Apple Inc. v. Fundamental Innovation Systems International LLC et al

Plaintiff: Apple Inc.
Defendant: Fundamental Innovation Systems International Holdings LLC and Fundamental Innovation Systems International LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00638
Filed: February 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
0 Judge: William Alsup
1 Judge: Thomas S Hixson
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 5, 2019 Filing 26 REPLY (re #22 MOTION to Dismiss or Transfer ) filed byFundamental Innovation Systems International Holdings LLC, Fundamental Innovation Systems International LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Brian P. Biddinger in Further Support of Fundamental's Motion to Dismiss or Transfer, #2 Exhibit AD)(Biddinger, Brian) (Filed on 4/5/2019)
March 29, 2019 Filing 25 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #22 MOTION to Dismiss or Transfer ) filed byApple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Sean Cunningham, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Declaration Michael Jaynes, #13 Proposed Order)(Cunningham, Sean) (Filed on 3/29/2019)
March 22, 2019 Filing 24 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Fundamental Innovation Systems International Holdings LLC, Fundamental Innovation Systems International LLC identifying Corporate Parent Fundamental Innovation Systems International Holdings LLC for Fundamental Innovation Systems International LLC. (Biddinger, Brian) (Filed on 3/22/2019)
March 22, 2019 Filing 23 Certificate of Interested Entities by Fundamental Innovation Systems International Holdings LLC, Fundamental Innovation Systems International LLC identifying Other Affiliate BlackBerry Limited, Other Affiliate Fundamental Finance LLC for Fundamental Innovation Systems International Holdings LLC, Fundamental Innovation Systems International LLC. (Biddinger, Brian) (Filed on 3/22/2019)
March 15, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION to Dismiss or Transfer filed by Fundamental Innovation Systems International Holdings LLC, Fundamental Innovation Systems International LLC. Motion Hearing set for 4/25/2019 08:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor before Judge William Alsup. Responses due by 3/29/2019. Replies due by 4/5/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Paul Seaman ISO Fundamental's Motion to Dismiss or Transfer, #3 Declaration of Brian P. Biddinger in Support of Fundamental's Motion to Dismiss or Transfer, #4 Exhibit A to Biddinger Dec., #5 Exhibit B to Biddinger Dec., #6 Exhibit C to Biddinger Dec., #7 Exhibit D to Biddinger Dec., #8 Exhibit E to Biddinger Dec., #9 Exhibit F to Biddinger Dec., #10 Exhibit G to Biddinger Dec., #11 Exhibit H to Biddinger Dec., #12 Exhibit I to Biddinger Dec., #13 Exhibit J to Biddinger Dec., #14 Exhibit K to Biddinger Dec., #15 Exhibit L to Biddinger Dec., #16 Exhibit M to Biddinger Dec., #17 Exhibit N to Biddinger Dec., #18 Exhibit O to Biddinger Dec., #19 Exhibit P to Biddinger Dec., #20 Exhibit Q to Biddinger Dec., #21 Exhibit R to Biddinger Dec., #22 Exhibit S to Biddinger Dec., #23 Exhibit T to Biddinger Dec., #24 Exhibit U to Biddinger Dec., #25 Exhibit V to Biddinger Dec., #26 Exhibit W to Biddinger Dec., #27 Exhibit X to Biddinger Dec., #28 Exhibit Y to Biddinger Dec., #29 Exhibit Z to Biddinger Dec., #30 Exhibit AA to Biddinger Dec., #31 Exhibit AB to Biddinger Dec., #32 Exhibit AC to Biddinger Dec.)(Biddinger, Brian) (Filed on 3/15/2019)
March 15, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian Paul Biddinger [SPECIAL APPEARANCE] (Biddinger, Brian) (Filed on 3/15/2019)
February 25, 2019 Filing 20 STIPULATION (Joint) to Extend the Time for Defendants to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint for Patent Infringement filed by Apple Inc., Fundamental Innovation Systems International Holdings LLC and Fundamental Innovation Systems International LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Cunningham, Sean) (Filed on 2/25/2019) Modified on 2/25/2019 (amgS, COURT STAFF).
February 21, 2019 Filing 19 CLERK'S NOTICE SCHEDULING CMC ON REASSIGNMENT: Case Management Statement due by 5/2/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/9/2019 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/whaorders. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2019)
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER, Case reassigned to Judge William Alsup. Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Executive Committee on 2/21/19. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2019)
February 20, 2019 Filing 17 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2019)
February 19, 2019 Filing 16 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Apple Inc... (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Cunningham, Sean) (Filed on 2/19/2019)
February 19, 2019 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple Inc. of Summons, Complaint and Related Documents on Defendant Fundamental Innovation Systems International Holdings LLC (Cunningham, Sean) (Filed on 2/19/2019)
February 19, 2019 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Apple Inc. of Summons, Complaint and Related Documents on Defendant Fundamental Innovation Systems International LLC (Cunningham, Sean) (Filed on 2/19/2019)
February 7, 2019 Filing 13 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding (cc: form mailed to register). (Attachments: #1 cmp)(hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2019)
February 7, 2019 Filing 12 Summons Issued as to Fundamental Innovation Systems International Holdings LLC, Fundamental Innovation Systems International LLC. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2019)
February 6, 2019 Filing 11 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 5/2/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/9/2019 10:00 AM. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2019)
February 6, 2019 Filing 10 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 2/20/2019. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2019)
February 6, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Erik R. Fuehrer (Fuehrer, Erik) (Filed on 2/6/2019)
February 6, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter Patrick Maggiore (Maggiore, Peter) (Filed on 2/6/2019)
February 6, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Jacob Daniel Anderson (Anderson, Jacob) (Filed on 2/6/2019)
February 6, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Yakov M. Zolotorev (Zolotorev, Yakov) (Filed on 2/6/2019)
February 6, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Edward Henryk Sikorski (Sikorski, Edward) (Filed on 2/6/2019)
February 6, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Erin Paige Gibson (Gibson, Erin) (Filed on 2/6/2019)
February 5, 2019 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by Apple Inc. (Cunningham, Sean) (Filed on 2/5/2019)
February 5, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Cunningham, Sean) (Filed on 2/5/2019)
February 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment of Noninfringement against Fundamental Innovation Systems International Holdings LLC, Fundamental Innovation Systems International LLC ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13067909.). Filed byApple Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 to Complaint, #3 Exhibit 3 to Complaint, #4 Exhibit 4 to Complaint, #5 Exhibit 5 to Complaint, #6 Exhibit 6 to Complaint, #7 Exhibit 7 to Complaint, #8 Exhibit 8 to Complaint, #9 Exhibit 9 to Complaint, #10 Exhibit 10 to Complaint, #11 Exhibit 11 to Complaint, #12 Exhibit 12 to Complaint, #13 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cunningham, Sean) (Filed on 2/5/2019)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Apple Inc. v. Fundamental Innovation Systems International LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Apple Inc.
Represented By: Erik R. Fuehrer
Represented By: Jacob Daniel Anderson
Represented By: Edward Henryk Sikorski
Represented By: Yakov M. Zolotorev
Represented By: Peter Patrick Maggiore
Represented By: Sean C. Cunningham
Represented By: Erin Paige Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fundamental Innovation Systems International Holdings LLC
Represented By: Brian Paul Biddinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fundamental Innovation Systems International LLC
Represented By: Brian Paul Biddinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?