Pacific Coast Federation of Fishermens Associations, Inc. v. Chevron Corp. et al
Plaintiff: PACIFIC COAST FEDERATION OF FISHERMENS ASSOCIATIONS, INC.
Defendant: Devon Energy Corporation, Repsol Trading USA Corp., OCCIDENTAL CHEMICAL CORP., BP America, Inc., Royal Dutch Shell PLC, Shell Oil Products Company LLC, BP P.L.C., Phillips 66, Chevron Corp., MARATHON PETROLEUM CORPORATION, ConocoPhillips Company, Hess Corporation, ENI S.P.A., Chevron U.S.A., Inc., ENI Oil & Gas, Inc., Apache Corporation, ANADARKO PETROLEUM CORPORATION, Encana Corporation, Citgo Petroleum Corporation, Marathon Oil Company, Repsol Energy North America Corp., OCCIDENTAL PETROLEUM CORP., Total E&P USA Inc., EXXON MOBIL CORP., Repsol S.A., Total Specialties USA Inc., Marathon Oil Corporation, EXXONMOBIL OIL CORP., ConocoPhillips and Devon Energy Production Company, L.P.
Case Number: 3:2018cv07477
Filed: December 12, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Vince Chhabria
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2019 Filing 128 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Marathon Oil Corporation re #117 Certificate of Interested Entities, [Supplemental Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement and Local Rule 3-15 Certificate of Interested Parties] (Lui, Catherine) (Filed on 9/26/2019)
September 16, 2019 Filing 127 NOTICE by Apache Corporation NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT APACHE CORPORATION (Hartwell, Mortimer) (Filed on 9/16/2019)
August 21, 2019 Filing 126 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Anadarko Petroleum Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Occidental Petroleum Corporation for Anadarko Petroleum Corporation. First Supplemental Certification (Dragna, James) (Filed on 8/21/2019)
June 13, 2019 Filing 125 Certificate of Interested Entities by ConocoPhillips, ConocoPhillips Company identifying Corporate Parent ConocoPhillips for ConocoPhillips, ConocoPhillips Company. (Tough, Margaret) (Filed on 6/13/2019)
June 13, 2019 Filing 124 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ConocoPhillips, ConocoPhillips Company identifying Corporate Parent ConocoPhillips for ConocoPhillips, ConocoPhillips Company. (Tough, Margaret) (Filed on 6/13/2019)
June 13, 2019 Filing 123 NOTICE of Appearance by Margaret Tough on behalf of ConocoPhillips and ConocoPhillips Company (Tough, Margaret) (Filed on 6/13/2019)
June 13, 2019 Filing 122 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven Mark Bauer on behalf of ConocoPhillips and ConocoPhillips Company (Bauer, Steven) (Filed on 6/13/2019)
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 121 Order by Judge Vince Chhabria granting #119 Motion for Pro Hac Vice - Stengel.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2019)
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 120 Order by Judge Vince Chhabria granting #118 Motion for Pro Hac Vice - Reznick.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2019)
April 16, 2019 Filing 119 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice and [Proposed] Order ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13266198.) filed by Marathon Oil Company, Marathon Oil Corporation. (Stengel, James) (Filed on 4/16/2019)
April 16, 2019 Filing 118 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice and [Proposed] Order ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13266180.) filed by Marathon Oil Company, Marathon Oil Corporation. (Reznick, Robert) (Filed on 4/16/2019)
April 16, 2019 Filing 117 Certificate of Interested Entities by Marathon Oil Company, Marathon Oil Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Marathon Oil Corporation, Other Affiliate Marathon Oil Company for Marathon Oil Company, Marathon Oil Corporation. and Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement (Lui, Catherine) (Filed on 4/16/2019)
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 116 Order by Judge Vince Chhabria granting #115 Motion to Substitute Attorney. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2019)
April 15, 2019 Filing 115 MOTION to Substitute Attorney and [Proposed] Order filed by Marathon Oil Company, Marathon Oil Corporation. (Lui, Catherine) (Filed on 4/15/2019)
February 28, 2019 Filing 114 Certificate of Interested Entities by Phillips 66 (Tough, Margaret) (Filed on 2/28/2019)
February 28, 2019 Filing 113 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Phillips 66 (Tough, Margaret) (Filed on 2/28/2019)
February 28, 2019 Filing 112 NOTICE of Appearance by Margaret Tough on behalf of Phillips 66 (Tough, Margaret) (Filed on 2/28/2019)
February 28, 2019 Filing 111 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven Mark Bauer on behalf of Phillips 66 (Bauer, Steven) (Filed on 2/28/2019)
February 26, 2019 Filing 110 NOTICE by Chevron Corp. - Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel for Defendant Chevron Corporation (Champion, Anne) (Filed on 2/26/2019)
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 109 Order by Judge Vince Chhabria granting #106 Motion for Pro Hac Vice - Schmalzbach.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2019)
