Abante Rooter and Plumbing, Inc. v. Martin Brothers Insurance Services, LLC

Plaintiff: Abante Rooter and Plumbing, Inc.
Defendant: Martin Brothers Insurance Services, LLC d/b/a Fast Start Insurance & Financial Services, Inc. and Martin Brothers Insurance Services, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00870
Filed: February 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 47:227
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 17, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Abante Rooter and Plumbing, Inc. (Friedman, Todd) (Filed on 4/17/2019)
March 15, 2019 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Abante Rooter and Plumbing, Inc... (Friedman, Todd) (Filed on 3/15/2019)
February 20, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Martin Brothers Insurance Services, LLC. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2019)
February 20, 2019 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 5/16/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/23/2019 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2019)
February 19, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 3/5/2019. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2019)
February 18, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Friedman, Todd) (Filed on 2/18/2019)
February 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Martin Brothers Insurance Services, LLC . Filed by Abante Rooter and Plumbing, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Friedman, Todd) (Filed on 2/18/2019) Modified on 2/20/2019 (slhS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Abante Rooter and Plumbing, Inc. v. Martin Brothers Insurance Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin Brothers Insurance Services, LLC d/b/a Fast Start Insurance & Financial Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin Brothers Insurance Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abante Rooter and Plumbing, Inc.
Represented By: Todd Michael Friedman
Represented By: Adrian R. Bacon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?