Pars Equality Center et al v. Pompeo et al
Plaintiff: Jane Doe # 1, Nicholas Hanout, Afshin Raghebi, Siraji Etha Siraji, JOHN DOES #1-3, Maral Tabrizi, Malayeen Ahmed, Mitra Hannani, Hossein Zamani Hosseinabadi, Reza Azimi, Pamela Whitehall Raghebi, Yahya Ghaleb, OneAmerica, Hoda Mehrabi Mohammadabadi, Pars Equality Center and Zeinab Mohamed Hassan
Defendant: U.S Customs and Border Protection, Department of Homeland Security, Mike Pompeo, U.S Department of State, Kevin K. McAleenan and Secretary Kirstjen M Nielsen
Case Number: 3:2018cv07818
Filed: December 31, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Referring Judge: James Donato
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 20, 2019 Filing 91 MOTION to Consolidate Cases and, in the Alternative, Stay Proceedings filed by Department of Homeland Security, Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen M Nielsen, Mike Pompeo, U.S Customs and Border Protection, U.S Department of State. Motion Hearing set for 4/11/2019 10:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 3/6/2019. Replies due by 3/13/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kim, David) (Filed on 2/20/2019)
February 12, 2019 Filing 90 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Aaron John Fickes NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL AARON FICKES (Fickes, Aaron) (Filed on 2/12/2019)
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 89 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/4/2019 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 3/28/2019. Signed by Judge James Donato on 1/30/19. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2019)
January 29, 2019 Filing 88 AMENDED ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge James Donato for all further proceedings. Judge Richard Seeborg no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Executive Committee on 1/29/19. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2019)
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Richard Seeborg for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Executive Committee on 1/29/19. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2019)
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER RELATING CASE. Signed by Judge James Donato on 1/28/19. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2019)
January 28, 2019 Filing 85 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2019)
January 28, 2019 Filing 84 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Malayeen Ahmed, Reza Azimi, Yahya Ghaleb, Mitra Hannani, Nicholas Hanout, Zeinab Mohamed Hassan, Hossein Zamani Hosseinabadi, Hoda Mehrabi Mohammadabadi, OneAmerica, Pars Equality Center, Afshin Raghebi, Pamela Whitehall Raghebi, Siraji Etha Siraji, Maral Tabrizi.. (Yousefzadeh, Babak) (Filed on 1/28/2019)
January 7, 2019 Filing 83 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs and Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 1/22/2019. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2019)
December 31, 2018 Filing 82 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 3/28/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/4/2019 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/31/2018)
December 31, 2018 Filing 81 Case transferred in from District of Washington Western; Case Number 2:18-cv-01122. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER granting Defendant's #55 Motion to Transfer Case to Northern District of California; striking Defendants' #64 Motion to Dismiss, and Plaintiffs' #65 Motion to Compel, #70 Motion for Reconsideration; directing Clerk to close this file. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. Case will be sent to the US District Court for the Northern District of California by electronic transfer 15 days from the date of this filing. (SWT)
December 6, 2018 Filing 79 Stipulated MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF CLASS DISCOVERY AND CERTIFICATION OF DEADLINES, filed by Plaintiffs Malayeen Ahmed, Reza Azimi, Yahya Ghaleb, Mitra Hannani, Nicholas Hanout, Zeinab Mohamed Hassan, Hossein Zamani Hosseinabadi, Hoda Mehrabi Mohammadabadi, OneAmerica, Pars Equality Center, Afshin Raghebi, Pamela Whitehall Raghebi, Siraji Etha Siraji, Maral Tabrizi. Noting Date 12/6/2018, (Fickes, Aaron)
October 26, 2018 Filing 78 REPLY, filed by Defendants Department of Homeland Security, Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen Nielsen, Mike Pompeo, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of State, TO RESPONSE to #64 MOTION to Dismiss (Kim, David)
October 25, 2018 Filing 77 NOTICE to Withdraw Pending Motion re #69 MOTION to Stay Discovery ; by Defendants Department of Homeland Security, Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen Nielsen, Mike Pompeo, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of State. (Westwater, Gisela)
October 25, 2018 Filing 76 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Gisela A Westwater on behalf of Defendants Department of Homeland Security, Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen Nielsen, Mike Pompeo, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of State. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Westwater, Gisela)
October 22, 2018 Filing 75 RESPONSE, by Plaintiffs Malayeen Ahmed, Reza Azimi, Yahya Ghaleb, Mitra Hannani, Nicholas Hanout, Zeinab Mohamed Hassan, Hossein Zamani Hosseinabadi, Jane Doe # 1, John Does #1-3, Hoda Mehrabi Mohammadabadi, OneAmerica, Pars Equality Center, Afshin Raghebi, Pamela Whitehall Raghebi, Siraji Etha Siraji, Maral Tabrizi, to #64 MOTION to Dismiss . Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Fickes, Aaron)
October 22, 2018 Filing 74 DECLARATION of Esther H. Sung in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Motion to Stay filed by Plaintiffs Malayeen Ahmed, Reza Azimi, Yahya Ghaleb, Mitra Hannani, Nicholas Hanout, Zeinab Mohamed Hassan, Hossein Zamani Hosseinabadi, Jane Doe # 1, John Does #1-3, Hoda Mehrabi Mohammadabadi, OneAmerica, Pars Equality Center, Afshin Raghebi, Pamela Whitehall Raghebi, Siraji Etha Siraji, Maral Tabrizi re #69 MOTION to Stay Discovery (Fickes, Aaron)
October 22, 2018 Filing 73 RESPONSE, by Plaintiffs Malayeen Ahmed, Reza Azimi, Yahya Ghaleb, Mitra Hannani, Nicholas Hanout, Zeinab Mohamed Hassan, Hossein Zamani Hosseinabadi, Jane Doe # 1, John Does #1-3, Hoda Mehrabi Mohammadabadi, OneAmerica, Pars Equality Center, Afshin Raghebi, Pamela Whitehall Raghebi, Siraji Etha Siraji, Maral Tabrizi, to #69 MOTION to Stay Discovery. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Fickes, Aaron)