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 108 Order by Judge Vince Chhabria granting #105 Motion for Pro Hac Vice - Fuhr.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2019)
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 107 Order by Judge Vince Chhabria granting #104 Motion for Pro Hac Vice - Williams.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2019)
January 31, 2019 Filing 106 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13054856.) filed by Devon Energy Corporation, Devon Energy Production Company, L.P.. (Schmalzbach, Brian) (Filed on 1/31/2019)
January 31, 2019 Filing 105 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13054581.) filed by Devon Energy Corporation, Devon Energy Production Company, L.P.. (Fuhr, Joy) (Filed on 1/31/2019)
January 31, 2019 Filing 104 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13054372.) filed by Devon Energy Corporation, Devon Energy Production Company, L.P.. (Williams, Steven) (Filed on 1/31/2019)
January 9, 2019 Filing 103 NOTICE of Appearance by James Rulon Burrell for Defendants Devon Energy Corporation and Devon Energy Production Company, L.P. (Burrell, James) (Filed on 1/9/2019)
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 102 Order by Judge Vince Chhabria granting #100 Motion for Pro Hac Vice - Milner.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2019)
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 101 Order by Judge Vince Chhabria granting #99 Motion for Pro Hac Vice - Mizell.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2019)
January 8, 2019 Filing 100 MOTION & [PROPOSED] ORDER for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Deborah C. Milner ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12984044.) filed by Apache Corporation. (Milner, Deborah) (Filed on 1/8/2019) Modified on 1/9/2019 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
January 8, 2019 Filing 99 MOTION & [PROPOSED] ORDER for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Patrick W. Mizell ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12984012.) filed by Apache Corporation. (Mizell, Patrick) (Filed on 1/8/2019) Modified on 1/9/2019 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
January 8, 2019 Filing 98 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Walter James (James, Christopher) (Filed on 1/8/2019)
January 8, 2019 Filing 97 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Apache Corporation Pursuant to FRCP 7.1 and Certification of Interested Entities or Persons (Hartwell, Mortimer) (Filed on 1/8/2019)
January 8, 2019 Filing 96 NOTICE of Appearance by Mortimer H. Hartwell (Hartwell, Mortimer) (Filed on 1/8/2019)
January 7, 2019 Filing 95 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Devon Energy Corporation, Devon Energy Production Company, L.P. identifying Corporate Parent Devon Energy Corporation for Devon Energy Production Company, L.P.. (Evans, Gregory) (Filed on 1/7/2019)
January 7, 2019 Filing 94 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory Evans for Defendants Devon Energy Corporation and Devon Energy Production Company, L.P. (Evans, Gregory) (Filed on 1/7/2019)
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 93 Order by Judge Vince Chhabria granting #92 Motion for Pro Hac Vice - Rohm.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2019)
January 2, 2019 Filing 92 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Brian D. Rohm ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12966520.) filed by Total E&P USA Inc.. (Rohm, Bryan) (Filed on 1/2/2019)
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 91 Order by Judge Vince Chhabria granting #47 Stipulation to Stay Proceedings.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/2/2019)
December 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 90 Order by Judge Vince Chhabria granting #87 Motion for Pro Hac Vice - Young.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/28/2018)
December 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 89 Order by Judge Vince Chhabria granting #86 Motion for Pro Hac Vice - Berge.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/28/2018)
December 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 88 Order by Judge Vince Chhabria granting #85 Motion for Pro Hac Vice - Janoe.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/28/2018)
December 27, 2018 Filing 87 First MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice , Evan Young on behalf of Defendants Hess Corp., Repsol Energy North America Corp., and Repsol S.A. ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12956871.) filed by Hess Corporation. (Carr, Christopher) (Filed on 12/27/2018)
December 27, 2018 Filing 86 First MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice , Megan H. Berge on behalf of Defendants Hess Corp., Repsol Energy North America Corp., and Repsol S.A. ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12956851.) filed by Hess Corporation. (Carr, Christopher) (Filed on 12/27/2018)
