Brown et al v. Sharp Electronics Corporation
Plaintiff: Jill Brown and Austin Russell
Defendant: Sharp Electronics Corporation
Case Number: 3:2019cv00371
Filed: January 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: James Donato
Referring Judge: Elizabeth D Laporte
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER by Judge James Donato granting #20 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Richard Lomuscio. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2019)
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER by Judge James Donato granting #21 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Jeffrey Beyer. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2019)
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER by Judge James Donato granting #19 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Brian e. O'Donnell. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2019)
March 20, 2019 Filing 21 First MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Jeffrey Beyer ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13187459.) filed by Sharp Electronics Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Beyer, Jeffrey) (Filed on 3/20/2019)
March 20, 2019 Filing 20 First MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Richard Lomuscio ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13187415.) filed by Sharp Electronics Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Lomuscio, Richard) (Filed on 3/20/2019)
March 20, 2019 Filing 19 First MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Brian e. O'Donnell ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13187142.) filed by Sharp Electronics Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(O'Donnell, Brian) (Filed on 3/20/2019)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/2/2019 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 4/25/2019. Signed by Judge James Donato on 3/5/19. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2019)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge James Donato for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Executive Committee on 3/4/19. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2019)
March 1, 2019 Filing 16 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now reassign this case to a District Judge because a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2019)
March 1, 2019 Filing 15 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Sharp Electronics Corporation.. (Davies, Robert) (Filed on 3/1/2019)
February 22, 2019 Filing 14 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint filed by Sharp Electronics Corporation. (Davies, Robert) (Filed on 2/22/2019)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Granting Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte: granting #11 Application. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2019)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Granting Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte: granting #10 Application. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2019)
February 18, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION & [PROPOSED] ORDER for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13100435.) filed by Jill Brown, Austin Russell. (Bryson, Daniel) (Filed on 2/18/2019) Modified on 2/19/2019 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
February 18, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION & [PROPOSED] ORDER for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13100429.) filed by Jill Brown, Austin Russell. (Segui, Harper) (Filed on 2/18/2019) Modified on 2/19/2019 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
February 15, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jill Brown, Austin Russell. Sharp Electronics Corporation served on 2/1/2019, answer due 2/22/2019. (Zavareei, Hassan) (Filed on 2/15/2019)
February 5, 2019 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Jill Brown, Austin Russell.. (Zavareei, Hassan) (Filed on 2/5/2019)
February 4, 2019 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE: The parties are hereby notified that the Initial Case Management Conference is rescheduled to 4/30/2019 at 10:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom E, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Case Management Statement is now due by 4/23/2019. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2019)
January 24, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Sharp Electronics Corporation. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2019)
January 23, 2019 Filing 5 Proposed Summons. (Zavareei, Hassan) (Filed on 1/23/2019)
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 4/16/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/23/2019 10:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 1/22/19. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2019)
January 22, 2019 #Electronic filing error. This filing will not be processed by the clerks office.Please re-file in its entirety. Re: #2 Proposed Summons filed by Austin Russell, Jill Brown Defendant Sharp Electronics Corporation can only be served at one address. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2019)
January 22, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 2/5/2019. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2019)
January 22, 2019 Filing 2 ERRONEOUSLY E-FILED: SEE ERROR MESSAGE DATED 01/22/19 Proposed Summons. (Zavareei, Hassan) (Filed on 1/22/2019) Modified on 1/23/2019 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
January 22, 2019 Filing 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT; JURY TRIAL DEMANDED; against Sharp Electronics Corporation ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13023437.). Filed byJill Brown, Austin Russell. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jill Brown, #2 Declaration of Austin Russell, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Zavareei, Hassan) (Filed on 1/22/2019) Modified on 1/23/2019 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown et al v. Sharp Electronics Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jill Brown
Represented By: Gregory F. Coleman
Represented By: Rachel Lynn Soffin
Represented By: Lisa A. White
Represented By: Harper T. Segui
Represented By: Annick Marie Persinger
Represented By: Daniel K. Bryson
Represented By: Adam A. Edwards
Represented By: Hassan Ali Zavareei
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Austin Russell
Represented By: Gregory F. Coleman
Represented By: Rachel Lynn Soffin
Represented By: Lisa A. White
Represented By: Harper T. Segui
Represented By: Annick Marie Persinger
Represented By: Daniel K. Bryson
Represented By: Adam A. Edwards
Represented By: Hassan Ali Zavareei
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharp Electronics Corporation
Represented By: Jeffrey M Beyer
Represented By: Richard J.L. Lomuscio
Represented By: Brian E O'Donnell
Represented By: Robert Edmund Davies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?