October 19, 2018 Filing 72 REPLY, filed by Plaintiffs Malayeen Ahmed, Reza Azimi, Yahya Ghaleb, Mitra Hannani, Nicholas Hanout, Zeinab Mohamed Hassan, Hossein Zamani Hosseinabadi, Jane Doe # 1, John Does #1-3, Hoda Mehrabi Mohammadabadi, OneAmerica, Pars Equality Center, Afshin Raghebi, Pamela Whitehall Raghebi, Siraji Etha Siraji, Maral Tabrizi, TO RESPONSE to #65 MOTION to Compel Administrative Record Under Local Rule 79(h) (Fickes, Aaron)
October 15, 2018 Filing 71 RESPONSE, by Defendants Department of Homeland Security, Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen Nielsen, Mike Pompeo, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of State, to #65 MOTION to Compel Administrative Record Under Local Rule 79(h). (Kim, David)
October 12, 2018 Filing 70 MOTION Reconsideration of Court's Order Granting Plaintiffs' Motion to Proceed Under Pseudonym re #20 MOTION to Proceed Under Pseudonym, #51 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief , filed by Defendants Department of Homeland Security, Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen Nielsen, Mike Pompeo, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of State. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 11/2/2018, (Kim, David)
October 10, 2018 Filing 69 MOTION to Stay Discovery, filed by Defendants Department of Homeland Security, Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen Nielsen, Mike Pompeo, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of State. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 10/26/2018, (Kim, David)
October 9, 2018 Filing 68 JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties Filed by Plaintiffs Malayeen Ahmed, Reza Azimi, Yahya Ghaleb, Mitra Hannani, Nicholas Hanout, Zeinab Mohamed Hassan, Hossein Zamani Hosseinabadi, Jane Doe # 1, John Does #1-3, Hoda Mehrabi Mohammadabadi, OneAmerica, Pars Equality Center, Afshin Raghebi, Pamela Whitehall Raghebi, Siraji Etha Siraji, Maral Tabrizi.(Walder, Jessica)
October 8, 2018 Filing 67 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL: Attorney Christina Sinha for Plaintiffs Malayeen Ahmed, Reza Azimi, Yahya Ghaleb, Mitra Hannani, Nicholas Hanout, Zeinab Mohamed Hassan, Hossein Zamani Hosseinabadi, Jane Doe # 1, John Does #1-3, Hoda Mehrabi Mohammadabadi, OneAmerica, Pars Equality Center, Afshin Raghebi, Pamela Whitehall Raghebi, Siraji Etha Siraji, Maral Tabrizi. (Vafaie, Elica)
October 4, 2018 Filing 66 DECLARATION of Jessica N. Walder in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Administrative Record filed by Plaintiffs Malayeen Ahmed, Reza Azimi, Yahya Ghaleb, Mitra Hannani, Nicholas Hanout, Zeinab Mohamed Hassan, Hossein Zamani Hosseinabadi, Jane Doe # 1, John Does #1-3, Hoda Mehrabi Mohammadabadi, OneAmerica, Pars Equality Center, Afshin Raghebi, Pamela Whitehall Raghebi, Siraji Etha Siraji, Maral Tabrizi re #65 MOTION to Compel Administrative Record Under Local Rule 79(h) (Walder, Jessica)
October 4, 2018 Filing 65 MOTION to Compel Administrative Record Under Local Rule 79(h), filed by Plaintiffs Malayeen Ahmed, Reza Azimi, Yahya Ghaleb, Mitra Hannani, Nicholas Hanout, Zeinab Mohamed Hassan, Hossein Zamani Hosseinabadi, Jane Doe # 1, John Does #1-3, Hoda Mehrabi Mohammadabadi, OneAmerica, Pars Equality Center, Afshin Raghebi, Pamela Whitehall Raghebi, Siraji Etha Siraji, Maral Tabrizi. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 10/19/2018, (Walder, Jessica)
October 2, 2018 Filing 64 MOTION to Dismiss , filed by Defendants Department of Homeland Security, Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen Nielsen, Mike Pompeo, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of State. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order) Noting Date 10/26/2018, (Kim, David)
September 28, 2018 Filing 63 REPLY, filed by Defendants Department of Homeland Security, Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen Nielsen, Mike Pompeo, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of State, TO RESPONSE to #55 MOTION to Transfer Case (Kim, David)
September 24, 2018 Filing 62 DECLARATION of Tana Lin filed by Plaintiffs Malayeen Ahmed, Reza Azimi, Yahya Ghaleb, Mitra Hannani, Nicholas Hanout, Zeinab Mohamed Hassan, Hossein Zamani Hosseinabadi, Jane Doe # 1, John Does #1-3, Hoda Mehrabi Mohammadabadi, OneAmerica, Pars Equality Center, Afshin Raghebi, Pamela Whitehall Raghebi, Siraji Etha Siraji, Maral Tabrizi re #55 MOTION to Transfer Case (Walder, Jessica)
September 24, 2018 Filing 61 DECLARATION of Warsame filed by Plaintiffs Malayeen Ahmed, Reza Azimi, Yahya Ghaleb, Mitra Hannani, Nicholas Hanout, Zeinab Mohamed Hassan, Hossein Zamani Hosseinabadi, Jane Doe # 1, John Does #1-3, Hoda Mehrabi Mohammadabadi, OneAmerica, Pars Equality Center, Afshin Raghebi, Pamela Whitehall Raghebi, Siraji Etha Siraji, Maral Tabrizi re #55 MOTION to Transfer Case (Walder, Jessica)
September 24, 2018 Filing 60 DECLARATION of Zeinab Hassan filed by Plaintiffs Malayeen Ahmed, Reza Azimi, Yahya Ghaleb, Mitra Hannani, Nicholas Hanout, Zeinab Mohamed Hassan, Hossein Zamani Hosseinabadi, Jane Doe # 1, John Does #1-3, Hoda Mehrabi Mohammadabadi, OneAmerica, Pars Equality Center, Afshin Raghebi, Pamela Whitehall Raghebi, Siraji Etha Siraji, Maral Tabrizi re #55 MOTION to Transfer Case (Walder, Jessica)
September 24, 2018 Filing 59 DECLARATION of Siraji Siraji filed by Plaintiffs Malayeen Ahmed, Reza Azimi, Yahya Ghaleb, Mitra Hannani, Nicholas Hanout, Zeinab Mohamed Hassan, Hossein Zamani Hosseinabadi, Jane Doe # 1, John Does #1-3, Hoda Mehrabi Mohammadabadi, OneAmerica, Pars Equality Center, Afshin Raghebi, Pamela Whitehall Raghebi, Siraji Etha Siraji, Maral Tabrizi re #55 MOTION to Transfer Case (Walder, Jessica)
September 24, 2018 Filing 58 DECLARATION of Afshin Raghebi filed by Plaintiffs Malayeen Ahmed, Reza Azimi, Yahya Ghaleb, Mitra Hannani, Nicholas Hanout, Zeinab Mohamed Hassan, Hossein Zamani Hosseinabadi, Jane Doe # 1, John Does #1-3, Hoda Mehrabi Mohammadabadi, OneAmerica, Pars Equality Center, Afshin Raghebi, Pamela Whitehall Raghebi, Siraji Etha Siraji, Maral Tabrizi re #55 MOTION to Transfer Case (Walder, Jessica) Modified on 9/26/2018 to add name of declarant(PM).