December 27, 2018 Filing 85 First MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice , J. Scott Janoe on behalf of Defendants Hess Corp., Repsol Energy North America Corp., and Repsol S.A. ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12956801.) filed by Hess Corporation. (Carr, Christopher) (Filed on 12/27/2018)
December 27, 2018 Filing 84 Certificate of Interested Entities by Repsol S.A. (Carr, Christopher) (Filed on 12/27/2018)
December 27, 2018 Filing 83 Certificate of Interested Entities by Repsol Energy North America Corp. identifying Corporate Parent Repsol S.A., Other Affiliate Repsol USA Holdings Corporation, Other Affiliate Repsol Exploracion, S.A., Other Affiliate Repsol Petroleo, S.A. for Repsol Energy North America Corp.. (Carr, Christopher) (Filed on 12/27/2018)
December 27, 2018 Filing 82 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher J. Carr and Jonathan A. Shapiro (Carr, Christopher) (Filed on 12/27/2018)
December 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 81 Order by Judge Vince Chhabria granting #73 Motion for Pro Hac Vice - Stammel.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/27/2018)
December 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 80 Order by Judge Vince Chhabria granting #70 Motion for Pro Hac Vice - Curtis.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/27/2018)
December 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 79 Order by Judge Vince Chhabria granting #55 Motion for Pro Hac Vice - Rotman.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/27/2018)
December 27, 2018 Filing 78 REASSIGNED CASE - NOTICE OF NEW HEARING DATE: You are notified that the Court has scheduled an Initial Case Management Conference before Judge Vince Chhabria upon reassignment. For a copy of Judge Chhabria's Standing Order and other information, please refer to the Court's website at www.cand.uscourts.gov. Case Management Statement due by 3/5/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/12/2019 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 04, 17th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/27/2018)
December 26, 2018 Filing 77 EXHIBITS re #55 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Anna Rotman ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12942785.) Certificate of Good Standing of Anna Rotman filed byTotal E&P USA Inc., Total Specialties USA Inc.. (Related document(s) #55 ) (Rotman, Anna) (Filed on 12/26/2018)
December 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Vince Chhabria for all further proceedings. Judge William H. Orrick no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Executive Committee on 12/24/18. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/24/2018)
December 21, 2018 Filing 75 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Occidental Chemical Corp., Occidental Petroleum Corp. identifying Corporate Parent Occidental Chemical Holding Corporation for Occidental Chemical Corp.. (Fuller, Marc) (Filed on 12/21/2018)
December 21, 2018 Filing 74 Certificate of Interested Entities by Occidental Chemical Corp., Occidental Petroleum Corp. identifying Corporate Parent OXY USA Inc., Corporate Parent Occidental Chemical Holding Corporation, Corporate Parent Occidental Petroleum Corporation for Occidental Chemical Corp.. (Fuller, Marc) (Filed on 12/21/2018)
December 21, 2018 Filing 73 First MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Matthew R. Stammel ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12951414.) filed by Occidental Chemical Corp., Occidental Petroleum Corp.. (Fuller, Marc) (Filed on 12/21/2018)
December 21, 2018 Filing 72 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Hess Corporation (Carr, Christopher) (Filed on 12/21/2018)
December 21, 2018 Filing 71 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher J. Carr and Jonathan A. Shapiro (Carr, Christopher) (Filed on 12/21/2018)
December 21, 2018 Filing 70 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Philip H. Curtis ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12949099.) filed by BP America, Inc.. (Curtis, Philip) (Filed on 12/21/2018)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 12/21/2018. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2018)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 68 Order by Judge William H. Orrick granting #54 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Andrew R. McGaan. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2018)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 67 Order by Judge William H. Orrick granting #49 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Raphael Janove. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2018)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 66 Order by Judge William H. Orrick granting #44 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Lisa S. Meyer. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2018)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 65 Order by Judge William H. Orrick granting #43 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Pamela R. Hanebutt. