Quanli Dong, DDS, Inc., et al. v. Complete Business Solutions Group, Inc., et al.

Plaintiff: Quanli Dong, DDS, Inc., a California corporation, Dr. Vivian Dong and Quanli Dong, DDS, Inc.
Defendant: Complete Business Solutions Group, Inc. d/b/a Par Funding d/b/a Broadway Advance Funding, a Pennsylvania Corporation, Hamilton Advance, Inc., a New York Corporation, Yellowstone Capital West, LLC, a New York Limited Liability Company, Complete Business Solutions Group, Inc., Yellowstone Capital West, LLC and Hamilton Advance, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00705
Filed: February 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
0 Judge: Vince Chhabria
1 Judge: Donna M Ryu
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 21, 2019 Reset Hearing as to #11 MOTION to Transfer Case Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1404(a) with Proof of Service. Motion Hearing set for 4/25/2019 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 04, 17th Floor before Judge Vince Chhabria. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2019)
March 20, 2019 Filing 21 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Yellowstone Capital West, LLC. Amendment to 20 Clerk's Notice,,,, #19 Order Reassigning Case,, Case Assigned/Reassigned, Amended Notice of Hearing on Defendant West Coast Business Capital, LLC's Notice of Motion and Motion to Transfer Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1404(a) with Proof of Service. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Oh-Kubisch, Sharon) (Filed on 3/20/2019)
March 19, 2019 Filing 20 REASSIGNED CASE - NOTICE OF NEW HEARING DATE: You are notified that the Court has scheduled an Initial Case Management Conference before Judge Vince Chhabria upon reassignment. For a copy of Judge Chhabria's Standing Order and other information, please refer to the Court's website at www.cand.uscourts.gov. All pending motions will be taken off-calendar and must be re-noticed by the moving party for a new hearing according to Judge Chhabria's available dates, which are listed on his webpage under the section "Scheduling Notes." The new hearing date must be at least five weeks from the date the motion was filed and at least three weeks from the date the re-notice is filed. The due date for any opposition or reply papers not yet filed shall be calculated in accordance with Civil Local Rule 7-3. Case Management Statement due by 5/7/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/14/2019 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 04, 17th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2019)
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Vince Chhabria for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Clerk on 03/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2019)
March 18, 2019 Set/Reset Hearing (dmrlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2019)
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 3/18/2019. (dmrlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2019)
March 1, 2019 Filing 17 Proposed Order re #11 MOTION to Transfer Case Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1404(a) with Proof of Service by Yellowstone Capital West, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Oh-Kubisch, Sharon) (Filed on 3/1/2019) Modified on 3/4/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
February 28, 2019 #Electronic filing error. Motion did not include a proposed order in compliance with Local Rule 7-2 (c). Please file a proposed order on the docket and in compliance with the Judge 's Standing Order. Re: #11 MOTION to Transfer Case Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1404(a) with Proof of Service filed by Yellowstone Capital West, LLC (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2019)
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting #15 Stipulation to Vacate Case Deadlines Pending Resolution of Motion to Transfer #11 . (dmrlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2019)
February 27, 2019 Filing 15 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Stay Action Pending #11 Motion to Transfer Action Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1404(a) filed by Yellowstone Capital West, LLC., Quanli Dong, DDS, Inc., and Vivian Dong. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service, #2 Proposed Order)(Oh-Kubisch, Sharon) (Filed on 2/27/2019) Modified on 2/28/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
February 27, 2019 Filing 14 AMENDED CLERK'S NOTICE TO PLAINTIFFS Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 3/6/2019. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2019)
February 27, 2019 Filing 13 Declaration of Sharon Oh-Kubisch in Support of #11 MOTION to Transfer Case Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1404(a) with Proof of Service filed byYellowstone Capital West, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit "4", #2 Exhibit Exhibit "5", #3 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Related document(s) #11 ) (Oh-Kubisch, Sharon) (Filed on 2/27/2019)
February 27, 2019 Filing 12 Declaration of Leah Zelazny in Support of #11 MOTION to Transfer Case Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1404(a) with Proof of Service filed byYellowstone Capital West, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit "1", #2 Exhibit Exhibit "2", #3 Exhibit Exhibit "3", #4 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Related document(s) #11 ) (Oh-Kubisch, Sharon) (Filed on 2/27/2019)
February 27, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Transfer Case Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1404(a) with Proof of Service filed by Yellowstone Capital West, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 4/11/2019 11:00 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Responses due by 3/13/2019. Replies due by 3/20/2019. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Oh-Kubisch, Sharon) (Filed on 2/27/2019)
February 27, 2019 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE re Docket No. #9 , pursuant to Civil Local Rule 6-1(a), parties may stipulate to extend the time within which to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint without a court order provided the change will not alter the date of any event or any deadline already fixed by Court order. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (dmrlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2019)
February 25, 2019 Filing 9 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extending Deadline for Defendant West Coast Business Capital, LLC to File Responsive Pleading to Complaint with Proof of Service re #1 Notice of Removal,, filed by Yellowstone Capital West, LLC., Quanli Dong, DDS, Inc., and Vivian Dong. (Attachments: #1 Order Approving Stipulation Extending Deadline for Defendant West Coast Business Capital, LLC to File Responsive Pleading to Complaint)(Oh-Kubisch, Sharon) (Filed on 2/25/2019) Modified on 2/26/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 2/26/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).
February 20, 2019 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE TO PLAINTIFFS Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 3/6/2019. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2019)
February 13, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Yellowstone Capital West, LLC. Service waived by Yellowstone Capital West, LLC waiver sent on 2/13/2019, answer due 4/15/2019. with Proof of Service (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Oh-Kubisch, Sharon) (Filed on 2/13/2019)
February 13, 2019 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Quanli Dong, DDS, Inc. and Dr. Vivian Dong on 02/13/2019 by Yellowstone Capital West, LLC. with Proof of Service Waiver of Service due by 3/15/2019. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Oh-Kubisch, Sharon) (Filed on 2/13/2019)
February 13, 2019 Filing 5 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Yellowstone Capital West, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Oh-Kubisch, Sharon) (Filed on 2/13/2019)
February 13, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Yellowstone Capital West, LLC of Order Serving Initial Case Managment Conference and ADR Deadlines (Oh-Kubisch, Sharon) (Filed on 2/13/2019)
February 8, 2019 Filing 3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 5/22/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/29/2019 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2019)
February 8, 2019 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 2/22/2019. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2019)
February 8, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL of Action by Defendant West Coast Business Capital, LLC Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Sections 1332, 1441(b), and 1446 with Proof of Service from San Mateo County Superior Court. Their case number is 19civ00023. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-13077098). Filed byYellowstone Capital West, LLC, a New York Limited Liability Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Oh-Kubisch, Sharon) (Filed on 2/8/2019) Modified on 2/11/2019 (jjbS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Quanli Dong, DDS, Inc., et al. v. Complete Business Solutions Group, Inc., et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Complete Business Solutions Group, Inc. d/b/a Par Funding d/b/a Broadway Advance Funding, a Pennsylvania Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hamilton Advance, Inc., a New York Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yellowstone Capital West, LLC, a New York Limited Liability Company
Represented By: Sharon Oh-Kubisch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Complete Business Solutions Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yellowstone Capital West, LLC
Represented By: Sharon Oh-Kubisch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hamilton Advance, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Quanli Dong, DDS, Inc., a California corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dr. Vivian Dong
Represented By: Bonnie Lynn Stokes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Quanli Dong, DDS, Inc.
Represented By: Bonnie Lynn Stokes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?