September 24, 2018 Filing 57 DECLARATION of P. Raghebi filed by Plaintiffs Malayeen Ahmed, Reza Azimi, Yahya Ghaleb, Mitra Hannani, Nicholas Hanout, Zeinab Mohamed Hassan, Hossein Zamani Hosseinabadi, Jane Doe # 1, John Does #1-3, Hoda Mehrabi Mohammadabadi, OneAmerica, Pars Equality Center, Afshin Raghebi, Pamela Whitehall Raghebi, Siraji Etha Siraji, Maral Tabrizi re #55 MOTION to Transfer Case (Walder, Jessica)
September 24, 2018 Filing 56 RESPONSE, by Plaintiffs Malayeen Ahmed, Reza Azimi, Yahya Ghaleb, Mitra Hannani, Nicholas Hanout, Zeinab Mohamed Hassan, Hossein Zamani Hosseinabadi, Jane Doe # 1, John Does #1-3, Hoda Mehrabi Mohammadabadi, to #55 MOTION to Transfer Case . (Walder, Jessica)
September 6, 2018 Filing 55 MOTION to Transfer Case , filed by Defendants Department of Homeland Security, Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen Nielsen, Mike Pompeo, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of State. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Transfer Venue) Noting Date 9/28/2018, (Kim, David)
September 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 54 SCHEDULING ORDER REGARDING CLASS CERTIFICATION MOTION by Judge James L. Robart. Deadline to complete discovery of class certification: 12/28/2018; Deadline for Plaintiffs to file motion for class certification: 1/28/2019. (AD)
September 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT by Judge James L. Robart. Joint Status Report due by 10/9/2018, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 9/18/2018, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 10/2/2018. (AD)
August 23, 2018 Filing 52 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney David Kim on behalf of Defendants Department of Homeland Security, Kevin K. McAleenan, Kirstjen Nielsen, Mike Pompeo, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of State. (Kim, David)
August 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER granting Plaintiffs John Doe 1, John Doe 2, John Doe 3, and Jane Doe 1's #20 Motion to proceed under pseudonym. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
August 21, 2018 Filing 50 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL: Attorney Jana Whalley for Plaintiffs Malayeen Ahmed, Reza Azimi, Yahya Ghaleb, Mitra Hannani, Nicholas Hanout, Zeinab Mohamed Hassan, Hossein Zamani Hosseinabadi, Jane Doe # 1, John Does #1-3, Hoda Mehrabi Mohammadabadi, OneAmerica, Pars Equality Center, Afshin Raghebi, Pamela Whitehall Raghebi, Siraji Etha Siraji, Maral Tabrizi. (Sung, Esther)
August 20, 2018 REFERRING #20 MOTION to Proceed Under Pseudonym to: Judge James L. Robart (TG)
August 20, 2018 Judge James L. Robart added. Case transferred as related to C17-178JLR. (TG)
August 8, 2018 Filing 49 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by OneAmerica (Fickes, Aaron)
August 8, 2018 Filing 48 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Malayeen Ahmed, Reza Azimi, Yahya Ghaleb, Mitra Hannani, Nicholas Hanout, Zeinab Mohamed Hassan, Hossein Zamani Hosseinabadi, Jane Doe # 1, John Does #1-3, OneAmerica, Pars Equality Center, Afshin Raghebi, Pamela Whitehall Raghebi, Siraji Etha Siraji (Fickes, Aaron)
August 6, 2018 Filing 47 Affidavit of Service of Summons and Complaint CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Plaintiffs Malayeen Ahmed, Reza Azimi, Yahya Ghaleb, Mitra Hannani, Nicholas Hanout, Zeinab Mohamed Hassan, Hossein Zamani Hosseinabadi, Jane Doe # 1, John Does #1-3, Hoda Mehrabi Mohammadabadi, OneAmerica, Pars Equality Center, Afshin Raghebi, Pamela Whitehall Raghebi, Siraji Etha Siraji, Maral Tabrizi re #5 Praecipe for a Summons, Summons on Department of Homeland Security (Walder, Jessica) Modified on 8/17/2018 to correct docket event (SP).
August 6, 2018 Filing 46 Affidavit of Service of Summons and Complaint CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Plaintiffs Malayeen Ahmed, Reza Azimi, Yahya Ghaleb, Mitra Hannani, Nicholas Hanout, Zeinab Mohamed Hassan, Hossein Zamani Hosseinabadi, Jane Doe # 1, John Does #1-3, Hoda Mehrabi Mohammadabadi, OneAmerica, Pars Equality Center, Afshin Raghebi, Pamela Whitehall Raghebi, Siraji Etha Siraji, Maral Tabrizi re #6 Praecipe for a Summons, Summons on US Department of State (Walder, Jessica) Modified on 8/17/2018 to correct docket event (SP).
August 6, 2018 Filing 45 Affidavit of Service of Summons and Complaint CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Plaintiffs Malayeen Ahmed, Reza Azimi, Yahya Ghaleb, Mitra Hannani, Nicholas Hanout, Zeinab Mohamed Hassan, Hossein Zamani Hosseinabadi, Jane Doe # 1, John Does #1-3, Hoda Mehrabi Mohammadabadi, OneAmerica, Pars Equality Center, Afshin Raghebi, Pamela Whitehall Raghebi, Siraji Etha Siraji, Maral Tabrizi re #7 Praecipe for a Summons, Summons on US Customs and Border Protection (Walder, Jessica) Modified on 8/17/2018 to correct docket event (SP).
August 6, 2018 Filing 44 Affidavit of Service of Summons and Complaint CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Plaintiffs Malayeen Ahmed, Reza Azimi, Yahya Ghaleb, Mitra Hannani, Nicholas Hanout, Zeinab Mohamed Hassan, Hossein Zamani Hosseinabadi, Jane Doe # 1, John Does #1-3, Hoda Mehrabi Mohammadabadi, OneAmerica, Pars Equality Center, Afshin Raghebi, Pamela Whitehall Raghebi, Siraji Etha Siraji, Maral Tabrizi re #3 Praecipe for a Summons, Summons on Kirstjen Nielsen (Walder, Jessica) Modified on 8/17/2018 to correct docket event (SP).
August 6, 2018 Filing 43 Affidavit of Service of Summons and Complaint CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Plaintiffs Malayeen Ahmed, Reza Azimi, Yahya Ghaleb, Mitra Hannani, Nicholas Hanout, Zeinab Mohamed Hassan, Hossein Zamani Hosseinabadi, Jane Doe # 1, John Does #1-3, Hoda Mehrabi Mohammadabadi, OneAmerica, Pars Equality Center, Afshin Raghebi, Pamela Whitehall Raghebi, Siraji Etha Siraji, Maral Tabrizi Attorney General, Washington State (Walder, Jessica) Modified on 8/17/2018 to correct docket event (SP).
August 6, 2018 Filing 42 Affidavit of Service of Summons and Complaint CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Plaintiffs Malayeen Ahmed, Reza Azimi, Yahya Ghaleb, Mitra Hannani, Nicholas Hanout, Zeinab Mohamed Hassan, Hossein Zamani Hosseinabadi, Jane Doe # 1, John Does #1-3, Hoda Mehrabi Mohammadabadi, OneAmerica, Pars Equality Center, Afshin Raghebi, Pamela Whitehall Raghebi, Siraji Etha Siraji, Maral Tabrizi re #2 Praecipe for a Summons, Summons Mike Pompeo (Walder, Jessica) Modified on 8/17/2018 to correct docket event (SP).