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2018)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 64 Order by Judge William H. Orrick granting #42 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Nathan P. Eimer. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2018)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 63 Order by Judge William H. Orrick granting #33 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Shawn Patrick Regan. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2018)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 62 Order by Judge William H. Orrick granting #56 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Nancy G. Milburn. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2018)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 61 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER - Case Management Conference set for 3/26/2019 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 3/19/2019. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 12/20/2018. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2018)
December 19, 2018 Filing 60 Certificate of Interested Entities by BP America, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent BP P.L.C., Corporate Parent BP Holdings North America Limited, Corporate Parent BP America Limited for BP America, Inc.. (Lombardo, John) (Filed on 12/19/2018)
December 19, 2018 Filing 59 NOTICE of Appearance by John David Lombardo For Defendant BP America Inc. (Lombardo, John) (Filed on 12/19/2018)
December 19, 2018 Filing 58 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew T. Heartney For Defendant BP America Inc. (Heartney, Matthew) (Filed on 12/19/2018)
December 19, 2018 Filing 57 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan W. Hughes For Defendant BP America Inc. (Hughes, Jonathan) (Filed on 12/19/2018)
December 19, 2018 Filing 56 MOTION & [PROPOSED] ORDER for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Nancy Milburn ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 26E7N015.) Filing fee previously paid on 12/19/2018 filed by BP America, Inc.. (Milburn, Nancy) (Filed on 12/19/2018) Modified on 12/20/2018 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
December 19, 2018 Filing 55 MOTION & [PROPOSED] ORDER for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Anna Rotman ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12942785.) filed by Total E&P USA Inc., Total Specialties USA Inc.. (Rotman, Anna) (Filed on 12/19/2018) Modified on 12/20/2018 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
December 19, 2018 Filing 54 MOTION & [PROPOSED] ORDER for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Andrew McGaan ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12942735.) filed by Total E&P USA Inc., Total Specialties USA Inc.. (McGaan, Andrew) (Filed on 12/19/2018) Modified on 12/20/2018 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
December 19, 2018 Filing 53 NOTICE of Appearance by James Ryan Molen (Molen, James) (Filed on 12/19/2018)
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge William H. Orrick for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Executive Committee on 12/19/2018. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2018)
December 19, 2018 Filing 51 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ENI Oil & Gas, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Eni America Limited for ENI Oil & Gas, Inc.. and Certificate of Interested Entities or Persons (Eni America Limited (shareholder of EOG) and Eni UHL Limited (shareholder of Eni America Limited). (Cranston, David) (Filed on 12/19/2018)
December 19, 2018 Filing 50 NOTICE of Appearance by David Edward Cranston (Cranston, David) (Filed on 12/19/2018)
December 19, 2018 Filing 49 MOTION & [PROPOSED] ORDER for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12940651.) filed by Citgo Petroleum Corporation. (Janove, Raphael) (Filed on 12/19/2018) Modified on 12/20/2018 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
December 18, 2018 Filing 48 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2018)
December 18, 2018 Filing 47 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Stay Proceedings filed by Chevron Corp., Chevron U.S.A., Inc.. (Boutrous, Theodore) (Filed on 12/18/2018) Modified on 12/19/2018 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
December 18, 2018 Filing 46 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael F. Healy for Defendant Encana Corporation (Healy, Michael) (Filed on 12/18/2018)
December 18, 2018 Filing 44 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12937981.) filed by Citgo Petroleum Corporation. (Meyer, Lisa) (Filed on 12/18/2018)
December 18, 2018 Filing 43 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12937950.) filed by Citgo Petroleum Corporation. (Hanebutt, Pamela) (Filed on 12/18/2018)
December 18, 2018 Filing 42 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12937918.) filed by Citgo Petroleum Corporation. (Eimer, Nathan) (Filed on 12/18/2018)
