Haney et al v. Monsanto Company et al
Plaintiff: Darrel Mosely, virgenna saunders, Oliver McCain, William Johnson, II, Beverly Bray, Dennis Ferris, Delbert Kazee, Richard Garrott, Walter Holden, Jerry Keith Haney, Michael Pettit, Mark Waligura, Larry Singleton, Dennis Lindstrom, Allowishes Dula Scott, Ray Moore and Cynthia Banks
Defendant: Monsanto Company and John Does 1 through 100, inclusive
Case Number: 3:2019cv00278
Filed: January 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Vince Chhabria
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byMonsanto Company. (Hollingsworth, Joe) (Filed on 2/13/2019)
February 13, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Monsanto Company identifying Other Affiliate Bayer AG for Monsanto Company. (Hollingsworth, Joe) (Filed on 2/13/2019)
February 13, 2019 Filing 8 Certificate of Interested Entities by Monsanto Company identifying Other Affiliate Bayer AG for Monsanto Company. (Hollingsworth, Joe) (Filed on 2/13/2019)
January 17, 2019 Filing 7 Case transferred in from District of Missouri Eastern; Case Number 4:18-cv-02075. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF MDL TRANSFER to: Northern District of California. Case transferred via CM/ECF extraction. (DJO)
January 14, 2019 Filing 5 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-116) regarding multidistrict litigation No. 2741 IN RE: ROUNDUP PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION signed by Jeffery N. Lthi, Clerk of the Panel. (DJO)
January 4, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Walter Holden, Beverly Bray, Virgenna Saunders, Cynthia Banks, Jerry Keith Haney, Oliver McCain, Mark Waligura, Darrel Mosely, Larry Singleton, Dennis Lindstrom, William Johnson, II, Delbert Kazee, Michael Pettit, Richard Garrott, Ray Moore, Dennis Ferris, Allowishes Dula Scott. Monsanto Company served on 1/2/2019, answer due 1/23/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Kirk, Emily)
December 13, 2018 Filing 3 CJRA ORDER (GJL). Magistrate Judge John M. Bodenhausen termed. Case reassigned to District Judge Henry Edward Autrey for all further proceedings (KXS)
December 13, 2018 Case Opening Notification: 1 Summons(es) issued. The summons was emailed to attorney Emily Jo Kirk. All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. and all non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: U.S. Magistrate Judge John M. Bodenhausen. (BAK)
December 12, 2018 Receipt: $ 400.00, receipt number 0865-6923288 for Civil Filing Fee. (BAK)
December 12, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiffs Cynthia Banks, Beverly Bray, Dennis Ferris, Richard Garrott, Jerry Keith Haney, Walter Holden, William Johnson, II, Frank Johnson, Jr., Deceased, Delbert Kazee, Dennis Lindstrom, Oliver McCain, Ray Moore, Darrel Mosely, Michael Pettit, Virgenna Saunders, Allowishes Dula Scott, Larry Singleton, Mark Waligura Process Server: Civil Action Group dba APS International (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Original Filing Form)(Kirk, Emily)
December 12, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant Monsanto Company Jury Demand,, filed by Walter Holden, Beverly Bray, Virgenna Saunders, Cynthia Banks, Jerry Keith Haney, Oliver McCain, Mark Waligura, Darrel Mosely, Larry Singleton, Frank Johnson, Jr., Deceased, Dennis Lindstrom, William Johnson, II, Delbert Kazee, Michael Pettit, Richard Garrott, Ray Moore, Dennis Ferris, Allowishes Dula Scott.(Kirk, Emily)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Haney et al v. Monsanto Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darrel Mosely
Represented By: Emily Jo Kirk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: virgenna saunders
Represented By: Emily Jo Kirk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oliver McCain
Represented By: Emily Jo Kirk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Johnson, II
Represented By: Emily Jo Kirk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beverly Bray
Represented By: Emily Jo Kirk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Ferris
Represented By: Emily Jo Kirk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Delbert Kazee
Represented By: Emily Jo Kirk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Garrott
Represented By: Emily Jo Kirk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Walter Holden
Represented By: Emily Jo Kirk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry Keith Haney
Represented By: Emily Jo Kirk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Pettit
Represented By: Emily Jo Kirk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Waligura
Represented By: Emily Jo Kirk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Singleton
Represented By: Emily Jo Kirk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Lindstrom
Represented By: Emily Jo Kirk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allowishes Dula Scott
Represented By: Emily Jo Kirk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ray Moore
Represented By: Emily Jo Kirk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Banks
Represented By: Emily Jo Kirk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Represented By: Joe G. Hollingsworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1 through 100, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?