Oliver v. Aabaco Small Business, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Anthony A. Oliver and Anthony Oliver
Defendant: Perez Hilton Management, Inc., NYP Holdings, Inc., Warner Bros Entertainment, Inc., EHM Productions, Inc., Aabaco Small Business, LLC, Corte Lodato, LLC, The Wrap News, Inc., Hearst Communications, Inc., YouTube, LLC, Radar Online, LLC, CBS Interactive, Inc., American Media, Inc., Google, LLC, Whalerock Television Productions, Inc., Meredith Corporation of Iowa, IMDB.Com, Inc., Wenn Ryde Holdings, Inc., Thomson Reuters America Corporation, Thomson Reuters America Holdings, Inc., Microsoft Corporation, RSV NG, LLC and Reddit, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00851
Filed: February 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Edward M Chen
Referring Judge: Virginia K DeMarchi
2 Judge: Beth Labson Freeman
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #5 Motion for Permission for Electronic Case Filing. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2019)
February 28, 2019 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Amended Complaint due by 4/2/2019. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2019)
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting #3 Plaintiff's Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis; and Dismissing Complaint With Leave to Amend. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2019)
February 25, 2019 Filing 12 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Anthony A. Oliver. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2019)
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER IN REASSIGNED CASE: Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/27/2019 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 05, 17th Floor. Joint Case Management Statement due by 6/20/2019. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/21/2019. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2019)
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Edward M. Chen for all further proceedings. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Judge Executive Committee on 2/21/19. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(cfeS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2019)
February 21, 2019 Filing 9 This case will be randomly reassigned to a District Judge outside the San Jose Division pursuant to the Caseload Rebalancing Pilot Program approved by the Court effective March 1, 2018. For information, visit our web page at #http://cand.uscourts.gov/news/225. (cfeS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2019)
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 2/20/2019. (blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2019)
February 15, 2019 Filing 7 Proposed Summons. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2019)
February 15, 2019 Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras Case Management Statement due by 6/20/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/27/2019 11:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 3, 5th Floor. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2019) Modified on 2/19/2019 (sfbS, COURT STAFF).
February 15, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Permission for Electronic Case Filing filed by Anthony A. Oliver. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2019)
February 15, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Interested Parties by Anthony A. Oliver (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2019)
February 15, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Anthony A. Oliver. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in Support of IFP)(sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2019)
February 15, 2019 Filing 2 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Anthony A. Oliver. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2019)
February 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Aabaco Small Business, LLC, American Media, Inc., CBS Interactive, Inc., Corte Lodato, LLC, EHM Productions, Inc., Google, LLC, Hearst Communications, Inc., NYP Holdings, Inc., Perez Hilton Management, Inc., Radar Online, LLC, The Wrap News, Inc., Warner Bros Entertainment, Inc., YouTube, LLC. Filed byAnthony A. Oliver. Consent/Declination due by 3/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2019) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/19/2019: #2 Cover Letter) (sfbS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Oliver v. Aabaco Small Business, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Perez Hilton Management, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NYP Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warner Bros Entertainment, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EHM Productions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aabaco Small Business, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corte Lodato, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Wrap News, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hearst Communications, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YouTube, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Radar Online, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Interactive, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Media, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Whalerock Television Productions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meredith Corporation of Iowa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMDB.Com, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wenn Ryde Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomson Reuters America Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomson Reuters America Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Microsoft Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RSV NG, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reddit, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony A. Oliver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Oliver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?