December 18, 2018 Filing 40 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Total Specialties USA Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Total, S.A., Other Affiliate TOTAL SERVICES MARKETING S.A. for Total Specialties USA Inc.. (Keegan, Christopher) (Filed on 12/18/2018)
December 18, 2018 Filing 39 Certificate of Interested Entities by Total Specialties USA Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Total, S.A., Other Affiliate Total Services Marketing S.A. for Total Specialties USA Inc.. (Keegan, Christopher) (Filed on 12/18/2018)
December 18, 2018 Filing 38 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Total E&P USA Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Total, S.A., Other Affiliate TOTAL Delaware, Inc., Other Affiliate Elf Aquitaine, Inc., Other Affiliate TOTAL Holdings USA, Inc., Other Affiliate TOTAL GESTION USA for Total E&P USA Inc.. (Keegan, Christopher) (Filed on 12/18/2018)
December 18, 2018 Filing 37 Certificate of Interested Entities by Total E&P USA Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Total, S.A., Other Affiliate TOTAL Delaware, Inc., Other Affiliate Elf Aquitaine, Inc., Other Affiliate TOTAL Holdings USA, Inc., Other Affiliate TOTAL GESTION USA for Total E&P USA Inc.. (Keegan, Christopher) (Filed on 12/18/2018)
December 18, 2018 Filing 36 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Pacific Coast Federation of Fishermens Associations, Inc... (Sher, Victor) (Filed on 12/18/2018)
December 18, 2018 Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher William Keegan for Defendants Total E&P USA, Inc. and Total Specialties USA Inc. (Keegan, Christopher) (Filed on 12/18/2018)
December 18, 2018 Filing 33 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Marathon Petroleum Corporation ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12936958.) filed by Marathon Petroleum Corporation. (Regan, Shawn) (Filed on 12/18/2018)
December 18, 2018 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by Ann Marie Mortimer for Marathon Petroleum Corporation (Mortimer, Ann Marie) (Filed on 12/18/2018)
December 18, 2018 Filing 31 Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Marathon Petroleum Corporation (Broome, Shannon) (Filed on 12/18/2018)
December 18, 2018 Filing 30 Certificate of Interested Entities by Marathon Petroleum Corporation identifying Other Affiliate Marathon Petroleum Company LP, Other Affiliate Speedway LLC for Marathon Petroleum Corporation. (Broome, Shannon) (Filed on 12/18/2018)
December 18, 2018 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Shannon Suzanne Broome for Marathon Petroleum Corporation (Broome, Shannon) (Filed on 12/18/2018)
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO RELATE CASE. Signed by Judge Alsup on 12/18/2018. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2018)
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting #11 Joel M. Silverstein's Motion for admission Pro Hac Vice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2018)
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting #10 Herbert J. Stern's Motion for admission Pro Hac Vice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2018)
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting #8 Anne Marie Champion's Motion for admission Pro Hac Vice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2018)
December 17, 2018 Filing 27 Certificate of Interested Entities by Citgo Petroleum Corporation identifying Corporate Parent CITGO Holding, Inc., Other Affiliate PDV Holding, Inc., Other Affiliate Petroleos de Venezuela, S.A. for Citgo Petroleum Corporation. (Duchesneau, Peter) (Filed on 12/17/2018)
December 17, 2018 Filing 26 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Citgo Petroleum Corporation identifying Corporate Parent CITGO Holding, Inc., Other Affiliate PDV Holding, Inc., Other Affiliate Petroleos de Venezuela, S.A. for Citgo Petroleum Corporation. (Duchesneau, Peter) (Filed on 12/17/2018)
December 17, 2018 #Electronic filing error. Names of interested entities or person MUST be entered at the prompt. This filing will not be processed by the clerks office. Please re-file in its ent irety. Re: #15 Certificate of Interested Entities filed by Citgo Petroleum Corporation, #14 Certificate of Interested Entities filed by Citgo Petroleum Corporation (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2018)
December 17, 2018 Filing 25 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 3/13/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/20/2019 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2018)
December 17, 2018 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua David Dick (Dick, Joshua) (Filed on 12/17/2018)
December 17, 2018 Filing 23 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Encana Corporation (Fox, Michael) (Filed on 12/17/2018)
December 17, 2018 Filing 22 Certificate of Interested Entities by Encana Corporation (Fox, Michael) (Filed on 12/17/2018)
December 17, 2018 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Louis Fox and Michael F. Healy for Defendant Encana Corporation (Fox, Michael) (Filed on 12/17/2018)