August 6, 2018 Filing 41 Affidavit of Service of Summons and Complaint CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Plaintiffs Malayeen Ahmed, Reza Azimi, Yahya Ghaleb, Mitra Hannani, Nicholas Hanout, Zeinab Mohamed Hassan re #4 Summons on Kevin McAleenan (Walder, Jessica) Modified on 8/8/2018 to add document relationship (SP). Modified on 8/17/2018 to correct docket event (SP).
August 3, 2018 Filing 40 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to party(s) Hoda Mehrabi Mohammadabadi and Maral Tabrizi, filed by Plaintiffs Malayeen Ahmed, Reza Azimi, Yahya Ghaleb, Mitra Hannani, Nicholas Hanout, Zeinab Mohamed Hassan, Hossein Zamani Hosseinabadi, Jane Doe # 1, John Does #1-3, Hoda Mehrabi Mohammadabadi, OneAmerica, Pars Equality Center, Afshin Raghebi, Pamela Whitehall Raghebi, Siraji Etha Siraji, Maral Tabrizi. (Walder, Jessica)
August 1, 2018 Filing 39 NOTICE of Related Case(s) 2:17-cv-0178-JLR, by Plaintiffs Malayeen Ahmed, Reza Azimi, Yahya Ghaleb, Mitra Hannani, Nicholas Hanout, Zeinab Mohamed Hassan, Hossein Zamani Hosseinabadi, Jane Doe # 1, John Does #1-3, Hoda Mehrabi Mohammadabadi, OneAmerica, Pars Equality Center, Afshin Raghebi, Pamela Whitehall Raghebi, Siraji Etha Siraji. (Walder, Jessica)
August 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER re #19 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Christina Sinha for Plaintiffs Malayeen Ahmed, Reza Azimi, Yahya Ghaleb, Mitra Hannani, Nicholas Hanout, Zeinab Mohamed Hassan, Hossein Zamani Hosseinabadi, Jane Doe # 1, John Does #1-3, Hoda Mehrabi Mohammadabadi, OneAmerica, Pars Equality Center, Afshin Raghebi, Pamela Whitehall Raghebi, and Siraji Etha Siraji, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
August 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER re #18 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Elica S Vafaie for Plaintiffs Malayeen Ahmed, Reza Azimi, Yahya Ghaleb, Mitra Hannani, Nicholas Hanout, Zeinab Mohamed Hassan, Hossein Zamani Hosseinabadi, Jane Doe # 1, John Does #1-3, Hoda Mehrabi Mohammadabadi, OneAmerica, Pars Equality Center, Afshin Raghebi, Pamela Whitehall Raghebi, and Siraji Etha Siraji, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
August 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER re #17 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Nicholas Espiritu for Plaintiffs Malayeen Ahmed, Reza Azimi, Yahya Ghaleb, Mitra Hannani, Nicholas Hanout, Zeinab Mohamed Hassan, Hossein Zamani Hosseinabadi, Jane Doe # 1, John Does #1-3, Hoda Mehrabi Mohammadabadi, OneAmerica, Pars Equality Center, Afshin Raghebi, Pamela Whitehall Raghebi, and Siraji Etha Siraji, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
August 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER re #16 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Melissa S. Keaney for Plaintiffs Malayeen Ahmed, Reza Azimi, Yahya Ghaleb, Mitra Hannani, Nicholas Hanout, Zeinab Mohamed Hassan, Hossein Zamani Hosseinabadi, Jane Doe # 1, John Does #1-3, Hoda Mehrabi Mohammadabadi, OneAmerica, Pars Equality Center, Afshin Raghebi, Pamela Whitehall Raghebi, and Siraji Etha Siraji, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
August 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER re #15 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice,. The Court ADMITS Attorney John A Freedman for Plaintiffs Malayeen Ahmed, Reza Azimi, Yahya Ghaleb, Mitra Hannani, Nicholas Hanout, Zeinab Mohamed Hassan, Hossein Zamani Hosseinabadi, Jane Doe # 1, John Does #1-3, Hoda Mehrabi Mohammadabadi, OneAmerica, Pars Equality Center, Afshin Raghebi,John Pamela Whitehall Raghebi, and Siraji Etha Siraji, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
August 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER re #14 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Esther Sung for Plaintiffs Malayeen Ahmed, Reza Azimi, Yahya Ghaleb, Mitra Hannani, Nicholas Hanout, Zeinab Mohamed Hassan, Hossein Zamani Hosseinabadi, Jane Doe # 1, John Does #1-3, Hoda Mehrabi Mohammadabadi, OneAmerica, Pars Equality Center, Afshin Raghebi, Pamela Whitehall Raghebi, and Siraji Etha Siraji, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS) Modified on 8/1/2018 to add plaintiff Malayeen Ahmed to list of represented parties (GMR).
August 1, 2018 Filing 32 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) (Main document - summons - Michael Pompeo) (Attachments: #1 Kirstjen Nielsen, #2 Kevin McAleenan, #3 U S Department of Homeland Security, #4 U S Department of State, #5 U S Customs and Border Protection)(CDA)
August 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER re #13 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Zahra A Billoo for Plaintiffs Malayeen Ahmed, Reza Azimi, Yahya Ghaleb, Mitra Hannani, Nicholas Hanout, Zeinab Mohamed Hassan, Hossein Zamani Hosseinabadi, Jane Doe # 1, John Does #1-3, Hoda Mehrabi Mohammadabadi, OneAmerica, Pars Equality Center, Afshin Raghebi, Pamela Whitehall Raghebi, and for Siraji Etha Siraji, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
August 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER re #12 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Joshua Stehlik for Plaintiffs Malayeen Ahmed, Reza Azimi, Yahya Ghaleb, Mitra Hannani, Nicholas Hanout, Zeinab Mohamed Hassan, Hossein Zamani Hosseinabadi, Jane Doe # 1, John Does #1-3, Hoda Mehrabi Mohammadabadi, OneAmerica, Pars Equality Center, Afshin Raghebi, Pamela Whitehall Raghebi, and Siraji Etha Siraji, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
August 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER re #11 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Brittney Rezaei for Plaintiffs Malayeen Ahmed, Reza Azimi, Yahya Ghaleb, Mitra Hannani, Nicholas Hanout, Zeinab Mohamed Hassan, Hossein Zamani Hosseinabadi, Jane Doe # 1, John Does #1-3, Hoda Mehrabi Mohammadabadi, OneAmerica Pars Equality Center, Afshin Raghebi, Pamela Whitehall Raghebi, and Siraji Etha Siraji, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
August 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER re #10 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Dustin J O'Quinn for Plaintiffs Malayeen Ahmed, Reza Azimi, Yahya Ghaleb, Mitra Hannani, Nicholas Hanout, Zeinab Mohamed Hassan, Hossein Zamani Hosseinabadi, Jane Doe # 1, John Does #1-3, Hoda Mehrabi Mohammadabadi, OneAmerica, Pars Equality Center, for Afshin Raghebi, Pamela Whitehall Raghebi and Siraji Etha Siraji, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
August 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER re #9 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Jana Whalley for Plaintiffs Malayeen Ahmed, Reza Azimi, Yahya Ghaleb, Mitra Hannani, Nicholas Hanout, Zeinab Mohamed Hassan, Hossein Zamani Hosseinabadi, JANE DOE #1, JOHN DOES #1-3, Hoda Mehrabi Mohammadabadi, OneAmerica, Pars Equality Center, PAMELA WHITEHALL RAGHEBI, Afshin Raghebi, and SIRAJI ETHA SIRAJI, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
August 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER re #8 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Babak G Yousefzadeh for Plaintiffs Malayeen Ahmed, Reza Azimi, Yahya Ghaleb, Mitra Hannani, Nicholas Hanout, Zeinab Mohamed Hassan, Hossein Zamani Hosseinabadi, Jane Doe #1, John Does #1-3, Hoda Mehrabi Mohammadabadi, OneAmerica, Pars Equality Center, Pamela Whitehall Raghebi, Afshin Raghebi,and Siraji Etha Siraji, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS) Modified on 8/1/2018 (GMR).
