Shields et al v. Federation Internationale De Natation
Plaintiff: Katinka Hosszu, Michael C. Andrew and Thomas A. Shields
Defendant: Federation Internationale De Natation
Case Number: 3:2018cv07393
Filed: December 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2019 Filing 14 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Federation Internationale De Natation.. (Wall, Daniel) (Filed on 1/25/2019)
January 25, 2019 Filing 13 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint filed by Federation Internationale De Natation. (Wall, Daniel) (Filed on 1/25/2019)
January 25, 2019 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Federation Internationale De Natation (Wall, Daniel) (Filed on 1/25/2019)
January 25, 2019 Filing 11 Certificate of Interested Entities by Federation Internationale De Natation (Wall, Daniel) (Filed on 1/25/2019)
January 25, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Aaron T. Chiu on Behalf of Defendant Federation Internationale de Natation (Chiu, Aaron) (Filed on 1/25/2019)
January 25, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher S. Yates on Behalf of Defendant Federation Internationale de Natation (Yates, Christopher) (Filed on 1/25/2019)
January 25, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Murray Wall on Behalf Defendant Federation Internationale de Natation (Wall, Daniel) (Filed on 1/25/2019)
December 21, 2018 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Michael C. Andrew, Katinka Hosszu, Thomas A. Shields.. (Goteiner, Neil) (Filed on 12/21/2018)
December 12, 2018 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Federation Internationale De Natation. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2018)
December 12, 2018 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 2/28/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/7/2019 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2018)
December 11, 2018 Filing 4 Proposed Summons. (Cate, Matthew) (Filed on 12/11/2018)
December 10, 2018 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by Michael C. Andrew, Katinka Hosszu, Thomas A. Shields identifying Other Affiliate Energy Standard Group, Other Affiliate International Swimming League, Ltd. for Katinka Hosszu, Michael C. Andrew, Thomas A. Shields. (Goteiner, Neil) (Filed on 12/10/2018)
December 7, 2018 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 12/21/2018. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2018)
December 7, 2018 Filing 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT for Violations of the Sherman Act, 15 U.S.C. 1, 2, and the Common Law" against Federation International De Natation (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-12910872). Filed by Thomas A. Shields, Katinka Hosszu, Michael C. Andrew. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Goteiner, Neil) (Filed on 12/7/2018) Modified on 12/12/2018 (slhS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shields et al v. Federation Internationale De Natation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katinka Hosszu
Represented By: Neil A. Goteiner
Represented By: Aviva Judith Gilbert
Represented By: Hilary Caryn Krase
Represented By: Matthew Stephen Lee Cate
Represented By: Eric B. Fastiff
Represented By: Carl Brandon Wisoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael C. Andrew
Represented By: Neil A. Goteiner
Represented By: Aviva Judith Gilbert
Represented By: Hilary Caryn Krase
Represented By: Matthew Stephen Lee Cate
Represented By: Eric B. Fastiff
Represented By: Richard Martin Heimann
Represented By: Carl Brandon Wisoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas A. Shields
Represented By: Neil A. Goteiner
Represented By: Aviva Judith Gilbert
Represented By: Hilary Caryn Krase
Represented By: Matthew Stephen Lee Cate
Represented By: Eric B. Fastiff
Represented By: Richard Martin Heimann
Represented By: Carl Brandon Wisoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federation Internationale De Natation
Represented By: Aaron T. Chiu
Represented By: Christopher S. Yates
Represented By: Daniel Murray Wall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?