Elite Cajun Foods II, LLC v. Popeyes Louisiana Kitchen, Inc.

Plaintiff: Elite Cajun Foods II, LLC
Defendant: Popeyes Louisiana Kitchen, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00706
Filed: February 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Charles R Breyer
Referring Judge: Sallie Kim
Nature of Suit: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 26, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Elite Cajun Foods II, LLC (Hansra, Jagdeep) (Filed on 3/26/2019)
March 22, 2019 Filing 21 STIPULATION re #20 Stipulation, #18 Renotice motion hearing, #7 MOTION to Change Venue TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF FLORIDA PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1404 filed by Elite Cajun Foods II, LLC. (Hansra, Jagdeep) (Filed on 3/22/2019)
March 7, 2019 Filing 20 STIPULATION filed by Elite Cajun Foods II, LLC. (Hansra, Jagdeep) (Filed on 3/7/2019)
March 5, 2019 Filing 19 Proposed Order re #7 MOTION to Change Venue TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF FLORIDA PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1404 by Popeyes Louisiana Kitchen, Inc.. (Friedenberg, Adam) (Filed on 3/5/2019)
March 5, 2019 Filing 18 Renotice motion hearing re #7 MOTION to Change Venue TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF FLORIDA PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1404 filed byPopeyes Louisiana Kitchen, Inc.. (Related document(s) #7 ) (Friedenberg, Adam) (Filed on 3/5/2019)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE, Michael D. Joblove by Judge Charles R. Breyer: Granting #13 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2019)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE, Jessica Serell Erenbaum by Judge Charles R. Breyer: Granting #12 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2019)
February 26, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #7 MOTION to Change Venue TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF FLORIDA PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1404. Responses due by 3/8/2019. Replies due by 3/15/2019. Motion Hearing set for 4/12/2019 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 06, 17th Floor before Judge Charles R. Breyer. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2019)
February 26, 2019 Filing 15 CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING MOTION TO CHANGE VENUE (ECF No. 7) HEARING. Motion Hearing reset for 4/12/2019 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 06, 17th Floor before Judge Charles R. Breyer. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2019)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Charles R. Breyer for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Executive Committee on 2/26/19. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2019)
February 25, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear in Pro Hac Vice, (Filing Fee: $310.00, receipt number 0971-13119502), (Filing Fee Previously Paid on 02/25/2019) filed by Popeyes Louisiana Kitchen, Inc.. (Joblove, Michael) (Filed on 2/25/2019)
February 25, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear in Pro Hac Vice, (Filing Fee: $310.00, receipt number 0971-13119569) filed by Popeyes Louisiana Kitchen, Inc.. (Serell Erenbaum, Jessica) (Filed on 2/25/2019)
February 25, 2019 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2019)
February 22, 2019 Filing 10 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Popeyes Louisiana Kitchen, Inc... (Friedenberg, Adam) (Filed on 2/22/2019)
February 22, 2019 Filing 9 [Proposed] Order Granting re #7 MOTION to Change Venue TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF FLORIDA PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1404 filed by Popeyes Louisiana Kitchen, Inc.. (Friedenberg, Adam) (Filed on 2/22/2019)
February 22, 2019 Filing 8 Declaration of Jeffrey Grill in Support of #7 MOTION to Change Venue TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF FLORIDA PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1404 filed byPopeyes Louisiana Kitchen, Inc.. (Related document(s) #7 ) (Friedenberg, Adam) (Filed on 2/22/2019)
February 22, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Change Venue TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF FLORIDA PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1404 filed by Popeyes Louisiana Kitchen, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 4/1/2019 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Responses due by 3/8/2019. Replies due by 3/15/2019. (Friedenberg, Adam) (Filed on 2/22/2019)
February 14, 2019 Filing 6 STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEFENDANT POPEYES LOUISIANA KITCHEN, INC.'S TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT (L.R. 6-1) filed by Popeyes Louisiana Kitchen, Inc.. (Friedenberg, Adam) (Filed on 2/14/2019)
February 13, 2019 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Joint Case Management Statement due by 5/6/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/13/2019 at 1:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2019)
February 8, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Popeyes Louisiana Kitchen, Inc. of re #1 Notice of Removal, re #2 Certification of Interested Entities or Parties, re 3 Case Assigned by Intake (Friedenberg, Adam) (Filed on 2/8/2019)
February 8, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 2/22/2019. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2019)
February 8, 2019 Filing 2 Certification of Interested Entities or Parties filed by Popeyes Louisiana Kitchen, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Restaurant Brands International, Inc., Other Affiliate Orange Intermediate, LLC for Popeyes Louisiana Kitchen, Inc.. (Friedenberg, Adam) (Filed on 2/8/2019)
February 8, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL OF ACTION from Contra Costa County Superior Court. Their case number is C19-00010, (Filing Fee: $400.00, receipt number 0971-13077199). Filed by Popeyes Louisiana Kitchen, Inc.. (Attachments: #(1) Civil Cover Sheet)(Friedenberg, Adam) (Filed on 2/8/2019) Modified on 2/13/2019 (tnS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Elite Cajun Foods II, LLC v. Popeyes Louisiana Kitchen, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elite Cajun Foods II, LLC
Represented By: Enedina S Cardenas
Represented By: Jagdeep Singh Hansra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Popeyes Louisiana Kitchen, Inc.
Represented By: Adam Friedenberg
Represented By: Jessica Serell Erenbaum
Represented By: Michael D Joblove
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?