United States of America for the Use and Benefit of Boscacci, Inc., v. Advanced Technology Construction
Plaintiff: BOSCACCI, INC. and United States of America for the Use and Benefit of Boscacci, Inc.
Defendant: ADVANCED TECHNOLOGY C ONSTRUCTION, Zurich American Insurance Company and Advanced Technology Construction
Case Number: 3:2019cv00263
Filed: January 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth D Laporte
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2019 Filing 20 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Advanced Technology Construction.. (Linn, Peter) (Filed on 3/8/2019)
March 8, 2019 Filing 19 CLERK'S NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF Re: Consent or Declination. Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 3/22/2019. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2019)
March 6, 2019 Filing 18 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Advanced Technology Construction, Zurich American Insurance Company.. (Linn, Peter) (Filed on 3/6/2019)
March 6, 2019 Filing 17 ANSWER to #2 Complaint ; by Zurich American Insurance Company. (Linn, Peter) (Filed on 3/6/2019) Modified on 3/7/2019 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
March 6, 2019 Filing 16 ANSWER to #2 Complaint and Counterclaim; by Advanced Technology Construction. (Linn, Peter) (Filed on 3/6/2019) Modified on 3/7/2019 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
February 26, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter James Linn (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Linn, Peter) (Filed on 2/26/2019)
February 6, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Lauren Brittney Stec (Stec, Lauren) (Filed on 2/6/2019)
February 1, 2019 Filing 13 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 2/15/2019. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2019) Modified on 2/1/2019 (mllS, COURT STAFF).
January 31, 2019 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Complaint served on ADVANCED TECHNOLOGY CONSTRUCTION on 1/25/19, filed by United States of America for the Use and Benefit of Boscacci, Inc.. (McCarthy, Colin) (Filed on 1/31/2019)
January 31, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America for the Use and Benefit of Boscacci, Inc. upon Def. Zurich American Insurance Company (McCarthy, Colin) (Filed on 1/31/2019)
January 22, 2019 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Advanced Technology Construction, Zurich American Insurance Company. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2019)
January 18, 2019 Filing 9 Proposed Summons. (McCarthy, Colin) (Filed on 1/18/2019)
January 17, 2019 #Electronic filing error. This filing will not be processed by the clerks office.Please re-file in its entirety. Re: #8 Proposed Summons filed by United States of America for th e Use and Benefit of Boscacci, Inc., #7 Proposed Summons filed by United States of America for the Use and Benefit of Boscacci, Inc. E-Filer Submitted Incorrect Case Number of 19-1745 EDL Correct Case Number is 19-263 EDL. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2019)
January 17, 2019 Filing 8 ERRONEOUSLY E-FILED: SEE ERROR MESSAGE DATED 01/17/18 Proposed Summons. (McCarthy, Colin) (Filed on 1/17/2019) Modified on 1/18/2019 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
January 17, 2019 Filing 7 ERRONEOUSLY E-FILED: SEE ERROR MESSAGE DATED 01/17/18 Proposed Summons. (McCarthy, Colin) (Filed on 1/17/2019) Modified on 1/18/2019 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
January 17, 2019 #Electronic filing error. This filing will not be processed by the clerks office.Please re-file in its entirety. Re: #5 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons is Incomplete. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2019)
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 4/9/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/16/2019 10:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 1/16/19. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2019)
January 16, 2019 #Electronic filing error. Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re: #2 Complaint filed by BOSCACCI, INC. All Parties Entered Incorrectly, Parties Should Not be Entered in all Capitalized Letters. Docket Numbers Entered Out of Sequence the Complaint Should Always be Docket Number 1. All other Supporting Documents Should Follow in Correct Sequence. Fee should be Paid While E-filing the Complaint. Case Title Entered Incorrectly and Should Not be in All Capitalize Letters. E-Filer Should Not be Selective of the Parties They Enter on the Court Docket, all Parties must be Entered. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2019)
January 16, 2019 Filing 5 Proposed Summons. (McCarthy, Colin) (Filed on 1/16/2019)
January 16, 2019 Filing 4 Certificate of Interested Entities by BOSCACCI, INC. identifying Corporate Parent Zurich American Insurance Company, Corporate Parent BOSCACCI, INC., Corporate Parent ADVANCED TECHNOLOGY CONSTRUCTION for BOSCACCI, INC.. re #2 Complaint (McCarthy, Colin) (Filed on 1/16/2019)
January 16, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 1/29/2019. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2019) Modified on 1/17/2019 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
January 16, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT FOR: 1. BREACH OF CONTRACT; 2. QUANTUM MERUIT; 3. RECOVERY ON MILLER ACT PAYMENT BOND; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL; against All Plaintiffs ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13007192.). Filed byBOSCACCI, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(McCarthy, Colin) (Filed on 1/16/2019) Modified on 1/17/2019 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
January 16, 2019 Filing 1 FEE PAID (Filing fee$400,receipt number 0971-13007178). (McCarthy, Colin) (Filed on 1/16/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America for the Use and Benefit of Boscacci, Inc., v. Advanced Technology Construction
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BOSCACCI, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America for the Use and Benefit of Boscacci, Inc.
Represented By: Lauren Brittney Stec
Represented By: Colin Kendall McCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ADVANCED TECHNOLOGY C ONSTRUCTION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zurich American Insurance Company
Represented By: Terrence James Brasch
Represented By: Peter James Linn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Advanced Technology Construction
Represented By: Terrence James Brasch
Represented By: Peter James Linn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?