Freeman v. Ekso Bionics
Plaintiff: Joshua Freeman
Defendant: Ekso Bionics
Case Number: 3:2019cv00211
Filed: January 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Vince Chhabria
Referring Judge: Kandis A Westmore
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2019 Filing 19 REASSIGNED CASE - NOTICE OF NEW HEARING DATE: You are notified that the Court has scheduled an Initial Case Management Conference before Judge Vince Chhabria upon reassignment. For a copy of Judge Chhabria's Standing Order and other information, please refer to the Court's website at www.cand.uscourts.gov. Case Management Statement due by 4/9/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/16/2019 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 04, 17th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2019)
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Vince Chhabria for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Executive Committee on 2/14/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2019)
February 13, 2019 Filing 17 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ivaS, COURTSTAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2019)
February 11, 2019 Filing 16 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Joshua Freeman.. (Fields, William) (Filed on 2/11/2019)
February 11, 2019 Filing 15 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Ekso Bionics.. (Rains, Darryl) (Filed on 2/11/2019)
February 11, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas Ethan Ham (Ham, Nicholas) (Filed on 2/11/2019)
February 11, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Darryl Paul Rains (Rains, Darryl) (Filed on 2/11/2019)
January 30, 2019 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Joshua Freeman. Service waived by Ekso Bionics waiver sent on 1/30/2019, answer due 4/1/2019. (Mah, Rosanne) (Filed on 1/30/2019)
January 28, 2019 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 2/11/2019. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2019)
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore granting #7 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2019)
January 14, 2019 Filing 9 EXHIBITS re #1 Complaint, Exhibit A to the Complaint filed byJoshua Freeman. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Mah, Rosanne) (Filed on 1/14/2019)
January 14, 2019 #Electronic filing error. No title Page. Exhibits e-filed separately and not as an attachment, require a title page. Please refer to Civil Local Rules 3-4 re first page requirement . Please re-file in its entirety. Re: #8 Exhibits filed by Joshua Freeman (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2019)
January 14, 2019 Filing 8 EXHIBITS re #1 Complaint, Exhibit A to the Complaint filed byJoshua Freeman. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Mah, Rosanne) (Filed on 1/14/2019)
January 14, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13000005.) filed by Joshua Freeman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Fields, William) (Filed on 1/14/2019)
January 11, 2019 Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 4/16/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/23/2019 01:30 PM. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2019)
January 11, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Ekso Bionics. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2019)
January 11, 2019 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 1/25/2019. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2019)
January 11, 2019 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by Joshua Freeman (Mah, Rosanne) (Filed on 1/11/2019)
January 11, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Mah, Rosanne) (Filed on 1/11/2019)
January 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Recovery of Attorneys' Fees for Causing Benefit to Defendant against Ekso Bionics ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-12996517.). Filed byJoshua Freeman. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mah, Rosanne) (Filed on 1/11/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Freeman v. Ekso Bionics
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ekso Bionics
Represented By: Darryl Paul Rains
Represented By: Nicholas Ethan Ham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Freeman
Represented By: Rosanne L. Mah
Represented By: William J Fields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?