Johnson v. Equitable Investments et al

Plaintiff: Scott Johnson
Defendant: Tai Wah, Inc. and Equitable Investments
Case Number: 3:2019cv00170
Filed: January 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Vince Chhabria
Nature of Suit: American with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 20, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Amanda Lockhart Seabock (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Seabock, Amanda) (Filed on 2/20/2019)
February 19, 2019 Filing 10 STIPULATION re #9 Stipulation Further Stipulation To Extend Time For Defendant Tai Wah, Inc. To Answer or Otherwise Respond To Initial Complaint filed by Tai Wah, Inc.. (Scolari, Aaron) (Filed on 2/19/2019)
February 14, 2019 Filing 9 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, To Extend Time For Defendant Tai Wah, Inc. To Answer or Otherwise Respond To Initial Complaint filed by Tai Wah, Inc.. (Scolari, Aaron) (Filed on 2/14/2019)
January 30, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Scott Johnson. Tai Wah, Inc. served on 1/23/2019, answer due 2/13/2019. (Carson, Chris) (Filed on 1/30/2019)
January 14, 2019 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE scheduling deadline to file joint status report with the Court. Joint Status Report due by 7/10/2019. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2019)
January 11, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Equitable Investments, Tai Wah, Inc.. (msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2019)
January 11, 2019 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order for Cases Asserting Denial of Right of Access under Americans with Disabilities Act. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras (Attachments: #1 Supplement Notice of Eligibility for Video)(msrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2019)
January 10, 2019 Filing 4 Case assigned to Judge Vince Chhabria. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2019)
January 10, 2019 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. (Carson, Chris) (Filed on 1/10/2019)
January 10, 2019 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Scott Johnson re #1 Complaint, (Carson, Chris) (Filed on 1/10/2019)
January 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Damages And Injunctive Relief For Violations Of: Americans With Disabilities Act; Unruh Civil Rights Act against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-12989587.). Filed byScott Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Carson, Chris) (Filed on 1/10/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Equitable Investments et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tai Wah, Inc.
Represented By: Aaron Marcus Scolari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equitable Investments
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Johnson
Represented By: Chris Carson
Represented By: Amanda Lockhart Seabock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?