December 14, 2018 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Ann Kim on behalf of Defendants Royal Dutch Shell plc and Shell Oil Products Co. LLC (Kim, Elizabeth) (Filed on 12/14/2018)
December 14, 2018 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Craig Alan Moyer (Moyer, Craig) (Filed on 12/14/2018)
December 14, 2018 Filing 18 DISREGARD, FILED IN ERROR NOTICE of Appearance by Peter Raymond Duchesneau (Duchesneau, Peter) (Filed on 12/14/2018) Modified on 12/17/2018 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
December 14, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter Raymond Duchesneau (Duchesneau, Peter) (Filed on 12/14/2018)
December 14, 2018 Filing 16 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 12/28/2018. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2018)
December 14, 2018 Filing 15 **RE-FILED AT DOCKET NO. #26 ** Corporate Disclosure Statement by Citgo Petroleum Corporation (Duchesneau, Peter) (Filed on 12/14/2018) Modified on 12/18/2018 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
December 14, 2018 Filing 14 ** RE-FILED AT DOCKET NO. #27 ** Certificate of Interested Entities by Citgo Petroleum Corporation (Duchesneau, Peter) (Filed on 12/14/2018) Modified on 12/18/2018 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
December 14, 2018 Filing 13 Certificate of Interested Entities by Royal Dutch Shell PLC, Shell Oil Products Company LLC identifying Other Affiliate Shell Oil Company for Royal Dutch Shell PLC, Shell Oil Products Company LLC. (Levin, Daniel) (Filed on 12/14/2018)
December 14, 2018 #Electronic filing error. Re: #1 Notice of Removal,, filed by Chevron U.S.A., Inc., Chevron Corp. Please confirm the nature of suit for this case as 240 as docketed or 385 o n civil cover sheet. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2018)
December 14, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Benjamin Levin (Levin, Daniel) (Filed on 12/14/2018)
December 14, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Joel M. Silverstein ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12928378.) filed by Chevron Corp., Chevron U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Cert. Good Standing)(Silverstein, Joel) (Filed on 12/14/2018)
December 14, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Herbert J Stern ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12928318.) filed by Chevron Corp., Chevron U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Cert. Good Standing)(Stern, Herbert) (Filed on 12/14/2018)
December 13, 2018 Filing 9 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint Under Local Civil Rule 6-1(a) filed by Chevron Corp., Chevron U.S.A., Inc.. (Boutrous, Theodore) (Filed on 12/13/2018)
December 13, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12926266.) filed by Chevron Corp., Chevron U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Champion, Anne) (Filed on 12/13/2018)
December 13, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE by OCCIDENTAL PETROLEUM CORP. (Fuller, Marc) (Filed on 12/13/2018)
December 13, 2018 Filing 6 Certificate of Interested Entities by ANADARKO PETROLEUM CORPORATION (Dragna, James) (Filed on 12/13/2018)
December 13, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE by ANADARKO PETROLEUM CORPORATION re #1 Notice of Removal,, of Consent to Removal (Dragna, James) (Filed on 12/13/2018)
December 13, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by James Joseph Dragna , Yardena R. Zwang-Weissman, and Bryan M. Killian (Dragna, James) (Filed on 12/13/2018)
December 12, 2018 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Chevron Corp., Chevron U.S.A., Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal,, #2 Certificate of Interested Entities (Boutrous, Theodore) (Filed on 12/12/2018)
December 12, 2018 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Chevron Corp., Chevron U.S.A., Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Chevron Corporation for Chevron U.S.A., Inc.. (Boutrous, Theodore) (Filed on 12/12/2018)
December 12, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from CALIFORNIA SUPERIOR COURT, SAN FRANCISCO COUNTY. Their case number is CGC-18-571285. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-12922609). Filed byChevron Corp., Chevron U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of W. Thomson, #2 Exhibit A, Decl'n of W. Thomson, #3 Exhibit B, Decl'n of W. Thomson, #4 Exhibit C, Decl'n of W. Thomson, #5 Exhibit D, Decl'n of W. Thomson, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Boutrous, Theodore) (Filed on 12/12/2018)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pacific Coast Federation of Fishermens Associations, Inc. v. Chevron Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Devon Energy Corporation
Represented By: James Rulon Burrell
Represented By: Brian David Schmalzbach
Represented By: Steven Robert Williams
Represented By: Gregory Evans
Represented By: Joy Cummings Fuhr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Repsol Trading USA Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OCCIDENTAL CHEMICAL CORP.