August 1, 2018 Judge Benjamin H. Settle added. (CDA)
August 1, 2018 NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Pars Equality Center and OneAmerica must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 8/8/2018 (if applicable). (CDA)
July 31, 2018 Plaintiff Maral Tabrizi (omitted from caption of complaint; first named on page 8, at No. 38) added to case. (SP)
July 31, 2018 Filing 25 DECLARATION of Jessica N. Walder filed by Plaintiffs Malayeen Ahmed, Reza Azimi, Yahya Ghaleb, Mitra Hannani, Nicholas Hanout, Zeinab Mohamed Hassan, Hossein Zamani Hosseinabadi, Jane Doe #1, John Does #1-3, Hoda Mehrabi Mohammadabadi, OneAmerica, Pars Equality Center, Afshin Raghebi, Pamela Whitehall Raghebi, and Siraji Etha Siraji re #20 MOTION to Proceed Under Pseudonym re #1 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, p. 6-9, #2 Exhibit B, p. 10-15, #3 Exhibit C, p. 6-19, #4 Exhibit D, p. 20-25, #5 Exhibit E, p. 26-86, #6 Exhibit F, p. 87-111, #7 Exhibit G, p. 112-116, #8 Exhibit H, p. 117-119, #9 Exhibit I, p. 120-125, #10 Exhibit J, p. 126-129)(Walder, Jessica) Modified on 8/2/2018 (GMR).
July 31, 2018 Filing 24 DECLARATION of Jane Doe 1 filed by Plaintiffs Malayeen Ahmed, Reza Azimi, Yahya Ghaleb, Mitra Hannani, Nicholas Hanout, Zeinab Mohamed Hassan, Hossein Zamani Hosseinabadi, Jane Doe # 1, John Does #1-3, Hoda Mehrabi Mohammadabadi, OneAmerica, Pars Equality Center, Afshin Raghebi, Pamela Whitehall Raghebi and Siraji Etha Siraji re #20 Motion to Proceed Under Pseudonym re #1 Complaint. (Walder, Jessica) Modified on 8/1/2018 (GMR).
July 31, 2018 Filing 23 DECLARATION of John Doe 3 filed by Plaintiffs Malayeen Ahmed, Reza Azimi, Yahya Ghaleb, Mitra Hannani, Nicholas Hanout, Zeinab Mohamed Hassan, Hossein Zamani Hosseinabadi, Jane Doe # 1, John Does #1-3, Hoda Mehrabi Mohammadabadi, OneAmerica, Pars Equality Center, Afshin Raghebi, Pamela Whitehall Raghebi and Siraji Etha Siraji re #20 Motion to Proceed Under Pseudonym re #1 Complaint. (Walder, Jessica) Modified on 8/1/2018 (GMR).
July 31, 2018 Filing 22 DECLARATION of John Doe 2 filed by Plaintiffs Malayeen Ahmed, Reza Azimi, Yahya Ghaleb, Mitra Hannani, Nicholas Hanout, Zeinab Mohamed Hassan, Hossein Zamani Hosseinabadi, Jane Doe #1, John Does #1-3, Hoda Mehrabi Mohammadabadi, OneAmerica, Pars Equality Center, Afshin Raghebi, Pamela Whitehall Raghebi, and Siraji Etha Siraji re #20 Motion to Proceed Under Pseudonym re #1 Complaint. (Walder, Jessica) Modified on 8/1/2018 (GMR).
July 31, 2018 Filing 21 DECLARATION of John Doe 1 filed by Plaintiffs Malayeen Ahmed, Reza Azimi, Yahya Ghaleb, Mitra Hannani, Nicholas Hanout, Zeinab Mohamed Hassan, Hossein Zamani Hosseinabadi, Jane Doe #1, John Does #1-3, Hoda Mehrabi Mohammadabadi, OneAmerica, Pars Equality Center, Afshin Raghebi, Pamela Whitehall Raghebi, and Siraji Etha Siraji re #20 Motion to Proceed Under Pseudonym re #1 Complaint. (Walder, Jessica) Modified on 8/1/2018 (GMR).
July 31, 2018 Filing 20 MOTION to Proceed Under Pseudonym re #1 Complaint, filed by Plaintiffs Malayeen Ahmed, Reza Azimi, Yahya Ghaleb, Mitra Hannani, Nicholas Hanout, Zeinab Mohamed Hassan, Hossein Zamani Hosseinabadi, Jane Doe #1, John Does #1-3, Hoda Mehrabi Mohammadabadi, OneAmerica, Pars Equality Center, Afshin Raghebi, Pamela Whitehall Raghebi, and Siraji Etha Siraji. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 8/17/2018, (Walder, Jessica) Modified on 8/1/2018 to remove duplicate text, correct parties entered in ALL CAPS, and update text so as to better describe attached document (GMR).
July 31, 2018 Filing 19 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Christina Sinha FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Malayeen Ahmed, Reza Azimi, Yahya Ghaleb, Mitra Hannani, Nicholas Hanout, Zeinab Mohamed Hassan, Hossein Zamani Hosseinabadi, Jane Doe #1, John Does #1-3, Hoda Mehrabi Mohammadabadi, OneAmerica, Pars Equality Center, Afshin Raghebi, Pamela Whitehall Raghebi, and Siraji Etha Siraji. (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5417207 (Walder, Jessica) Modified on 8/2/2018 (GMR).
July 31, 2018 Filing 18 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Elica S. Vafaie FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Malayeen Ahmed, Reza Azimi, Yahya Ghaleb, Mitra Hannani, Nicholas Hanout, Zeinab Mohamed Hassan, Hossein Zamani Hosseinabadi, Jane Doe #1, John Does #1-3, Hoda Mehrabi Mohammadabadi, OneAmerica, Pars Equality Center, Afshin Raghebi, Pamela Whitehall Raghebi, and Siraji Etha Siraji. (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5417204 (Walder, Jessica) Modified on 8/2/2018 (GMR).
