Quality Products, Inc. v. Kaur et al

Plaintiff: Quality Products, Inc.
Defendant: Sohna Foods, Inc., Sukhinder Singh and Indervir Kaur
Case Number: 3:2019cv00184
Filed: January 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Vince Chhabria
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1121
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 28, 2019 Filing 18 Declaration of Andrew P. Holland in Support of #17 Notice (Other) DECLARATION OF ANDREW P. HOLLAND IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT OF INDERVIR KAUR filed byQuality Products, Inc.. (Related document(s) #17 ) (Holland, Andrew) (Filed on 2/28/2019)
February 28, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for Entry of Default OF INDERVIR KAUR by Quality Products, Inc. (Holland, Andrew) (Filed on 2/28/2019) Modified on 3/1/2019 (fabS, COURT STAFF).
February 28, 2019 Filing 16 Declaration of Andrew P. Holland in Support of #15 Notice (Other) DECLARATION OF ANDREW P. HOLLAND IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT OF SUKHINDER SINGH filed byQuality Products, Inc.. (Related document(s) #15 ) (Holland, Andrew) (Filed on 2/28/2019)
February 28, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Entry of Default OF SUKHINDER SINGH by Quality Products, Inc. (Holland, Andrew) (Filed on 2/28/2019) Modified on 3/1/2019 (fabS, COURT STAFF).
February 28, 2019 Filing 14 Declaration of Andrew P. Holland in Support of #13 Notice (Other) DECLARATION OF ANDREW P. HOLLAND IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT OF SOHNA FOODS, INC. filed byQuality Products, Inc.. (Related document(s) #13 ) (Holland, Andrew) (Filed on 2/28/2019)
February 28, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Entry of Default OF SOHNA FOODS, INC. by Quality Products, Inc. (Holland, Andrew) (Filed on 2/28/2019) Modified on 3/1/2019 (fabS, COURT STAFF).
February 12, 2019 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons; Complaint; Standing Order for Civil Cases Before Judge Vince Chhabria; Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark; Standing Order for Civil Trials Before Judge Chhabria; Certification of Interested Entities or Persons; Civil Cover Sheet; Note of Eligibility for Video Recording; Order Setting Initial Case Management Conference and ADR Deadlines; Standing Order for All Judges of the Northern District of California served on Indervir Kaur on 2/4/19, filed by Quality Products, Inc.. (Holland, Andrew) (Filed on 2/12/2019)
February 12, 2019 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons; Complaint; Standing Order for Civil Cases Before Judge Vince Chhabria; Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark; Standing Order for Civil Trials Before Judge Chhabria; Certification of Interested Entities or Persons; Civil Cover Sheet; Note of Eligibility for Video Recording; Order Setting Initial Case Management Conference and ADR Deadlines; Standing Order for All Judges of the Northern District of California served on SOHNA Foods, Inc. on 1/30/19, filed by Quality Products, Inc.. (Holland, Andrew) (Filed on 2/12/2019)
February 12, 2019 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons; Complaint; Standing Order for Civil Cases Before Judge Vince Chhabria; Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark; Standing Order for Civil Trials Before Judge Chhabria; Certification of Interested Entities or Persons; Civil Cover Sheet; Note of Eligibility for Video Recording; Order Setting Initial Case Management Conference and ADR Deadlines; Standing Order for All Judges of the Northern District of California served on Sukhinder Singh on 2/4/19, filed by Quality Products, Inc.. (Holland, Andrew) (Filed on 2/12/2019)
January 11, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Indervir Kaur, Sukhinder Singh, Sohna Foods, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2019)
January 10, 2019 Filing 8 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras Case Management Statement due by 4/9/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/16/2019 10:00 AM. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2019)
January 10, 2019 Filing 7 Case assigned to Judge Vince Chhabria. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2019)
January 10, 2019 Filing 6 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding (cc: form mailed to register). (Attachments: #1 Complaint)(Holland, Andrew) (Filed on 1/10/2019)
January 10, 2019 Filing 5 Certificate of Interested Entities by Quality Products, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Kulwinder Dhillon for Quality Products, Inc.. (Holland, Andrew) (Filed on 1/10/2019)
January 10, 2019 Filing 4 Proposed Summons. (Holland, Andrew) (Filed on 1/10/2019)
January 10, 2019 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. (Holland, Andrew) (Filed on 1/10/2019)
January 10, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Holland, Andrew) (Filed on 1/10/2019)
January 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-12993388.). Filed byQuality Products, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Holland, Andrew) (Filed on 1/10/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Quality Products, Inc. v. Kaur et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sohna Foods, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sukhinder Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Indervir Kaur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Quality Products, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew Patrick Holland
Represented By: Juliene Drei Munar
Represented By: Misasha Suzuki Graham,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?