Green v. Covello

Defendant: P. Covello
Petitioner: Michael Green and Kevin Dean Brewer
Case Number: 3:2019cv00176
Filed: January 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: PSLC MWD
Referring Judge: William H Orrick
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 5, 2019 Filing 10 USCA Case Number 19-15204 for #8 Notice of Appeal, filed by Michael Green. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2019)
February 1, 2019 Filing 9 Letter post dated 1/25/19; from Michael Green re #7 Prisoner trust account. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2019)
February 1, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Michael Green. Appeal of Judgment #5 , Order Dismissing Case, #4 (IFP Request was previously e-filed with the Court and Granted on 01/16/19 as Docket Number #4 Order). (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2019) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/5/2019: #2 USCA NUMBER 18-15204) (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
January 28, 2019 Filing 7 Prison Trust Fund Account Statement; by Michael Green. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2019) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/29/2019: #1 Envelope) (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
January 17, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis ; filed by Michael Green. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2019)
January 16, 2019 Filing 5 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 1/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2019)
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF DISMISSAL - The pending petition is DISMISSED as second or successive. Petitioner's #2 application to proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 01/16/2019. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2019)
January 10, 2019 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE re completion of In Forma Pauperis affidavit or payment of filing fee due within 28 days. IFP Form due by 2/19/2019. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2019)
January 10, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis ; filed by Michael Green. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2019)
January 10, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus; (NO PROCESS); (IFP PENDING);. Filed byMichael Green. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Green v. Covello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P. Covello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Michael Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Kevin Dean Brewer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?