July 31, 2018 Filing 17 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Nicholas Espiritu FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Malayeen Ahmed, Reza Azimi, Yahya Ghaleb, Mitra Hannani, Nicholas Hanout, Zeinab Mohamed Hassan, Hossein Zamani Hosseinabadi, Jane Doe #1, John Does #1-3, Hoda Mehrabi Mohammadabadi, OneAmerica, Pars Equality Center, Afshin Raghebi, Pamela Whitehall Raghebi, and Siraji Etha Siraji. (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5417185 (Walder, Jessica) Modified on 8/2/2018 (GMR).
July 31, 2018 Filing 16 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Melissa S. Keaney FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Malayeen Ahmed, Reza Azimi, Yahya Ghaleb, Mitra Hannani, Nicholas Hanout, Zeinab Mohamed Hassan, Hossein Zamani Hosseinabadi, Jane Doe #1, John Does #1-3, Hoda Mehrabi Mohammadabadi, OneAmerica, Pars Equality Center, Afshin Raghebi, Pamela Whitehall Raghebi, and Siraji Etha Siraji. (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5417174 (Walder, Jessica) Modified on 8/2/2018 (GMR).
July 31, 2018 Filing 15 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY John A. Freedman FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Malayeen Ahmed, Reza Azimi, Yahya Ghaleb, Mitra Hannani, Nicholas Hanout, Zeinab Mohamed Hassan, Hossein Zamani Hosseinabadi, Jane Doe #1, John Does #1-3, Hoda Mehrabi Mohammadabadi, OneAmerica, Pars Equality Center, Afshin Raghebi, Pamela Whitehall Raghebi, and Siraji Etha Siraji. (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5417171 (Walder, Jessica) Modified on 8/2/2018 (GMR).
July 31, 2018 Filing 14 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Esther H. Sung FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Malayeen Ahmed, Reza Azimi, Yahya Ghaleb, Mitra Hannani, Nicholas Hanout, Zeinab Mohamed Hassan, Hossein Zamani Hosseinabadi, Jane Doe #1, John Does #1-3, Hoda Mehrabi Mohammadabadi, OneAmerica, Pars Equality Center, Afshin Raghebi, Pamela Whitehall Raghebi, and Siraji Etha Siraji. (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5417168 (Walder, Jessica) Modified on 8/2/2018 (GMR).
July 31, 2018 Filing 13 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Zahra A. Billoo FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Malayeen Ahmed, Reza Azimi, Yahya Ghaleb, Mitra Hannani, Nicholas Hanout, Zeinab Mohamed Hassan, Hossein Zamani Hosseinabadi, Jane Doe #1, John Does #1-3, Hoda Mehrabi Mohammadabadi, OneAmerica, Pars Equality Center, Afshin Raghebi, Pamela Whitehall Raghebi, and Siraji Etha Siraji. (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5417165 (Walder, Jessica) Modified on 8/2/2018 (GMR).
July 31, 2018 Filing 12 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Joshua Stehlik FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Malayeen Ahmed, Reza Azimi, Yahya Ghaleb, Mitra Hannani, Nicholas Hanout, Zeinab Mohamed Hassan, Hossein Zamani Hosseinabadi, Jane Doe #1, John Does #1-3, Hoda Mehrabi Mohammadabadi, OneAmerica, Pars Equality Center, Afshin Raghebi, Pamela Whitehall Raghebi, and Siraji Etha Siraji. (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5417164 (Walder, Jessica) Modified on 8/2/2018 (GMR).
July 31, 2018 Filing 11 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Brittney Rezaei FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Malayeen Ahmed, Reza Azimi, Yahya Ghaleb, Mitra Hannani, Nicholas Hanout, Zeinab Mohamed Hassan, Hossein Zamani Hosseinabadi, Jane Doe #1, John Does #1-3, Hoda Mehrabi Mohammadabadi, OneAmerica, Pars Equality Center, Afshin Raghebi, Pamela Whitehall Raghebi, and Siraji Etha Siraji. (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5417163 (Walder, Jessica) Modified on 8/2/2018 (GMR).
July 31, 2018 Filing 10 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Dustin J. O'Quinn FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Malayeen Ahmed, Reza Azimi, Yahya Ghaleb, Mitra Hannani, Nicholas Hanout, Zeinab Mohamed Hassan, Hossein Zamani Hosseinabadi, Jane Doe #1, John Does #1-3, Hoda Mehrabi Mohammadabadi, OneAmerica, Pars Equality Center, Afshin Raghebi, Pamela Whitehall Raghebi, and Siraji Etha Siraji. (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5417158 (Walder, Jessica) Modified on 8/2/2018 (GMR).
July 31, 2018 Filing 9 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Jana Whalley FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Malayeen Ahmed, Reza Azimi, Yahya Ghaleb, Mitra Hannani, Nicholas Hanout, Zeinab Mohamed Hassan, Hossein Zamani Hosseinabadi, Jane Doe #1, John Does #1-3, Hoda Mehrabi Mohammadabadi, OneAmerica, Pars Equality Center, Afshin Raghebi, Pamela Whitehall Raghebi, and Siraji Etha Siraji. (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5417146 (Walder, Jessica) Modified on 8/2/2018 (GMR).
July 31, 2018 Filing 8 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Babak G. Yousefzadeh FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Malayeen Ahmed, Reza Azimi, Yahya Ghaleb, Mitra Hannani, Nicholas Hanout, Zeinab Mohamed Hassan, Hossein Zamani Hosseinabadi, Jane Doe #1, John Does #1-3, Hoda Mehrabi Mohammadabadi, OneAmerica, Pars Equality Center, Afshin Raghebi, Pamela Whitehall Raghebi, and Siraji Etha Siraji. (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5417136 (Walder, Jessica) Modified on 8/2/2018 (GMR).
July 31, 2018 Filing 7 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS re U.S. Customs and Border Protection by Plaintiffs Malayeen Ahmed, Reza Azimi, Yahya Ghaleb, Mitra Hannani, Nicholas Hanout, Zeinab Mohamed Hassan, Hossein Zamani Hosseinabadi, Jane Doe #1, John Does #1-3, Hoda Mehrabi Mohammadabadi, OneAmerica, Pars Equality Center, Afshin Raghebi, Pamela Whitehall Raghebi, and Siraji Etha Siraji. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Walder, Jessica) Modified on 8/2/2018 (GMR).
July 31, 2018 Filing 6 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS re U.S. Department of State by Plaintiffs Malayeen Ahmed, Reza Azimi, Yahya Ghaleb, Mitra Hannani, Nicholas Hanout, Zeinab Mohamed Hassan, Hossein Zamani Hosseinabadi, Jane Doe #1, John Does #1-3, Hoda Mehrabi Mohammadabadi, OneAmerica, Pars Equality Center, Afshin Raghebi, Pamela Whitehall Raghebi, and Siraji Etha Siraji. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Walder, Jessica) Modified on 8/2/2018 (GMR).
