American Civil Liberties Union Foundation et al v. Department of Justice et al
Plaintiff: American Civil Liberties Union Foundation and American Civil Liberties Foundation of Northern California
Defendant: U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Department of State, Department of Justice, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Department of Homeland Security and U.S. Customs and Border Protection
Case Number: 3:2019cv00290
Filed: January 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Edward M Chen
Referring Judge: Sallie Kim
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER IN REASSIGNED CASE: Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/2/2019 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor. Joint Case Management Statement due by 4/25/2019. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/13/2019. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2019)
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Edward M. Chen for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Clerk on 3/12/19. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2019)
March 11, 2019 Filing 15 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2019)
March 8, 2019 Filing 14 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Department of Homeland Security, Department of Justice, Department of State, Federal Bureau of Investigation, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement.. (Tulis, Elizabeth) (Filed on 3/8/2019)
February 22, 2019 Filing 13 CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 3/8/2019. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2019)
February 20, 2019 Filing 12 STIPULATION to Extend Defendants' Time to Respond to the Complaint filed by Department of Homeland Security, Department of Justice, Department of State, Federal Bureau of Investigation, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Customs and Border Protection. (Tulis, Elizabeth) (Filed on 2/20/2019)
February 20, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Tulis (Tulis, Elizabeth) (Filed on 2/20/2019)
January 31, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed (FOIA) by American Civil Liberties Foundation of Northern California, American Civil Liberties Union Foundation. Department of Homeland Security served on 1/23/2019, answer due 2/22/2019; Department of Justice served on 1/23/2019, answer due 2/22/2019; Department of State served on 1/23/2019, answer due 2/22/2019; Federal Bureau of Investigation served on 1/23/2019, answer due 2/22/2019; U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services served on 1/23/2019, answer due 2/22/2019; U.S. Customs and Border Protection served on 1/23/2019, answer due 2/22/2019; U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement served on 1/23/2019, answer due 2/22/2019. (Handeyside, Hugh) (Filed on 1/31/2019)
January 30, 2019 Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by American Civil Liberties Foundation of Northern California, American Civil Liberties Union Foundation.. (Handeyside, Hugh) (Filed on 1/30/2019)
January 18, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Defendants Department of Homeland Security, Department of Justice, Department of State, Federal Bureau of Investigation, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Customs and Border Protection & U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2019)
January 18, 2019 Filing 7 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Joint Case Management Statement due by 4/15/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/22/2019 at 1:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2019)
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim granting #4 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (sklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2019)
January 17, 2019 Filing 5 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 1/31/2019. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2019)
January 17, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear in Pro Hac Vice, (Filing Fee: $310.00, receipt number 0971-13010990) (Filing Fee Previously Paid on 1/17/2019) filed by American Civil Liberties Foundation of Northern California, American Civil Liberties Union Foundation. (Handeyside, Hugh) (Filed on 1/17/2019)
January 17, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by American Civil Liberties Foundation of Northern California, American Civil Liberties Union Foundation of Certification of Interested Entities or Persons (Cagle, Matthew) (Filed on 1/17/2019)
January 17, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Cagle, Matthew) (Filed on 1/17/2019)
January 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Injunctive Relief for Violation of the Freedom of Information Act against Department of Homeland Security, Department of Justice, Department of State, Federal Bureau of Investigation, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, (Filing Fee: $400.00, receipt number 0971-13010965). Filed by American Civil Liberties Foundation of Northern California, American Civil Liberties Union Foundation. (Attachments: #(1) Civil Cover Sheet)(Cagle, Matthew) (Filed on 1/17/2019) Modified on 1/18/2019 (tnS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American Civil Liberties Union Foundation et al v. Department of Justice et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Represented By: Elizabeth Tulis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of State
Represented By: Elizabeth Tulis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Justice
Represented By: Elizabeth Tulis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
Represented By: Elizabeth Tulis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Bureau of Investigation
Represented By: Elizabeth Tulis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Elizabeth Tulis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Customs and Border Protection
Represented By: Elizabeth Tulis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Civil Liberties Union Foundation
Represented By: Hugh Handeyside
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Cagle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Civil Liberties Foundation of Northern California
Represented By: Hugh Handeyside
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Cagle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?