Rainsy v. Facebook, Inc. Featured Case

Former Cambodian opposition leader Sam Rainsy is asking a federal court in the US to require Facebook to release information related to Cambodian Prime Minister Hun Sen’s use of the social media platform.

Petitioner: Sam Rainsy
Respondent: Facebook, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2018mc80024
Filed: February 8, 2018
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Sallie Kim
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: Civil Miscellaneous Case
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 7, 2018 25 PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 4/30/2018 9:31:14 AM ]. File Size [ 16616 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:34:37 ]. (courtspeak).
May 4, 2018 24 Featured Case ORDER by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim denying 1 Application for Order Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1782 for Leave to Obtain Discovery. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2018)
May 3, 2018 23 Letter from J. Noah Hagey in Response to Respondents Unauthorized Filing (Dkt. No. 21). (Hagey, Jonas) (Filed on 5/3/2018)
May 2, 2018 22 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 4/30/2018 before Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim by Sam Rainsy, for Court Reporter Leo Mankiewicz. (Hagey, Jonas) (Filed on 5/2/2018)
May 2, 2018 21 Letter from Facebook, Inc. Responding to Applicant's Letter of May 1, 2018 . (Lipshutz, Joshua) (Filed on 5/2/2018)
May 2, 2018 20 Transcript of Proceedings held on 04/30/2018, before Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Court Reporter/Transcriber Leo T. Mankiewicz, CSR, RMR, CRR, telephone number (415) 722-7045; email: leomank@gmail.com. FTR 9:31 a.m. - 10:05 a.m. = 34 minutes. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re 18 Transcript Order ) Redaction Request due 5/23/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/4/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/31/2018. (Related documents(s) 18 ) (Mankiewicz, Leo) (Filed on 5/2/2018)
May 1, 2018 19 Letter from J. Noah Hagey re Applicants Supplemental Submission. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4)(Hagey, Jonas) (Filed on 5/1/2018)
April 30, 2018 18 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on April 30, 2018 before Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim by Facebook, Inc., for Court Reporter FTR - San Francisco. (Thomson, William) (Filed on 4/30/2018)
April 30, 2018 17 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim: Motion Hearing held on 4/30/2018 re 1 Ex Parte Application filed by Sam Rainsy. Petitioner's counsel may file the additional documents requested by the Court. The matter is taken under submission. The Court will issue a written order. (FTR Time: 9:31-10:05.) Attorney for Petitioner: J. Noah Hagey. Attorneys for Respondent: Joshua Lipshutz; Gregory Bok. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/30/2018) Modified on 4/30/2018: Matter transcribed by Leo Mankiewicz. (rjdS, COURT STAFF).
March 22, 2018 16 Declaration of Sin Soputhi Certifying Translations of Exhibits A, B, and G of the March 7, 2018 Declaration of Sam Rainsy filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Translations of Exhibits A, B, and G of the March 7, 2018 Declaration of Sam Rainsy)(Lipshutz, Joshua) (Filed on 3/22/2018)
March 13, 2018 15 CLERK'S NOTICE: Motion Hearing Re: 1 Ex Parte Application for Leave to Obtain Discovery for Use in Foreign Proceedings set for 4/30/2018 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom A, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2018)
March 7, 2018 14 Declaration of J. Noah Hagey in Support of 12 Reply to Opposition/Response filed bySam Rainsy. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10)(Related document(s) 12 ) (Hagey, Jonas) (Filed on 3/7/2018)
March 7, 2018 13 Declaration of Sam Rainsy in Support of 12 Reply to Opposition/Response filed bySam Rainsy. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G)(Related document(s) 12 ) (Hagey, Jonas) (Filed on 3/7/2018)
March 7, 2018 12 REPLY (re 1 Ex Parte Application for Order Pursuant to 28 U.S.C> Section 1782 Granting Leave to Obtain Discovery for Use in Foreign Proceedings) filed by Sam Rainsy. (Hagey, Jonas) (Filed on 3/7/2018)
March 1, 2018 11 Declaration of Sin Soputhi in Support of 10 Opposition/Response to Motion filed byFacebook, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits A - C)(Related document(s) 10 ) (Lipshutz, Joshua) (Filed on 3/1/2018)
March 1, 2018 10 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE to (re 1 Ex Parte Application for Leave to Obtain Discovery Under 28 U.S.C. Section 1782) filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Lipshutz, Joshua) (Filed on 3/1/2018)
February 27, 2018 9 CLERK'S NOTICE: The court has reviewed the motion to relate 6 and determined that cases 4:16-mc-80258-DMR Rainsy v. Chevron Corporation and 3:18-mc-80024-SK Rainsy v. Facebook, Inc. are not related and no reassignments shall occur. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2018)
February 27, 2018 8 NOTICE by Sam Rainsy of Lodging of Applicant's Opposition to Facebook, Inc.'s Motion to Relate Cases (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Hagey, Jonas) (Filed on 2/27/2018)
February 21, 2018 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Ex Parte Application, Supporting Declarations with Exhibits, and Order Setting Briefing Schedule served on Defendant Facebook, Inc. on 02/21/2018, filed by Sam Rainsy. (Hagey, Jonas) (Filed on 2/21/2018)
February 21, 2018 6 NOTICE by Facebook, Inc. of Lodging of Motion to Relate (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Notice of Lodging, # 2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Abbey Hudson and Exhibits)(Lipshutz, Joshua) (Filed on 2/21/2018)
February 16, 2018 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Abbey J. Hudson and for William E. Thomson, Joshua S. Lipshutz, and Tiaunia Henry (Hudson, Abbey) (Filed on 2/16/2018)
February 15, 2018 4 Featured Case ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE as to 1 Ex Parte Application. Responses due by 3/1/2018. Replies due by 3/7/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim on 2/15/2018. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2018)
February 8, 2018 3 Declaration of J. Noah Hagey in Support of 1 Ex Parte Application for an Order Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1782 Granting Leave to Obtain Discovery for Use in Foreign Proceedings filed by Sam Rainsy. (Related document(s) 1 ) (tnS) (Filed on 2/8/2018) (tnS, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/13/2018: # 1 Exhibits 1 - 5) (tnS, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/13/2018: # 2 exhibits 6 -11) (tnS, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/13/2018: # 3 Exhibits 12 - 17 & 17A) (tnS, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/13/2018: # 4 Exhibits 18 - 21) (tnS, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/13/2018: # 5 Exhibits 21A - 21C) (tnS, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/13/2018: # 6 Exhibits 22 - 24) (tnS, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/13/2018: # 7 Exhibits 24A - 24B) (tnS, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/13/2018: # 8 Exhibits 25 -26) (tnS, ).
February 8, 2018 2 Declaration of Sam Rainsy in Support of 1 Ex Parte Application for an Order Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1782 Granting Leave to Obtain Discovery for Use in Foreign Proceedings filed by Sam Rainsy. (Related document(s) 1 ) (tnS) (Filed on 2/8/2018) (tnS, ).
February 8, 2018 1 Ex Parte Application for Order Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1782 Granting Leave to Obtain Discovery for Use in Foreign Proceedings; Supporting Memorandum of Points & Authorities filed by Sam Rainsy. (tnS) (Filed on 2/8/2018) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/12/2018: # 1 Filing Fee Receipt) (tnS, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rainsy v. Facebook, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Sam Rainsy
Represented By: Matthew Brooks Borden
Represented By: Jonas Noah Hagey
Represented By: Richard John Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Facebook, Inc.
Represented By: Tiaunia Henry
Represented By: Abbey J. Hudson
Represented By: Joshua Seth Lipshutz
Represented By: William Edward Thomson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?