July 31, 2018 Filing 5 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS re Department of Homeland Security by Plaintiffs Malayeen Ahmed, Reza Azimi, Yahya Ghaleb, Mitra Hannani, Nicholas Hanout, Zeinab Mohamed Hassan, Hossein Zamani Hosseinabadi, Jane Doe #1, John Does #1-3, Hoda Mehrabi Mohammadabadi, OneAmerica, Pars Equality Center, Afshin Raghebi, Pamela Whitehall Raghebi, and Siraji Etha Siraji. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Walder, Jessica) Modified on 8/2/2018 (GMR).
July 31, 2018 Filing 4 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS re Kevin K. McAleenan by Plaintiffs Malayeen Ahmed, Reza Azimi, Yahya Ghaleb, Mitra Hannani, Nicholas Hanout, Zeinab Mohamed Hassan, Hossein Zamani Hosseinabadi, Jane Doe #1, John Does #1-3, Hoda Mehrabi Mohammadabadi, OneAmerica, Pars Equality Center, Afshin Raghebi, Pamela Whitehall Raghebi, and Siraji Etha Siraji. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Walder, Jessica) Modified on 8/2/2018 (GMR).
July 31, 2018 Filing 3 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS re Kirstjen Nielsen by Plaintiffs Malayeen Ahmed, Reza Azimi, Yahya Ghaleb, Mitra Hannani, Nicholas Hanout, Zeinab Mohamed Hassan, Hossein Zamani Hosseinabadi, Jane Doe #1, John Does #1-3, Hoda Mehrabi Mohammadabadi, OneAmerica, Pars Equality Center, Afshin Raghebi, Pamela Whitehall Raghebi, and Siraji Etha Siraji. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Walder, Jessica) Modified on 8/2/2018 (GMR).
July 31, 2018 Filing 2 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS re Mike Pompeo by Plaintiffs Malayeen Ahmed, Reza Azimi, Yahya Ghaleb, Mitra Hannani, Nicholas Hanout, Zeinab Mohamed Hassan, Hossein Zamani Hosseinabadi, Jane Doe #1, John Does #1-3, Hoda Mehrabi Mohammadabadi, OneAmerica, Pars Equality Center, Afshin Raghebi, Pamela Whitehall Raghebi, and Siraji Etha Siraji. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Walder, Jessica) Modified on 8/2/2018 (GMR).
July 31, 2018 Filing 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Receipt # 0981-5416939), filed by Malayeen Ahmed, Reza Azimi, Yahya Ghaleb, Mitra Hannani, Nicholas Hanout, Zeinab Mohamed Hassan, Hossein Zamani Hosseinabadi, Jane Doe # 1, John Does #1-3, Hoda Mehrabi Mohammadabadi, OneAmerica, Pars Equality Center, Afshin Raghebi, Pamela Whitehall Raghebi and Siraji Etha Siraji. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibits A-C)(Walder, Jessica) Modified on 8/1/2018 to remove duplicate text re attorney and modify party names originally entered in ALL CAPS (GMR).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pars Equality Center et al v. Pompeo et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S Customs and Border Protection
Represented By: Gisela A Westwater
Represented By: David Kim
Represented By: David Kim,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Gisela A Westwater
Represented By: David Kim
Represented By: David Kim,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Pompeo
Represented By: Gisela A Westwater
Represented By: David Kim
Represented By: David Kim,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S Department of State
Represented By: Gisela A Westwater
Represented By: David Kim
Represented By: David Kim,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin K. McAleenan
Represented By: Gisela A Westwater
Represented By: David Kim
Represented By: David Kim,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary Kirstjen M Nielsen
Represented By: Gisela A Westwater
Represented By: David Kim
Represented By: David Kim,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe # 1
Represented By: Esther Sung
Represented By: Nicholas Espiritu
Represented By: Babak G. Yousefzadeh
Represented By: John A. Freedman
Represented By: Zahra A Billoo
Represented By: Dustin J O'Quinn
Represented By: Elica S Vafaie
Represented By: Darin M Sands
Represented By: Jana Whalley
Represented By: Melissa S. Keaney
Represented By: Joshua Stehlik
Represented By: Jessica Walder
Represented By: Christina Sinha
Represented By: Brittney Rezaei
Represented By: Aaron J. Fickes
Represented By: Esther Hsiao-In Sung,
Represented By: Aaron John Fickes,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Hanout
Represented By: Esther Sung
Represented By: Nicholas Espiritu
Represented By: Babak G. Yousefzadeh
Represented By: John A. Freedman
Represented By: Zahra A Billoo
Represented By: Dustin J O'Quinn
Represented By: Elica S Vafaie
Represented By: Darin M Sands
Represented By: Jana Whalley
Represented By: Melissa S. Keaney
Represented By: Joshua Stehlik
Represented By: Jessica Walder
Represented By: Christina Sinha
Represented By: Brittney Rezaei
Represented By: Aaron J. Fickes
Represented By: Esther Hsiao-In Sung,
Represented By: Aaron John Fickes,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Afshin Raghebi
Represented By: Esther Sung
Represented By: Nicholas Espiritu
Represented By: Babak G. Yousefzadeh
Represented By: John A. Freedman
Represented By: Zahra A Billoo
Represented By: Dustin J O'Quinn
Represented By: Elica S Vafaie
Represented By: Darin M Sands
Represented By: Jana Whalley
Represented By: Melissa S. Keaney
Represented By: Joshua Stehlik
Represented By: Jessica Walder
Represented By: Christina Sinha
Represented By: Brittney Rezaei
Represented By: Aaron J. Fickes
Represented By: Esther Hsiao-In Sung,
Represented By: Aaron John Fickes,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Siraji Etha Siraji
Represented By: Esther Sung
Represented By: Nicholas Espiritu
Represented By: Babak G. Yousefzadeh
Represented By: John A. Freedman
Represented By: Zahra A Billoo
Represented By: Dustin J O'Quinn
Represented By: Elica S Vafaie
Represented By: Darin M Sands
Represented By: Jana Whalley
Represented By: Melissa S. Keaney
Represented By: Joshua Stehlik
Represented By: Jessica Walder
Represented By: Christina Sinha
Represented By: Brittney Rezaei
Represented By: Aaron J. Fickes
Represented By: Esther Hsiao-In Sung,
Represented By: Aaron John Fickes,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN DOES #1-3
Represented By: Esther Sung
Represented By: Nicholas Espiritu
Represented By: Babak G. Yousefzadeh
Represented By: John A. Freedman
Represented By: Zahra A Billoo
Represented By: Dustin J O'Quinn
Represented By: Elica S Vafaie
Represented By: Darin M Sands
Represented By: Jana Whalley
Represented By: Melissa S. Keaney
Represented By: Joshua Stehlik
Represented By: Jessica Walder
Represented By: Christina Sinha
Represented By: Brittney Rezaei
Represented By: Aaron J. Fickes
Represented By: Esther Hsiao-In Sung,
Represented By: Aaron John Fickes,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maral Tabrizi
Represented By: Esther Sung
Represented By: Nicholas Espiritu