Represented By: Marc A. Fuller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP America, Inc.
Represented By: Philip H. Curtis
Represented By: Nancy G. Milburn
Represented By: John David Lombardo
Represented By: Jonathan W. Hughes
Represented By: Matthew T. Heartney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Royal Dutch Shell PLC
Represented By: Daniel Benjamin Levin
Represented By: Elizabeth Ann Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shell Oil Products Company LLC
Represented By: Daniel Benjamin Levin
Represented By: Elizabeth Ann Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP P.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phillips 66
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chevron Corp.
Represented By: Theodore J. Boutrous, Jr.
Represented By: Joel M. Silverstein
Represented By: Anne Marie Champion
Represented By: Herbert J Stern
Represented By: Joshua David Dick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARATHON PETROLEUM CORPORATION
Represented By: Shawn P. Regan
Represented By: Shannon Suzanne Broome
Represented By: Ann Marie Mortimer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ConocoPhillips Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hess Corporation
Represented By: Christopher J. Carr
Represented By: Megan H. Berge
Represented By: Evan Andrew Young
Represented By: J. Scott Janoe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ENI S.P.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chevron U.S.A., Inc.
Represented By: Theodore J. Boutrous, Jr.
Represented By: Joel M. Silverstein
Represented By: Anne Marie Champion
Represented By: Herbert J Stern
Represented By: Joshua David Dick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ENI Oil & Gas, Inc.
Represented By: James Ryan Molen
Represented By: David Edward Cranston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apache Corporation
Represented By: Mortimer H. Hartwell
Represented By: Deborah Carleton Milner
Represented By: Christopher Walter James
Represented By: Patrick W. Mizell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANADARKO PETROLEUM CORPORATION
Represented By: James Joseph Dragna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Encana Corporation
Represented By: Michael F. Healy
Represented By: Michael Louis Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citgo Petroleum Corporation
Represented By: Nathan P. Eimer
Represented By: Pamela Reasor Hanebutt
Represented By: Craig Alan Moyer
Represented By: Lisa S. Meyer
Represented By: Raphael Janove
Represented By: Peter Raymond Duchesneau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marathon Oil Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Repsol Energy North America Corp.
Represented By: Christopher J. Carr
Represented By: Megan H. Berge
Represented By: Evan Andrew Young
Represented By: J. Scott Janoe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OCCIDENTAL PETROLEUM CORP.
Represented By: Marc A. Fuller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Total E&P USA Inc.
Represented By: Bryan David Rohm
Represented By: Anna Grace Rotman
Represented By: Christopher William Keegan
Represented By: Andrew R McGaan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EXXON MOBIL CORP.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Repsol S.A.
Represented By: Christopher J. Carr
Represented By: Megan H. Berge
Represented By: Evan Andrew Young
Represented By: J. Scott Janoe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Total Specialties USA Inc.
Represented By: Anna Grace Rotman
Represented By: Christopher William Keegan
Represented By: Andrew R McGaan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marathon Oil Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EXXONMOBIL OIL CORP.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ConocoPhillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Devon Energy Production Company, L.P.
Represented By: James Rulon Burrell
Represented By: Brian David Schmalzbach
Represented By: Steven Robert Williams
Represented By: Gregory Evans
Represented By: Joy Cummings Fuhr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PACIFIC COAST FEDERATION OF FISHERMENS ASSOCIATIONS, INC.
Represented By: Katie Hannah Jones
Represented By: Martin Daniel Quinones
Represented By: Victor Marc Sher
Represented By: Matthew Kendall Edling
Represented By: Timothy Robin Sloane
Represented By: Meredith Segan Wilensky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?