Linx Card, Inc. v. Value Linx Services, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Linx Card, Inc.
Defendant: Value Linx Services, LLC and Priority Payment Systems West, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00262
Filed: January 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING UNOPPOSED MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 3/11/2019. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2019)
February 20, 2019 Filing 12 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Linx Card, Inc... (Pacquing, Rafael) (Filed on 2/20/2019)
February 19, 2019 Filing 11 Statement of Non-Opposition re #10 MOTION to Dismiss Transfer, or Stay filed by Linx Card, Inc.. (Related document(s) #10 ) (Pacquing, Rafael) (Filed on 2/19/2019) Modified on 2/20/2019 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
February 5, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss Transfer, or Stay filed by Priority Payment Systems West, LLC, Value Linx Services, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 3/28/2019 09:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Responses due by 2/19/2019. Replies due by 2/26/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Proposed Order)(Willes, Michael) (Filed on 2/5/2019)
January 28, 2019 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 2/11/2019. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. ((ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2019)
January 28, 2019 #Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101]Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re: #7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Appearance filed by Priority Payment Systems West, LLC, Value Linx Services, LLC (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2019)
January 28, 2019 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Priority Payment Systems West, LLC, Value Linx Services, LLC.. (Willes, Michael) (Filed on 1/28/2019)
January 22, 2019 Filing 7 Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Answer or Appearance filed by Priority Payment Systems West, LLC, Value Linx Services, LLC. (Willes, Michael) (Filed on 1/22/2019) Modified on 1/28/2019 (ahm, COURT STAFF).
January 17, 2019 Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 4/11/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/18/2019 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2019)
January 16, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Priority Payment Systems West, LLC, Value Linx Services, LLC (Willes, Michael) (Filed on 1/16/2019)
January 15, 2019 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 1/29/2019. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2019)
January 15, 2019 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by Priority Payment Systems West, LLC, Value Linx Services, LLC identifying Other Affiliate Tyler Young for Priority Payment Systems West, LLC, Value Linx Services, LLC. (Willes, Michael) (Filed on 1/15/2019)
January 15, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Priority Payment Systems West, LLC, Value Linx Services, LLC (Willes, Michael) (Filed on 1/15/2019)
January 15, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of Contra Costa County. Their case number is C18-02540. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-13005371). Filed byPriority Payment Systems West, LLC, Value Linx Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Willes, Michael) (Filed on 1/15/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Linx Card, Inc. v. Value Linx Services, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Value Linx Services, LLC
Represented By: Michael Clark Willes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Priority Payment Systems West, LLC
Represented By: Michael Clark Willes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linx Card, Inc.
Represented By: Rafael Reuben Pacquing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?