Kunkle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Murtell Sligh
Represented By: Wilson D. Sikes
Represented By: Tate James Kunkle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frances Deans
Represented By: Wilson D. Sikes
Represented By: Tate James Kunkle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Clark
Represented By: Wilson D. Sikes
Represented By: Tate James Kunkle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Priscilla Johnson
Represented By: Wilson D. Sikes
Represented By: Tate James Kunkle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Henry Clark
Represented By: Wilson D. Sikes
Represented By: Tate James Kunkle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edwin Hansen
Represented By: Wilson D. Sikes
Represented By: Tate James Kunkle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ernest Snyder
Represented By: Wilson D. Sikes
Represented By: Tate James Kunkle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danielle Fontenot-O'Toole
Represented By: Wilson D. Sikes
Represented By: Tate James Kunkle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Nichter
Represented By: Wilson D. Sikes
Represented By: Tate James Kunkle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Dallin
Represented By: Wilson D. Sikes
Represented By: Tate James Kunkle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Geise
Represented By: Wilson D. Sikes
Represented By: Tate James Kunkle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Gorney
Represented By: Wilson D. Sikes
Represented By: Tate James Kunkle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lois Smith
Represented By: Wilson D. Sikes
Represented By: Tate James Kunkle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Mucha
Represented By: Wilson D. Sikes
Represented By: Tate James Kunkle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherman Trout
Represented By: Wilson D. Sikes
Represented By: Tate James Kunkle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexander Roman, Jr
Represented By: Wilson D. Sikes
Represented By: Tate James Kunkle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robin Neal
Represented By: Wilson D. Sikes
Represented By: Tate James Kunkle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Represented By: Erik L. Hansell
Represented By: Eric Gordon Lasker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?