Represented By: Babak G. Yousefzadeh
Represented By: John A. Freedman
Represented By: Elica S Vafaie
Represented By: Zahra A Billoo
Represented By: Dustin J O'Quinn
Represented By: Darin M Sands
Represented By: Jana Whalley
Represented By: Melissa S. Keaney
Represented By: Joshua Stehlik
Represented By: Jessica Walder
Represented By: Christina Sinha
Represented By: Brittney Rezaei
Represented By: Aaron J. Fickes
Represented By: Esther Hsiao-In Sung,
Represented By: Aaron John Fickes,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Malayeen Ahmed
Represented By: Esther Sung
Represented By: Nicholas Espiritu
Represented By: Babak G. Yousefzadeh
Represented By: John A. Freedman
Represented By: Zahra A Billoo
Represented By: Dustin J O'Quinn
Represented By: Elica S Vafaie
Represented By: Darin M Sands
Represented By: Jana Whalley
Represented By: Melissa S. Keaney
Represented By: Joshua Stehlik
Represented By: Jessica Walder
Represented By: Christina Sinha
Represented By: Brittney Rezaei
Represented By: Aaron J. Fickes
Represented By: Esther Hsiao-In Sung,
Represented By: Aaron John Fickes,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mitra Hannani
Represented By: Esther Sung
Represented By: Nicholas Espiritu
Represented By: Babak G. Yousefzadeh
Represented By: John A. Freedman
Represented By: Zahra A Billoo
Represented By: Dustin J O'Quinn
Represented By: Elica S Vafaie
Represented By: Darin M Sands
Represented By: Jana Whalley
Represented By: Melissa S. Keaney
Represented By: Joshua Stehlik
Represented By: Jessica Walder
Represented By: Christina Sinha
Represented By: Brittney Rezaei
Represented By: Aaron J. Fickes
Represented By: Esther Hsiao-In Sung,
Represented By: Aaron John Fickes,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hossein Zamani Hosseinabadi
Represented By: Esther Sung
Represented By: Nicholas Espiritu
Represented By: Babak G. Yousefzadeh
Represented By: John A. Freedman
Represented By: Zahra A Billoo
Represented By: Dustin J O'Quinn
Represented By: Elica S Vafaie
Represented By: Darin M Sands
Represented By: Jana Whalley
Represented By: Melissa S. Keaney
Represented By: Joshua Stehlik
Represented By: Jessica Walder
Represented By: Christina Sinha
Represented By: Brittney Rezaei
Represented By: Aaron J. Fickes
Represented By: Esther Hsiao-In Sung,
Represented By: Aaron John Fickes,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reza Azimi
Represented By: Esther Sung
Represented By: Nicholas Espiritu
Represented By: Babak G. Yousefzadeh
Represented By: John A. Freedman
Represented By: Zahra A Billoo
Represented By: Dustin J O'Quinn
Represented By: Elica S Vafaie
Represented By: Darin M Sands
Represented By: Jana Whalley
Represented By: Melissa S. Keaney
Represented By: Joshua Stehlik
Represented By: Jessica Walder
Represented By: Christina Sinha
Represented By: Brittney Rezaei
Represented By: Aaron J. Fickes
Represented By: Esther Hsiao-In Sung,
Represented By: Aaron John Fickes,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela Whitehall Raghebi
Represented By: Esther Sung
Represented By: Nicholas Espiritu
Represented By: Babak G. Yousefzadeh
Represented By: John A. Freedman
Represented By: Zahra A Billoo
Represented By: Dustin J O'Quinn
Represented By: Elica S Vafaie
Represented By: Darin M Sands
Represented By: Jana Whalley
Represented By: Melissa S. Keaney
Represented By: Joshua Stehlik
Represented By: Jessica Walder
Represented By: Christina Sinha
Represented By: Brittney Rezaei
Represented By: Aaron J. Fickes
Represented By: Esther Hsiao-In Sung,
Represented By: Aaron John Fickes,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yahya Ghaleb
Represented By: Esther Sung
Represented By: Nicholas Espiritu
Represented By: Babak G. Yousefzadeh
Represented By: John A. Freedman
Represented By: Zahra A Billoo
Represented By: Dustin J O'Quinn
Represented By: Elica S Vafaie
Represented By: Darin M Sands
Represented By: Jana Whalley
Represented By: Melissa S. Keaney
Represented By: Joshua Stehlik
Represented By: Jessica Walder
Represented By: Christina Sinha
Represented By: Brittney Rezaei
Represented By: Aaron J. Fickes
Represented By: Esther Hsiao-In Sung,
Represented By: Aaron John Fickes,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: OneAmerica
Represented By: Esther Sung
Represented By: Nicholas Espiritu
Represented By: Babak G. Yousefzadeh
Represented By: John A. Freedman
Represented By: Zahra A Billoo
Represented By: Dustin J O'Quinn
Represented By: Elica S Vafaie
Represented By: Darin M Sands
Represented By: Jana Whalley
Represented By: Melissa S. Keaney
Represented By: Joshua Stehlik
Represented By: Jessica Walder
Represented By: Christina Sinha
Represented By: Brittney Rezaei
Represented By: Aaron J. Fickes
Represented By: Esther Hsiao-In Sung,
Represented By: Aaron John Fickes,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hoda Mehrabi Mohammadabadi
Represented By: Esther Sung
Represented By: Nicholas Espiritu
Represented By: Babak G. Yousefzadeh
Represented By: John A. Freedman
Represented By: Zahra A Billoo
Represented By: Dustin J O'Quinn
Represented By: Elica S Vafaie
Represented By: Darin M Sands
Represented By: Jana Whalley
Represented By: Melissa S. Keaney
Represented By: Joshua Stehlik
Represented By: Jessica Walder
Represented By: Christina Sinha
Represented By: Brittney Rezaei
Represented By: Aaron J. Fickes
Represented By: Esther Hsiao-In Sung,
Represented By: Aaron John Fickes,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pars Equality Center
Represented By: Esther Sung
Represented By: Nicholas Espiritu
Represented By: Babak G. Yousefzadeh
Represented By: John A. Freedman
Represented By: Zahra A Billoo
Represented By: Dustin J O'Quinn
Represented By: Elica S Vafaie
Represented By: Darin M Sands
Represented By: Jana Whalley
Represented By: Melissa S. Keaney
Represented By: Joshua Stehlik
Represented By: Jessica Walder
Represented By: Christina Sinha
Represented By: Brittney Rezaei
Represented By: Aaron J. Fickes
Represented By: Esther Hsiao-In Sung,
Represented By: Aaron John Fickes,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zeinab Mohamed Hassan
Represented By: Esther Sung
Represented By: Nicholas Espiritu
Represented By: Babak G. Yousefzadeh
Represented By: John A. Freedman
Represented By: Zahra A Billoo
Represented By: Dustin J O'Quinn
Represented By: Elica S Vafaie
Represented By: Darin M Sands
Represented By: Jana Whalley
Represented By: Melissa S. Keaney
Represented By: Joshua Stehlik
Represented By: Jessica Walder
Represented By: Christina Sinha
Represented By: Brittney Rezaei
Represented By: Aaron J. Fickes
Represented By: Esther Hsiao-In Sung,
Represented By: Aaron John Fickes,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?